Lily et al v. Cooper
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Jane Roe, Lily, John Doe, Sarah and Jenny
Defendant: Tay Christopher Cooper
Case Number: 3:2019cv00745
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12682786.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hepburn, Carol) (mdc)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Proceed with Pseudonyms. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/7/2019. (aef)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed under Pseudonyms by Jane Doe, John Doe, Jenny, Lily, Jane Roe, Sarah. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Carol L. Hepburn, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Carol L. Hepburn, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Carol L. Hepburn, #5 Declaration of Deborah A. Bianco, #6 Declaration of James R. Marsh)(Kawai, John) (aef).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. Judge William Q. Hayes no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cr-02208-DMS. The new case number is 19cv745-DMS-AGS. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/24/2019.(ag)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao).
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tay Christopher Cooper ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12434412.), filed by Lily, Jenny, Sarah, John Doe, Jane Roe, Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-745-WQH-AGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Kawai, John)(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lily et al v. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: John A. Kawai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe
Represented By: John A. Kawai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily
Represented By: John A. Kawai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: John A. Kawai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah
Represented By: John A. Kawai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny
Represented By: John A. Kawai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tay Christopher Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?