Bols v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: JD Bols
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Sonia Y. Angell, Kevin Faulconer, Wilma J. Wooten, Jim Desmond, Nathan Fletcher, Greg Cox, William Gore, Gavin Newsom, Dianne Jacob and Kristen Gaspar
Case Number: 3:2020cv00873
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2403
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Greg Cox, Jim Desmond, Nathan Fletcher, Kristen Gaspar, William Gore, Dianne Jacob, Wilma J. Wooten. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of John P. Cooley, #3 Proof of Service)(Cooley, John)Attorney John P. Cooley added to party Greg Cox(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Cooley added to party Jim Desmond(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Cooley added to party Nathan Fletcher(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Cooley added to party Kristen Gaspar(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Cooley added to party William Gore(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Cooley added to party Dianne Jacob(pty:dft), Attorney John P. Cooley added to party Wilma J. Wooten(pty:dft) (mme).
July 1, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss by Kevin Faulconer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Proof of Service)(Schaefer, George) (mme).
July 1, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(O'Brien, Anthony) (mme).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying #10 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Telephonic Status Hearing set for 7/13/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/30/2020. (mme)
June 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Kevin Faulconer to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Defendant shall have until July 1, 2020, to file his Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. No further continuances will be granted without just cause. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/19/2020. (mme)
June 18, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kevin Faulconer. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schaefer, George) (mme).
June 12, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for order show cause why preliminary injuctions should not issue filed by Kevin Faulconer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George F. Schaefer, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Proof of Service)(Schaefer, George) (mme).
June 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE Second Notice of Supplemental Authority by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom (O'Brien, Anthony) (mme).
June 5, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kevin Faulconer re #15 Joint MOTION for a Separate Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs Application for a Temporary Restraining Order Against Co-Defendant Mayor Kevin Faulconer filed by Kevin Faulconer . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schaefer, George) (mme).
June 4, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Faulconer re #23 Amended MOTION for Separate Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order Against Co-Defendant Mayor Kevin Faulconer (Schaefer, George) (mme).
June 4, 2020 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for Separate Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order Against Co-Defendant Mayor Kevin Faulconer by Kevin Faulconer. (Schaefer, George) Modified on 6/5/2020 to instruct filer to file a Notice of Withdrawal for original motion (mme).
June 4, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 Joint MOTION for a Separate Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs Application for a Temporary Restraining Order Against Co-Defendant Mayor Kevin Faulconer , #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint, #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for order show cause why preliminary injuctions should not issue filed by JD Bols. (Baric, Steven) (mme).
June 3, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for order show cause why preliminary injuctions should not issue. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 6/8/2020 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
June 3, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (O'Brien, Anthony) (mme).
June 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom (O'Brien, Anthony) (mme).
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE Application by Defendants Newsom, Becerra, and Angell For Leave to File Oversized Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Anthony) *QC Mailer sent re proposed orders should not be attached. Event type changed to motion* (mme).
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for order show cause why preliminary injuctions should not issue filed by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to O'Brien Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to O'Brien Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to O'Brien Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to O'Brien Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to O'Brien Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to O'Brien Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to O'Brien Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to O'Brien Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to O'Brien Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to O'Brien Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to O'Brien Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to O'Brien Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to O'Brien Declaration, #15 Declaration, #16 Exhibit A to Watt Declaration, #17 Exhibit B to Watt Declaration, #18 Request for Judicial Notice)(O'Brien, Anthony) (mme).
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for order show cause why preliminary injuctions should not issue filed by Greg Cox, Jim Desmond, Nathan Fletcher, Kristen Gaspar, William Gore, Dianne Jacob, Wilma J. Wooten. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John P. Cooley, #2 Proof of Service)(Cooley, John) (mme).
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 **WITHDRAWN PER ECF #25**Joint MOTION for a Separate Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs Application for a Temporary Restraining Order Against Co-Defendant Mayor Kevin Faulconer by Kevin Faulconer. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schaefer, George) (mme). Modified on 6/5/2020 to reflect document withdrawn (mme).
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by George F Schaefer on behalf of Kevin Faulconer (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schaefer, George)Attorney George F Schaefer added to party Kevin Faulconer(pty:dft) (mme).
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom (O'Brien, Anthony)Attorney Anthony P O'Brien added to party Sonia Y. Angell(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony P O'Brien added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony P O'Brien added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft) (mme).
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of John P. Cooley by Thomas Dale Bunton on behalf of Greg Cox, Jim Desmond, Nathan Fletcher, Kristen Gaspar, William Gore, Dianne Jacob, Wilma J. Wooten (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bunton, Thomas) (mme).
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom of case(s) 3:20-cv-00683-BAS-AHG; 3:20-cv-00865-AJB-MDD . (O'Brien, Anthony) (mme).
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for order show cause why preliminary injuctions should not issue by JD Bols. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Declaration Declaration of JD Bols, #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service, #4 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Baric, Steven) (mme).
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JD Bols. Sonia Y. Angell served. (Baric, Steven) (mme).
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JD Bols. Xavier Becerra served. (Baric, Steven) (mme).
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JD Bols. Gavin Newsom served. (Baric, Steven) (mme).
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JD Bols. Kevin Faulconer served. (Baric, Steven) (mme).
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #3 Notice of Related Case, #4 Notice (Other),, filed by JD Bols. (Baric, Steven) (mme).
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Supplement to Notice of Related Cases by Greg Cox, Jim Desmond, Nathan Fletcher, Kristen Gaspar, William Gore, Dianne Jacob, Wilma J. Wooten re #3 Notice of Related Case, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service)(Bunton, Thomas)Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party Greg Cox(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party Jim Desmond(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party Nathan Fletcher(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party Kristen Gaspar(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party William Gore(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party Dianne Jacob(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Dale Bunton added to party Wilma J. Wooten(pty:dft) (mme).
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Greg Cox, Jim Desmond, Nathan Fletcher, Kristen Gaspar, William Gore, Dianne Jacob, Wilma J. Wooten of case(s) 20-cv-00683 re #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bunton, Thomas) (mme).
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Gavin Newsom, Xavier Becerra, Sonia Y. Angell, Kevin Faulconer, Wilma J. Wooten, Nathan Fletcher, Kristen Gaspar, Jim Desmond, Greg Cox, Dianne Jacob, William Gore, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13849979.), filed by JD Bols. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)The new case number is 3:20-cv-873-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Baric, Steven)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bols v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Anthony P O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Y. Angell
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Anthony P O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Faulconer
Represented By: George F Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilma J. Wooten
Represented By: Thomas Dale Bunton
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Desmond
Represented By: Thomas Dale Bunton
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Fletcher
Represented By: Thomas Dale Bunton
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Represented By: Thomas Dale Bunton
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gore
Represented By: Thomas Dale Bunton
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Anthony P O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Jacob
Represented By: Thomas Dale Bunton
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Gaspar
Represented By: Thomas Dale Bunton
Represented By: John P. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD Bols
Represented By: Steven Douglas Baric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?