United States of America v. American Express Company
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Defendant: Visa Inc. and Mastercard International Incorporated
Petitioner: Abercrombie & Fitch Co., Saks Incorporated, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., The Buckle, Inc., Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc., Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc., WFM Hawaii, Inc., Whole Foods Market, OfficeMax Incorporated, Willmar Motors, LLC, Foot Locker, Inc., Ashley Furniture Industries Inc., 7-Eleven, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Home Depot USA, Inc., Mills Motor, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc., Republic Services, Inc., DBD, Inc., Yum! Brands, Inc., Brookshire Grocery Company, The William Carter Company, Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., Office Depot, Incorporated, WFM Northern Nevada, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited, Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc., American Signature, Inc., Mills Fleet Farm, Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc., Boscovs, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Target Corporation, Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Stein Mart, Inc., Academy, Ltd., DBA Academy Sports + Outdoors, David's Bridal, Inc., The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc., Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC, Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc., Chico's FAS, Inc., The Gap, Inc., Staples, Inc., Ascena Retail Group, Inc., Kwik Trip, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Buc-ee's Ltd, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, WFM-WO, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, United Airlines, Inc., Sears Holdings Corporation, National Association of Convenience Stores, Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc., Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P., Speedway LLC, Official Payments Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Express LLC, Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc., Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., HMSHost Corporation, Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Whole Food Company, Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Petsmart, Inc., Davids Bridal Canada Inc., Beall's, Inc., Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc., Whole Foods Market California, Inc., National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association, Mills Auto Center, Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc. and Coborns Incorporated
Amicus Curiae: Michael A. Carrier, Law Professor, Bridgestone Americas Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., MorphoTrust USA, LLC, SuperValu, Inc., Einer R. Elhauge, Law Professor, Caleres, Inc., Lawrence J. White, Regents of the University of California, The Kroger Co., Thomas L. Greaney, Law Professor, Spencer Weber Waller, Law Professor, AutoNation, Inc., Roger Noll, Robert D Willig, Shubha Ghosh, Law Professor, BJ's Restaurants, Inc., Robin Feldman, Law Professor, Southwest Airlines Co., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Mark R. Patterson, Law Professor, Raley's, Robert H. Lande, Law Professor, HyVee, Inc., Rite-Aid Corp., Brookstone Company, Incorporated, Safeway Inc., Joseph Gregory Sidak, Esq., Meijer, Inc., Peter Carstensen, Law Professor, Fresh Enterprises, LLC, CoreLogic, Inc., Centric Group, LLC, Fitness International, LLC, National Retail Federation, Harry First, Esq., Eleanor M. Fox, Law Professor, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Albertsons LLC, Stephen Calkins, Law Professor, The New York Times Company, Big Sur Waterbeds, Inc., H.E. Butt Grocery Co., Sofa Mart, LLC, Tesoro Companies, Inc., Nespresso USA, Inc., Norman W. Hawker, Law Professor, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Tiffany and Company, Denver Mattress Hospitality, Retail Litigation Center, Inc., Marina Lao, Law Professor, David J Teece, Jeffrey Perloff, John B. Kirkwood, Law Professor, Ralph Winter, Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Jack in the Box, Inc., BI-LO LLC, Public Storage, Consumer Action, Andrew Chin, Law Professor, Chris Sagers, Law Professor, Walgreen Co., Bally Total Fitness Corporation, Gregory T. Gundlach, Law Professor, Darden Restaurants, Inc., Darren Bush, Law Professor, John M. Connor, Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Lucky Brand LLC, Martin Gaynor, WP Company LLC, Ingram Micro, Inc., Joseph A. Stiglitz, Keith Hylton, Marriott International, Inc., Luxottica Retail North America Inc., United States Public Interest Research Group, Thomas J. Horton, Law Professor, Alan S. Frankel, CVS Health, Inc., Thomas Grimes, Law Professor, Festival Fun Parks, LLC, Innovative Dining Group, LLC, Joshua P. Davis, Law Professor, Herbert Hovenkamp, Law Professor, Discover Financial Services and Daniel McFadden
Plaintiff / Appellee: State of Idaho, State of Iowa, State of Ohio, State of Texas, State of New Hampshire, State of Arizona, State of Nebraska, State of Connecticut, State of Missouri, State of Tennessee, State of Michigan, United States of America, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, State of Vermont, State of Montana, State of Utah and State of Rhode Island
Defendant / Appellant: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. and American Express Company
Case Number: 15-1672
