Dickey v. Mendoza et al
Plaintiff: |
Gary Dickey |
Defendant: |
Gilbert Mendoza and Warden of State Prison |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00206 |
Filed: |
February 1, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
William Q. Hayes |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew G. Schopler |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 13, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/13/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
January 5, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER adopting 37 the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. The motion to dismiss the Warden 11 is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
October 31, 2017 |
Filing
37
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Granting Defendant's Dismissal Motion (ECF No. 11 ). The Court recommends that the Warden's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 11 ) be Granted, but that Dickey be given 14 days to file an amended complaint to address the identified deficiencies. The parties must file any objections to this report within 14 days of being served with it. A party may respond to any objection within 14 days of receiving it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/31/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
|
February 9, 2017 |
Filing
3
ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Dkt # 2 ) And (2) Directing U.S. Marshal To Effect Service Of Summons And Complaint: The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust accou nt the $350 filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/9/2017. (IFP package prepared. Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR. Per Order, a copy also was mailed to Secretary of CDCR as directed.) (mdc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?