IN RE: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC, TELEPHONE CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Inna Badran, Morris Padulo, Chenelle McCall, Bryan LaMie, Katrina Danbar, Donald Balowski, Jessie D. Shuford, Inna Spivak, Thomas Whitler, Michael Arroyo, Kelly Banks, Sharon L Sovick, Jeffrey J Morales, Janice Mercado, Kepler Laurore, Elisha Ornes, Julie Madden, Mary Russell, Christopher Peck, Daniel Mather, Tereda Mays, Susan Lowe, Jody Firneno, Walker Cassidy, Andramedia C. Robinson, Jarrett R. Jenkins, Loralyn Drong, Sheila J. Wilson, AT&T, Robert Banks, Willie McLaughlin, Ernest Engels, Laura Catlett, A L Ivey, Raoul Delalue, Adeline Rejkowski, Tammy Kilmer, Robert L. Waxman, Barbara Gonzalez, Lee Arthur Momient, Juanita Ocanas, Fawn Turner, Jay Renfrow, Sam Marin, Antoine Cutler, Teri Robert, Matthew Neill, Lorenz Worthy, Judith Suggs, Drew Hill, Amie Hinton, Craig Cunningham, Jerilee Batista, William Nichols, Jr., Michael A. Greengrass, Katherine Ann Bowen, Brighid Colleen Bauer, Cedar Shelley, Jason Heller, Dan Elliston, Sebastian Fisichella, Rachael Treshman, David Moya, Kenneth Stout, Jr., Richard Chrisman, Leslie Millspaugh, Lawrence Domingo, Earlina King, Brittany Jackson, Robin Rice, Estela Vasquez, Christopher Ciesla, Carlos Suarez, Scott C. Piller, Mohammed A. Tipoo, CASSANDRA PYNES, Paul Pasquesi, Julius Macatangay, Mildred Bukvich, Stephen A. Heuertz, Catherine Brown, Michelle Truong, Christopher Zimmerman, Misty Blevins, Francesco Manasse, Jeremy Rohde, Lynelle Hernandez, Dennis Nolting, Heather Conine, Claudette Marc, Cheryl Hatfield, John Lukowicz, Brandi Williams, Angela Stathopoulos, Thomas McPherson, Daniel Grief, Kevin Vance, Laura Oliver, Geoff G Heusohn, Joseph Newcomb, Jeffrey Gonic, Frederick L Jury, Adrian Claiborne, Robert R. Vsetula, Paul Andrews, Pamela Walker, Gary Contreras, Ricki Justice, Chris Cathey, Judith McLaughlin, Mike Smith, Christopher Calkins, Bank of America NA, Mary Deering, Al Maxey, Karen Hubbard, Wendy Kiefer, Christopher Sutton, Christine Suarez, Kelly Smith, Norma Mulrine, John Howard, Kirby Spencer, Ron Frazier, Marc Lawrence, Michael Slattery, Jason Shearer, Deon Thomas, Adrian Hines, Loni Smith, Kerry Skarbakka, James Brown, Faron Peacock, Sarah Pasquesi, Ross A. Miller, Bret Burroughs, Steven Nikolov, Christine L Herendeen, Carolyn Wheeler, Jane Dean, Patrick Chu, Jason Gaza, Jacqueline Taylor, Kathleen Herzog, Sandra Stroud, Desiree Valdez, Rey Rabago, Terry Lowe, Kevin Asbury, Tamara Morris, Guy Connor, Steve Kistiansen, Karen Harvey, John Ashe, Larry Harrington, Stan Marczak, Deborah Jesse, Aeirel Shoun, Herode Benjamin, Tracy Kwit, Ta Mika Williams-Sharpley, Riki-Anne Rebelez, James J. Dillard, U.S. Bank N.A., Mary Royal, Lisa Winiecki, Danny Allen, Jr., Ronald A. Wing, Athiena Byers, David Goehst, David Kern, Denice Merli, Susan Matos, Jesse Meyer, Steven D. Fredrickson, Mary Branca, Eli Terrell, Rosie Lara, David Bauer, Rene Hernandez, Robert Mayo, Angie M. Richards, Miguel E. Bengochea, Kenneth McCormick, Stacy Crayder, Akeli Smith, Jose Hernandez, Adam Hoover, Darren Neese, Yolanda Forte, Janet McCormick, Roger Small, Jeremy Frydman, Shad Finney, Robert D Clark, Frank T. Augustin, Betty Wing, Tracy Smith, Andrew Makarious, Brae Coats, Nora Garcia, Will Gabot, Michael Phan, Josh Streeter, Twyler Bynum, Timothy S. Bowyer, Dan Lynch, Benjamin Bromberg, Bernard Robertson, Alisa Baker, Anthony Gustafson, Armando Aguilar, Joseph Gough, Kimberly Bartlett, Daniel Shotts, Christine Longa, Dawn Reamer, Judge John Thompson, Carl Herrero and Rosemary Contreras
Defendant: PRA Group, Inc., Neal Stern, Cynthia Patterson, William J. Allen, P.A., does 1-10, inclusive, Portfolio Associates, LLC, Ryan Seay, Forster & Garbus, LLP., Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and Worldwide Asset Recoveries, LLC
Petitioner: Sharina Talbot Romano
Not Classified By Court: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2011md02295
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay [Doc. No. #793 ]. The parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the Supreme Court's decision. Defendant's previously filed motions to stay (Doc. Nos. #737 , #777 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/27/2020. (tcf)
July 21, 2020 Filing 793 MOTION to Stay by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
July 15, 2020 Filing 792 RESPONSE re #791 Supplemental Document filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
July 7, 2020 Filing 791 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Drew Hill re #777 MOTION to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Barr Decision)(Lester, Patric) (tcf).
July 6, 2020 Filing 790 RESPONSE re #789 Notice (Other) re Supplemental Authority filed by Drew Hill. (Lester, Patric) (tcf).
June 29, 2020 Filing 789 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #672 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Makarious Member Case with Prejudice (Doc. No. #787 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/12/2020. CC: MDL Panel (tcf)
June 12, 2020 Filing 787 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Makarious Member Case with Prejudice by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
May 4, 2020 Filing 786 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #672 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
March 23, 2020 Filing 785 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #672 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #673 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Randall Snyder or, Alternatively, Strike Snyder's March 19, 2018 Declaration . (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
March 23, 2020 Filing 784 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #777 MOTION to Stay . (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
March 20, 2020 Filing 783 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority - In Re: Midland by Drew Hill re #779 Response in Opposition to Motion (Lester, Patric) (tcf).
March 16, 2020 Filing 782 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority - Sutor by Drew Hill re #779 Response in Opposition to Motion (Lester, Patric) (tcf).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER of Dismissal of Smith, Mike Member Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/28/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (CC: MDL Panel) (tcf)
February 20, 2020 Filing 780 REPLY to Response to Motion re #777 MOTION to Stay filed by PRA Group, Inc. (Madel, Christopher) (tcf).
February 13, 2020 Filing 779 RESPONSE in Opposition re #777 MOTION to Stay filed by Drew Hill. (Lester, Patric) (tcf).
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #777 MOTION to Stay: Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion on or before February 13, 2020; Defendant may file a reply on or before February 20, 2020. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/29/2020. (tcf)
January 24, 2020 Filing 777 MOTION to Stay by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER Approving Time and Expense Submission to Common Benefit Fund of Chris Miltenberger (Doc. No. #775 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/9/2019. (tcf)
November 19, 2019 Filing 775 DECLARATION of Miltenberger by Plaintiff Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Time Invoice)(Miltenberger, Chris) (tcf).
November 4, 2019 Filing 774 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Drew Hill re #772 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document re Marks. (Lester, Patric) (tcf).
November 4, 2019 Filing 773 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #772 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Relating to the Parties' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Briefing. (Doc. No. #770 ) The parties shall file their reply briefs on or before 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/25/2019. (tcf)
October 24, 2019 Filing 771 RESPONSE in Opposition re #770 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Supplemental Authority re: Marks filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
October 23, 2019 Filing 770 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Supplemental Authority re: Marks by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Reply Supplemental Authority)(Lester, Patric) (tcf).
October 15, 2019 Filing 769 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Drew Hill re #764 Order on Motion to Supplement, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Denying Rehearing En banc, #2 Exhibit B - Marks - Petition for Rehearing en banc, #3 Exhibit C - District Courts)(Lester, Patric) (tcf).
October 15, 2019 Filing 768 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #764 Order on Motion to Supplement, Motions for Summary Judgment. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER of Dismissal of Stathopoulos Member Case with Prejudice. IT IS ORDERED that: 1. All claims and counterclaims that were or might have been asserted inthe Stathopoulos action are dismissed, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with prejudice and with each party tobear its own costs and attorneys' fees. 2. The Clerk of this Court shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The Stathopoulos action shall not be remanded to the transferor court, and this Court shall retain the original files and records, unless the transferee judge or the Panel directs otherwise. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/3/2019. CC: MDL Panel(tcf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 766 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Eli Terrell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miltenberger, Chris) (tcf).
September 27, 2019 Filing 765 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stathopoulos Member Case by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER Granting #763 Defendant's Motion For Supplemental Briefing. The parties shall file supplemental briefs of no more than five pages addressing the issues raised by Marks and its effect on the instant action onor before October 15, 2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/18/2019. (mme)
July 22, 2019 Filing 763 MOTION to Supplement Summary Judgment Briefing by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (tcf).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER of Dismissal of Bukvich Member Case with Prejudice. IT IS ORDERED that:1. All claims and counterclaims that were or might have been asserted in the Bukvich action are dismissed; 2. The Clerk of this Court shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/8/2019. Copy of order sent to U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (acc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 761 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #759 MOTION to Dismiss Bukvich Member Case filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC . (Robbins, Jennifer) (tcf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 760 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Bukvich Member Case by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer) (tcf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 759 ***Document Withdrawn per ECF No. #761 *** MOTION to Dismiss Bukvich Member Case by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer) QC mailer sent re: signature does not match CM/ECF account (tcf).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER of dismissal of Clark member case with prejudice (16CV2838-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/27/2019. (cc: MDL panel) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 26, 2019 Filing 757 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re Request for Stay by Eli Terrell (Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
June 25, 2019 Filing 756 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by AT&T. (Germann, Hans) (jpp).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER of dismissal of Sovic member case with prejudice.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/29/2019. (cc: MDL panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 25, 2019 Filing 754 NOTICE of Appearance (Kersey, Joshua) (jpp).
April 25, 2019 Filing 753 NOTICE of Appearance (Kersey, Joshua) (jpp).
April 19, 2019 Filing 752 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sovick Action with Prejudice by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
March 6, 2019 Filing 751 NOTICE of Finality of Second Supplemental Authority by Drew Hill re #730 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Notice of Settlement, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Stipulation to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Certiorari)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER granting #747 Motion to Dismiss McCormick With Prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/4/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & MDL Panel)(dlg)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER Granting #748 Motion to Dismiss Merli With Prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/3/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & MDL Panel)(dlg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 748 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Merli Action with Prejudice by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (dlg).
December 27, 2018 Filing 747 Joint MOTION to Dismiss McCormick Action With Prejudice by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER vacating hearing on #737 motion to stay set for 12/10/2018. The motion is taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/03/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 3, 2018 Filing 745 REPLY to Response to Motion re #737 MOTION to Stay Pending Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Ruling on Constitutionality of the TCPA filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
November 26, 2018 Filing 744 RESPONSE in Opposition re #737 MOTION to Stay Pending Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Ruling on Constitutionality of the TCPA filed by Drew Hill. (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
November 14, 2018 Filing 743 NOTICE re Cy Pres Distribution by Jesse Meyer re #355 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and Class Certification, #494 Order, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott DiCarlo, #2 Letter from Ira Rheingold, Executive Director of NACA)(Preston, Ethan) (jpp). (jpp).
November 9, 2018 Filing 742 NOTICE Reply to Response to 3rd Notice of Supplemental Authority by Drew Hill re #741 Notice (Other), (Lester, Patric) (sjm).
November 8, 2018 Filing 741 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer)
November 6, 2018 Filing 740 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Thomas Whitler (Distasio, John) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 739 NOTICE of Third Supplemental Authority by Drew Hill re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
October 24, 2018 Filing 738 NOTICE to the United States Attorney General of Its Constitutional Challenge to the Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 per Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 5.1 by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #737 MOTION to Stay Pending Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Ruling on Constitutionality of the TCPA (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Dkt. 737-1, #2 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
October 23, 2018 Filing 737 MOTION to Stay Pending Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Ruling on Constitutionality of the TCPA by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jennifer M. Robbins, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER Approving Time and Expense Submissions to Common Benefit Fund of Patric A. Lester (Doc. No. #728 ) and Chris Miltenberger (Doc. No. #734 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/10/2018. (jdt)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER granting #733 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Jerilee Batista (member case 16CV0337-JAH(BGS))with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 26, 2018 Filing 734 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Miltenberger in Support by Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
September 26, 2018 Filing 733 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Jerilee Batista. (Tieman, Taylor)Attorney Taylor Tieman added to party Jerilee Batista(pty:pla) (jpp).
September 26, 2018 Filing 732 NOTICE of Appearance for Jerilee Batista (Tieman, Taylor) (jpp).
September 24, 2018 Filing 731 Notice of Objection to Electronic Filing: by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #730 Notice (Other) and Request for Supplemental Briefing (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
September 24, 2018 Filing 730 NOTICE of Second Supplemental Authority by Drew Hill re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER granting #727 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Cassandra Pynes's action with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (member case: 16CV1830-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/18/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 14, 2018 Filing 728 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Lester in Support by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lester Time, #2 Exhibit B - M Smith Time, #3 Exhibit C - Costs & Expenses)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
September 12, 2018 Filing 727 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by CASSANDRA PYNES. (Tieman, Taylor)Attorney Taylor Tieman added to party CASSANDRA PYNES(pty:pla) (jpp).
September 12, 2018 Filing 726 NOTICE of Appearance for Cassandra Pynes (Tieman, Taylor) (jpp).
September 4, 2018 Filing 725 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Drew Hill re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Heard v Nationstar Mtg)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
August 27, 2018 Filing 724 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC re #672 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER Vacating Hearing re #672 MOTION for Summary Judgment; #673 MOTION to Exclude; #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/23/2018. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/23/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(mpl)
July 30, 2018 Filing 722 NOTICE of Appearance for John Ashe (Kersey, Joshua) (jpp).
July 30, 2018 Filing 721 NOTICE of Appearance for Mary Branca (Kersey, Joshua) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER granting #715 Joint Motion to Dismiss member case 14CV2223-JAH(BGS) with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER granting #717 Joint Motion to Dismiss member case 15CV0008-JAH(BGS) with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER granting joint motion to dismiss member case 16CV1915-JAH(BGS) with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/23/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 23, 2018 Filing 717 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Claudette Marc. (Tieman, Taylor)Attorney Taylor Tieman added to party Claudette Marc(pty:pla) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Filing 716 NOTICE of Appearance for Claudette Marc (Tieman, Taylor) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Filing 715 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Dawn Reamer. (Tieman, Taylor)Attorney Taylor Tieman added to party Dawn Reamer(pty:pla) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Filing 714 NOTICE of Appearance for Dawn Reamer (Tieman, Taylor) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER granting #712 Joint Motion to Dismiss member case 14CV2865-JAH(BGS) with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii).. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 19, 2018 Filing 712 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Daniel Grief. (Tieman, Taylor)Attorney Taylor Tieman added to party Daniel Grief(pty:pla) (jpp).
July 19, 2018 Filing 711 NOTICE of Appearance for Daniel Grief (Tieman, Taylor) (jpp).
July 17, 2018 Filing 710 REPLY to Response to Motion re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases filed by Drew Hill. (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
July 17, 2018 Filing 709 REPLY to Response to Motion re #673 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Randall Snyder or, Alternatively, Strike Snyder's March 19, 2018 Declaration filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
July 17, 2018 Filing 708 REPLY to Response to Motion re #672 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER Approving Time and Expense Submissions to Common Benefit Fund of Patric A. Lester (Doc No #689 ) and Chris Miltenberger (Doc. No. #703 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/11/2018. (mpl)
July 11, 2018 Filing 706 NOTICE (Corrected) of Withdrawal of Counsel Matthew J. Kalmanson by PRA Group, Inc. (Kalmanson, Matthew) (mpl).
