Padilla v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Diane Padilla
Defendant: Target Corporation and Does 1 Through 10
Case Number: 3:2019cv01161
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice [Doc. No. #10 ]. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/13/2019. (anh)(sjt).
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter) (anh).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion for Dismissal. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 9/17/2109. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 9/17/2109, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 9/24/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 8/6/2019.(jrm) (jao).
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez:An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 8/6/2019. The case settled. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Peter Schulz).(Defendant Attorney Anthony Kalikas). (no document attached) (asm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter) (jrm).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Federal Court of Filing in State Court by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter)(anh).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/6/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/25/2019.(anh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Target Corporation. (cdw) (jao).
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Target Corporation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (cdw) (jao).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (cdw) (jao).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of CA, County of SD, case number 37-02019-00025900-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12640576), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01161-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Padilla
Represented By: Anthony Elias Kalikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Peter J. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?