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Filing 479 U.S. SUPREME COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2018, RECEIVED.[2355951] [15-1672] [Entered: 07/31/2018 10:49 AM]
June 28, 2018 Filing 477 U.S. SUPREME COURT OPINION, dated 06/25/2018, affirming the judgment of the Court of Appeals, RECEIVED.[2335661] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/29/2018 11:07 AM]
January 16, 2018 Filing 476 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2213881] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 11:43 AM]
January 16, 2018 Filing 474 E-CASE, with attached documents, numbered from 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 11, 14, 17, 19, 31, 32, 35, 36, 38, 39, 43, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 53, 55, 58, 72, 73, 79, 80, 83, 84, 86, 89, 90, 96, 104, 105, 110, 111, 112, 118, 122, 123, 126, 127, 128, 132, 133, 134, 135, 140, 145, 149, 150, 164, 167, 169, 170, 173, 181, 185, 187, 190, 195, 197, 200, 201, 203, 204, 205, 206, 207, 208, 209, 210, 219, 224, 227, 228, 232, 235, 237, 238, 241, 244, 245, 247, 248, 249, 250, 251, 252, 253, 254, 255, 256, 257, 262, 265, 267, 270, 271, 274, 275, 276, 277, 278, 279, 280, 281, 282, 283, 284, 285, 288, 289, 302, 303, 305, 310, 311, 312, 313, 314, 315, 316, 317, 318, 320, 325, 329, 332, 334, 355, 358, 377, 380, 383, 384, 386, 388, 389, 391, 395, 396, 400, 401, 402, 403, 404, 405, 407, 409, 411, 417, 418, 420, 421, 422, 424, 425, 426, 431, 432, 433, 434, 445, 449, 451, 453, 454, 455, 458, 462, and 463, to Supreme Court, TRANSMITTED.[2213531] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 09:29 AM]
January 10, 2018 Filing 473 U.S. SUPREME COURT LETTER, dated 01/09/2018, requesting record be transmitted to the Supreme Court, RECEIVED.[2213508] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 09:20 AM]
October 17, 2017 Filing 470 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 10/16/2017, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 16-1454, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is granted, RECEIVED.[2148730] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/17/2017 09:09 AM]
August 18, 2017 Filing 469 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[2104338] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:23 PM]
April 28, 2017 Filing 467 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellee Iowa, et al., a further extension to file Writ of Certiorari, to and including 06/02/2017, FILED.[2024170] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/02/2017 10:54 AM]
April 25, 2017 Filing 468 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellee United States of America a further extension to file Writ of Certiorari, to an including 06/02/2017, FILED.[2024205] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/02/2017 11:07 AM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 464 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellee State of Arizona, State of Connecticut, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of Ohio, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Vermont and United States of America extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[2002092] [15-1672] [Entered: 03/31/2017 02:56 PM]
January 12, 2017 Filing 463 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1946683] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/12/2017 04:00 PM]
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER, petition for rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[1941027] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/05/2017 04:01 PM]
November 29, 2016 Filing 459 CURED DEFECTIVE: AMICUS BRIEF, [ # 458 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Darren Bush, Stephen Calkins, Michael A. Carrier, Peter Carstensen, Andrew Chin, Joshua P. Davis, Einer R. Elhauge, Robin Feldman, Harry First, Esq., Eleanor M. Fox, Shubha Ghosh, Thomas L. Greaney, Thomas Grimes, Gregory T. Gundlach, Norman W. Hawker, Thomas J. Horton, Herbert Hovenkamp, John B. Kirkwood, Robert H. Lande, Marina Lao, Mark R. Patterson, Chris Sagers and Spencer Weber Waller, FILED.[1915720] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/29/2016 02:19 PM]
November 29, 2016 Filing 458 AMICUS BRIEF, behalf of Amicus Curiae Darren Bush, Stephen Calkins, Michael A. Carrier, Peter Carstensen, Andrew Chin, Joshua P. Davis, Einer R. Elhauge, Robin Feldman, Harry First, Esq., Eleanor M. Fox, Shubha Ghosh, Thomas L. Greaney, Thomas Grimes, Gregory T. Gundlach, Norman W. Hawker, Thomas J. Horton, Herbert Hovenkamp, John B. Kirkwood, Robert H. Lande, Marina Lao, Mark R. Patterson, Chris Sagers and Spencer Weber Waller, FILED. Service date 11/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1915647] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/29/2016 01:41 PM]
November 28, 2016 Filing 456 ATTORNEY, Christopher T. Leonardo for Luxottica Retail North America Inc. Tiffany and Company CoreLogic, Inc. United Airlines, Inc. Lucky Brand LLC Jack in the Box, Inc. Caleres, Inc. Innovative Dining Group, LLC Sofa Mart, LLC MorphoTrust USA, LLC OfficeMax Incorporated Office Depot, Incorporated Nestle Waters North America Inc. Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. The New York Times Company Public Storage Big Sur Waterbeds, Inc. Fresh Enterprises, LLC Festival Fun Parks, LLC Denver Mattress Hospitality Ingram Micro, Inc. Marriott International, Inc. Regents of the University of California Darden Restaurants, Inc. Target Corporation WP Company LLC Bridgestone Americas Inc. Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc. Tesoro Companies, Inc. Brookstone Company, Incorporated Fitness International, LLC Staples, Inc. Sears Holdings Management Corporation Nespresso USA, Inc. AutoNation, Inc. Bally Total Fitness Corporation Centric Group, LLC BJ's Restaurants, Inc. Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, in case 15-1672 , [ # 425 ], ADDED.[1914363] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/28/2016 11:37 AM]
