D.C. v. County of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: D.C.
Defendant: County of San Diego, A.B. and Jessie Polinsky Children's Center and San Diego County Health and Human Services Agency
Case Number: 3:2015cv01868
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting 135 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. The Mandatory Settlement Conference is continued to 10/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/1/2021. (tcf)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting 123 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey G Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/26/2021. (tcf)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Granting 128 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/22/2021. (tcf)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting 126 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/17/2021. (tcf)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Denying 108 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/25/2021. (tcf)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 115 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Permission to File Sur-Reply. The County may file a three-page maximum sur-reply on or before December 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/10/2020. (tcf)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 110 Ex Parte Motion to Strike re 109 Response in Opposition to Motion. The Court GRANTS the County's motion and STRIKES exhibits A and B to the County's opposition to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint (Doc Nos. 109-1 and 109-2). The Court further ORDERS the redacted exhibits filed as of the date of this order and accordingly DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to file the redacted exhibits as separate entries on the docket of the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/1/2020. (tcf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2020: # 1 Stricken Document, # 2 Stricken Document) (tcf).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 7/21/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/28/2020. (tcf)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: (1) For Status Report; (2) Setting Status Conference Via Videoconference. The Status Report shall be filed on or before 10/26/2020. A Status Conference via videoconference is set for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/21/2020. (tcf)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 96 Joint Motion to Stay Action Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Certiorari. Weighing the competing interests, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion and STAYS this action pending a resolution of Plaintiff's Petition. The Court ORDERS that the parties submit a joint status report within 5 days of the Petition's resolution. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/2/2020. (tcf)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Following Status Conference. On 3/25/2020, the Court held a status conference. The Court sets a deadline of 4/8/2020 for the parties to file a motion to stay the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/25/2020. (tcf)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and to Alter or Amend the Order Denying Motion for Class Certification. The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion. Specifically, the Court denies Plaintiff's renewed request to certify the putative class and grants Plaintiff's request to amend the Order as delineated herein. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/2/2018. (rmc)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Denying Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Strike; and Denying 60 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/7/2017. (ag)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying 47 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/14/2017. (ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.C. v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C.
Represented By: Rachele R Rickert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: David L Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.B. and Jessie Polinsky Children's Center
Represented By: David L Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Health and Human Services Agency
Represented By: David L Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?