Heilman v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Thomas John Heilman
Defendant: J. Cook, J. Chau, R. Davis, R. Russell, Pham, K. Lacorum, D. Donoghue, J. Walker and S. Nizamani
Case Number: 3:2014cv01412
Filed: June 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER - The Court therefore GRANTS the voluntary dismissal of Plaintiffs claims, with prejudice, and ORDERS the clerk to close the cases which are in front of this Court: Heilman v. Silva, et al., Case No. 13-CV-2984 JLS (AGS); and Heilman v. J. Cook, et al., Case No. 3:14-CV-01412-JLS-(AGS). Because these cases are now dismissed, Plaintiffs Motion to Sever the Cook and Silva cases is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/25/2018.(jpp)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Denying Motions for Reconsideration re 192 201 . Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/31/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER on Motions for Summary Judgment. The Court grants 172 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is ordered that the Court grants in part and denies in Part Defendants' 151 Motion for Summary Judgment, and denies Plaintiff's 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/23/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER (1) Overruling Plaintiff's Objections; (2) adopting 123 Report and Recommendation; and (3) Denies Plaintiff's Motion to Rejoin Party. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/24/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER On Plaintiff's 142 Motion For Supplemental Discover Responses. Plaintiff's motion to compel defendant to provide supplemental responses to requests for production of documents (RFPs), interrogatories, and requests for admission ( RFAs) is granted in part and denied in part. Because Kilgore cannot convert plaintiff's generic request for a CV into a specific request for these new items, his motion to compel as to RFP 1 is denied. Heilman's motion to compel as to RF Ps 4 and 6 is granted. Since it is the defendant's burden to support her objections with competent evidence, and there is no declaration before the court of what the defense produced, the Court grants Heilman's motion to compel as to RFP 8. Heilman's motion to compel supplemental responses to interrogatories and RFAs is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections to Order. It is ordered that the Court overrules the plaintiff's objections to Judge Schopler's order 138 and denies plaitiff's request to sever his cases from the global settlement conference 144 . Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/12/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Denying 110 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Identity of Staff on Subpoenaed Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/15/16. (cap)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER re Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses from Defendants Donoghue and Davis; denying as moot 89 Motion to Compel; denying in part as moot 92 Motion to Compel; denying in part as moot 114 Motion to Compel; denying 121 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/14/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Medical Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/21/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (1) Denying Motion For Reconsideration; (2) Granting Motion For Extension Of Time To File First Amended Complaint: Plaintiff is granted sixty (60) days leave from the date this Order is entered in which to file a First Amended Complaint. The Cl erk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff a blank court approved civil rights complaint form. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/25/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; a blank 1983 First Amended Complaint form also was mailed to plaintiff.) (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heilman v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas John Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Lacorum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Nizamani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?