March 6, 2017 |
Filing
174
ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amendment claims (Dkt # 169 ) is granted in part. The claims in the original Complaint, the First Amended Complaint, the Second Amended Complaint, and the Third Amended Complaint that were previously dismissed without prejudice and that are re-plead without amendment in the Fourth Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice in the Fourth Amended Complaint. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' FTCA claims (Dkt # 170 ) is granted with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/6/2017. (mdc)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
133
ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Second Motion To Compel Production Of Documents (Re Dkt # 114 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/23/2016. (mdc)
|
February 9, 2016 |
Filing
130
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel (Dkt # 113 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/9/2016. (mdc)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
127
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Purportedly Privileged Documents (Re Dkt # 100 ): Defendants must file a supplemental brief addressing by 2/5/2016. Plaintiffs' response must be filed by 2/12/2016. The parties must submit to the Court a proposed stipulated protective order no later than 2/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/29/2016. (mdc)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
126
ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel (Dkt # 99 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/25/2016. (mdc)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing
96
ORDER (Re Dkt # 89 ): Defendants' Motion to Clarify Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Fifth Amendment Claims and to dismiss all Fifth Amendment claims against all Defendants with prejudice is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/6/2015. (mdc)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/1/15. (kas)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing
60
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 51 ) is granted. Plaintiffs shall file the Second Amended Complaint, as set forth as an exhibit to the Motion (Doc. 51 -2), within ten (10) days from the date this Order is filed. Defendants shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date the Second Amended Complaint is re-filed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/19/2014. (mdc)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
46
ORDER: The Order on the Joint Motion to Dismiss is amended as follows. Plaintiff's Second, Fourth, and Sixth Claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice as to DHS. The Government Defendants' and Supervisor Defendants' Motion to Dism iss (Doc. 26 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' First Claim for violation of the law of nations is dismissed. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' prayer for attorneys' fees is denied. The Supervisor Defendants and Agen t Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 27 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Motion to Dismiss Defendants Aguilar, McAleenan, and Winkowski for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Plaintiff's Second, Third, Sixth and Seventh Claims for Due Process and Equal Protection violations are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Fourth Claim is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Napolitano, Bersin, Beeson, Barlow, and Scott. The motion is denied to the extent i t seeks dismissal of Defendant Fisher from Plaintiff's Fourth Claim. Plaintiffs' Fifth Claim is dismissed without prejudice as to Agent Nelson. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' prayer for attorneys' fees is denied. Plaintiffs 9; Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery (Doc. 31 ) is denied. No later than thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, accompanied by a proposed second amended complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/3/2014. (mdc)
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
35
ORDER: The Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 34 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Second Claim for Relief (Fifth Amendment Due Process), Fourth Claim for Relief (Fourth Amendment Unreasonable Seizure), and Sixth Claim for Relief (Fifth Amendment Equal Prot ection) are dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants the United States, United States Customs and Border Protection, and the Office of Border Patrol, and as to the following individuals sued in their official capacities: Janet Napolitano, Thomas Win kowski, Alan Bersin, Kevin McAleenan, Michael Fisher, Paul Beeson, Richard Barlow, and Rodney Scott. Plaintiffs' Eighth Claim for Relief seeking Declaratory Relief Regarding the Judgment Bar is dismissed with prejudice as to all Defendants. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/15/2014. (mdc)(jrd)
|