November 22, 2016 Filing 455 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae AutoNation, Inc., Bally Total Fitness Corporation, Big Sur Waterbeds, Inc., BJ's Restaurants, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Inc., Brookstone Company, Incorporated, Caleres, Inc., Centric Group, LLC, CoreLogic, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Darden Restaurants, Inc., Denver Mattress Hospitality, Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Festival Fun Parks, LLC, Fitness International, LLC, Fresh Enterprises, LLC, Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Ingram Micro, Inc., Innovative Dining Group, LLC, Jack in the Box, Inc., Lucky Brand LLC, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Marriott International, Inc., MorphoTrust USA, LLC, Nespresso USA, Inc., Nestle Waters North America Inc., Office Depot, Incorporated, OfficeMax Incorporated, Public Storage, Regents of the University of California, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Sofa Mart, LLC, Staples, Inc., Target Corporation, Tesoro Companies, Inc., The New York Times Company, Tiffany and Company, WP Company LLC and Movant United Airlines, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1912459] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/22/2016 02:08 PM]
November 22, 2016 Filing 454 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae John M. Connor, Martin Gaynor, Daniel McFadden, Roger Noll, Jeffrey Perloff, Joseph A. Stiglitz, Lawrence J. White and Ralph Winter, FILED. Service date 11/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1912149] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/22/2016 11:43 AM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 453 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Southwest Airlines Co., FILED. Service date 11/21/2016 by CM/ECF.[1911730] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 04:32 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 452 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF [ # 451 ], [ # 448 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Action and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED.[1911602] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 03:35 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 451 AMICUS BRIEF, Consumer Action and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. Service date 11/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1911567] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 03:09 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 450 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [447], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Darren Bush, Stephen Calkins, Michael A. Carrier, Peter Carstensen, Andrew Chin, Joshua P. Davis, Einer R. Elhauge, Robin Feldman, Harry First, Esq., Eleanor M. Fox, Shubha Ghosh, Thomas L. Greaney, Thomas Grimes, Gregory T. Gundlach, Norman W. Hawker, Thomas J. Horton, Herbert Hovenkamp, John B. Kirkwood, Robert H. Lande, Marina Lao, Mark R. Patterson, Chris Sagers and Spencer Weber Waller, FILED.[1911505] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 02:26 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 449 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Discover Financial Services, FILED. Service date 11/21/2016 by CM/ECF.[1911496] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 02:20 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 448 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [446], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Action and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED.[1911487] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 02:13 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 447 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Darren Bush, Stephen Calkins, Michael A. Carrier, Peter Carstensen, Andrew Chin, Joshua P. Davis, Einer R. Elhauge, Robin Feldman, Harry First, Esq., Eleanor M. Fox, Shubha Ghosh, Thomas L. Greaney, Thomas Grimes, Gregory T. Gundlach, Norman W. Hawker, Thomas J. Horton, Herbert Hovenkamp, John B. Kirkwood, Robert H. Lande, Marina Lao, Mark R. Patterson, Chris Sagers and Spencer Weber Waller, FILED. Service date 11/21/2016 by CM/ECF.[1911345] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 12:38 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 446 AMICUS BRIEF, Consumer Action and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. Service date 11/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1911314] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 12:18 PM]
November 21, 2016 Filing 445 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 403 ],[ # 433 ], granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 404 ], granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 434 ], granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 432 ], granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 409 ], granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 426 ], by CFD, FILED. [1911272][445] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/21/2016 11:58 AM]