July 11, 2018 Filing 705 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Matthew J. Kalmanson by PRA Group, Inc. (Kalmanson, Matthew) (mpl).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's #698 Application to Lodge Certain Documents in Alternative Format. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/9/2018. (mpl)
June 29, 2018 Filing 703 DECLARATION of Chris Miltenberger by Plaintiff Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
June 28, 2018 Filing 702 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Drew Hill re #697 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendants MSJ (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 28, 2018 Filing 701 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Drew Hill re #698 MOTION for Leave to File and/or Lodge documents by Alternative Means (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 28, 2018 Filing 700 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Drew Hill re #699 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike Snyder (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 26, 2018 Filing 699 RESPONSE in Opposition re #673 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Randall Snyder or, Alternatively, Strike Snyder's March 19, 2018 Declaration filed by Drew Hill. (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 26, 2018 Filing 698 MOTION for Leave to File and/or Lodge documents by Alternative Means by Drew Hill. (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 26, 2018 Filing 697 RESPONSE in Opposition re #672 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McMillon Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit 4 to Cherkasly Depo, #3 Exhibit 3 - Response to Plaintiff's Irog 2, #4 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs Disputed Facts, #5 Declaration Chris Miltenberger, #6 Exhibit A - Correspondence and Emails)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 26, 2018 Filing 696 RESPONSE in Opposition re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases Statement of Facts filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
June 26, 2018 Filing 695 RESPONSE in Opposition re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
June 15, 2018 Filing 694 NOTICE Notice of Change of Counsel by Kepler Laurore (Ugaz, Luis)Attorney Luis F. Ugaz added to party Kepler Laurore(pty:pla) (jpp).
June 15, 2018 Filing 693 NOTICE Notice of Change of Counsel by Frank T. Augustin, Herode Benjamin, Raoul Delalue, Marc Lawrence, Daniel Mather, Andramedia C. Robinson (Ugaz, Luis)Attorney Luis F. Ugaz added to party Frank T. Augustin(pty:pla), Attorney Luis F. Ugaz added to party Herode Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Luis F. Ugaz added to party Raoul Delalue(pty:pla), Attorney Luis F. Ugaz added to party Marc Lawrence(pty:pla), Attorney Luis F. Ugaz added to party Daniel Mather(pty:pla), Attorney Luis F. Ugaz added to party Andramedia C. Robinson(pty:pla) (jpp).
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER Granting Supplemental #685 Joint Stipulation for Leave to File Exhibit 8 Under Seal. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/14/2018. (mxn)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER granting #688 Joint Motion to Dismiss Marczak member case with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/14/2018. (cc: MDL Panel) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 14, 2018 Filing 689 MOTION for Attorney Fees Patric Lester, Fees 4-1-2018 - 5-31-2018 by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Patric Lester, #2 Exhibit Ex B Mary Belford Smith, #3 Exhibit Ex C Costs and Expenses)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 12, 2018 Filing 688 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Marczak Action With Prejudice by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER rescheduling hearing on Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. #672 ) and motion to exclude Plaintiffs expert (Doc. No. #673 ), and Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. No. #674 ) set for hearing on 8/20/2018, is vacated and rescheduled to 9/10/2018 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/04/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 4, 2018 Filing 686 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/14/2018] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #685 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Lester, Patric)(mxn). (Main Document 686 replaced on 6/14/2018) (mxn). Modified on 6/14/2018 to add file date of lodgment (mxn).
June 4, 2018 Filing 685 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Lester, Patric)(mxn).
June 4, 2018 Filing 684 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Drew Hill. Amendment to #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases Doc No 674-11, per Doc No 677. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 8)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER rescheduling hearing and setting briefing schedule. The hearing on for Defendants motions set for 8/13/2018, is vacated and rescheduled to8/20/2018 at 2:30pm. The hearing on Plaintiffs motion set for 7/30/2018, is vacated and rescheduled to 8/20/2018 at 2:30pm. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants motion on or before 7/26/2018. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs motion on or before 6/26/2018. Any replies shall be filed on or before 7/17/2018. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/01/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER Granting #675 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/30/2018. (mxn)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER Granting #670 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/30/2018. (mxn)
June 1, 2018 Filing 678 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Drew Hill re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
May 31, 2018 Filing 677 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Drew Hill re #674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases filed by Drew Hill Doc. No. 674-11, Exhibit 8. (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
May 29, 2018 Filing 676 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/1/2018] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #675 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lester, Patric)(mxn). (Main Document 676 replaced on 6/1/2018) (mxn). Modified on 6/1/2018 to add file date of lodgment (mxn).
May 29, 2018 Filing 675 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lester, Patric)(mxn).
May 29, 2018 Filing 674 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs with Member Cases by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities redacted, #2 Statement of Facts redacted, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1 - PRA Website, #5 Exhibit 2 - Cherkasly depo - NOT attached, #6 Exhibit 3 - P&A ISO Mtn Final Class Approval, #7 Exhibit 4 - Snyder Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 - Demczak Depo, #9 Exhibit 6 - PRA 9th Cir Appellate Brief, #10 Exhibit 7 - PRA 9th Cir Reply, #11 Exhibit 8 - Snyder Supp Declaration, #12 Exhibit 9 - PRA Calling System Diagram - NOT attached, #13 Exhibit 10 - Demczak Amended Report - NOT attached, #14 Exhibit 11 - PRA Dialer Mgmt Policy - NOT attached, #15 Exhibit 12 - Depo Mediaceja, #16 Exhibit 13 - PRA Dialing Components, #17 Exhibit 14 - Davis Depo, #18 Exhibit 15 - Cherkasly Declaration, #19 Exhibit 16 - PRA Dialer Log in, #20 Exhibit 17 - Snyder depo, #21 Exhibit 18 - PRA 2nd Supp Resp to Irog No 1 - NOT attached, #22 Exhibit 19 - Nelson v Santander, #23 Declaration Chris Miltenberger)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
May 29, 2018 Filing 673 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Randall Snyder or, Alternatively, Strike Snyder's March 19, 2018 Declaration by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authories, #2 Declaration Declaration of Cassandra Merrick, #3 Exhibit Table of Exhibits to Declaration o Cassandra Merrick, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-J Part I of IV, #5 Exhibit Exhibits A-J Part II of IV, #6 Exhibit Exhibits A-J Part III of IV, #7 Exhibit Exhibits A-J Part IV of IV, #8 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
May 29, 2018 Filing 672 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts Redacted Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration Declaration of J. Robbins, #4 Exhibit Table of Exhibits to Declaration of J. Robbins, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9 to Declaration of J. Robbins, #6 Declaration Declaration Filed as Sealed, #7 Declaration Declaration of J. Cherkasly, #8 Declaration Declaration Filed as Sealed, #9 Declaration Declaration of S. Zahn, #10 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
May 29, 2018 Filing 671 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/1/2018] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #670 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Madel, Christopher)(mxn). (Main Document 671 replaced on 6/1/2018) (mxn). Modified on 6/1/2018 to add file date of lodgment (mxn).
May 29, 2018 Filing 670 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Madel, Christopher)(mxn).
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER granting #668 Joint motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/23/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 22, 2018 Filing 668 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER approving time and expense submissions to common benefit fund of Patric A. Lester #644 and Chris Miltenberger #665 . Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' advisement of the establishment of PRA TCPA MDL Fund (Doc. No. #629 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/07/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 3, 2018 Filing 665 DECLARATION Motion for Approval of Fees by Plaintiff Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
May 2, 2018 Filing 664 DECLARATION re #629 Order, #651 Declaration, Motion for Fees, Patric Lester for 1-31-2018 through 3-31-2018 by Plaintiff Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patric Lester, #2 Exhibit Mary Belford Smith, #3 Exhibit Costs and Expenses)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
April 26, 2018 Filing 663 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Conference held on 4/26/2018 regarding third party subpoena. Counsel for Defendant and the third party are continuing to attempt to resolve the issue. Counsel shall jointly contact the Court no later than 5/3/2018 if the issue is not resolved. If the issue is resolved, there is no need to contact the Court. (Plaintiff Attorney Chris R. Miltenberger, Patric Lester). (Defendant Attorney Cassandra Merrick). (Alida Dagostino, David Farkas).(no document attached) (rxa)
April 26, 2018 Filing 662 NOTICE of Establishment of PRA TCPA MDL Fund by Drew Hill re #629 Order (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
April 17, 2018 Filing 661 Minute Entry for proceedings held with Chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Counsel for the parties and a third party objecting to a third party subpoena issued by Defendant jointly contacted Chambers on 4/17/2018. Counsel shall attempt to resolve the dispute through further meet and confer efforts discussed during the call to the Court. The Court sets a Telephonic Status Conference for 4/26/18 at 10:30 AM for counsel to advise the Court if the dispute has been resolved. The deadline to file dispositive motions is continued from 4/23/18 to 5/29/18. (Plaintiff Attorney Patric Lester, Chris Miltenberger). (Defendant Attorney Cassandra Merrick). (David Farkas, Alida Dagostino).(no document attached) (rxa)
April 5, 2018 Filing 660 NOTICE of MDL Filing of Order Denying Transfer from Middle District of Florida (Williams v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, C.A. No. 6:17-02064). It is further ordered that Panel Rule 7.1(a), requiring notification to the Clerk of the Panel of potential tag-along actions, is suspended in this litigation. (rmc)
April 2, 2018 Filing 659 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Discovery Conference held on 4/2/2018. Court granted Defendant's motion to allow Defendant to subpoena two reports as detailed in Defendant's brief. (ECF 654). All deadlines remain the same.(Plaintiffs Attorney Chris R. Miltenberger). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer M. Robbins). (no document attached) (rxa)
April 2, 2018 Filing 658 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 4/2/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel to jointly call (619) 557-2993 at 2:30 p.m. on 4/2/2018.(no document attached) (rxa)
March 30, 2018 Filing 657 RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Drew Hill re #654 Supplemental Briefing . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER approving time and expense submissions to Common Benefit Fund of Patric A. Lester (Doc No. #651 ) and Chris Miltenberger (Doc No. #652 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/29/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER approving submissions to Common Benefit Fund of Patric A. Lester (Doc No. #636 ) and Chris Miltenberger (Doc No. #637 ). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/29/2018.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 29, 2018 Filing 654 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Relating to Letter Briefing Requested by Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
March 28, 2018 Filing 653 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Discovery Conference held on 3/28/2018. The parties raised a discovery dispute. Parties to file letter briefs as discussed during the discovery conference. (Plaintiff Attorney Chris R. Miltenberger, Patric Alexander Lester). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer M. Robbins, Christopher William Madel). (no document attached) (rxa)
March 6, 2018 Filing 652 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service)(Miltenberger, Chris) (mpl).
March 5, 2018 Filing 651 DECLARATION re #636 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Patric Lester pursuant to Doc No. 629 12-1-2017 through 1-30-2018 by Plaintiff Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Lester Hourly Time Record, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Paralegal Hourly Time Record, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Costs & Expenses, #4 Proof of Service)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER granting #649 Motion to Dismiss Peck member case with prejudice.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/26/2018. (cc: MDL Panel) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 23, 2018 Filing 649 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Peck Member Case with Prejudice by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
February 9, 2018 Filing 648 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Order Denying Transfer (jjg)
February 9, 2018 Filing 647 NOTICE of Appearance (Ibrahim, Wedad) (jpp).
January 26, 2018 Filing 646 NOTICE of Change of Telephone Number by Drew Hill (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #641 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to extend fact discovery, expert witness discovery, and dispositive motion deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/19/2018. CC: MDL Panel(jpp)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 644 MINUTE ORDER - The Court held a Telephonic Discovery Conference on 1/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 1/18/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 10, 2018 Filing 643 NOTICE of MDFL Hearing on iQor Motion to Quash by Drew Hill re #641 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Opposed, (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
January 10, 2018 Filing 642 RESPONSE to Motion re #641 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Opposed, Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer M. Robbins, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
January 8, 2018 Filing 641 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Opposed, by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - iQor Mtn to Quash, #2 Exhibit B - Resp to Mtn to Quash, #3 Exhibit C - Email, #4 Exhibit D - SDT for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit E - SDT for Designated Rep Depo, #6 Exhibit F - Email, #7 Exhibit G - Lee Declaration, #8 Exhibit H - MDFL Civil Discovery Handbook, #9 Exhibit I - iQor CNA of Des Rep, #10 Declaration of Patric Lester, #11 Proof of Service)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
January 5, 2018 Filing 640 Minute Order for proceedings held with Chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: The parties jointly contacted Chambers regarding a dispute about extension of case management deadlines. (Chambers Rules at 5.) Plaintiffs seek an extension of numerous deadlines. Defendant opposes the requested extensions. The Court orders the following: Plaintiffs may file an ex parte motion to extend the deadlines on or before January 8, 2018. Defendant shall file any opposition to the ex parte motion on or before January 10, 2018. (Plaintiffs Attorney Chris R. Miltenberger).(Defendant Attorney Jennifer M. Robbins). (no document attached) (rxa)
December 29, 2017 Filing 639 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher William Madel (Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
December 20, 2017 Filing 638 Minute Entry for proceedings held with Chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Lead Plaintiffs' counsel and Defendant's counsel jointly contacted the Court on 12/20/2017 regarding a discovery dispute. The Court sets a Telephonic Discovery Conference for 1/18/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Plaintiffs' counsel shall coordinate a joint call to Chambers on 1/18/2018 at 10:00 a.m. at (619) 557-2993 with all participants already on the line.(Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick Lester). (Defendant Attorney Cassandra Merrick). (no document attached) (rxa)
December 17, 2017 Filing 637 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Chris Miltenberger pursuant to Doc No. 629 by Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service C)(Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
December 15, 2017 Filing 636 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Patric Lester pursuant to Doc No. 629 by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lester Billing, #2 Exhibit B - MBS Billing, #3 Exhibit C - Costs & Expenses, #4 Proof of Service)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER granting #634 Joint Motion to Dismiss Brown Member case (14CV1495-JAH(BGS) with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/13/2017. (cc: MDL Panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 13, 2017 Filing 634 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss and NOTICE of Settlement with Plaintiffs James Brown and Catherine Brown by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) (Searles, Nathan) (jpp). (jpp).
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #632 Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend fact discovery on Cyber City Teleservices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/22/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(jpp)
November 22, 2017 Filing 632 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration C Miltenberger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proof of Service)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
October 25, 2017 Filing 631 Letter from Mark A. Priest. NUNC PRO TUNC 10/24/2017 (jpp)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Letter. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: CivLR 83.9 Ex Parte communication is prohibited; CivLR 5.1(h) - Except as provided in the federal rules, or by leave of court, no document will be filed in any case by any person not a party thereto.. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/24/2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/24/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER on common benefit fund. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/23/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER Granting #626 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/16/2017. (knb)
October 11, 2017 Filing 627 DECLARATION of Jennifer Robbins by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
October 2, 2017 Filing 626 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Patric Lester, Co-Lead Counsel for Member Plaintiffs)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
September 7, 2017 Filing 625 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01824-JAH-BGS (Transferred from Michigan Western, 1:17-cv-00667) (no document attached) (jjg)
September 7, 2017 Filing 624 Minute Entry for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Lead Plaintiffs' counsel and counsel for Defendant PRA contacted chambers on September 7, 2017 to jointly request tolling of the 30-day deadline to raise a number of specifically identified discovery disputes on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendant PRA. The request is GRANTED. The deadline is tolled until October 10, 2017 as to the identified discovery disputes. Should it become necessary, any request to amend the June 29, 2017 Case Management Order must be filed in compliance with Judge Skomal's Chambers Rules. (Plaintiff Attorney Chris R. Miltenberger, Patric Alexander Lester). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer M. Robbins). (no document attached) (rxa)
August 30, 2017 Filing 623 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Plaintiff Sandra Stroud (Parmer, Geoffrey) (jpp).
