Corella v. AAA Demolition, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rafael Ruiz Corella
Defendant: Gary J. Goodemote, Raymundo Rodriguez, John J. Gotejen, American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc. and AAA Demolition, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00051
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
0 Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
1 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER Granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal and dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/2018. (mpl) (jao).
April 20, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez re #4 Non Opposition to Motion, (Rubino, Michael) (mpl).
April 19, 2018 4 NON Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice with leave to refile in appropriate forum filed by AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez. (Rubino, Michael) QC Mail re Missing Cert of Service. (mpl).
February 22, 2018 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice with leave to refile in appropriate forum by Rafael Ruiz Corella. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Return of Service - AAA Demolition, Inc., and John Goetjen, #3 Exhibit Waivers of Service, #4 Declaration Plaintiff Rafael Ruiz Corrella, #5 Declaration Marc S. Bragg, #6 Proof of Service)(Bragg, Marc)(mpl).
January 9, 2018 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao).
January 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10788801), filed by Rafael Ruiz Corella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)The new case number is 3:18-cv-00051-JLS-JLB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Bragg, Marc)(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corella v. AAA Demolition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ruiz Corella
Represented By: Matthew W Johnson
Represented By: Marc S. Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary J. Goodemote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymundo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Gotejen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Demolition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?