November 18, 2016 Filing 441 NEW PARTY, Movant United Airlines, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Office Depot, Incorporated, Target Corporation, OfficeMax Incorporated, Staples, Inc., The New York Times Company, WP Company LLC, Tesoro Companies, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Tiffany and Company, AutoNation, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Inc., Brookstone Company, Incorporated, Caleres, Inc., Lucky Brand LLC, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Bally Total Fitness Corporation, Fitness International, LLC, BJ's Restaurants, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., Fresh Enterprises, LLC, Jack in the Box, Inc., Innovative Dining Group, LLC, Nestle Waters North America Inc., Nespresso USA, Inc., Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Festival Fun Parks, LLC, Centric Group, LLC, CoreLogic, Inc., Ingram Micro, Inc., MorphoTrust USA, LLC, Public Storage, Big Sur Waterbeds, Inc., Denver Mattress Hospitality, Sofa Mart, LLC and Regents of the University of California, ADDED.[1910217] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2016 11:34 AM]
November 18, 2016 Filing 439 ATTORNEY, Alden L. Atkins for Southwest Airlines Co., in case 15-1672 , [65], ADDED.[1909929] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2016 08:58 AM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 436 NEW PARTY, Movant U.S. Public Interest Research Group, ADDED.[1909818] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 04:46 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 435 NEW PARTY, Movant Consumer Action, ADDED.[1909773] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 04:29 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 434 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/17/2016 by CM/ECF.[1909757] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 04:23 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 433 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/17/2016 by CM/ECF.[1909746] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 04:18 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 432 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Consumer Action; U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. Service date11/17/2016 by CM/ECF.[1909513] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 02:59 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 431 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Consumer Action; U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. Service date 11/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1909510] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 02:56 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 430 ATTORNEY, David P. Germaine for Publix Super Markets, Inc. Raley's CVS Health, Inc. SuperValu, Inc. Meijer, Inc., in case 15-1672 , [ # 418 ], ADDED.[1909376] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 01:20 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 429 ATTORNEY, Joseph M. Vanek for Publix Super Markets, Inc. Raley's CVS Health, Inc. SuperValu, Inc. Meijer, Inc., in case 15-1672 , [ # 420 ], ADDED.[1909370] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 01:14 PM]
November 17, 2016 Filing 427 ATTORNEY, David A. Balto for Stephen Calkins, in case 15-1672 , [ # 402 ], ADDED.[1909119] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/17/2016 11:04 AM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 426 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1908755] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 08:31 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 425 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Merchant amici, FILED. Service date 11/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1908754] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 08:27 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 424 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Merchant amici, FILED. Service date 11/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1908753] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 08:24 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 422 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Co., HyVee, Inc., Safeway Inc., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED. Service date 11/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1908708] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 04:56 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 421 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf The Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and the National Retail Federation, FILED. Service date 11/14/2016 by CM/ECF. [1908622] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 04:25 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 420 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae CVS Health, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's and SuperValu, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1908581] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 04:08 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 419 ATTORNEY, Eric L. Bloom for BI-LO LLC Rite-Aid Corp., in case 15-1672 , [ # 417 ], ADDED.