August 25, 2017 Filing 622 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01726-JAH-BGS (Transferred from Florida Middle, 8:17-cv-01734) (no document attached) (jjg)
August 17, 2017 Filing 621 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01661-JAH-BGS (Transferred from Illinois Northern, 1:17-cv-04941) (no document attached) (jjg)
August 17, 2017 Filing 620 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01658-JAH-BGS (Transferred from Florida Northern, 3:17-cv-00499) (no document attached) (jjg)
August 1, 2017 Filing 619 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01546-JAH-BGS (Transferred from Illinois Northern, 1:17-cv-04938) (no document attached) (jjg)
July 31, 2017 Filing 618 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01545-JAH-BGS (Transferred from Florida Middle, 8:17-cv-01615) (no document attached) (jjg)
July 20, 2017 Filing 617 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: :17-cv-01472-JAH-BGS (Transferred from California Central, 2:17-cv-04260) (no document attached) (jjg)
July 20, 2017 Filing 616 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01471-JAH-BGS (Transferred from Florida Middle, 8:17-cv-01436) (no document attached) (jjg)
July 19, 2017 Filing 615 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/26/2017, before Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2017. (akr)
July 14, 2017 Filing 614 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Drew Hill re #597 Order Re: Paragraph 10 - Proposed Protocol re Common Benefit Fund. (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
July 14, 2017 Filing 613 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Drew Hill re #597 Order Re: Paragraph 6 - Tolling TCPA Claims. (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
July 12, 2017 Filing 612 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01411-JAH-BGS Heller v. Bank of America, N.A. et al (Transferred from Florida Middle, 8:17-cv-01190) (no document attached) (jjg)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting #610 Joint Motion for entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/11/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 5, 2017 Filing 610 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 609 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: A Discovery Conference was held on 6/27/2017 at 10:00 AM. The parties will resubmit the proposed Protective Order with the modifications discussed during the Discovery Conference. The pending Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order is denied. Any dispositive motions are to be filed no later than 3/5/2018. All other requests for Court orders in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt #600 ) are denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/29/2017. (mdc)
June 27, 2017 Filing 608 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01311-JAH-BGS Vance v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Transferred from Michigan Western, 1:17-cv-00110) (no document attached) (jjg)
June 27, 2017 Filing 607 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01310-JAH-BGS Vsetula v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Transferred from Michigan Western, 1:17-cv-00043) (no document attached) (jjg)
June 22, 2017 Filing 606 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01283-JAH-BGS Wing v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Transferred from Michigan Western, 1:17ap80065-JTG) (no document attached) (jjg)
June 22, 2017 Filing 605 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-01278-JAH-BGS CLAIBORNE v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC (Transferred from Georgia Middle, 5:17-cv-00065) (no document attached) (jjg)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER granting Notice of Withdrawal of counsel. Michael A. Geibelson is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record on behalf of Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Chris Madel, Jenny Robbins, and Cassandra Merrick at MADEL PA remain counsel for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/19/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER continuing Telephonic Discovery Conference to 6/27/2017 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/19/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 16, 2017 Filing 602 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geibelson, Michael) (jpp).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter (Notarized).. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Filer not a party to the case.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/15/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2017: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
June 15, 2017 Filing 600 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Drew Hill (Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 15, 2017 Filing 599 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated by Drew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lester, Patric) (jpp).
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter Re: Late Notice Class Action Member.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Letter Re: Filer not a party to the case; deadline for filing claim was October 26, 2016. Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2017: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion for appointment of lead counsel. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/08/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER setting Telephonic Discovery Conference for 6/20/2017 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/05/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 2, 2017 Filing 595 NOTICE re #593 Order: The Joint Discovery Plan required by the Court's May 31, 2017 Order shall be prepared by counsel for Defendants and Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs. (no document attached) (rxa)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER regarding discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/31/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 26, 2017 Filing 594 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Motion/Status Hearing held on 5/26/2017 granting #579 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Appointed Chris R. Miltenberger,Patric Alexander Lester as lead counsel for plaintiffs. Douglas J. Campion relieved as liaison counsel. James O. Latturner and Ethan Mark Preston are relieved as lead counsel. The Court directs parties to meet and confer by 6/30/17. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas J. Campion, James O. Latturner, Chris R. Miltenberger, Patric Alexander Lester, Robert Murphy,).(Defendant Attorney Chrispother W. Madel, Jennifer M. Robbins). (no document attached) (lwm)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 592 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter Re: Settlement.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Filer not a party to the case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/25/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2017: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
May 24, 2017 Filing 591 NOTICE of Change of Counsel by Raoul Delalue, Kepler Laurore, Marc Lawrence, Andramedia C. Robinson (Norman, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Charles Norman added to party Raoul Delalue(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Charles Norman added to party Kepler Laurore(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Charles Norman added to party Marc Lawrence(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Charles Norman added to party Andramedia C. Robinson(pty:pla) (jpp).
May 24, 2017 Filing 590 NOTICE of Change of Counsel by Frank T. Augustin, Herode Benjamin, Daniel Mather (Norman, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Charles Norman added to party Frank T. Augustin(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Charles Norman added to party Herode Benjamin(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Charles Norman added to party Daniel Mather(pty:pla) (jpp).
May 12, 2017 Filing 589 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00998-JAH-BGS Millspaugh v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Transferred from Maryland, 1:17-cv-01158) (no document attached) (jjg)
May 8, 2017 Filing 588 RESPONSE to Motion re #579 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting #586 motion of co-lead counsel to appear telephonically at Court ordered hearing on 5/26/2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/05/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 4, 2017 Filing 586 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically (Motion of Co-Lead Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Court-Ordered Hearing) by Jeremy Frydman, John Howard. (Latturner, James) (jpp).
May 3, 2017 Filing 585 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00896-JAH-BGS Nolting v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Missouri Eastern, 4:17-cv-01344) (no document attached) (jjg)
April 28, 2017 Filing 584 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-118) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER of dismissal of Tuck member case with prejudice (16CV0684-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/24/2017. (cc: MDL panel).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 21, 2017 Filing 582 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00809-JAH-BGS Elliston v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transferred from Texas Northern, 3:17-cv-00804) (no document attached) (kas)
April 20, 2017 Filing 581 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-117) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 18, 2017 Filing 580 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Eli Terrell re #579 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
April 17, 2017 Filing 579 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
April 14, 2017 Filing 578 NOTICE of MDL Filing: United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Notice of Hearing Session scheduled for 5/25/2017 at 8:00am at the John H. Wood, Jr. United States Courthouse (kas)
April 13, 2017 Filing 577 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00750-JAH-BGS Wing v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transferred from Illinois Northern, 1:17-cv-01806) (no document attached) (kas)
April 12, 2017 Filing 576 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00737-JAH-BGS Bowyer v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Michigan Western, 1:17-cv-00179) (no document attached) (kas)
April 12, 2017 Filing 575 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-116) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 7, 2017 Filing 574 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00715-JAH-BGS Hoover v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Pennsylvania Middle, 1:16-cv-02418) (no document attached) (kas)
April 6, 2017 Filing 573 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER of dismissal of Shotts member case with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/03/2017. (cc: MDL panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting #570 Motion to appear telephonically. Attorney of record for class member, Michael A. Greengrass is permitted to appear telephonically at the hearing set for May 26, 2017 at 10:30am. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/03/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 30, 2017 Filing 570 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Court-Ordered Hearing by Michael A. Greengrass. (Murphy, Robert) (jpp).
March 30, 2017 Filing 569 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Shotts Member Case by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Merrick, Cassandra) M (jpp).
March 29, 2017 Filing 568 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-115) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
March 28, 2017 Filing 567 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00621-JAH-BGS Richards v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Michigan Western, 1:17-cv-00045) (no document attached) (kas)
March 27, 2017 Filing 566 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-114) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
March 20, 2017 Filing 565 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #540 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. Mail sent to Jeffrey J. Morales. (fth)
March 20, 2017 Filing 564 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #540 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. Mail sent to Elisha Ornes. (fth)
March 20, 2017 Filing 563 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #547 Order, #546 Order, #545 Order, #542 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,. Mail sent to Elisha Ornes. (fth)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER following Status Conference held 3/09/2017. A hearing on the motions for lead counsel and motions for liaison counsel will be held before this Court on May 26, 2017 at 10:30am. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/15/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 561 AMENDMENT to the Order (re: #496 ) granting Plaintiffs' inadvertently omitted litigation costs. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/09/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 9, 2017 Filing 560 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: all applications to be lead counsel or co-lead counsel shall be filed by 4/17/17; Objections by 5/8/17. Applications for liaison counsel shall be filed by 4/17/17; objections by 5/8/17. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston.(Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas J. Campion, Ethan Mark Preston, Mauricio Arcadier, Chris R. Miltenberger, Nathan D. Sturycz, Francis Richard Greene, Rex C. Anderson, Seth Andrews, Matthew Lewis Bromberg, Patrick J. Helwig, David Andrew Maxfield, Robert W. Murphy, Benjamin A. Parker, Garrett Leif, Greg Cunningham). (Defendant Attorney James Patrick Galvin, Christopher William Madel, Cassandra B. Merrick, Jennifer M. Robbins). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (lwm)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER granting #554 motion to telephonically participate in the March 9, 2017 status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/09/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting #553 motion to telephonically participate in the March 9, 2017 status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/09/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER granting #552 motion to telephonically participate in the March 9, 2017 status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/09/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER granting #555 request to telephonically participate in the March 9, 2017 status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/09/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 9, 2017 Filing 555 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Kelly Banks. (Parker, Benjamin) (jpp).
March 9, 2017 Filing 554 MOTION Telephonic Appearance by Jason Gaza. (Gadd, William) (jpp).
March 8, 2017 Filing 553 MOTION for Leave to Appear telephonically by William J. Allen, P.A.. (Galvin, James) (jpp).
March 8, 2017 Filing 552 MOTION for Order to appear telephonically by William Nichols, Jr. (Lee, Jared)Attorney Jared M Lee added to party William Nichols, Jr(pty:pla) (jpp).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER granting #538 Request to telephonically participate in the March 9, 2017 status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/7/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER granting #532 Request to telephonically participate in the March 7, 2017 status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/07/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 7, 2017 Filing 549 NOTICE of Call-in Telephone Number for March 9 Hearing by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) re #528 Order (Merrick, Cassandra)Attorney Cassandra B. Merrick added to party Portfolio Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassandra B. Merrick added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassandra B. Merrick added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
March 7, 2017 Filing 548 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cassandra B. Merrick (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
March 7, 2017 Filing 544 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Davidson on behalf of Judith Suggs (Davidson, Joseph) (jpp).
March 7, 2017 Filing 543 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Davidson on behalf of Mildred Bukvich (Davidson, Joseph) (jpp).
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER granting #523 request to participate telephonically in the March 9, 2017 status hearing. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/06/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03006-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03007-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #530 motion to appear telephonically at status conference set for March 9, 2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/06/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER granting #536 request to telephonically participate in the March 9, 2017 status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/06/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #533 Request to Telephonically Participate in the March 9, 2017 Status Conference. It is ordered that Seth Andrew may participate by telephone in the March 9, 2017 Status Conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/6/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
March 6, 2017 Filing 541 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00454-JAH-BGS Hernandez v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Illinois Northern, 1:17-cv-00649) (no document attached) (kas)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER Granting #529 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 3/9/2017 Status Conference. It is Ordered that Attorney Patrick J. Helwig, counsel for individual Plaintiff Stan Marczak, be permitted to participate by telephone in the 3/9/2017 Status Conference at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/3/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
March 6, 2017 Filing 539 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00447-JAH-BGS CATHEY v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (transferred from Indiana Southern, 4:17-cv-00025) (no document attached) (kas)
March 6, 2017 Filing 538 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the March 9, 2017 Status Hearing by Sheila J. Wilson. (Davidson, Joseph) (jpp).
March 6, 2017 Filing 537 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Davidson on behalf of Sheila J. Wilson (Davidson, Joseph) (jpp).
March 6, 2017 Filing 536 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Geoff G Heusohn. (Sturycz, Nathan) (jpp).
March 3, 2017 Filing 535 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-112) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
March 3, 2017 Filing 534 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-111) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
March 3, 2017 Filing 533 MOTION for Leave to Appear Request to telephonically participate in the March 9, 2017 status conference by Christopher Ciesla, Roger Small, Christopher Sutton. (Andrews, Seth) (rlu).
March 3, 2017 Filing 532 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Benjamin Bromberg, Tracy Kwit, Kerry Skarbakka. (Bromberg, Brian) (rlu).
March 3, 2017 Filing 530 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Status Conference by Michael A. Greengrass. (Murphy, Robert) (rlu).
March 2, 2017 Filing 529 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the March 9, 2017 Status Conference by Stan Marczak. (Helwig, Patrick) (jpp).
March 1, 2017 Filing 531 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00435-JAH-BGS Newcomb v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Illinois Northern, 1:17-cv-00566) (no document attached) (kas)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER directing Defendant to initiate conference call for status conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/28/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(jpp)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER granting #516 Plaintiff Craig Cunningham's motion to appear at the 3/9/2017 status conference by telephone. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/28/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 28, 2017 Filing 526 STATUS REPORT ,Joint, in Anticipation of March 9, 2017 Status Hearing by Danny Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Campion, Douglas) (jpp).
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication. No provisions for acceptance. Not a party to case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/28/2017.(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2017: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: not a party to the case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/28/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2017: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
February 28, 2017 Filing 523 MOTION for Leave to Appear telephonic by Karen Harvey. (Arcadier, Mauricio) (jpp).
February 28, 2017 Filing 522 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Rosenblum on behalf of Adeline Rejkowski (Rosenblum, Rachel) (jpp).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting #513 Motion to appear telephonically at status conference. Jim G. Price, attorney of record for plaintiffs Gary Contreras and Rosemary Contreras is permitted to appear telephonically at the Status Conference set for March 9, 2017 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting #514 Motion to appear telephonically at status conference. Jim G. Price, attorney of record for plaintiff Carl Herrero is permitted to appear telephonically at the Status Conference set for March 9, 2017 at 10:30 AM.Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #506 Motion to Withdraw as counsel, (member case 15CV1107-JAH(BGS)). Attorney David B. Levin is terminated from the docket. New counsel for Plaintiff Adeline Rejkowski shall file an appearance within 14 days. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Request to Attend Telephonic Hearing, from Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/21/2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/24/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 24, 2017 Filing 516 REQUEST to attend the 3/9/2017 hearing via telephone, by Craig Cunningham. NUNC PRO TUNC 2/21/2017. (jpp)
February 23, 2017 Filing 518 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00383-JAH-BGS Mike Smith v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from California Central, 2:17-cv-00801) (no document attached) (kas)
February 23, 2017 Filing 515 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00382-JAH-BGS Hatfield v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Michigan Western, 1:16-cv-01369) (no document attached) (kas)
February 23, 2017 Filing 514 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Status Conference by Carl Herrero. (Price, Jim) (jpp).
February 23, 2017 Filing 513 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Status Conference by Gary Contreras, Rosemary Contreras. (Price, Jim) (jpp).
February 23, 2017 Filing 512 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-110)re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
February 15, 2017 Filing 511 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00298-JAH-BGS Kiefer v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Missouri Western, 4:16-cv-01285) (no document attached) (kas)
February 14, 2017 Filing 510 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00291-JAH-BGS Benjamin v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al (transferred from Florida Southern, 0:17-cv-60042) (no document attached) (kas)
February 13, 2017 Filing 509 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-109) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER re Status Conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/09/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #505 request to appear telephonically. Rex C. Anderson may participate by telephone in the March 9, 2017 Status Conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/09/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 9, 2017 Filing 506 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adeline Rejkowski. (Levin, David) (jpp).
February 9, 2017 Filing 505 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Alisa Baker. (Anderson, Rex)(jpp).
February 8, 2017 Filing 504 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00239-JAH-BGS Makarious v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al (transferred in from New Jersey, 2:16-cv-06475) (no document attached) (kas)
February 6, 2017 Filing 503 Ex Parte MOTION re #496 Order,,, For an Amendment to the Order Awarding Plaintiffs' Counsel's Inadvertently Omitted Costs by Danny Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua B. Swigart, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Proof of Service)(Swigart, Joshua) (jpp).
