Rose et al v. Niccole et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Rose and Jack G. Rose
Defendant: M.D. Michael Niccole, Mentor Worldwide, LLC and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2022cv00158
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave To File A Sur-Reply as to #11 Reply - Other by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monee Takla Hanna ISO Ex Parte for Leave to File Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Hanna Declaration ISO, #3 Proposed Order)(Hanna, Monee) QC Mailer re Wrong event selected, proposed orders should not be attached. (axc). (ddf).
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY - Other re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Beverly Rose, Jack G. Rose. (Lenze, Jennifer) (ddf).
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Hanna, Monee) (ddf).
March 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Monee Takla Hanna (Hanna, Monee) (ddf).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: (1)Vacating Order To Show Cause (2) Setting Briefing Schedule For Plaintiff's Motion To Remand. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 3/4/2022.(ddf)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Beverly Rose, Jack G. Rose. (Lenze, Jennifer)*Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court (ddf).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 2/25/2022.(ddf)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Hanna, Monee)*Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court(ddf).
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Frank on behalf of Michael Niccole (Frank, Robert) (ddf).
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Niccole. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo Ps & As, #2 Declaration Declaration of RWF, #3 Proof of Service POS)(Frank, Robert)Attorney Robert W. Frank added to party Michael Niccole(pty:dft)*Motion under submission, no appearances are required unless ordered by the Court(ddf).
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson. (jrd)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16537586.), filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Monee Hanna, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)The new case number is 3:22-cv-158-LL-WVG. Judge Lopez, Linda and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose et al v. Niccole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Rose
Represented By: Jennifer A. Lenze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack G. Rose
Represented By: Jennifer A. Lenze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Michael Niccole
Represented By: Robert W. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Monee Takla Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?