McMorrow et al v. Mondelez International, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Patrick McMorrow and Marco Ohlin |
Defendant: |
Mondelez International, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv02327 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Roger T. Benitez |
Presiding Judge: |
Jill L. Burkhardt |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 8, 2022 |
Filing
212
Order (1) Granting Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement (ECF No. 206 ); (2) Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards (ECF No. 200 ); and (3) Overruling Objection to Motion for Attorneys; Fees, Costs, and Service Awards (ECF No. 201 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/8/22. (jmo)
|
November 19, 2021 |
Filing
197
Order: (1) Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement; and (2) Setting Final Approval Hearing for February 28, 2022, at 3:00 PM (ECF No. 196 ). Final Approval Hearing set for 2/28/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/17/21. (jmo)
|
April 5, 2021 |
Filing
181
ORDER Denying Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Stay Pending Disposition of Rule 23(f) Petition (ECF No. 178 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/5/21. (jmo)
|
March 8, 2021 |
Filing
172
ORDER: (1) Denying Defendant's Daubert Motion (Weir) (ECF No. 147 ); (2) Denying Defendant's Daubert Motion (Dennis) (ECF No. 148 ); (3) Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion (McFadden & Wilcox) (ECF No. 151 ); (4) Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion (Simonson) (ECF No. 152 ); and (5) Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion For Class Certification (ECF No. 137 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/8/21. (jmo)
|
February 10, 2021 |
Filing
168
ORDER : (10 Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal 138 ; (2) Granting Defendant's Motion to Seal 144 ; and (3) Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Seal 158 . Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/10/2021. (anh)
|
March 13, 2020 |
Filing
128
ORDER: (1) Denying Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Michael Greger,(2) Denying Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Robert H. Lustig (ECF No. 88 , 89 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/13/20. (jmo)
|
March 9, 2020 |
Filing
126
ORDER: (1) Denying Motion for Class Certification; (2) Granting Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of J. Michael Dennis; and (3) Granting Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Colin Weir (ECF Nos. 70 , 87 , 90 ). The parties are to contact Judge Burkhardts chambers within three calendar days of this Order to discuss the schedule of this case going forward. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/9/20. (jmo)
|
January 24, 2020 |
Filing
115
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal; Granting Defendant's Motion to Seal; and Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF Nos. 71 , 84 , 103 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/24/20. (dlg)
|
October 17, 2018 |
Filing
30
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 25 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to the operative complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/17/2018. (jah)
|
August 17, 2018 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Court grants without leave to amend the motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims relying on the advertising statements referenced in th is Order. Court grants with leave to amend the motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims for breach of express and implied warranties. Court denies the motion to dismiss as to the remaining advertising statements. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint that only provides additional factual allegations relating to the breach of express and implied warranty claims by 8/31/2018. If Plaintiffs do not file a Second Amended Complaint, Defendant must answer to the First Amended Complaint by 9/14/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/17/2018. (jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?