February 2, 2017 Filing 502 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 re transfer of case from District of New Jersey 2:16-06475 (kas)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER of dismissal of Danbar member case with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/27/2017. (cc: MDL panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting #499 Request to Telephonically Participate in the 3/9/2017 Status Conference. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/27/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth)
January 27, 2017 Filing 499 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at March 9, 2017 Status Conference by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer)7 (jpp).
January 27, 2017 Filing 498 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice - Danbar v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER setting Status Conference for March 9, 2017 at 10:30am. The parties shall file a joint status report addressing the current status of the action, including which member cases remain following the settlement, on or before February 28, 2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/25/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting in part Class Counsel's motion for attorneys fees and incentive awards; and granting in part Bartlett and Harvey's motion for attorneys' fees, Doc Nos. #427 and #430 . Class Counsels motion for attorneys fees and costs is granted in part and denied in part. Class Counsel are granted attorneys fees of $4,860,000 and $71,955.73 for expenses. Class Counsels motion for incentive payments is granted. Each class representative is awarded $6,250 from the common fund. Bartlett and Harveys motion for attorneys fees is granted in part and denied in part. Counsel for Bartlett is awarded $23,720 in attorneys fees and$224.59 for costs. Counsel for Harvey is awarded $53,381.25 for attorneys fees and $1,557.87 for costs. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/23/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting National Plaintiff's emergency motion for an injunction under The All Writs Act, 28 USC 1651. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/23/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER and judgment granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 20, 2017 Filing 493 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint, by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company).(Martin, Eugene) (jpp).
January 18, 2017 Filing 492 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:17-cv-00093-JAH-BGS Augustin v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 1:16-cv-25327) (no document attached) (kas)
January 17, 2017 Filing 491 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's ANSWER to #484 Amended Complaint by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company).(Martin, Eugene)Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party Portfolio Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party Portfolio Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 17, 2017 Filing 490 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-107) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER vacating hearing on #474 National Plaintiff's motion for Permanent Injunction set for 1/23/2017. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/11/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER denying #467 Defendant's request to telephonically participate in the January 9, 2017 hearing as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/05/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 4, 2017 Filing 487 CONSENT DECREE - The Court finds that the following documents are withdrawnwith prejudice: (1) National Plaintiffs Motion to Sanction Turner Plaintiffs and Turner Plaintiffs Counsel (ECF No. #452 ); (2) National Plaintiffs Opposition to Bartlett and Harvey Counsels Motion for Fees (ECF No. #447 ). signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/04/2017. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting #481 stipulation of dismissal of Mayo member case with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/28/2016. (cc: MDL panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 28, 2016 Filing 485 NOTICE of Proof of Service by Eli Terrell re #484 Amended Complaint (Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
December 28, 2016 Filing 484 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, filed by Eli Terrell. (Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
December 27, 2016 Filing 483 NOTICE of Settlement as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC - Stacey Crayder v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
December 27, 2016 Filing 482 NOTICE of Settlement as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC - Cutler v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
December 27, 2016 Filing 481 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice - Mayo v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
December 23, 2016 Filing 480 NOTICE Corrected Notice of Lodging of Consent Decree by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer re #474 MOTION for Permanent Injunction under the All Writs Act, #441 Objection, #479 Notice (Other),, #426 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class, #452 MOTION for Sanctions Sanctions under the Court's Inherent Authority Against Turner Plaintiffs and Turner Counsel, 468 Order on Motion for Order,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, Set Hearings,,, (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
December 23, 2016 Filing 479 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer re #430 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees , #474 MOTION for Permanent Injunction under the All Writs Act, #441 Objection, #426 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class, #452 MOTION for Sanctions Sanctions under the Court's Inherent Authority Against Turner Plaintiffs and Turner Counsel, 468 Order on Motion for Order,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, Set Hearings,,, (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER vacating dates for lead counsel motions. The hearing for motions for appointment as lead counsel set for January 27, 2017, and the related briefing schedule are vacated until further order of this Court. Discovery is stayed until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/22/2016. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 21, 2016 Filing 477 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-03076-JAH-BGS Cutler v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 1:16-cv-25096) (no document attached) (kas)
December 20, 2016 Filing 476 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-03069-JAH-BGS Danbar v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 5:16-cv-00656) (no document attached) (kas)
December 19, 2016 Filing 475 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer re #474 MOTION for Permanent Injunction under the All Writs Act (Greene, Francis) (jpp).
December 19, 2016 Filing 474 MOTION for Permanent Injunction under the All Writs Act by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Francis R. Greene, #3 Exhibit 1-5)(Greene, Francis)Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Danny Allen, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Danny Allen, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Frederick L Jury(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Frederick L Jury(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Sam Marin(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Sam Marin(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Jesse Meyer(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party Jesse Meyer(pty:pla) (jpp).
December 15, 2016 Filing 473 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-105) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
December 13, 2016 Filing 472 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/5/2016, before Judge John A. Houston. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
December 9, 2016 Filing 471 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeremy Frydman re #470 Notice (Other), (Latturner, James) (jpp).
December 9, 2016 Filing 470 NOTICE (Letter to Judge Houston Regarding Declarations of James O. Latturner) by Jeremy Frydman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Decl. of James O. Latturner, #2 Exhibit B- Amended Supplemental Decl. of James O. Latturner)(Latturner, James) (jpp).
December 9, 2016 Filing 469 On December 7, 2016, Class Counsel, Ethan Preston, and counsel for Objector Archie Blair, David Hall, contacted the chambers of Judge Skomal. Class Counsel sought leave to depose Objector's counsel concerning Mr. Blair's Objection to the Class Settlement. However, the Settlement has been approved over Mr. Blair's Objection and Mr. Blair has not filed an appeal of that decision at this time. Additionally, discovery in this matter is stayed until January 27, 2017. Based on the foregoing, the Court DENIES without prejudice counsel's request for leave from the stay of discovery to depose Objector's counsel. (no document attached) (rxa)
December 7, 2016 Filing 467 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically in the January 9, 2017 Hearing on the National Plaintiffs' Motion to Sanction Turner Plaintiffs and Turner Plaintiffs' Counsel by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting #453 granting National Plaintiffs' ex parte motion to extend injunction against Turner Plaintiffs and others until such time as National Plaintiffs can be heard on their anticipated motion to make the injunction permanent. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/5/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 5, 2016 Filing 468 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2016 granting #426 Motion for Order or Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class; granting #453 MOTION for National Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Extend Injunction; Motion #427 is submitted; Motion #430 is submitted. Injunction Hearing set for 1/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston. Discovery is stayed until 1/27/17. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas J. Campion, James O. Latturner, Ethan Mark Preston, Mauricio Arcadier, Chris R. Miltenberger, Nathan D. Sturycz).(Defendant Attorney Christopher William Madel, Jennifer M. Robbins, Steven R. Zahn). (no document attached) (lwm)
December 5, 2016 Filing 465 NOTICE Of Filing [DE 430-5] by Karen Harvey re #430 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees (Arcadier, Mauricio) (jpp).
December 5, 2016 Filing 464 NOTICE PLAINTIFF HEUSOHNS REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF TO TELEPHONICALLY PARTICIPATE IN THE DECEMBER 5, 2016 FAIRNESS HEARING by Geoff G Heusohn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-Out Request)(Sturycz, Nathan)(jpp).
December 5, 2016 Filing 463 MOTION Acceptance of Late Opt Out of Victor Malliaros by Eli Terrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miltenberger, Chris) (jpp).
December 2, 2016 Filing 462 DECLARATION re #427 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Awards (Supplemental Declaration of James O. Latturner in Support of Class Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Class Representatives' Incentive Awards) by Plaintiff Jeremy Frydman. (Latturner, James) (jpp).
December 2, 2016 Filing 461 DECLARATION re #426 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class (Supplemental Declaration of James O. Latturner in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class) by Plaintiff Jeremy Frydman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Final List of Opt Outs)(Latturner, James) (jpp).
December 2, 2016 Filing 460 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02938-JAH-BGS Crayder v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (transferred from Florida Middle, 8:16-cv-03029) (no document attached) (kas)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting #456 request from Co-Counsel for Kimberly Barlett et al. and Karen Harvy et al. to participate Telephonically in the December 5, 2016 Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/01/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 1, 2016 Filing 458 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02924-JAH-BGS Mather v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al (transferred from Southern District of Florida) (no document attached) (kas)
November 30, 2016 Filing 457 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-104) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
November 29, 2016 Filing 456 NOTICE Request to Participate Telephonically by Karen Harvey (Arcadier, Mauricio) (jpp). Modified on 12/2/2016 to edit event type to motion. (jpp).
November 28, 2016 Filing 455 REPLY to Response to Motion re #426 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class filed by Frederick L Jury, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan Preston, #2 Declaration of Eric Robin)(Parisi, David) (jpp).
November 28, 2016 Filing 454 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Objection of Patrick Sweeney by Danny Allen, Jr re #440 Notice (Other) (Campion, Douglas) (jpp).
November 23, 2016 Filing 453 MOTION National Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Extend Injunction Against Turner Plaintiffs and Others Until Such Time as National Plaintiffs can be Heard on Their Anticipated Motion to Make the Injunction Permanent by Jeremy Frydman, John Howard. (Latturner, James) (jpp).
November 21, 2016 Filing 452 MOTION for Sanctions Sanctions under the Court's Inherent Authority Against Turner Plaintiffs and Turner Counsel by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ethan Preston, #3 Declaration of Francis R. Greene, #4 Declaration of David C. Parisi, #5 Proof of Service)(Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
November 18, 2016 Filing 451 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: :16-cv-02838-JAH-BGS CLARK v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC et al (transferred from Georgia Middle, 5:16-cv-00208) (no document attached) (kas)
November 17, 2016 Filing 450 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-103) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
November 17, 2016 Filing 449 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Discovery Conference regarding discovery dispute between Plaintiffs and Objector held on 11/17/2016. Judge Skomal issued a tentative. If briefing becomes necessary, the parties should contact chambers for a briefing schedule.(Attorneys for Plaintiffs, Ethan Preston, James Latturner, Francis Greene, Douglas Campion). (Attorney for Defendant Cassandra Merrick). (Attorney for Objector Archie Blair, David Hall).(no document attached) (rxa)
November 17, 2016 Filing 447 RESPONSE in Opposition re #430 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan Preston, #2 Proof of Service)(Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
November 16, 2016 Filing 448 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/13/2016, before Judge John A. Houston. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
November 15, 2016 Filing 446 Minute Entry for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/15/2016. In accordance with Judge Skomal's chambers rules, counsel for the parties and an objector called regarding a discovery dispute. The Court sets the matter for a discovery conference on November 17, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Accordingly, Plaintiffs counsel is ORDERED to coordinate and initiate a JOINT call to the Court at (619) 557-2993 on Thursday, November 17, 2016 at 10:00 a.m.(Plaintiff Attorney Ethan Preston, Francis Green, Douglas Campion).(Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins, Christopher Madel).(David Hall). (no document attached) (rxa)
November 9, 2016 Filing 444 OBJECTION to the Settlement, by non-party Edward Hagood. (jpp)
November 7, 2016 Filing 445 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02752-JAH-BGS Hill v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (filed in CASD) (no document attached) (kas)
November 7, 2016 Filing 443 OBJECTION by Archie S Blair to the Proposed Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear at Fairness Hearing (Amended). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hall, David) (jpp).
November 4, 2016 Filing 442 OBJECTION by Archie S Blair to the Proposed Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hall, David) (kcm).
November 3, 2016 Filing 441 OBJECTION by Kimberly Bartlett CONSOLIDATED OBJECTION TO FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry)
November 1, 2016 Filing 440 WITHDRAWN PER #454 - OBJECTION to the settlement, by non-party Patrick S. Sweeney. (jpp) Modified on 11/28/2016 to edit text, efiling withdrawn per 454. (jpp).
October 24, 2016 Filing 438 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: :16-cv-02639-JAH-BGS Wilson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (transferred from Illinois Northern, 1:16-cv-08658) (no document attached) (kas)
October 24, 2016 Filing 437 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-101) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 17, 2016 Filing 439 OBJECTION to the settlement, by non-party Vionca Marie Jason. (jpp)
October 17, 2016 Filing 436 NOTICE of Settlement as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC - Robert Mayo by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
October 13, 2016 Filing 435 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02553-JAH-BGS Terrell v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transferred from Texas Northern, 3:16-cv-02404) (no document attached) (kas)
October 12, 2016 Filing 434 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-100) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 12, 2016 Filing 433 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02544-JAH-BGS Ornes v. Fredrickson et al (transferred from Virginia Western, 7:16-cv-00357) (no document attached) (kas)
October 11, 2016 Filing 432 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02532-JAH-BGS Whitler v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 5:16-cv-00570) (no document attached) (kas)
October 11, 2016 Filing 431 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-99) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 6, 2016 Filing 430 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hill Aff, #2 Exhibit Mr Hill's ex, #3 Exhibit Mr Hill's time, #4 Exhibit firm res, #5 Affidavit ma aff)(Hill, Samuel) (kcm).
October 6, 2016 Filing 429 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer re #427 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Awards, #428 Declaration, #426 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class, #425 Notice (Other),, (Preston, Ethan) (kcm).
October 6, 2016 Filing 428 DECLARATION re #427 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Awards, #426 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class, #425 Notice (Other),, Declaration of Keith J. Keogh by Plaintiffs Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Preston, Ethan) (kcm).
October 6, 2016 Filing 427 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Incentive Awards by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Preston, Ethan) (kcm).
October 6, 2016 Filing 426 MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Preston, Ethan) (kcm).
October 6, 2016 Filing 425 NOTICE (Letter to Judge Houston Attaching Declarations) by Jeremy Frydman, John Howard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric Robin, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of James O. Latturner, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Ethan Preston, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Douglas J. Campion, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of David C. Parisi, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Abbas Kazerounian, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Joshua B. Swigart)(Greene, Francis)Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party John Howard(pty:pla), Attorney Francis Richard Greene added to party John Howard(pty:pla) (kcm).
October 6, 2016 Filing 424 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-98) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 5, 2016 Filing 423 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02489-JAH-BGS Chrisman v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 6:16-cv-01563) (no document attached) (kas)
September 30, 2016 Filing 422 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-97) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 27, 2016 Filing 421 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02418-JAH-BGS Branca v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Georgia Northern, 1:16-cv-03318) (no document attached) (kas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 420 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02411-JAH-BGS Longa v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 0:16-cv-62102) (no document attached) (kas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 419 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-96) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Response Letter Re: Claim from Christopher J. Ciccotelli. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation - certificate of service, OTHER: Improper format., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/22/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2016: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
September 13, 2016 Filing 417 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2016 granting motion for preliminary injunction. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Ethan Preston, Francis Greene, David Parisi, Henry Turner, Mauricio Arcadier).(Defendant Attorney Jenifer Robins, Chris Madel). (no document attached) (lwm)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting National Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Injunction under the all writs act, 28 USC 1651. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/13/2016.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting request for Defendant's to telephonically participate in the September 13, 2016 hearing on National Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order under the All Writs Act, 28 USC 1651. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/12/2016.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 12, 2016 Filing 413 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically in the September 13, 2016 Hearing on National Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order Under the All Writs Act by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting National Plaintiffs' #406 Emergency Motion to File Such Motion Under Seal. The Court hereby orders that the supplemental declaration supporting the National Plaintiffs' Reply in support of their Motion for An Injunction Under the All Writs Act, 28 U.S.C. 1651 shall be filed under seal until the Court rules on the temporary restraining order requested in the Motion. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/9/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER. Pending before this Court is the Request from Co-Counsel for Kimberly Bartlett et al. and Karen Harvey et al. to participate Telephonically in the September 13, 2016 Hearing on the National Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion For ATemporary Restraining Order And An Injunction Under The All Writs Act, 28 U.S.C. 1651. It is ordered that the Request is GRANTED and all Co-Counsel for Bartlett and Harvey may participate Telephonically in the September 13, 2016 Hearing. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/9/16. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03006-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03007-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
September 9, 2016 Filing 409 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer re #408 Reply to Response to Motion, #406 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #407 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Preston, Ethan) (kas).
September 9, 2016 Filing 408 REPLY to Response to Motion re #397 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Preston, Ethan) (kas).
