Juhan v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ernestine B. Juhan
Defendant: American Mortgage Network LLC., Bank Of America, Does 1 through 5 inclusive, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, Calm Creek Inc. and American Mortgage Network Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01501
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ernestine B. Juhan. (Freshman, Ronald) (aef).
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY - Other re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Ernestine B. Juhan. (Freshman, Ronald) (aef).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (ECF #5 ) Plaintiff's motion to remand is currently scheduled for hearing on October 4, 2019. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the October 4, 2019 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/27/2019.(aef)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bank Of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.. (Lippa, Alison) (jrm).
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by American Mortgage Network Inc., American Mortgage Network LLC.. (Rackers, Mark) (aef).
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Smith, Daniel) (aef).
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE [Consent to Removal of Action] by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Rackers, Mark) (aef).
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank Of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Lippa, Alison)Attorney Alison V. Lippa added to party Bank Of America(pty:dft), Attorney Alison V. Lippa added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Smith on behalf of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Smith, Daniel)Attorney Daniel S. Smith added to party Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S. Smith added to party The Bank of New York Mellon(pty:dft) (aef).
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Plaintiff's Complaint] by American Mortgage Network Inc., American Mortgage Network LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Rackers, Mark) (aef).
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ernestine B. Juhan. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Freshman, Ronald) (aef).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Following Telephonic Conference. On or before August 23, 2019, Plaintiff shall notify Defendants whether she will file a motion to remand. If Plaintiff decides to go forward with the motion, she shall contact chambers for a hearing date on or before September 3, 2019. If Plaintiff elects not to file the motion, Defendants shall be prepared to file their 12(b) motion and contact chambers for a hearing date on or before September 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/19/2019.(aef)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/19/2019. (Plaintiff Attorney Ronald Freshman). (Defendant Attorney Mark Rackers, Ian Rambarran, Alison Lipa). (no document attached) (jak)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by American Mortgage Network Inc., American Mortgage Network LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Wachovia Mortgage Corporation for American Mortgage Network Inc., American Mortgage Network LLC. (jxv)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court- County of San Diego, case number 37-02019-00033847-CU-OR-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12818668.), filed by American Mortgage Network Inc., American Mortgage Network LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Documents, #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01501-DMS-LL. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juhan v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Network LLC.
Represented By: Mark G. Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Represented By: Alison V. Lippa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Represented By: Alison V. Lippa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Daniel S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calm Creek Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Network Inc.
Represented By: Mark G. Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine B. Juhan
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?