L.S. v. Oliver et al

Plaintiff: L.S.
Defendant: William Ashley Oliver, III and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2019cv00746
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Proposed Order by L.S.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Clemens, Samuel) (mme).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Continue Deadline to Submit Proposed Protective Order. The deadline to submit a proposed Protective Order currently set for 6/28/2019 is reset to 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 7/1/2019. (jrm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order Re Protective Order by William Ashley Oliver, III. (Thorne, Geoffrey) (jrm).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 6/4/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/10/2019.(jpp)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/7/2019. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 6/7/2019. Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Mark Gilleon, Samuel A. Clemens, Robert Gans). (Defendant Attorney Geoffrey M. Thorne, Jason Conforti). (L.S., William Ashley Oliver, III).(no document attached) (fk1)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by L.S. re #3 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference (Clemens, Samuel)Attorney Samuel A. Clemens added to party L.S.(pty:pla) (jpp).
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/7/2019 at 9:30am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez.on 4/23/2019.(jpp)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by William Ashley Oliver, III. (jrm)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02019-00006908-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12434874.), filed by William Ashley Oliver, III (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Thorne, #3 Exhibit A in Support of Declaration of Geoffrey M. Thorne - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit B in Support of Declaration of Geoffrey M. Thorne - State Court Answer, #5 Exhibit C in Support of Declaration of Geoffrey M. Thorne - State Court Statement of Damages, #6 Declaration of William A. Oliver III in Support of Notice of Removal, #7 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-746-JLS-LL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(jrm) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.S. v. Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ashley Oliver, III
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.S.
Represented By: Daniel Mark Gilleon
Represented By: Samuel A. Clemens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?