September 9, 2016 Filing 407 *FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/13/2016* SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #406 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Preston, Ethan) (dls). (Main Document 407 replaced on 9/13/2016; modified docket text accordingly) (dls).
September 9, 2016 Filing 406 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Preston, Ethan) (dls).
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER - Plaintiff Geoff G. Heusohns unopposed motion to for leavefor Andrew J. Feldman to withdraw is granted (Doc 17 in member case 16CV2124-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/08/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 8, 2016 Filing 404 RESPONSE to Motion re #397 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Notice REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC PARTICIPATION, #2 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (jpp).
September 7, 2016 Filing 410 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02279-JAH-BGS Rohde v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Nevada, 2:16-cv-01909); 3:16-cv-02281-JAH-BGS Michelle Truong v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from California Central, 8:16-cv-01539) (no document attached) (kas)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 AMENDED ORDER granting National Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order under the All Writs Act, 28 USC 1651. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/06/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 7, 2016 Filing 402 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02250-JAH-BGS Heuertz v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Nebraska, 8:16-cv-00178) (no document attached) (kas)
September 6, 2016 Filing 401 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-95) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 6, 2016 Filing 400 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-94) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 1, 2016 Filing 399 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frederick L Jury, Jesse Meyer re #398 Order, #396 Temporary Restraining Order, #397 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Parisi, David) (jpp).
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER Sealing National Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/1/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm) Modified on 9/1/2016 to Unseal per #396 Order (kcm).
September 1, 2016 Filing 397 National Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for an Injunction Under the All Writs Act 28 U.S.C. 1651 by John Ashe, Alisa Baker, Kelly Banks, Robert Banks, Jerilee Batista, Brighid Colleen Bauer, Miguel E. Bengochea, Katherine Ann Bowen, Benjamin Bromberg, Catherine Brown, James Brown, Mildred Bukvich, Christopher Ciesla, Brae Coats, Heather Conine, Craig Cunningham, Mary Deering, Raoul Delalue, Lawrence Domingo, Ernest Engels, Jason Gaza, David Goehst, Joseph Gough, Michael A. Greengrass, Daniel Grief, Larry Harrington, Jose Hernandez, Carl Herrero, Geoff G Heusohn, Adrian Hines, Amie Hinton, Karen Hubbard, Brittany Jackson, Jarrett R. Jenkins, Tammy Kilmer, Tracy Kwit, Rosie Lara, Kepler Laurore, Marc Lawrence, Susan Lowe, Terry Lowe, John Lukowicz, Francesco Manasse, Claudette Marc, Stan Marczak, Susan Matos, Al Maxey, Robert Mayo, Janet McCormick, Kenneth McCormick, Willie McLaughlin, Thomas McPherson, Denice Merli, Ross A. Miller, Lee Arthur Momient, Jeffrey J Morales, Norma Mulrine, Darren Neese, Matthew Neill, William Nichols, Jr, Steven Nikolov, Laura Oliver, CASSANDRA PYNES, Morris Padulo, Paul Pasquesi, Sarah Pasquesi, Christopher Peck, Michael Phan, Scott C. Piller, Rey Rabago, Dawn Reamer, Adeline Rejkowski, Jay Renfrow, Teri Robert, Jason Shearer, Daniel Shotts, Kerry Skarbakka, Roger Small, Sharon L Sovick, Kirby Spencer, Angela Stathopoulos, Kenneth Stout, Jr, Josh Streeter, Carlos Suarez, Christine Suarez, Judith Suggs, Christopher Sutton, Jacqueline Taylor, Deon Thomas, John Thompson, Mohammed A. Tipoo, Rachael Treshman, Fawn Turner, U.S. Bank N.A., Robert L. Waxman, Brandi Williams, Lisa Winiecki. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ethan Preston in Support of Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and an Injunction)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (kcm).
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting #397 National Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order under the All Writs Act, 28 USC 1651. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/01/2016. This temporary restraining order will expire on September 13, 2016at 1:30 p.m. absent further order of the Court.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) Modified on 9/1/2016 to replace image, nef resent to all parties. (jpp).
August 31, 2016 Filing 395 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-93) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter from Johna D. Stringer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Not a party to the case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/25/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2016: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter from Vivian Clark. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Not a party to the case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/25/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2016: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter from Frances N. Cervantes. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Not a party to the case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/25/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2016: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter from Darrin Nadolski. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Not a party to the case., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/25/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2016: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
August 25, 2016 Filing 390 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02149-JAH-BGS Mayo v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Georgia Northern, 1:16-cv-01985) (no document attached) (kas)
August 25, 2016 Filing 389 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-92) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 24, 2016 Filing 388 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02124-JAH-BGS Heusohn v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Illinois Southern, 3:16-cv-00767) (no document attached) (kas)
August 19, 2016 Filing 387 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: :16-cv-02109-JAH-BGS Harrington v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transferred from Texas Northern, 3:16-cv-02204) (no document attached) (kas)
August 19, 2016 Filing 386 NOTICE RE CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/18/2016.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 18, 2016 Filing 385 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-91) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letter from Non-Party: Salma Alpial. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Not a party to the case; ex parte communication prohibited., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/17/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2016: #1 rejected document) (jpp).
August 10, 2016 Filing 383 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-02007-JAH-BGS Piller v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 2:16-cv-00124) (no document attached) (kas)
August 5, 2016 Filing 382 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 from Middle District of Florida, C.A. No. 2:16-00124 (kas)
July 28, 2016 Filing 381 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-01915-JAH-BGS Oliver v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Michigan Western, 1:16-cv-00457) (no document attached) (kas)
July 28, 2016 Filing 380 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-90) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
July 19, 2016 Filing 379 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-01848-JAH-BGS Ashe v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 3:16-cv-00731) (no document attached) (kas)
July 15, 2016 Filing 378 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-01830-JAH-BGS Pynes v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Colorado, 1:16-cv-01088) (no document attached) (kas)
July 15, 2016 Filing 377 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-89) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
July 7, 2016 Filing 376 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Matthew J.M. Pelikan as Counsel by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) (Pelikan, Matthew) (jpp).
June 24, 2016 Filing 375 NOTICE of Revised Proposed Long Form and Postcard Notice by Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service)(Parisi, David) (jpp).
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting preliminary approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/23/2016.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 22, 2016 Filing 373 NOTICE of Lodgment by Jeremy Frydman, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer Re Proposed Preliminary Approval Order (Parisi, David) (jpp).
June 13, 2016 Filing 372 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2016 re #355 granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and Class Certification; denying Ex-Parte Consolidated Motion For Designation As Subclasses. Plaintiff to prepare the order. (Court Reporter/ECR Cami Kircher). (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas J. Campion, James O. Latturner, Ethan Mark Preston). (Defendant Attorney Christopher William Madel, Jennifer M. Robbins, Steven R. Zahn). (no document attached) (lwm)
June 10, 2016 Filing 371 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-01446-JAH-BGS Jackson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Minnesota, 0:16-cv-01134) (no document attached) (kas)
June 9, 2016 Filing 370 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-88) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 9, 2016 Filing 369 OBJECTION by Kimberly Bartlett re #364 Objection REPLY BRIEF TO PRA RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (kas).
June 9, 2016 Filing 368 OBJECTION by Kimberly Bartlett re #364 Objection REPLY BRIEF TO NATIONWIDE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (kas).
June 6, 2016 Filing 367 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF NAME by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Merrick, Cassandra) (jpp).
June 6, 2016 Filing 366 RESPONSE re #364 Objection [Non-Motion] to Proposed Settlement filed by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
June 6, 2016 Filing 365 RESPONSE re #364 Objection Plaintiffs' Response to Barlett and Harvey Objection to Class Action Settlement filed by John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
May 31, 2016 Filing 364 OBJECTION by Kimberly Bartlett . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (jpp).
May 19, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-01213-JAH-BGS Stathopoulos v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Middle District of Florida, 8:16ap00191) (no document attached) (kas)
May 19, 2016 Filing 362 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-87) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #359 stipulation to Dismiss Shuford member case with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/12/2016. (cc: mdl panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting #358 Plaintiffs' unopposed ex parte application to reset the hearing on Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement and class certification. Motion Hearing continued to 6/13/2016 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/12/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 11, 2016 Filing 359 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice - Drong by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
May 6, 2016 Filing 358 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Ex Parte Application to Reset Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Approval by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
May 2, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-01057-JAH-BGS Patterson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from District of Nevada) (no document attached) (kas)
April 28, 2016 Filing 356 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-85) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 25, 2016 Filing 355 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and Class Certification by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration James O. Latturner, #2 Declaration Ethan Preston, #3 Declaration Douglas J. Campion, #4 Declaration Daniel Burke, #5 Proof of Service)(Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER - Good cause appearing, the deadline for filing the motion for preliminary approval of class settlement is extended by one week. The preliminary approval motion shall be filed with District Judge John A. Houston on or before April 25, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/14/2016.(no document attached) (mw)
April 13, 2016 Filing 353 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00889-JAH-BGS Shotts v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 2:15-cv-00776) (no document attached) (kas)
April 11, 2016 Filing 352 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00866-JAH-BGS Bromberg v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. (transferred from New York Southern, 1:16-cv-00421) (no document attached) (kas)
April 11, 2016 Filing 351 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-83) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 8, 2016 Filing 350 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
March 30, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00772-JAH-BGS Stevenson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Florida, 8:16-ap-00128-KRM) (no document attached) (kas)
March 30, 2016 Filing 348 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-82) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #346 Stipulation to dismiss Shuford member case with prejudice (14CV1449-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/16/2016. (cc: MDL panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 11, 2016 Filing 346 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice - Shuford by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
February 10, 2016 Filing 345 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00337-JAH-BGS Batista v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Connecticut, 3:15-cv-01820) (no document attached) (kas)
February 10, 2016 Filing 344 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00333-JAH-BGS Alzner v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Michigan Eastern, 2:15-cv-13448) (no document attached) (kas)
February 10, 2016 Filing 342 REPLY to Response to Motion re #314 MOTION Ex-Parte Consolidated Motion For Designation As Subclasses filed by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) M (jpp).
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #341 Motion to Dismiss fourth cause of action without prejudice for violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act and for issuance of a suggestion for remand to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to remand the case to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of California. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 2/09/2016. (cc: MDL panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 8, 2016 Filing 341 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action for Violation of TCPA and for Issuance of a Suggestion for Remand to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to Remand the Case to the US District Court, No. District of California by Gary Contreras, Rosemary Contreras. (Price, Jim)
February 4, 2016 Filing 340 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-81) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
February 3, 2016 Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re #314 MOTION Ex-Parte Consolidated Motion For Designation As Subclasses filed by Jesse Meyer. (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
February 1, 2016 Filing 338 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-80) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
January 26, 2016 Filing 337 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00205-JAH-BGS Delalue v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 1:15-cv-24381) (no document attached) (kas)
January 26, 2016 Filing 336 NOTICE by United States of America Acknowledgment of Constitutional Challenge (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine Lind Parker added to party United States of America(pty:misc), Attorney Katherine Lind Parker added to party United States of America(pty:misc) (jpp).
January 25, 2016 Filing 335 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-79) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
January 21, 2016 Filing 334 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00141-JAH-BGS Small v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from New York Western, 1:15-cv-01032) (no document attached) (kas)
January 20, 2016 Filing 333 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-78) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
January 19, 2016 Filing 332 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00127-JAH-BGS Rey Rabago v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transfered from California Central, 5:15-cv-02590) (no document attached) (kas)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER - A motion for preliminary approval of class settlement shall be filed with District Judge John A. Houston on or before April 18, 2016. Plaintiffs Class Counsel and counsel for PRA are permitted to conduct limited confirmatory discovery up to March 18, 2016 in preparation for the filing of the motionfor preliminary approval of class settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/12/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #325 Stipulation for Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Neal Stern (1:11CV0524 (N.D. Ill), 3:11CV1008-JAH(BGS), 3:10CV2658 (S.D. cal). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/11/2016. (cc: mdl panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #324 Stipulation for Dismissal of Hernandez member case with prejudice (2:15CV0078-LDG(NJK). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/11/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (cc: mdl panel). (jpp)
January 8, 2016 Filing 328 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-77) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
January 8, 2016 Filing 326 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern re #324 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice - Hernandez (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
January 8, 2016 Filing 325 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Neal Stern by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
January 8, 2016 Filing 324 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice - Hernandez by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
January 7, 2016 Filing 327 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:16-cv-00052-JAH-BGS Gough v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Michigan Eastern, 5:15-cv-13397) (no document attached) (kas)
December 28, 2015 Filing 323 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-76) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
December 18, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02851-JAH-BGS Jenkins v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from New York Eastern, 2:15-cv-06697) (no document attached) (kas)
December 17, 2015 Filing 321 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-75) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
December 16, 2015 Filing 320 Minute Entry: Counsel for PRA and Counsel for Class Plaintiffs have an extension to January 4, 2016 to contact the Court regarding the mediator's proposal. (no document attached) (mw)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting #316 stipulation of dismissal of counts I and II only of Matos member case with prejudice (15CV1449-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/09/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 10, 2015 Filing 318 REPLY to Response to Motion re #314 MOTION Ex-Parte Consolidated Motion For Designation As Subclasses filed by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (jpp).
December 9, 2015 Filing 317 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Settlement Conference held on 12/9/2015. Counsel for the parties are instructed to contact the chambers of Judge Skomal at (619) 557-2993 regarding their acceptance or rejection of the mediator's proposal no later than December 15, 2015.(Plaintiff Attorney Douglas Campion, Ethan Preston, James Latturner). (Defendant Attorney Christopher Madel, Jennifer Robbins). (no document attached) (mw)
December 9, 2015 Filing 316 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II Only of Matos Member Case with Prejudice by Susan Matos. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bybee, Floyd) (jpp).
December 3, 2015 Filing 315 RESPONSE in Opposition re #314 MOTION Ex-Parte Consolidated Motion For Designation As Subclasses for the Kimberly Bartlett and Karen Harvey Cases filed by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
November 30, 2015 Filing 314 MOTION Ex-Parte Consolidated Motion For Designation As Subclasses by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (jpp).
November 20, 2015 Filing 313 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02618-JAH-BGS Jacqueline Taylor v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transferred from California Central, 8:15-cv-01768) (no document attached) (kas)
November 18, 2015 Filing 312 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-74) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
November 12, 2015 Filing 311 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: The telephonic Case Management Conference currently set for November 16, 2015 with counsel for Class Plaintiffs and PRA is HEREBY CONTINUED to December 9, 2016 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal.(no document attached) (mw)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person Settlement Conference for Class Plaintiffs and PRA on December 9, 2015, at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal, 333 West Broadway, Suite 1280, San Diego, CA 92101. All claims adjusters for insured defendants with full and unlimited authority to negotiate and enter into a binding settlement, as well as the principal attorneys responsible for the litigation, must be present and legally and factually prepared to discuss and resolve the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/12/15.(no document attached) (mw)
November 11, 2015 Filing 309 RESPONSE re #283 Order,, Set Hearings, Supplemental Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Danny Allen, Jr. (Campion, Douglas) (jpp).
