Berland, et al. v. The Conclave, LLC, et al.
Petitioner: Laurita Berland, Brian G. Berland, Randy Staten, Vincent Berland, Ronnie Stanley, Roger Winter, Aaron Bollig, Mark Shields, Carol Thomeczek, Progenex Investment Group, LLC, Annetta Vahsholtz, Mark Zortman, Patrick Carey, Richard Weiser, Anita Zortman, Kevin Fralick, Nancy L. Thomas, Larry Woodward, Tom Gawlick, Roxane M. Blake, Troy E. Burns, Justin Jones, Gail Stanley, Scott Schneider, Jeffrey Menzie, Michael Carey, Michael Speer, William D. Turley, Ross Edwards, Kimberly Unruh, Gavin Unruh, Steve Burns, Mr Cameron N Verdi, Pamela Menzie, Michael Carpenter, Gina Staten, D. Paul Rittman, William Kalahurka, Merrill Conant, Sonya Carpenter, Curtis L. Thomas, Sheri Turley, The Shields Group, LLC, Dennis Stanley, David Schmidt, Timothy C. Winter, Jimmy Woodward and Dennis Vahsholtz
Respondent: The Conclave, LLC, Progenex Holdings, LLC, Page10 Ventures, LLC, Riverpine, LLC, VenturePharma, LLC, Dagobah, LLC, Steve Shamion and Ryan Page
In Re: JAMS Arbitration Reference No. 1200051334
Case Number: 3:2020cv00922
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 PRO HAC APPROVED: Robert P. Harrington appearing for Respondents Dagobah, LLC, Ryan Page, Page10 Ventures, LLC (no document attached) (rmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 PRO HAC APPROVED: Ryan B. Bell appearing for Respondents Dagobah, LLC, Ryan Page, Page10 Ventures, LLC (no document attached) (rmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number BCASDC-14174695.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Harrington, Robert) (rmc).
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number CCASDC-14174537.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bell, Ryan) (rmc).
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION Petition for Confirmation of Interim Award as Final Award by Dagobah, LLC, Ryan Page, Page10 Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit Exhs 1 & 2)(Quist, Michelle)Attorney Michelle Quist added to party Dagobah, LLC(pty:res), Attorney Michelle Quist added to party Ryan Page(pty:res), Attorney Michelle Quist added to party Page10 Ventures, LLC(pty:res) (sxa).
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION Supplemental Declaration with Ex E by Petitioners Brian G. Berland, Laurita Berland, Vincent Berland, Roxane M. Blake, Aaron Bollig, Steve Burns, Troy E. Burns, Michael Carey, Patrick Carey, Michael Carpenter, Sonya Carpenter, Merrill Conant, Ross Edwards, Kevin Fralick, Tom Gawlick, Justin Jones, William Kalahurka, Jeffrey Menzie, Pamela Menzie, Progenex Investment Group, LLC, D. Paul Rittman, David Schmidt, Scott Schneider, Mark Shields, Michael Speer, Dennis Stanley, Gail Stanley, Ronnie Stanley, Gina Staten, Randy Staten, The Shields Group, LLC, Curtis L. Thomas, Nancy L. Thomas, Carol Thomeczek, Sheri Turley, William D. Turley, Gavin Unruh, Kimberly Unruh, Annetta Vahsholtz, Dennis Vahsholtz, Cameron N Verdi, Richard Weiser, Roger Winter, Timothy C. Winter, Jimmy Woodward, Larry Woodward, Anita Zortman, Mark Zortman. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Frost, Thomas) (sxa).
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY - Other re 1 Complaint,, Reply in Support of Petition filed by Brian G. Berland, Laurita Berland, Vincent Berland, Roxane M. Blake, Aaron Bollig, Steve Burns, Troy E. Burns, Michael Carey, Patrick Carey, Michael Carpenter, Sonya Carpenter, Merrill Conant, Ross Edwards, Kevin Fralick, Tom Gawlick, Justin Jones, William Kalahurka, Jeffrey Menzie, Pamela Menzie, Progenex Investment Group, LLC, D. Paul Rittman, David Schmidt, Scott Schneider, Steve Shamion, Mark Shields, Michael Speer, Dennis Stanley, Gail Stanley, Ronnie Stanley, Gina Staten, Randy Staten, The Shields Group, LLC, Curtis L. Thomas, Nancy L. Thomas, Carol Thomeczek, Sheri Turley, William D. Turley, Gavin Unruh, Kimberly Unruh, Annetta Vahsholtz, Dennis Vahsholtz, Cameron N Verdi, Richard Weiser, Roger Winter, Timothy C. Winter, Jimmy Woodward, Larry Woodward, Anita Zortman, Mark Zortman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Frost, Thomas) (sxa).
