US v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Defendant: LORENZO GONZALEZ-FELICIANO, Secretary, Department of Health, JOSE DE-LEON, Director, Mental Retardation Program and WANDA VAZQUEZ-GARCED, Governor of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Interested Party: BEATRIZ VILA-CABASSA, DIANA M. ALCARAZ IRIZARRY, DRA. DIMARIS GARCIA, JAVIER B. GONZALEZ, Executive Director, on behalf of the Office of the Joint Compliance Coordinator (JCC), MARGARITA LUISA MERCADO-ECHEGARAY, ALBERTO ORTIZRIVERA, on behalf of Brother's Home, PR DEPT OF JUSTICE, PROVEEDORES HOGARES COMUNITARIOS Y HOGARES SUSTITUTOS DE LA DIVISION DE SERVICIOS A LA POBLACION CON DE RETARDO MENTAL DEL DEPARTAMENTO DE SALUD, ALFREDO ANTONIO CASTELLANOS BAYOUTH, JCC, ASOCIACION DE PADRES DEL CENTRO DE DESARROLLO HABILITATIVO DE CAYEY, BAYAMON, PONCE, AIBONITO, AND OTHERS, MARIVETTE GONZALEZ-ANTONMARCHI, on behalf of Brother's Home, JAVIER ACEVES, MD, JCC, FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD, C.S., (female), PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF MENTALLY RETARDED POPULATION- FUNDACION MODESTO GARAY, JOHN J. MCGEE, Ph. D., VITERTO ROJAS-AGUEDA, JUAN AYALA-TANON, A.H., MARIA D. LONDONO, INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO, DR. CARMELO RODRIGUEZ, Second Assistant to the JCC- Dr. Sylvia Fernandez, FUNDACION MODESTO GOTAY, SYLVIA M. FERNANDEZ-COLORADO, ANA DELIA MADERA-ARROYO, on behalf of her daughter Ana Elly S., PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF THE INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO DE PUERTO RICO and CONCEPCION TORRES
Defendant / Appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 20-1556
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Diana M. Alcaraz Irizarry. Copy of Notice issued July 6, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1556] (JMK) [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:49 PM]
July 21, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Esther Crespin Credi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Patricia Lorenzi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Richard J. Farano for US, Esther Crespin Credi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Federico Hernandez-Denton for Javier Aceves, MD and Carmelo Rodriguez, Patricia Lorenzi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon and Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado for Instituto Psicopedagogico. [20-1556] (GB) [Entered: 07/21/2020 08:56 AM]
July 20, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Javier Aceves, MD. Copy of Notice issued July 6, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1556] (JMK) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:14 PM]
July 6, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 07/20/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Esther Crespin Credi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Patricia Lorenzi for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Richard J. Farano for US, Esther Crespin Credi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon, Federico Hernandez-Denton for Javier Aceves, MD and Carmelo Rodriguez, Patricia Lorenzi for Wanda Vazquez-Garced, Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano and Jose De-Leon and Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado for Instituto Psicopedagogico. [20-1556] (GB) [Entered: 07/04/2020 08:36 AM]
July 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Hector M. Laffitte. Certificate of service dated 07/02/2020. [20-1556] (HML) [Entered: 07/02/2020 12:26 PM]
July 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Isabel Torres-Sastre. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2020. [20-1556] (IT) [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:29 PM]
July 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Lizzie M. Portela. Certificate of service dated 07/01/2020. [20-1556] (LMP) [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:25 PM]
June 30, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 06/30/2020. [20-1556] (AJG) [Entered: 06/30/2020 06:27 PM]
June 30, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 06/30/2020. [20-1556] (AJG) [Entered: 06/30/2020 06:26 PM]
June 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Arturo J. Garcia-Sola. Certificate of service dated 06/30/2020. [20-1556] (AJG) [Entered: 06/30/2020 06:24 PM]
June 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Erin H. Flynn. Certificate of service dated 06/22/2020. [20-1556] (EHF) [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:27 PM]
June 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US filed by Attorney Yael Bortnick. Certificate of service dated 06/22/2020. [20-1556] (YB) [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:23 PM]