November 5, 2015 Filing 308 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Settlement Conference held on 11/4/2015 with additional teleconferences re: settlement on November 3 and 5, 2015. Counsel are HEREBY ADVISED that the deadlines and dates set forth in the Court's August 27, 2015 Order, which scheduled a further telephonic CMC on November 16, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. and the deadline for filing a joint CMC statement in advance of the teleconference on or before November 11, 2015, REMAIN IN EFFECT. [Please see ECF No. 283 at 2:15-3:2.](no document attached) (mw)
October 28, 2015 Filing 307 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02432-JAH-BGS Nichols v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferrred from Florida Middle, 6:15-cv-01587) (no document attached) (kas)
October 27, 2015 Filing 306 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-73) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 23, 2015 Filing 305 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02404-JAH-BGS Suggs v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Illinois Southern, 3:15-cv-00779) (no document attached) (kas)
October 23, 2015 Filing 304 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-72) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 20, 2015 Filing 303 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02381-JAH-BGS Streeter v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 8:15-cv-02200) (no document attached) (kas)
October 19, 2015 Filing 302 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-71) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 14, 2015 Filing 301 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02290-JAH-BGS Jenkins v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from New York Eastern, 2:15-cv-04090); 3:15-cv-02291-JAH-BGS Jenkins v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from New York Eastern, 2:15-cv-04089); 3:15-cv-02292-JAH-BGS McPherson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 8:15-cv-02074)(no document attached) (kas)
October 13, 2015 Filing 300 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-70) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER - Romanos unopposed motion to withdraw and to require defendant toenter appearances in the member cases (doc. # [290) is granted. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/07/2015.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 5, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02217-JAH-BGS Lawrence v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 1:15-cv-23096); 3:15-cv-02218-JAH-BGS Robinson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 0:15-cv-61740) View Combined Docket Report (no document attached) (kas)
September 30, 2015 Filing 297 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-68) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 28, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02158-JAH-BGS Winiecki v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred in from Illinois Northern, 1:15-cv-05663) (no document attached) (kas)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall be provided, subject to protective order, with the informal discovery previously exchanged between Defendant PRA and Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel on or before October 12, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/25/15.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER regarding privilege and work product. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/24/2015.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/24/2015.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 23, 2015 Filing 292 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-67) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 21, 2015 Filing 291 RESPONSE to Motion re #290 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and for Order Compelling PRA to Substitute Counsel filed by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
September 18, 2015 Filing 290 MOTION to Withdraw by Sharina Talbot Romano. (Romano, Sharina) (jpp).
September 17, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02076-JAH-BGS Ciesla v. Forster & Garbus, LLP. et al (transferred from New York Western, NYW 1 15-00694) (no document attached) (kas)
September 14, 2015 Filing 288 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-66) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 11, 2015 Filing 287 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-02032-JAH-BGS Bowen v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred in from Florida Middle, 8:15-cv-01918) (no document attached) (kas)
September 9, 2015 Filing 286 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-65) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 31, 2015 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance of Cassandra M. Batchelder substituting for Denise S. Rahne and Nicole S. Frank on behalf of Defendants Porfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and PRA Group, Inc. and Neal Stern (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
August 28, 2015 Filing 284 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2015.(Plaintiff Attorney Douglas Campion, Ethan Preston, James Laturner). (Defendant Attorney Christopher Madel, Jennifer Robbins). (no document attached) (mw)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER - The Court will hold an all-day Settlement Conference on November 4, 2015 at 9:30am. The Court will hold a further telephonic casemanagement conference on November 16, 2015 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/27/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 19, 2015 Filing 282 RESPONSE re #273 Order to file Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Danny Allen, Jr. (Campion, Douglas) (jpp).
August 14, 2015 Filing 281 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01822-JAH-BGS Treshman et al v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. (transferred from New York Eastern, 2:15-cv-03812) (no document attached) (kas)
August 14, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern re #276 Notice (Other), filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern, PRA Group, Inc. . (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
August 14, 2015 Filing 279 NOTICE by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Neal Stern re #278 Answer to Amended Complaint, to the United States Attorney General of Its Constitutional Challenge to the Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 (Attachments: #1 Answer of Defendants Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, PRA Group, Inc., and Neal Stern to Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
August 14, 2015 Filing 278 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
August 13, 2015 Filing 277 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-64) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 13, 2015 Filing 276 WITHDRAWN PER #280 - NOTICE of Withdrawal of Julia V. Lee as Counsel by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern (Robbins, Jennifer). Modified on 8/14/2015 - Wrong event, should be Motion. Should be filed by Atty Lee. QC Email sent refile w/ correct event (jah). Modified on 8/17/2015 to edit text, efiling withdrawn per 280 (jpp).
August 12, 2015 Filing 275 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Order Vacating Conditional Transfer Order as to Case 15cv1360-MMA-NLS (kas)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER re Deadlines and Hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/11/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
August 10, 2015 Filing 274 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01768-JAH-BGS Hernandez et al v. AFNI, Inc. et al (Transferred from District of Nevada, 2:15-cv-00078) (no document attached) (kas)
August 10, 2015 Filing 272 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 7, 2015 Filing 271 STATUS REPORT by Brighid Colleen Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Freeman, Brett) (ag).
July 31, 2015 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sabatini, Carlo) (jao).
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #267 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC may file its Answer by 8/14/2015. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/29/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
July 29, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (cxl).
July 29, 2015 Filing 267 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pelikan, Matthew)Attorney Matthew J.M. Pelikan added to party Portfolio Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J.M. Pelikan added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J.M. Pelikan added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER Requiring Submission of Joint Case Management Conference Statement. In preparation for the teleconference with Judge Skomal, counsel for the parties are ordered to meet and confer no later than August 10, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than August 17, 2015, counsel for the parties shall file a JOINT case management conference statement. In addition to filing the statement on the court's docket, a courtesy copy of the joint CMC statement shall be lodged electronically with chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/28/15. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
July 27, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)(dls).
July 27, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (rlu).
July 27, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (rlu).
July 27, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) qc email re excessive docket entries not needed on 7/28/2015 (rlu).
July 27, 2015 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)(QC mailer sent re: document not properly captioned, improper signature re: certificate of service)(sjt).
July 27, 2015 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (QC mailer sent re: document not properly captioned, improper signature re: certificate of service)(sjt).
July 27, 2015 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (QC mailer sent re: document not properly captioned, improper signature re: certificate of service)(sjt).
July 27, 2015 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)(jao).
July 27, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)(jao).
July 27, 2015 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (mdc)
July 27, 2015 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)
July 27, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)
July 27, 2015 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)
July 27, 2015 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan)(kas).
July 27, 2015 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (kas).
July 27, 2015 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) qc mail sent re s/signature on cert of service (kas).
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2015 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/16/2015.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 16, 2015 Filing 248 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 MDL Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #246 Status Report, Certificate of Service by Ethan Mark Preston on behalf of Jesse Meyer (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
July 16, 2015 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance (Searles, Nathan) (jpp).
July 15, 2015 Filing 246 STATUS REPORT Joint Report per the Court's June 2 Order by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 In re Rules and Regulations Implementing the Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 Declaratory Ruling and Order, FCC CG Docket No. 02-278 (July 10, 2105))(Preston, Ethan)
July 1, 2015 Filing 245 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01449-JAH-BGS Matos v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (case transferred from District of Arizona, 2:15-cv-00841) (no document attached) (kas)
June 30, 2015 Filing 244 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-62) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 19, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01349-JAH-BGS Bukvich v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. (transferred from Illinois Northern, 1:15-cv-03218); 3:15-cv-01350-JAH-BGS Tipoo v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al (transferred from New York Eastern, 1:15-cv-02913) (no document attached) (kas)
June 19, 2015 Filing 242 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-61) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 17, 2015 Filing 241 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01336-JAH-BGS Peck v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 9:15-cv-80625) (no document attached) (kas)
June 17, 2015 Filing 240 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-60) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 15, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01308-JAH-BGS Hinton v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. (transferred from Michigan Western, 1:15-cv-00398) (no document attached) (kas)
June 11, 2015 Filing 238 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-59) re MDL No. 2295 (no document attached) (kas)
June 2, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01227-JAH-BGS McLaughlin v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Middle, 3:15-cv-00545) (no document attached) (kas)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER re: stay. This case shall continue to be STAYED until further order of the Court The parties shall file a joint status report no later than July 24, 2015, to advise the Court as to the status of the matters currently before the FCC. Should the FCC resolve the matters pending before it prior to the July 24, 2015 deadline, the parties shall jointly advise the Court no later than five (5) days after the FCC issues such resolution. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/02/2015.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 1, 2015 Filing 235 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-58) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 1, 2015 Filing 234 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01206-JAH-BGS Mulrine v. Portfolio Recovery Associates (transferred in from Florida Middle, 8:15-cv-00942)(no document attached) (kas)
May 28, 2015 Filing 233 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01183-JAH-BGS Sutton v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferrred in from Western District of New York, 1:15-cv-00245) (no document attached) (kas)
May 28, 2015 Filing 232 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-57) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
May 27, 2015 Filing 231 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Robbins by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Corrected), #2 Proof of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
May 27, 2015 Filing 230 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Robbins by Defendant Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (FCC Proposal), #2 Proof of Service)(Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
May 20, 2015 Filing 229 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-56) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
May 20, 2015 Filing 228 Joint STATUS REPORT by Danny Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Danny Allen, #2 Declaration of Joshua Cherkasly)(Campion, Douglas) (ag).
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Denying Jason Gaza's Motion to Transfer (Doc. #182 ). Plaintiff Gaza's motion to transfer (doc. #182 ) is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/19/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl)
May 18, 2015 Filing 226 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01109-JAH-BGS Jenkins v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transferred in from New York Eastern, 2:15-cv-01361) (no document attached) (kas)
May 18, 2015 Filing 225 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01107-JAH-BGS Rejkowski v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred in from Illinois Northern, 1:15-cv-02765); 3:15-cv-01108-JAH-BGS Williams v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred in from Florida Middle, 8:15-cv-01004) (no document attached) (kas)
May 14, 2015 Filing 224 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-55) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
May 14, 2015 Filing 223 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01093-JAH-BGS Jenkins v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (transferred from New York Eastern, 2:15-cv-02415) (no document attached) (kas)
May 13, 2015 Filing 222 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-54) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
May 7, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-01019-JAH-BGS Conine v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (transferred from New York Northern, 6:15-cv-00359) (no document attached) (kas)
May 7, 2015 Filing 220 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-53) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
May 5, 2015 Filing 219 MOTION Transfer of Case to Middle District of Florida by Brandi Williams. (Gadd, William)Attorney William John Gadd added to party Brandi Williams(pty:mov) (jpp). Modified on 5/5/2015 to reflect transfer order not received from mdl panel, Attorney notified, QC email sent (jpp).
April 27, 2015 Filing 218 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00926-JAH-BGS Cunningham v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferrred from Tennessee Middle, 3:15-cv-00177) (no document attached) (kas)
April 22, 2015 Filing 217 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-52) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 16, 2015 Filing 216 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00843-JAH-BGS Vasquez v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Texas Northern, 3:15-cv-00802) (no document attached) (kas)
April 16, 2015 Filing 215 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-51) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 8, 2015 Filing 214 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00767-JAH-BGS Neill v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from Florida Southern, 9:15-cv-80114); 3:15-cv-00768-JAH-BGS Miller v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (transferred from Virginia Eastern, 3:14-cv-00865) (no document attached) (kas)
April 2, 2015 Filing 213 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Order vacating conditional transfer Order (CTO-46) insofar as it relates to the Andasola action (District of AZ, case #2:14-02635) (kas)
April 2, 2015 Filing 212 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 2, 2015 Filing 211 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-50) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
April 2, 2015 Filing 210 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00716-JAH-BGS Marczak v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred in from Minnesota, 0:15-cv-00514) View Combined Docket Report (no document attached) (kas)
April 1, 2015 Filing 209 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-49) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
March 10, 2015 Filing 208 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00548-JAH-BGS Gary Contreras et al v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (case transferred from California Northern, 3:15-cv-00104) (no document attached) (kas)
March 10, 2015 Filing 207 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-48) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
March 4, 2015 Filing 206 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ethan Mark Preston (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER RE: STAY - This case shall continue to be STAYED until further order of the Court. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than May 20, 2015, to advise the Court as to the status of the matters currently before the FCC; and Should the FCC resolve the matters pending before it prior to the May 20, 2015 deadline, the parties shall jointly advise the Court no later than five(5) days after the FCC issues such resolution. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 02/24/2015. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 20, 2015 Filing 204 STATUS REPORT , Parties' Joint Report on Status of Matters Before the FCC Re: Stay of Case on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds by Jeremy Frydman. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Latturner, James) (jpp).
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #202 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Holly E. Dowd is relieved as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff Kelly Banks, and that Benjamin A. Parker is henceforth Attorney of Record for Plaintiff Kelly Banks in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/17/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 13, 2015 Filing 202 Amended MOTION to Substitute Attorney Holly Dowd for Benjamin Parker by Kelly Banks. (Parker, Benjamin) (jpp).
February 12, 2015 Filing 201 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney Holly Dowd for Benjamin Parker by Kelly Banks. (Parker, Benjamin) (jpp).
February 12, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00299-JAH-BGS Herrero v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (transferred from California Northern, 3:14-cv-05175) (no document attached) (kas)
February 9, 2015 Filing 199 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-47) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice of Cassidy member case 14CV0109-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 02/03/2015. (cc: mdl panel) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 3, 2015 Filing 197 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
February 3, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE by PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern of Substitution of Counsel for Defendants (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
February 3, 2015 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J.M. Pelikan on behalf of PRA Group, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern (Pelikan, Matthew)Attorney Matthew J.M. Pelikan added to party PRA Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J.M. Pelikan added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J.M. Pelikan added to party Neal Stern(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 27, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Order Reinstating Stay of Conditional Transfer Order as to C.A. No. 3:14-00865 from the Eastern District of Virginia (kas)
January 21, 2015 Filing 193 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00128-JAH-BGS GOEHST v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (transferred from Pennsylvania Western, 2:14-cv-01745) (no document attached) (kas)
January 20, 2015 Filing 192 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00119-JAH-BGS Miller v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (transferred from Virginia Eastern, 3:14-cv-00865) (no document attached) (kas)
January 15, 2015 Filing 191 Notice of MDL ORDER Reinstating Stay of Conditional Transfer Order as to District of Arizona Case re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
January 15, 2015 Filing 190 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-46) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
January 8, 2015 Filing 189 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00035-JAH-BGS Lukowicz v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (from Florida Middle, 5:14-cv-00605) (no document attached) (kas)
January 5, 2015 Filing 188 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:15-cv-00008-JAH-BGS MARC v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (from Florida Southern, 1:14-cv-23968) (no document attached) (kas)
December 31, 2014 Filing 187 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #182 MOTION Transfer of Case to Middle District of Florida (of Jennifer M. Robbins) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
December 31, 2014 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Opposition re #182 MOTION Transfer of Case to Middle District of Florida filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
December 31, 2014 Filing 185 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-45) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
December 29, 2014 Filing 184 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-44) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER setting briefing schedule re #182 Motion to transfer member case 14CV0039-JAH(BGS) back to the Middle District of Florida. Opposition to the motion shall be filed and served no later than December 31, 2014. Plaintiff Gazas reply brief, if any, shall be filed and served no later than January 9, 2015. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/16/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 9, 2014 Filing 182 MOTION Transfer of Case to Middle District of Florida by Jason Gaza. (Gadd, William) (jpp).
December 4, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:14-cv-02865-JAH-BGS Grief v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC ( Florida Southern, 9:14-cv-81210) (no document attached) (kas)
December 3, 2014 Filing 180 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-43) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER RE: STAY - This case shall continued to be stayed until further order of the Court. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than February 20, 2015, to advise the Court as to the status of the matters currently before the FCC. Should the FCC resolve the matters pending before it prior to theFebruary 20, 2015 deadline, the parties shall jointly advise the Court nolater than five (5) days after the FCC issues such resolution. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/01/2014. (cc: mdl panel. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #176 Motion to amend case captions to reflect corporate name change. In all of the individual matters listed below, Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc. shall now be listed as PRA Group, Inc. 1. Allen v. PRA Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:10-cv-2658-JAH-BGS; 2. Bartlett v. PRA Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:11-cv-3007-JAH-BGS; 3. Lowe v. PRA Group, Inc,. et al., Case No. 3:12-cv-2127-JAH-BGS; 4. Baker v. PRA Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:13-cv-0391-JAH-BGS; 5. Pasquesi v. PRA Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:13-cv-1260-JAH-BGS. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/20/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cc: mdl panel).(jpp)
November 19, 2014 Filing 177 STATUS REPORT re FCC rulemaking by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelsey Ridenhour, #2 Declaration of Ethan Preston)(Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
November 19, 2014 Filing 176 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Captions to Reflect Corporate Name Change by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
November 19, 2014 Filing 175 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc. for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
November 17, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:14-cv-02714-JAH-BGS Nikolov v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Illinois Northern, 1:14-cv-07299) (no document attached) (kas)
November 14, 2014 Filing 173 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-42) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
November 3, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:14-cv-02608-JAH-BGS Stout v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Florida Middle, 2:14-cv-00578) (no document attached) (kas)
October 30, 2014 Filing 171 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-41) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #169 Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice of Santiago member case 13CV0696-JAH(BGS). All claims that were or might have been asserted in the Santiago action are dismissed, pursuant to the parties settlement agreement and to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. The Santiago action shall not be remanded to the transferor court, and this Court shall retain the original files and records, unless the transferee judge or the Panel directs otherwise. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/17/2014. (cc: MDL panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 16, 2014 Filing 169 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice - Santiago by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer)
October 16, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Change of Address by Francis Richard Greene (Greene, Francis) (jpp).
