Arrant v. Zambrano et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Ray Arrant
Defendant: Hayes, AsFour, Dellinger, M. Zambrano and S. Beyer
Case Number: 3:2020cv01220
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Melvin Ray Arrant. (jms)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting the Complaint, from Plaintiff Melvin Ray Arrant. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Initial case filings (42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, etc.) received by U.S. Mail and not properly e-filed in accordance with S.D. Cal. General Order 653A. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/30/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Melvin Ray Arrant. (jms)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melvin Ray Arrant. (jms)
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against M. Zambrano, Hayes, Dellinger, AsFour, S. Beyer, filed by Melvin Ray Arrant. ($400.00 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1220-JLS-AGS. District Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler is assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrant v. Zambrano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Ray Arrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AsFour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?