June 18, 2020 Public docket note: Wanda Vazquez-Garced is now the Governor of Puerto Rico, and Lorenzo Gonzalez-Feliciano is now the Secretary of the Puerto Rico Department of Public Health. We have substituted them for Pedro Rossello-Gonzalez and Carmen Feliciano-de Melecio, respectively, as defendants. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1556] (MNH) [Entered: 06/18/2020 06:02 PM]
June 18, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #2863) filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 07/02/2020. [20-1556] (MNH) [Entered: 06/18/2020 05:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BEATRIZ VILA-CABASSA
Represented By: Ramon Luis Vinas-Bueso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DIANA M. ALCARAZ IRIZARRY
Represented By: Diana M. Alcaraz Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DRA. DIMARIS GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAVIER B. GONZALEZ, Executive Director, on behalf of the Office of the Joint Compliance Coordinator (JCC)
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARGARITA LUISA MERCADO-ECHEGARAY
Represented By: Margarita Luisa Mercado-Echegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALBERTO ORTIZRIVERA, on behalf of Brother's Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PR DEPT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PROVEEDORES HOGARES COMUNITARIOS Y HOGARES SUSTITUTOS DE LA DIVISION DE SERVICIOS A LA POBLACION CON DE RETARDO MENTAL DEL DEPARTAMENTO DE SALUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALFREDO ANTONIO CASTELLANOS BAYOUTH, JCC
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Represented By: Margarita Luisa Mercado-Echegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE PADRES DEL CENTRO DE DESARROLLO HABILITATIVO DE CAYEY, BAYAMON, PONCE, AIBONITO, AND OTHERS
Represented By: Asociacion de Padres del Centro de Desarrollo Habilitativo de Cayey, Bayamon, Ponce, Aibonito, and others
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARIVETTE GONZALEZ-ANTONMARCHI, on behalf of Brother's Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAVIER ACEVES, MD, JCC
Represented By: Federico Hernandez-Denton
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Represented By: Javier Aceves MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: C.S., (female)
Represented By: Miguel Oppenheimer
Represented By: Mariela Maestre Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF MENTALLY RETARDED POPULATION- FUNDACION MODESTO GARAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN J. MCGEE, Ph. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VITERTO ROJAS-AGUEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JUAN AYALA-TANON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: A.H.
Represented By: Manuel San Juan DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARIA D. LONDONO
Represented By: Maria D. Londono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Represented By: Michelle Pirallo-Di Cristina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DR. CARMELO RODRIGUEZ, Second Assistant to the JCC- Dr. Sylvia Fernandez
Represented By: Federico Hernandez-Denton
Represented By: Alfredo Antonio Castellanos Bayouth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FUNDACION MODESTO GOTAY
Represented By: Jose Raul Cancio-Bigas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SYLVIA M. FERNANDEZ-COLORADO
Represented By: Sylvia M. Fernandez-Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANA DELIA MADERA-ARROYO, on behalf of her daughter Ana Elly S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PARENTS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF THE INSTITUTO PSICOPEDAGOGICO DE PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CONCEPCION TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORENZO GONZALEZ-FELICIANO, Secretary, Department of Health
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE DE-LEON, Director, Mental Retardation Program
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA VAZQUEZ-GARCED, Governor of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Ineabelle Santiago-Camacho
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Beatriz Annexy-Guevara
Represented By: Sonia Margarita Lopez Del Valle-Carrera
Represented By: Esther Crespin Credi
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Ineabelle Santiago-Camacho
Represented By: Patricia Lorenzi
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Lizzie M. Portela
Represented By: Hector M. Laffitte
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Richard J. Farano
Represented By: Yael Bortnick
Represented By: Erin Helene Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?