October 8, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 3:14-cv-02393-JAH-BGS Laurore v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Florida Southern, 9:14-cv-81131) (no document attached) (kas)
October 8, 2014 Filing 166 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-40) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 18, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 14-cv-02223-JAH-BGS Reamer v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC;14-cv-02225-JAH-BGS Maxey v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (no document attached) (kas)
September 16, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 14-cv-02206-JAH-BGS Hines v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (no document attached) (kas)
September 16, 2014 Filing 163 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-39) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #156 Plaintiff Nora Garcia's Motion to Dismiss. Counts one and two contained in plaintiffs complaint are dismissed with prejudice. The member case 14CV1511-JAH(BGS) is remanded to the Central District of California for allfurther proceedings. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/09/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 15, 2014 Filing 161 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-2295) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 11, 2014 Filing 160 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-37) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
August 7, 2014 Filing 159 RESPONSE to Motion re #156 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendant's Supplement to the Record filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re: motion to dismiss #156 . Defendant shall supplement the record by submitting Garcias complete state court complaint no later than August 15, 2014. Garcia may file a reply to defendants opposition, no later than August 22, 2014, addressing only the issue of whether her TCPA claims should bedismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 08/05/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 5, 2014 Filing 157 RESPONSE to Motion re #156 MOTION to Dismiss Cause of Action - Nora Garcia filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
July 28, 2014 Filing 156 MOTION to Dismiss Cause of Action, by Nora Garcia. (motion from member case 14CV1511-JAH(BGS)). (jpp)
July 17, 2014 Filing 155 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-36) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
July 9, 2014 Filing 154 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-35) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 stipulation of dismissal of Firneno member case with prejudice (Jody Firneno v. Credit Collection Services, Inc., et al., 14CV1410-JAH(BGS)).. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/30/2014. (cc: mdl panel) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 30, 2014 Filing 152 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice - Jody Firneno by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
June 19, 2014 Filing 151 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-34) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 17, 2014 Filing 150 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-33) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 11, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern of Withdrawal of Barry M. Landy as Counsel (Landy, Barry) (jpp).
June 10, 2014 Filing 149 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-32) re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
June 9, 2014 Filing 147 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 (kas)
May 27, 2014 Filing 146 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-31) re MDL No. 2295 (kaj)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #123 Defendant's Motion to Stay action on primary jurisdiction grounds. Plaintiffs ex parte application doc. #141 is denied as moot.Defendants ex parte application doc. #142 is denied as moot. This case is stayed until further order of the Court. This document relates to all member cases. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/19/2014. (order entered twice in lead case in order to spread to all member cases). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #123 Defendant's Motion to Stay action on primary jurisdiction grounds. Plaintiffs ex parte application doc. #141 is denied as moot.Defendants ex parte application doc. #142 is denied as moot. This case is stayed until further order of the Court. This document relates to all member cases. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/19/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 16, 2014 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern re #142 Ex Parte MOTION to Supplement Authority in Support of its Motion to Stay or Dismiss on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
May 16, 2014 Filing 142 Ex Parte MOTION to Supplement Authority in Support of its Motion to Stay or Dismiss on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
April 30, 2014 Filing 141 Ex Parte MOTION to Supplement Record on Defendants' Motion to Stay or Dismiss on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Preston, Ethan)
April 2, 2014 Filing 140 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-30) re MDL No. 2295 (kaj)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. Counsel is ORDERED to contact the chambers of Judge Skomal at (619) 557-2993 no later than April 14, 2014 to inform the Court of the parties' progress in determining class size in accordance with the Court's instructions at the end of the March 19, 2014 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 04/02/14.(no document attached) (mw)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #135 Defendants' ex parte motion requesting to submit supplemental authority in support of its motion to stay or dismiss action on primary jurisdiction grounds. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 03/28/2014.This document relates to All member cases. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(order entered twice in lead case in order to spread to all member cases).(jpp)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting #135 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion Requesting To Submit Supplemental Authority In Support Of Its Motion To Stay Or Dismiss Action On Primary Jurisdiction Grounds. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 03/28/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)(jrd)
March 27, 2014 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Neal Stern re #135 Ex Parte MOTION to Supplement Authority in Support of its Motion to Stay or Dismiss on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
March 27, 2014 Filing 135 Ex Parte MOTION to Supplement Authority in Support of its Motion to Stay or Dismiss on Primary Jurisdiction Grounds by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
March 19, 2014 Filing 134 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal:Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 3/19/2014. Following the conference, the parties were ordered to meet-and-confer and exchange materials. Counsel shall contact the Court on or before March 28, 2014 to discuss scheduling of a further settlement conference before Judge Skomal. (Plaintiff Attorney Doug Campion).(Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins). (no document attached) (mw)
March 17, 2014 Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Conference held on 3/17/2014.(Plaintiff Attorney Doug Campion). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins). (no document attached) (mw)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER setting TELEPHONIC Status Conference. The Court will hold a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE for ATTORNEYS ONLY on Monday, 3/17/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to coordinate a joint call with opposing counsel and initiate the call to chambers at (619) 557-2993 on the day and at the time indicated above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 03/13/14.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (mw)
March 4, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M. Landy on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern (Landy, Barry)Attorney Barry M. Landy added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barry M. Landy added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Barry M. Landy added to party Neal Stern(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 28, 2014 Filing 130 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-29) re MDL No. 2295 (kaj)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Vacating Hearing on #123 Defendant's Motion to stay or dismiss action on primary grounds set for 03/03/2014. Court deems the motion suitable for disposition without oral argument. (Doc. No. 123 in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 02/25/14. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)(jrd)
February 24, 2014 Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion re #123 MOTION to Stay or MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Continuing Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Mandatory Settlement Conference currently scheduled for March 5, 2014 is continued to March 19, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/18/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
February 17, 2014 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #123 MOTION to Stay or MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Opposition to Motion to Stay or Dismiss filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Preston, Ethan) (knb).
February 14, 2014 Filing 125 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 (kaj)
February 7, 2014 Filing 124 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-27) re MDL No. 2295 (kaj)
January 23, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION to Stay or, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jennifer M. Robbins, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Declaration Joshua Cherkasly, #14 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp). .
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Mandatory Settlement Conference currently scheduled for January 22, 2014 is hereby Vacated. Plaintiffs Interim Co-Class Counsel, Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel, and Defendants Counsel are ordered to be present for an in-person, attorneys-only settlement conference at 9:30 a.m. on March 5, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/10/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Denying (Doc. No. 71 in case: 11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Cause of Action and Plaintiffs' Claim For Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 01/08/14. This document relates to All member cases. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp). Modified on 1/9/2014 to reflect order entered twice in lead case in order to spread to all member cases. (jpp)(jrd)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Denying (Doc. No. #71 in case: 11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Cause Of Action And Plaintiffs' Claim For Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 01/08/14. This document relates to All member cases. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)(jrd)
December 31, 2013 Filing 119 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO-25) (kaj)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/11/13.(jpp) (jrl).
October 17, 2013 Filing 117 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 for Transfer of Case 1:13-04648 from the Northern District of Illinois (kaj)
October 15, 2013 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Conference held on 10/15/2013. The Court gave the parties additional instructions regarding discovery. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a date for a future Mandatory Settlement Conference and call Judge Skomal's Research Attorney assigned to this case when a date has been agreed upon.(Plaintiff Attorney Douglas Campion). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins, Christopher Madel). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (jpd)
October 4, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Status Conference previously scheduled for 10/4/2013 is hereby VACATED pursuant to the Court's 10/1/2013 in 11-md-2295. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (jpd)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER continuing Telephonic Status Conference to 10/15/2013 at 10:00am before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The parties joint motion #113 tocontinue the settlement conference is denied. Because a settlement conference is not scheduled at this time, the parties request for leave to lodge separate confidential settlement reports with the Court is also denied.. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/01/13. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (av1).
September 30, 2013 Filing 113 Joint MOTION to Continue October 4, 2013 Settlement Conference and For Leave to Lodge Separate, Confidential Status Reports on Settlement Discovery re Class Size by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying in its entirety (85) Motion to Remand in case 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/23/13. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:13-cv-00029-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
September 19, 2013 Filing 111 Ex Parte MOTION Entry Of Comprehensive Scheduling Order by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (jpp).
August 22, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/4/2013 at 10:00 AM, pacfiic time, before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. This call is for Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Class Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel only. Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for setting up the call. When all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (619) 557-2993Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (jpd)
August 22, 2013 Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Hearing held on 8/22/2013. Settlement Conference currently scheduled for 8/28/2013 is hereby VACATED. Parties should meet and confer regarding class size before the next status conference. A follow-up telephonic status conference will be scheduled for 10/4/2014 @ 10:00 a.m. pacific time, following this entry. (Plaintiff Attorney James Latturner, Ethan Preston, Douglas Campion). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins, Christopher Madel). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (jpd)
August 21, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Hearing set for 8/22/2013 at 10:00 AM Pacific Time before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. This call is for Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Class Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel only. Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for setting up the call. When all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (619) 557-2993.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (mgo)
June 13, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Transfer Order from the MDL Panel re Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order Conditionally Transferring Action. It is ordered that the action is transferred to the Southern District of CA (case has already been transferred to this district on 2/19/13, case number 13cv391-JAH-BGS) (kaj)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER setting future Settlement Conference dates. In person, attorneys-only Settlement Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 05/28/13.CC: MDL Panel(jpp)(av1).
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER regarding lodging of Settlement Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 05/22/13.CC: MDL Panel(jpp) (av1).
May 22, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) of Withdrawal of Scott M. Kranz as Counsel (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER regarding limited informal discovery and proposed Settlement Conference dates. Telephonic settlement conference held 05/08/13.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 05/08/13.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(jpp) (jrl).
May 8, 2013 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 5/8/2013. Written order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas Campion, Ethan Preston, James Latturner). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins, Christopher Madel). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (mgo)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER vacating hearing on (85 in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) MOTION to Remand set for 05/13/13. Court deems the motion suitable for disposition without oral argument. Because the motion hearing has been vacated, defendants ex parte application #96 for permission to appear telephonically at the May 13,2013 hearing and plaintiff Hubbards motion #100 to appear telephonically at the hearing are denied as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/08/13.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:13-cv-00029-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(jpp) (jrl).
May 8, 2013 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the May 13, 2013 Hearing by Karen Hubbard. (Meyers, Marshall)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Converting Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference shall be conducted on May 8, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The conference shall be telephonic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/3/2013.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb) (jrl).
May 3, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2013 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The Settlement Conference will now be telephonic. The Settlement Conference will be limited to Interim Co-class Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, and Defendant's Counsel. Plaintiffs' Counsel is responsible for arranging all parties on a call before telephoning chambers. A written order shall follow.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (mgo)
May 3, 2013 Filing 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 5/3/2013. (Plaintiff Attorney Ethan Preston, Douglas Campion, James Latturner). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins, Christopher Madel). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (mgo)
April 30, 2013 Filing 96 Ex Parte MOTION Permission to Appear Telephonically at the May 13, 2013 Hearing on Karen Hubbard's Motion for Suggestion of Remand by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Neal Stern. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
April 29, 2013 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 MOTION to Remand regarding Hubbard member case filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Neal Stern. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Joint Motion for Dismissal of Bauer Member Case 12CV1966-JAH(BGS) with prejudice. All claims and counterclaims that were or might have been asserted in the Bauer action are dismissed, pursuant to the parties settlement agreement and to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/24/13. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:12-cv-01966-JAH-BGS. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). CC: MDL Panel. (jpp) (jrl).
April 24, 2013 Filing 93 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Bauer Member Case by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying #87 ex parte Motion for standing to participate in Settlement Conference in case 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 04/19/13. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(jpp) (cap).
April 11, 2013 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION Standing To Participate In Settlement Conference Amended Response filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
April 11, 2013 Filing 90 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION Standing To Participate In Settlement Conference filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Latturner, James) (jpp).
April 9, 2013 Filing 89 NON Opposition re #87 MOTION Standing To Participate In Settlement Conference filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Neal Stern. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
April 8, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE re (87 in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) MOTION Standing To Participate In Settlement Conference. The Court construes Plaintiffs Bartlett and Harvey's motion for standing to participate in settlement conference as an ex parte request to allow Bartlett and Harvey's counsel to appear at the May 8, 2013 settlement conference. Any oppositions or statements of non-opposition to this ex parte motion shall be filed no later then April 12, 2013. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(no document attached) (alg)
April 5, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION Standing To Participate In Settlement Conference by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry) (jpp).
April 1, 2013 Filing 86 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 for Transfer of Case 3:12-8187 from the District of Arizona (kaj)
March 28, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION for Suggestion to Remand by Karen Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Docket Entries)(Meyers, Marshall) (jpp).
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE and ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 5/8/2013 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 03/26/13.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(jpp)(av1). (jrl). (jrl).
March 21, 2013 Filing 83 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 for Transfer of Cases from the Southern District of Florida (kaj)
March 8, 2013 Filing 82 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER re Transfer of Tag-Along Action from Central District of California, case 12-08600 (kaj)
March 7, 2013 Filing 81 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER re Transfer of Tag-Along Action from the Middle District of Florida, Bankruptcy, Case 12-ap-00990 (kaj)
March 4, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change of Address by Keith James Keogh (Keogh, Keith) (jpp).
February 28, 2013 Filing 79 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER re Transfer of Tag-Along Action from the Middle District of Florida, Case 8:12-00990 Herendeen v. Portolfio Recovery Associates (kaj)
February 14, 2013 Filing 78 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 2295 for Transfer of Tag-Along Action from the Western District of Michigan (kaj)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER vacating hearing on #71 (in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS), Motion to Dismiss set for 01/22/13. Court deems the motion suitable for disposition without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 01/15/13.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(jpp)
January 15, 2013 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the Second Cause of Action and to Dismiss Claim and Request for Attorneys' Fees MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
January 10, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company) of Withdrawal of Lisa L. Heller as Counsel (Heller, Lisa) (jpp).
January 8, 2013 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the Second Cause of Action and to Dismiss Claim and Request for Attorneys' Fees MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, John Howard, Frederick L Jury, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Parisi, David) (jpp).
December 14, 2012 Filing 73 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER re MDL No. 11md2295-JAH-BGS re Tag-Along Action from the District of Arizona (kaj) Modified on 12/19/2012 Notice of Opposition filed with the MDL Panel; case 3:12cv08187 from the District of Arizona will not be transferred to this district (kaj).
November 29, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D Lodgen on behalf of Neal Stern (Lodgen, Edward) (jpp).
November 28, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim the Second Cause of Action and to Dismiss Claim and MOTION for Attorneys' Fees by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Neal Stern. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
November 28, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Robbins on behalf of Neal Stern (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
November 28, 2012 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Veronica Lee on behalf of Neal Stern (Lee, Julia) (jpp).
November 28, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Madel on behalf of Neal Stern (Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
November 14, 2012 Filing 67 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Portfolio Recovery Associates Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC., and Neal Stern. CC: MDL Panel (jpp)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting (doc #61 in 11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) The Nationwide Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Leave to File an Amended Consolidated Complaint; Denying As Moot (doc #43 in 11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Nationwide Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint; and Vacating Hearing date of 11/26/12. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/13/12. The Clerk of Court shall file plaintiff's amended consolidated complaint, attached to plaintiff's moving papers. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cc: MDL Panel)(jpp)(jrd)
November 12, 2012 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #61 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
November 9, 2012 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Second Cause of Action and Claim and Request for Attorneys' Fees MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Second Cause of Action filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Parisi, David) (jpp).
