The Geo Group, Inc. v. Newsom et al Featured Case

Plaintiff The Geo Group, Inc. challenged the constitutionality of AB-32 because it allegedly prohibited the operation of federal private detention facilities in the state, but exempted those under contract with the state.

Plaintiff: The Geo Group, Inc.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Gavin C. Newsom
Case Number: 3:2019cv02491
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201ij
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion re: hearing and briefing dates for Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/17/2020. (jpp)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Hearing and Briefing Dates for Motion Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by Xavier Becerra, Gavin C. Newsom. (Boutin, Gabrielle)Attorney Gabrielle D. Boutin added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle D. Boutin added to party Gavin C. Newsom(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Geo Group, Inc.. Xavier Becerra, Gavin C. Newsom served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McClellan, Michael) (jpp).
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by The Geo Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of C. Kendie Schlecht, #3 Declaration of Amber Martin, #4 Appendix, #5 Exhibit A-E to Appendix (pp 5-100), #6 Exhibit F-L to Appendix (pp 101-155), #7 Exhibit M-U to Appendix (pp 156-214))(McClellan, Michael) (jpp).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMIT, AND (2) SETTING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit and for Approval of the Proposed Hearing Date by The Geo Group, Inc. Defendants SHALL FILE an opposition on or before March 5, 2020, and Plaintiff MAY FILE a reply on or before March 26, 2020. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/7/2020. (sjm)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit and for Approval of the Proposed Hearing Date by The Geo Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Kendie Schlecht, #2 Exhibit A to Schlecht Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Schlecht Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Schlecht Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Schlecht Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Schlecht Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Schlecht Declaration)(McClellan, Michael) (sjm).
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht on behalf of The Geo Group, Inc. (Schlecht, Chanmaly)Attorney Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht added to party The Geo Group, Inc.(pty:pla) (sjm).
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 PRO HAC APPROVED: Steven John Lindsay appearing for Plaintiff The Geo Group, Inc. (no document attached) (jrd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jose Joel Alicea appearing for Plaintiff The Geo Group, Inc. (no document attached) (jrd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 PRO HAC APPROVED: Michael W. Kirk appearing for Plaintiff The Geo Group, Inc. (no document attached) (jrd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC APPROVED: Charles Justin Cooper appearing for Plaintiff The Geo Group, Inc. (no document attached) (jrd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13317703.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Lindsay, Steven)(jrd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13317694.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Alicea, Jose)(jrd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13317686.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Kirk, Michael)(jrd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13317682.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Cooper, Charles)(jrd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by The Geo Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint. Identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for The Geo Group, Inc. (sxa)(jrd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Gavin C. Newsom, Xavier Becerra. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13315990.), filed by The Geo Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02491-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (McClellan, Michael)(sxa)(jrd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Gavin C. Newsom, Xavier Becerra. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13315990.), filed by The Geo Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02491-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (McClellan, Michael)(sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Geo Group, Inc. v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Gabrielle D. Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin C. Newsom
Represented By: Gabrielle D. Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Geo Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. McClellan
Represented By: Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven John Lindsay
Represented By: Michael W. Battin
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?