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Dagobah, LLC, Ryan Page, Page10 Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit Exhs. 1-6)(Adamson, Robert) (sxa).
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Support re 1 Petition to Confirm Temporary Restraining Award Issued by Arbitrator filed by Cameron N Verdi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 6/29/2020 to update docket text per M. Brown/C. Verdi. (jrd).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Following the status conference, the Court issues this scheduling order and orders the Petitioners to serve Respondents with a copy of the petition and related documents. Respondents' opposition to the petition is due on or before June 29, 2020. Petitioners' reply will be due July 13, 2020. The Court schedules a telephonic hearing for July 27, 2020 at 10 a.m. The Court will additionally send a copy of this order to the arbitrator at JAMS. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/28/2020. (A copy of this order has been sent to the Arbitrator's Case Manager at JAMS). (smy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Status Hearing held on 5/21/2020. Petitioners agreed to file the petition publicly. The motion to file the petition under seal is therefore denied as moot. (Doc. No. #2 .) The Court will issue a separate written briefing schedule. Counsel provided email addresses to the Court to receive service in this case. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Petitioner Attorneys Thomas C. Frost; Craig H. Wendland). (Respondent Attorney Ryan Bell making a special appearance). (Cross-Respondent Attorney Michael Brown). (no document attached) (smy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Petition Under Seal by Brian G. Berland, et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas C. Frost in Support Thereof)(rmc)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 Petition to Confirm Temporary Restraining Award Issued by Arbitrator by Brian G. Berland, et al. (no document attached) (rmc)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Ex Parte Telephonic Status Hearing held on 5/20/2020. The Court issues the following minute order:On May 20, 2020, the Court held an ex parte status hearing in this case as the petition was submitted for filing under seal. At the hearing, the Court raised specific concerns and noted certain deficiencies regarding the petition. Accordingly, the Court orders the petitioner to show cause why this Court has jurisdiction over this matter. See B.C. v. Plumas Unified Sch. Dist., 192 F.3d 1260, 1264 (9th Cir. 1999) ("[F]ederal courts are required sua sponte to examine jurisdictional issues such as standing."); Bernhardt v. Cnty. of Los Angeles, 279 F.3d 862, 868 (9th Cir. 2002) (same). Furthermore, the Court permits the petitioner to cure deficiencies identified at the hearing and may schedule a further hearing with the Court after addressing the concerns raised by the Court. Absent good cause, the Court prefers that future hearings be conducted with the participation of the respondents in this case. See United States v. Real Prop. Located at 22 Santa Barbara Drive, 264 F.3d 860, 870 (9th Cir. 2001) ("[E]x parte proceedings are appropriate only in a narrow set of circumstances[.]"). (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Petitioner Attorney Craig H. Wendland). (no document attached) (smy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berland, et al. v. The Conclave, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Laurita Berland
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian G. Berland
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Staten
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Berland
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronnie Stanley
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roger Winter
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Bollig
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Shields
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carol Thomeczek
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Progenex Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Annetta Vahsholtz
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Zortman
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Carey
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Weiser
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anita Zortman
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Fralick
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nancy L. Thomas
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Woodward
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tom Gawlick
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roxane M. Blake
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy E. Burns
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Jones
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gail Stanley
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Schneider
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Menzie
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Carey
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Speer
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William D. Turley
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ross Edwards
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kimberly Unruh
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gavin Unruh
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Burns
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr Cameron N Verdi
Represented By: Michael F. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela Menzie
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gina Staten
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D. Paul Rittman
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Kalahurka
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Merrill Conant
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sonya Carpenter
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curtis L. Thomas
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sheri Turley
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Shields Group, LLC
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Stanley
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Schmidt
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy C. Winter
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Woodward
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Vahsholtz
Represented By: Thomas C Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Conclave, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Progenex Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Page10 Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Represented By: Robert P. Harrington
Represented By: Michelle Quist
Represented By: Ryan B. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Riverpine, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: VenturePharma, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dagobah, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Represented By: Robert P. Harrington
Represented By: Michelle Quist
Represented By: Ryan B. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Shamion
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Page
Represented By: Brian C. Johnson
Represented By: Robert P. Harrington
Represented By: Michelle Quist
Represented By: Ryan B. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JAMS Arbitration Reference No. 1200051334
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?