[1908554] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 04:01 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 418 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae CVS Health, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's and SuperValu, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1908553] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 04:00 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 417 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Rite-Aid Corp. and BI-LO LLC, FILED. Service date 11/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1908447] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 03:24 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 416 ATTORNEY, Steffen Nathanael Johnson for Discover Financial Services, in case 15-1672 , [ # 407 ], ADDED.[1908193] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 12:40 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 415 NEW PARTY, Movant Discover Financial Services, ADDED.[1908176] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 12:33 PM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 412 NEW PARTY, Movant Herbert Hovenkamp, Harry First, Einer R. Elhauge, Eleanor M. Fox, Stephen Calkins, Spencer Weber Waller, Andrew Chin, Peter Carstensen, Shubha Ghosh, Darren Bush, Robert H. Lande, Robin Feldman, Gregory T. Gundlach, John B. Kirkwood, Joshua P. Davis, Norman W. Hawker, Chris Sagers, Thomas J. Horton, Thomas L. Greaney, Thomas Grimes, Mark R. Patterson, Marina Lao and Michael A. Carrier, ADDED.[1908083] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 11:59 AM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 411 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 391 ], [ # 395 ] [ # 396 ] by CFD, FILED. [1908050][411] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 11:43 AM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 409 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1907919] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 10:50 AM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 408 NEW PARTY, Movant Martin Gaynor, Daniel McFadden, Roger Noll, Jeffrey M. Perloff, Joseph A. Stiglitz, Lawrence J. White and Ralph Winter, ADDED.[1907703] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 09:15 AM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 407 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Discover Financial Services, FILED. Service date 11/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1907680] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 09:06 AM]
November 16, 2016 Filing 406 NEW PARTY, Movant John M. Connor, ADDED.[1907666] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2016 08:58 AM]
November 15, 2016 Filing 405 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Discover Financial Services, FILED. Service date 11/15/2016 by CM/ECF. [1907575] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/15/2016 07:43 PM]
November 15, 2016 Filing 404 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/15/2016 by CM/ECF.[1907568] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/15/2016 06:30 PM]
November 15, 2016 Filing 403 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/15/2016 by CM/ECF.[1907565] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/15/2016 06:13 PM]
November 15, 2016 Filing 402 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Herbert Hovenkamp, Harry First, Einer R. Elhauge, Eleanor M. Fox, Stephen Calkins, Spencer Weber Waller, Andrew Chin, Peter Carstensen,Shubha Ghosh, Darren Bush, Robert H. Lande, Robin Feldman, Gregory T. Gundlach, John B. Kirkwood, Joshua P. Davis, Norman W. Hawker, Chris Sagers, Thomas L. Greaney, Warren Grimes, Mark R. Patterson, Marina Lao, Michael A. Carrier, FILED. Service date 11/15/2016 by CM/ECF. [1907560] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/15/2016 06:05 PM]
November 15, 2016 Filing 401 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of John M. Connor, Martin Gaynor, Daniel McFadden, Roger Noll, Jeffrey M. Perloff, Joseph A. Stiglitz, Lawrence J. White, Ralph Winter, FILED. Service date 11/15/2016 by CM/ECF. [1907543] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/15/2016 05:11 PM]
November 15, 2016 Filing 400 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of John M. Connor, Martin Gaynor, Daniel McFadden, Roger Noll, Jeffrey M. Perloff, Joseph A. Stiglitz, FILED. Service date 11/15/2016 by CM/ECF. [1907411] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/15/2016 04:11 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 396 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1906396] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 07:37 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 395 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1906395] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 07:33 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 393 ATTORNEY, Frank M. Lowrey IV for Retail Litigation Center, Inc. National Retail Federation, in case 15-1672 , [ # 389 ], ADDED.[1906245] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 04:23 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 392 NEW PARTY, Movant National Retail Federation, ADDED.[1906190] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 04:05 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 391 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1906189] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 04:05 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 390 NEW PARTY, Movant Retail Litigation Center, Inc., ADDED.[1906170] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 03:58 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 389 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Retail LitigationCenter, Inc. and National Retail Federation, FILED. Service date 11/14/2016 by CM/ECF. [1906142] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 03:47 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 388 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and National Retail Federation, FILED. Service date 11/14/2016 by CM/ECF. [1906122] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 03:38 PM]