October 15, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Conditional Transfer Order re Transfer of Tag-Along Actions from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (kaj)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting (58) Defendant's Motion in case 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, to re-calendar Defendants' motion to dismiss #43 . Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/12/12.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:10-cv-02658-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-01008-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03057-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(jpp) (jrl).
October 9, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Danny Allen, Jr, Kimberly Bartlett, David Bauer, Jeremy Frydman, Karen Harvey, Susan Lowe, Terry Lowe, Sam Marin, Janet McCormick, Kenneth McCormick, Jesse Meyer, Carlos Suarez, Christine Suarez. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Consolidated Complaint)(Latturner, James) (jpp).
October 8, 2012 Filing 60 REPLY - Other re #58 MOTION to re-calendar Motion to Dismiss re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Second Cause of Action and Claim and Request for Attorneys' Fees MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Second Cause of Action< filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
October 5, 2012 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to re-calendar Motion to Dismiss re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Second Cause of Action and Claim and Request for Attorneys' Fees MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Second Cause of Action< filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Kimberly Bartlett, David Bauer, Jeremy Frydman, Karen Harvey, Susan Lowe, Terry Lowe, Sam Marin, Janet McCormick, Kenneth McCormick, Jesse Meyer, Carlos Suarez, Christine Suarez. (Latturner, James) (jpp).
October 2, 2012 Filing 58 MOTION to re-calendar Motion to Dismiss re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Second Cause of Action and Claim and Request for Attorneys' Fees MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Second Cause of Action by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
September 28, 2012 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: In light of the Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendants on 9/28/2012 (Doc. No. 55), the Court vacates the Discovery Conference regarding the scope of jurisdictional discovery set for 10/5/2012 before Magistrate Judge Skomal. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:10-cv-02658-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-01008-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03057-JAH-BGS CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (alg)
September 28, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Richard Greene on behalf of Jeremy Frydman (Greene, Francis) (jpp).
September 28, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(2) Only (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
September 27, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE by Jesse Meyer Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Azita Moradmand) (Parisi, David)(jpp).
September 21, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer re #52 Order, Set Hearings,, Joint Proposed Jurisdictional Discovery Plan Submitted by Nationwide Plaintiffs and Defendants; Notice of Lodging (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER regarding jurisdictional discovery. Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 09/04/12.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:10-cv-02658-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-01008-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03057-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(jpp) (jrl).
August 27, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Conditional Transfer Order re Transfer of Tag-Along Action from the Eastern District of Oklahoma (kaj)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Regarding Pending Motions. (Docs #91 and #94 in 11CV1008-JAH(BGS). Defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs first amended complaint filed in member case no. 11cv1008 JAH(BGS), Doc. # 91, is denied as moot. The joint motion for determination of discovery disputes filed in member case no. 11cv1008 JAH(BGS), Doc. # 94, is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 08/21/12. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-01008-JAH-BGS. (cc: MDL Panel)(jpp)(jrd)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting #46 Nationwide Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. The hearing on Defendants motion to dismiss #43 set for September 17, 2012, is vacated until further order of this Court. Associated Cases: 10CV2658-JAH(BGS), 11CV1008-JAH(BGS), 11CV3057-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 08/10/12. (CC: MDL Panel)(jpp)(jrd)
August 10, 2012 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 Ex Parte MOTION Take Discovery and Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Declaration and Certificate of Service filed by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
August 9, 2012 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 Ex Parte MOTION Take Discovery and Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer M. Robbins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Robbins, Jennifer) (leh).
August 3, 2012 Filing 46 Ex Parte MOTION Take Discovery and Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan Preston in Support of Ex Parte Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ethan Preston in Support of Ex Parte Motion, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ethan Preston in Support of Ex Parte Motion, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ethan Preston in Support of Ex Parte Motion, #5 Proof of Service)(Moradmand, Azita) (jpp).
August 3, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Transfer Order re Transfer of Case 8:12-1133 from the Middle District of Florida (kaj)
July 24, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D Lodgen on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc. (Lodgen, Edward) (jpp).
July 20, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Second Cause of Action and Claim and Request for Attorneys' Fees, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Second Cause of Action by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jennifer M. Robbins, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
July 20, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
July 20, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Robbins on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
July 20, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Madel on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc. (Madel, Christopher) (jpp).
July 20, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Veronica Lee on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc. (Lee, Julia) (jpp).
July 10, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ethan Mark Preston (Preston, Ethan) (jpp).
June 25, 2012 Filing 37 Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. CC: MDL Panel(jpp)
June 22, 2012 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Consolidated Complaint against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, Inc., filed by Danny Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Campion, Douglas) (jpp).
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying Plaintiff Bartlett's and Plaintiff Harvey's #34 Consolidated Ex Parte Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) in case 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS. After considering the Ex Parte Motion, the Court is not of the opinion that its May 25, 2012 Order involves a controlling question of law as to which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion or that an immediate appeal from the Order would materially advance the ultimate termination of this litigation. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 6/15/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03006-JAH-BGS, 3:11-cv-03007-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cc: MDL Panel)(leh)(jrd)
June 15, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Turner, Henry)(jpp).
June 8, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Transfer Order re transfer of case 3:11-01097 from the Middle District of Tennessee (kaj)
May 25, 2012 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Telephonic Status Hearing held on 5/25/2012. Plaintiff's shall file it's consolidated claims by 6/22/12. Defendant's responsive pleadings shall be filed by 7/20/12. (Court Reporter Cameron Kircher).(Plaintiff Attorney Mauricio Arcadier, James O. Latturner, Ethan Mark Preston, Henry A. Turner, David Parisi, Don Kovaleski). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer M. Robbins). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. CC: MDL Panel(lwm)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER Denying the Suarez Plaintiffs' Motion for Suggestion of Remand re (30 in 3:12-cv-00574-JAH-BGS) MOTION to Remand , (22 in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) MOTION to Remand. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/25/2012.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:12-cv-00574-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)CC: MDL Panel(leh)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying (22) Motion for Suggestion of Remand in case 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS. It is hereby ordered that the Suarez plaintiffs' request for a suggestion of remand or, in the alternative, for designation as a subclass is Denied in its entirety. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/24/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:12-cv-00574-JAH-BGS(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(leh)
May 24, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #25 Joint Hearing Statement, of Unresolved Issues Regarding Consolidated Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Robbins, Jennifer)(yeb).
May 22, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (a Delaware limited liabililty company) of Telephonic Status Conference (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
May 21, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) Withdrawal of Counsel (Landy, Barry) (jpp).
May 18, 2012 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand filed by Carlos Suarez, Christine Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Owens, Scott) (jpp).
May 18, 2012 Filing 25 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Danny Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cassandra P. Miller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proof of Service)(Campion, Douglas) (jpp).
May 11, 2012 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand by Suarez Plaintiffs filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company). (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER - The Member Cases are consolidated for pretrial purposes only. Any tag-along actions later filed in, removed to or transferred to this Court, or directly filed in the Southern District of California, will automatically be consolidated with this action without further motions or orders. This consolidation, however, does not constitute a determination that the actions should be consolidated for trial, nor does it have the effect of making any entity a party to any action in which he, she, or it has not been named, served, or added in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All future filing will be done on the master docket 11md2295-JAH(BGS). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/25/12.CC: MDL Panel(jpp) Modified on 6/12/2012 to indicate order filed in new case 12cv1389-JAH (leh). Modified on 8/09/2012 to indicate order filed in new case 12cv1966-JAH (jpp). Modified on 09/04/12 to indicate order filed in new case 12cv2127-JAH (jpp). Modified on 10/19/12 to indicate order filed in new case 12cv2538-JAH (jpp). Modified on 10/19/12 to indicate order filed in new case 12cv2539-JAH (jpp). Modified on 01/09/13 to indicate order filed in new case 13CV0029-JAH (jpp). Modified on 02/19/13 to indicate order filed in new case 13CV0391-JAH (jpp).
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting briefing schedule re Plaintiffs Christine Suarez and Carlos Suarez' Motion for suggestion of Remand (filed in 12CV0574-W(BGS) doc #30). Clerk of Court is directed to file the Suarez motion for suggestion of remand on the master docket in this case. Motion hearing set for 05/25/12 at 10:30am. Response due on or before 05/11/12, any reply due on or before 05/18/12. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/25/12.CC: MDL Panel(jpp) Modified on 4/26/2012 to edit motion hearing date to 05/25/12 at 10:30am, nef resent to all parties. (jpp).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER following Status Conference held 04/13/12. Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated amended complaint no later than 05/18/12. A telephonic status conference will be conducted before this Court on 05/25/12 at 10:30 am. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/13/12.CC: MDL Panel(jpp)
April 13, 2012 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Status Hearing held on 4/13/2012. Court to issue a written order. Amended complaint to be filed by 05/18/12. Defense to initiate the Telephonic Status Hearing set for 5/25/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston.(Court Reporter Cami Kircher).(Plaintiff Attorneys Douglas Campion, Telephonically Appearing: Henry Turner, Ethan Preston, James Latturner, Sam Hill and Maurice Arcadier). (Defendant Attorneys Chris Madel and Jennifer Robbins). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:12-cv-00574-JAH-BGS(bjb)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER in case 3:10-cv-02658-JAH-BGS; denying (9) Motion - Request For Suggestion For Remand Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Designation As Subclass in case 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS. It is hereby ordered that the moving plaintiffs' request for a suggestion of remand or, in the alternative, for designation as a subclass is denied in its entirety. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/13/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. CC: MDL Panel(leh)
April 12, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION for suggestion of Remand by Carlos Suarez, Christine Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities) (jpp)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #6 Ex Parte Application for the Appointment of Interim Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs. Ethan Mark Preston and James O. Latturner are appointed to act as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel; and Douglas J. Campion is appointed as Liaison counsel to the Court. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/09/12. (cc: MDL Panel)(jpp)(jrd)
April 4, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) Notice of Developments in Appeal Related to Member Case (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp). (Main Document 16 replaced on 2/20/2013) (jpp).
April 4, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) re #14 Notice (Other), filed by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC . (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
April 4, 2012 Filing 14 WITHDRAWN PER #15 - NOTICE by Portfolio Associates, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company), Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a Delaware limited liabililty company) Notice of Developments in Appeal Related to Member Case (Robbins, Jennifer). Modified on 4/5/2012 to edit text, efiling withdrawn (jpp).
April 2, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Hearing set for 4/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. CC: MDL Panel(lwm)
March 16, 2012 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION Request For Suggestion For Remand Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Designation As Subclass filed by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate)(Turner, Henry) (mtb).
March 12, 2012 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION Request For Suggestion For Remand Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Designation As Subclass filed by Danny Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Campion, Douglas) (jpp).
March 12, 2012 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION Request For Suggestion For Remand Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Designation As Subclass filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(a foreign limited liability company). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer M. Robbins, #2 Exhibit A)(Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
February 25, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION Request For Suggestion For Remand Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Designation As Subclass by Kimberly Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comparison Table, #2 Declaration Turner Declaration, #3 Proof of Service Certificate)(Turner, Henry) (jpp).
February 10, 2012 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Case Management Conference held on 2/10/2012. Court to issue order.(Court Reporter Cameron Kircher).(Plaintiff Attorney Mauricio Arcadier, James O. Latturner, Ethan Mark Preston, Henry A. Turner). (Defendant Attorney Christopher William Madel, Jennifer M. Robbins, Chris Lagow). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al. CC: MDL Panel(lwm)
February 7, 2012 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Counsel for interim leadership structure for plaintiffs' counsel filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer) (jpp).
January 27, 2012 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Counsel for interim leadership structure for plaintiffs' counsel by Danny Allen, Jr, Jeremy Frydman, Sam Marin, Jesse Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In support of ex parte application for appointment of interim leadership structure for Plaintiffs' counsel, #2 Declaration Ethan Preston, #3 Declaration James Latturner, #4 Declaration Douglas J. Campion, #5 Proof of Service)(Swigart, Joshua)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting (3) Ex Parte Motion to Stay Discovery and for Case Management Conference in case 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS. It is hereby ordered that a Case Management Conference will be conducted on 2/10/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. All discovery is stayed until further order of this Court. All Hearing Dates set for motions filed in member cases are vacated, to be rescheduled at the CMC. All applicable briefing schedules for motions currently pending in member cases are stayed. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/13/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(leh) (jrl).
January 13, 2012 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Case Management Conference filed by Jesse Meyer. (Preston, Ethan) (ag).
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: The Court vacates its order setting response in opposition deadlines to Defendant's ex parte motion to stay and for Case Management Conference. The ex parte motion will be decided by Judge Houston. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(alg)
January 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Set/Reset Deadlines as to (3 in 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS) Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Case Management Conference. Any Responses in Opposition due no later than 1/11/2012 and shall be no longer than two (2) pages in length (not including heading and certificate of service). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS et al.(alg)
January 6, 2012 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Case Management Conference by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Robbins, Jennifer). (jah).
December 21, 2011 Filing 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Case Management Conference held on 12/21/2011. No written order to follow. In light of the transfer order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the Court finds it appropriate to issue discovery and pretrial dates at a later date when all the cases identified in Schedule A of the transfer order are before the Court. (Plaintiff Attorney Joshua Swigart). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Robbins). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02295-JAH-BGS, 3:10-cv-02658-JAH -BGS(alg)
December 21, 2011 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER, MDL NO. 2295. Case assigned to Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Bernard G. Skomal; cc: MDL Panel (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC, TELEPHONE CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inna Badran
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Padulo
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Michael Lewis Greenwald
Represented By: James Lee Davidson
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chenelle McCall
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan LaMie
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Danbar
Represented By: Christopher Wallace Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Balowski
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie D. Shuford
Represented By: James Matthew Stephens
Represented By: Brandon S. Hays
Represented By: Rodney Eugene Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inna Spivak
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Whitler
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Jared M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Arroyo
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Banks
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Dowd
Represented By: Benjamin A. Parker
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon L Sovick
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J Morales
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Mercado
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kepler Laurore
Represented By: Yechezkel Rodal
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Luis F. Ugaz
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Anthony C. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisha Ornes
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Madden
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Russell
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Peck
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Hasanbasic
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Jon Paul Dubbeld
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Paul Robert Fowkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mather
Represented By: George N. Andrews
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Luis F. Ugaz
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Anthony C. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tereda Mays
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lowe
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Tearsa Storms Olson
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Firneno
Represented By: Julie A. Petrik
Represented By: Ian B. Lyngklip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walker Cassidy
Represented By: Penny Hays Cauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andramedia C. Robinson
Represented By: Yechezkel Rodal
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Steven Zakharyayev
Represented By: Luis F. Ugaz
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Anthony C. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrett R. Jenkins
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loralyn Drong
Represented By: Mark L Vavreck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila J. Wilson
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T
Represented By: Kyle Steinmetz
Represented By: Hans Germann
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Howard Jerome Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Banks
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Joseph Mauro
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie McLaughlin
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: William Peerce Howard
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Engels
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: George R. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Catlett
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A L Ivey
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raoul Delalue
Represented By: Yechezkel Rodal
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Kevin L Lewis
Represented By: Luis F. Ugaz
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Anthony C. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeline Rejkowski
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Kilmer
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Adam Theodore Hill
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Waxman
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Bret Leon Lusskin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Gonzalez
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Arthur Momient
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Ocanas
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fawn Turner
Represented By: William John Gadd
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Lisa R. Wilcox
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Renfrow
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: David Patrick Mitchell
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Marin
Represented By: Keith James Keogh
Represented By: James O. Latturner
Represented By: Francis Richard Greene
Represented By: Timothy J. Sostrin
Represented By: Douglas J Campion
Represented By: Craig M. Shapiro
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Ethan Mark Preston
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Ainat Natalie Margalit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Cutler
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Stephen James Bagge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Robert
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Brian J. Headley
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Neill
Represented By: Jennifer M Spiegel Colson
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenz Worthy
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Suggs
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman, First
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Penelope N. Bach
Represented By: James J. Haller
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Hill
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amie Hinton
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: David P. Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerilee Batista
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Jonathan G. Cohen
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Taylor Tieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Nichols, Jr.
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Amanda J. Allen
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Represented By: Jared M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Greengrass
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Robert W. Murphy
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Ann Bowen
Represented By: Michael Andrew Ziegler
Represented By: Chris R. Miltenberger
Represented By: Patric A. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |