Ryans v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jerlilia Ryans
Defendant: Target Corporation and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv01273
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 9/6/2019. The case settled. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Jerlilia Ryans). (Defendant Attorney Jordan Nager). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (dxm)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Joint Motion (ECF No. #10 ). Theodore R. Cercos is excused from attending the ENE and CMC set for 9/6/2019, provided that Jordan Nager attends the ENE on Targets behalf, along with the claims representative for Target. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 9/5/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Theodore R. Cercos at ENE, by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Yoon, Monica) (jrm).
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Yoon, Monica) (jrm).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting in Part #7 Joint Motion to Continue. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference reset for 9/6/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 8/1/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Continue (1) Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference and (2) Excuse Attendance by Corporate Representative by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of MJY, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Yoon, Monica) (acc).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cercos, Theodore) (acc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Jeanne Yoon on behalf of Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Yoon, Monica)Attorney Monica Jeanne Yoon added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft) (acc).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (als) (jao).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. No Parties With Financial Interest. (als) (jao).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California in and for the County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00028811-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12708520.), filed by DOES 1-50, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Theodore R. Cercos in Support of Target Corporation, #3 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Moore in Support of Target Corporation's, #4 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01273-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(als) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryans v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerlilia Ryans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Theodore R Cercos
Represented By: Monica Jeanne Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?