Larson v. Paramo et al
Plaintiff: Jon Warren Larson
Defendant: D. Paramo, Walker, J. Chau, M.D., Newton, M.D., Kristin Newton, M.D., S. Roberts, Gil, T. Paule, Winzel and Kristin Dean, MD
Case Number: 3:2015cv00308
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 112 Plaintiff's Request for One Final Extension of Time to File Fourth Amended Complaint. The Court grants Plaintiff one final extension of time and permits him 30 days leave from the date this Order is filed to file a Four th Amended Complaint.The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of his Second Amended Complaint, Third Amended Complaint, the September 13, 2017 Order and the March 5, 2018 Order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/16/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Copies of 2nd and 3rd Amended Complaint, 9/13/17 and 3/5/18 orders sent to Plaintiff) (dlg)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) & § 1915A. The court grants Plaintiff sixty (60) days leave in which to file an Amended Complaint that addresses the pleading deficiencies identif ied in this Order, as well as the Court's previous Orders. The court denies Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 109 ) as moot. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/5/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: (1) Denying 105 Motion for Appointment of Counsel without Prejudice; and (2) Granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time to File Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted sixty (60) days leave to file a TAC from the date this Order is fi led. Plaintiff's TAC must cure all the problems with his previous pleadings identified in the Court's 9/13/2017 Order. No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting 93 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days leave from the entry of this Order in which to file a third amended complaint that addresses the pleading deficie ncies identified in this Order, as well as the Court's previous orders. If Plaintiff fails to follow these instructions and/or files a third amended complaint that still fails to state a claim, his case will be dismissed without further leave t o amend. If Plaintiff does file an amended pleading, the Court will conduct a sua sponte screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) and § 1915A. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting Defendant's 45 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Court Grants Plaintiff leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/18/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Denying 74 Motion for Property without prejudice; Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's 80 Motion for Transcripts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/23/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service, as directed in this Order)(rlu)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court Denies Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/20/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/20/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/7/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) .
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Paramo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Warren Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chau, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Newton, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Paule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Dean, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?