Abiding Place Ministries v. Wooten et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Abiding Place Ministries sued Defendants Wilma J. Wooten, Public Health Officer for San Diego County, and the County of San Diego alleging that the "Order of the Health Officer and Emergency Regulations" was unconstitutional because the prohibition on religious gatherings was not narrowly tailored to achieve the government's interest of slowing transmission of COVID-19.

Plaintiff: Abiding Place Ministries
Defendant: County of San Diego, Wilma J. Wooten and Does 1 Through 100
Case Number: 3:2020cv00683
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 4/10/2020 before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dana Peabody. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/4/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2020. (akr)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Order Requesting Status Update. Joint notice due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/13/20.(jmo)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cynthia Bashant: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2020 telephonically. Court denies 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Abiding Place Ministries. (Court Reporter/ECR Dana Peabody). (Plaintiff Attorney Jeremiah Graham). (Defendant Attorney Thomas Montgomery). (no document attached) (sxm)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO. For the reasons stated in the telephonic hearing, TRO is denied. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/10/2020. (no document attached) (sxm)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by County of San Diego, Wilma J. Wooten. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy White, # 2 Declaration of Wilma Wooten, M.D., M.P.H, # 3 Declaration of Sergeant William Uelen, # 4 Proof of Service)(White, Timothy) (jmo).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing (ECF No. 2 ). The court sets a telephonic oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for 4/10/2020 at 01:35 PM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/9/20.(jmo) Modified on 4/9/2020 (jmo) (dlg).
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Abiding Place Ministries. Identifying Other Affiliate Mark Spitsbergen for Abiding Place Ministries. (jmr)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Abiding Place Ministries. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum Support Motion for TRO)(jmr)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against County of San Diego, Does 1 Through 100, Wilma J. Wooten ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13725657.), filed by Abiding Place Ministries. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Verification of Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 1 - the Order, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Essential Businesses, # 5 Exhibit 3 - First Written Proposal, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Second Written Proposal, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Third Written Proposal, # 8 Exhibit 6 - First Letter from Public Health Officer, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Letter to Public Health Officer, # 10 Exhibit 8 - Second Letter from Public Health Officer, # 11 Declaration Of Actual and Attempted Notice re: Motion for TRO)The new case number is 3:20-cv-683-BAS-AHG. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Graham, Jeremiah)(jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abiding Place Ministries v. Wooten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abiding Place Ministries
Represented By: Jeremiah Daniel Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilma J. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?