James v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Robert James
Defendant: Barbara Lee, Christine Harvel, Jeff Duckworth, Mark Kania, Daniel Pena, Flynn, Madsen, Blake, John Doe, William D. Gore, San Diego County, San Diego Sheriffs Department, Brewer, Barnabe Herrera, Linthincum, Nahan, Snyder, San Diego Sheriffs Admin Police and San Diego Central Jail
Case Number: 3:2016cv01592
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER: (1) Adopting the Report and Recommendation (Doc. NO. 159 ): and (2) Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 144 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/11/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER on Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Motions (ECF Nos. 140 ; 142 ; 155 ). Plaintiff's motion for copies (ECF No. 140 at 12), motion for additional interrogatories (ECF No. 142 ), and motion to exclude evidence (ECF No. 155 ) are denied, and Plaintiff's motion to compel (ECF No. 140 at 38) isgranted in part and denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/31/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Denying 121 Plaintiff's Motion for Written Depositions ; Denying 125 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/17/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2018; Replies due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/21/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying 84 Request for Judicial Notice and Request to File Interrogatories filed by Kyle Robert James. Plaintiff is hereby Ordered not to file any further discovery requests on the docket without a court order, unless the discovery requests are in support of or in opposition to a motion seeking relief other than a request to file discovery documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/11/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying 80 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Kyle Robert James. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/4/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Dismissing Claims and Defendants for Failing to State a Claim; Directing U.S. Marshal Service to Effect Service of Fourth Amended Complaint on Remanding Defedants. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/12/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (acc)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying as Premature 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Obtain Legal Property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 09/18/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Dismissing Second Amended Complaint as Frivolous and for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and § 1915A(b). The Court grants Plaintiff forty-five (45) days leave in which to file an Amended Complaint which cur es all the deficiencies of pleading described in this Order.. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/7/2017.(Mailed to Plaintiff a blank copy of the Court's Complaint under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 for his use in amending.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Dismissing First Amended Complaint as Frivolous and for Failing to State a Claim. 1. DISMISSES Plaintiff's FAC as frivolous and for failing to state a claim upon which § 1983 relief can granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915( e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b). 2. GRANTS Plaintiff forty-five (45) days leave in which to file an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading described in this Order. 3. DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to mail to Plaintiff, together with this O rder, a blank copy of the Courts form Complaint under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 for his use in amending. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/7/2017. A blank Complaint form sent with a copy of this order to the Plaintiff.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order elec tronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of this Order on the Watch Commander, Vista Detention Facility, 325 S. Melrose Drive, Vista, California 92081. DISMISSES Plaintiffs Complaint for failing to state a claim upon which § 1983 relief can granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1915A(b)(1). GRANTS Plaintiff forty-five (45) days leave in which to file an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleadi ng described in this Order. DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to mail to Plaintiff, together with this Order, a blank copy of the Courts form Complaint under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 for his use in amending. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/23/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Robert James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Harvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnabe Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linthincum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Sheriffs Admin Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Central Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?