Pennings v. Barrera et al
Plaintiff: |
Otoniel Tyler Pennings |
Defendant: |
Barrera, Sanchez, Stapleton, John Does 2-5, Benjamin, ., John Doe 1, John Doe 6 and Jane Doe 1 |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00582 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Kings |
Presiding Judge: |
Mitchell D. Dembin |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis L. Sammartino |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 13, 2018 |
Filing
54
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 43 Motion for Access to Law Library. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/13/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
May 29, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER Re: Defendants' 39 Motion to Continue Pretrial Motion Deadline; Plaintiff's 43 , 47 Motions for Extension and Appointment of Counsel; and Resetting the Scheduling Order. It is ordered, Defendants' Motion to Compel is hereby granted in part. Plaintiff must sit for a deposition by 6/25/2018. The Motion to Continue the Pretrial Motion is granted, with any pretrial motion now due on or before 7/31/2018. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery is granted in part until 6/29/2018, and Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER (1) Overruling and Sustaining Objections; (2) Adopting in Part 27 Report and Recommendation; and (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 12 Motion to Dismiss. It is ordered that the Court dismisses without prejudice Plaintiff's Co mplaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, if any, on or before thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on that date, the Court shall proceed with those claims of Plaintiffs complaint that remain unaffected by this Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing
27
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Complaint filed by Stapleton, Benjamin. The Court recommends defendants Motion to Diss be granted in part and deni ed in part. Any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties by 5/12/2017. Any reply to the objections shall be served and filed by 5/19/2017.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/19/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?