Commonwealth of Massachusetts v. US Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NORRIS COCHRAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Health and Human Services, AL STEWART, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Labor, US DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, JANET LOUISE YELLEN, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY and XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Interested Party: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, PLANNED PARENTHOOD LEAGUE OF MASSACHUSETTS, MARCH FOR LIFE EDUCATION AND DEFENSE FUND, NARAL PRO-CHOICE MASSACHUSETTS, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MASSACHUSETTS and DORDT COLLEGE
Case Number: 21-1076
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Daniel Riess for Appellees Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Department of the Treasury, US Department of Labor, Al Stewart, Janet Louise Yellen and Norris Cochran. Copy of Notice issued March 5, 2021. Forwarding address unknown. [21-1076] (ATC) [Entered: 03/22/2021 01:58 PM]
March 19, 2021 Public docket note: Xavier Becerra was confirmed as the Acting Secretary of Health and Human Services on March 18, 2021. We have substituted him for Norris Cochran, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [21-1076] (ALW) [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:21 PM]
March 18, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Anthony M. Doniger for Not Parties NARAL Pro-Choice Massachusetts, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts and Planned Parenthood League of Massachusetts. Copy of Notice issued February 18, 2021. [21-1076] (ATC) [Entered: 03/22/2021 11:50 AM]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge: The Consent Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance is granted. After consultation with the Commonwealth, defendants shall file a status report on or before April 30, 2021, concerning the further conduct of this appeal. No further extensions should be expected absent consent of both parties. [21-1076] (ALW) [Entered: 03/12/2021 09:45 PM]
March 5, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Christopher R. Healy for United States Department of Health and Human Services, Department of the Treasury, US Department of Labor, Norris Cochran, Al Stewart and Janet Louise Yellen and Daniel Riess for United States Department of Health and Human Services, Department of the Treasury, US Department of Labor, Norris Cochran, Al Stewart and Janet Louise Yellen. [21-1076] (ALW) [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:44 PM]
March 5, 2021 ASSENTED TO MOTION to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellees Norris Cochran, Department of the Treasury, Al Stewart, US Department of Labor, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Janet Louise Yellen. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2021. [21-1076] (LVS) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:28 PM]
February 22, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 03/08/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Anthony M. Doniger for NARAL Pro-Choice Massachusetts, American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts and Planned Parenthood League of Massachusetts. [21-1076] (ALW) [Entered: 02/20/2021 12:23 AM]
February 18, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 03/04/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Christopher R. Healy for United States Department of Health and Human Services, Department of the Treasury, US Department of Labor, Norris Cochran, Al Stewart and Janet Louise Yellen and Daniel Riess for United States Department of Health and Human Services, Department of the Treasury, US Department of Labor, Norris Cochran, Al Stewart and Janet Louise Yellen. [21-1076] (ALW) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:22 PM]
February 10, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Norris Cochran, Department of the Treasury, Al Stewart, United States Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor and Janet Louise Yellen filed by Attorney Lowell V. Sturgill Jr.. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2021. [21-1076] (LVS) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:56 PM]
February 10, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by Attorney Jon Burke. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2021. [21-1076] (JTB) [Entered: 02/10/2021 10:25 AM]
February 9, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2021. [21-1076] (JEK) [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:16 PM]
February 9, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Norris Cochran, Department of the Treasury, Al Stewart, United States Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor and Janet Louise Yellen filed by Attorney Karen Schoen. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2021. [21-1076] (KS) [Entered: 02/09/2021 09:54 AM]
February 9, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Norris Cochran, Department of the Treasury, Al Stewart, United States Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor and Janet Louise Yellen filed by Attorney Sharon Swingle. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2021. [21-1076] (SS) [Entered: 02/09/2021 09:38 AM]
February 8, 2021 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 03/22/2021 for appellant Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1076] (ALW) [Entered: 02/08/2021 09:41 PM]
February 8, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Massachusetts indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 02/08/2021. [21-1076] (JEK) [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:52 PM]
February 8, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by Attorney Julia Kobick. Certificate of service dated 02/08/2021. [21-1076] (JEK) [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:02 PM]
January 28, 2021 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry 32: Order denying CAP. [21-1076]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was docketed in the wrong case. Please disregard. (DPO) [Entered: 01/28/2021 02:54 PM]
January 28, 2021 Public docket note: Norris Cochran was named Acting Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services on January 20, 2021. We have substituted him for Alex Azar, as the defendant. Al Stewart was named Acting Secretary of Labor on January 20, 2021. We have substituted him for R. Alexander Acosta, as the defendant. Janet Louise Yellen was sworn in as Secretary of the Treasury on January 26, 2021. We have substituted her for Steven Mnuchin as the defendant. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [21-1076] (DPO) [Entered: 01/28/2021 01:22 PM]
January 28, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #141) filed by Appellant Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, Fee, and Appearance form due 02/11/2021. [21-1076] (DPO) [Entered: 01/28/2021 01:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Massachusetts v. US Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORRIS COCHRAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AL STEWART, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANET LOUISE YELLEN, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Treasury
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Christopher R. Healy
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Carnes Flynn
Represented By: Jonathan T. Burke
Represented By: Julia Eleanor Kobick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Represented By: Kathryn R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PLANNED PARENTHOOD LEAGUE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Jessie J. Rossman
Represented By: Kathryn R. Cook
Represented By: Anthony M. Doniger
Represented By: Susan A. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARCH FOR LIFE EDUCATION AND DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Andrew David Beckwith
Represented By: Kenneth J. Connelly
Represented By: Kevin H. Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NARAL PRO-CHOICE MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Jessie J. Rossman
Represented By: Kathryn R. Cook
Represented By: Anthony M. Doniger
Represented By: Susan A. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Matthew R. Segal
Represented By: Jessie J. Rossman
Represented By: Kathryn R. Cook
Represented By: Anthony M. Doniger
Represented By: Susan A. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DORDT COLLEGE
Represented By: Kenneth J. Connelly
Represented By: Kevin H. Theriot
Represented By: Andrew David Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?