Farley v. Soto
Petitioner: Craig Farley
Respondent: John Soto
Case Number: 3:2016cv00188
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/1/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. The Court adopts 50 Report and Recommendation. The Court overrules Farley's objections and concludes that Farley is entitled to no habeas relief. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/26/2018. (jdt)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2017, Replies due by 4/7/2017. The parties are advised that failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to raise those objections on appeal of the Courts order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/3/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 41 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/31/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying without prejudice petitioner's 32 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/29/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and Requesting Additional Information from the Parties. Petitioner shall file a document entitled "Additional Evidence of Mental Illness" with accompanying declarations, exhib its, and argument. Petitioner's filing is due no later than August 22, 2016. Respondent shall file a response no later than September 12, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/15/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farley v. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Soto
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?