D.T. v. San Diego Metropolitan Transit System et al
Plaintiff: D.T.
Defendant: Officer J. Torres, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, San Diego Metropolitan Transit System and City of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2019cv00901
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983bv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of No Filing of Any Opposition to Defendant City of San Diego's Motion to Dismiss by City of San Diego re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Abad, Dave) (jrm).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Dismiss : Any opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before June 26, 2019. Any reply is due on or before July 3, 2019. A hearing for the motion is set for October 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/11/19.(dlg)
June 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Officer J. Torres, San Diego Metropolitan Transit System. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bingham, Roger)Attorney Roger P Bingham added to party Officer J. Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Roger P Bingham added to party San Diego Metropolitan Transit System(pty:dft) (dlg).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Abad, Dave)Attorney Dave Esteves Abad added to party City of San Diego(pty:dft) (dlg).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of San Diego, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, Officer J. Torres, San Diego Metropolitan Transit System ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12485070.), filed by D.T..The new case number is 3:19-cv-00901-GPC-KSC. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Carr, Peter)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.T. v. San Diego Metropolitan Transit System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J. Torres
Represented By: Roger P Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Metropolitan Transit System
Represented By: Roger P Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Represented By: Dave Esteves Abad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.T.
Represented By: Peter L. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?