Rodriguez v. Newsom et al

Plaintiff: Pedro Rodriguez
Defendant: City & County of San Diego, Gavin Newsom, Bonne Dumans and Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 3:2019cv00907
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #5 Clerk's Judgment. Mail sent to Pedro Rodriguez, 14745493 - Moved Left No Address. (jrm)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the civil action is dismissed for failure to pay filing fee required by 28 USC 1914(a).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jao).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Denying #3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as barred by 28 USC 1915(g), and (2) Dismissing civil action for failure to pay filing fee required by 28 USC 1914(a). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/19/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jao).
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Dana M. Sabraw is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0907-JLS-BLM.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (cdw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pedro Rodriguez. (jms)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City & County of San Diego, Bonne Dumans, Gavin Newsom, filed by Pedro Rodriguez.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-907-DMS-BLM. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonne Dumans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?