November 14, 2016 Filing 387 ATTORNEY, James Almon for The Kroger Co. Safeway Inc. Ahold U.S.A., Inc. HyVee, Inc. The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc. H.E. Butt Grocery Co. Walgreen Co. Albertsons LLC, in case 15-1672 , [ # 386 ], ADDED.[1905426] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/14/2016 09:47 AM]
November 10, 2016 Filing 386 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Co., HyVee, Inc., Safeway Inc., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED. Service date 11/10/2016 by CM/ECF. [1905163] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/10/2016 05:07 PM]
November 10, 2016 Filing 384 PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/10/2016 by CM/ECF.[1904787] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/10/2016 01:51 PM]
September 26, 2016 Filing 383 JUDGMENT, FILED.[1871013] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/26/2016 04:01 PM]
September 26, 2016 Filing 380 CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 09/26/2016, to EDNY (BROOKLYN), ISSUED.[1870837] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/26/2016 02:56 PM]
September 26, 2016 Filing 378 NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1870819] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/26/2016 02:46 PM]
September 26, 2016 Filing 377 OPINION, the district court judgment is reversed and remanded with instructions to enter judgment in favor of Amex, by RKW, RCW, CFD, FILED.[1870813] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/26/2016 02:43 PM]
March 31, 2016 Filing 375 ARGUMENT CD, sent to D. Scott Macrae, TRANSMITTED.[1751036] [15-1672] [Entered: 04/14/2016 04:27 PM]
March 3, 2016 Filing 374 NEW CASE MANAGER, Kryzia Molina, ASSIGNED, copy to Pro Se.[1718753] [15-1672] [Entered: 03/03/2016 05:46 PM]
February 18, 2016 Filing 370 ARGUMENT CD, sent to John Crabtree, TRANSMITTED.[1694037] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 04:27 PM]
February 4, 2016 Filing 371 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Benjamin Brown, TRANSMITTED.[1707776] [15-1672] [Entered: 02/18/2016 03:40 PM]
January 28, 2016 Filing 363 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Chy Eaton, TRANSMITTED.[1693807] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 03:15 PM]
January 22, 2016 Filing 364 ARGUMENT CD, picked up by Richard Conza, TRANSMITTED.[1693881] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 03:38 PM]
January 21, 2016 Filing 361 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from COHEN MILSTEIN, with fee, RECEIVED.[1689185] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/21/2016 05:48 PM]
January 21, 2016 Filing 360 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from NEWMAN DUWORS, with fee, RECEIVED.[1688510] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/21/2016 11:29 AM]
January 20, 2016 Filing 362 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Clark Bailey, TRANSMITTED.[1693761] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 02:58 PM]
January 15, 2016 Filing 358 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 01/15/2016, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 01/15/2016 by CM/ECF.[1685725] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/15/2016 05:01 PM]
January 15, 2016 Filing 357 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from C. BAILEY, with fee, RECEIVED.[1685093] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/15/2016 11:04 AM]
January 14, 2016 Filing 355 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 01/14/2016, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 01/14/2016 by CM/ECF.[1683949] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/14/2016 10:06 AM]
January 11, 2016 Filing 366 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Benjamin D. Brown, TRANSMITTED.[1693978] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 04:04 PM]
January 11, 2016 Filing 365 ARGUMENT CD, sent to James Martin, TRANSMITTED.[1693976] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 04:03 PM]
January 5, 2016 Filing 367 ARGUMENT CD, sent to James R. Martin, TRANSMITTED.[1694017] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 04:15 PM]
January 5, 2016 Filing 354 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee FROM COHEN MILSTEIN, RECEIVED.[1676872] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/05/2016 07:14 PM]
December 30, 2015 Filing 353 ARGUMENT CD, sent regular mail to Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP, Wash. D.C. TRANSMITTED.[1673614] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/30/2015 08:09 AM]
December 29, 2015 Filing 352 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM AXINN, VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP, with fee, RECEIVED. [1673228] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/29/2015 02:41 PM]
December 23, 2015 Filing 350 ARGUMENT CD, sent FedEx overnight to Robins Kaplan LLP, TRANSMITTED. [1671202] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/23/2015 02:00 PM]
December 23, 2015 Filing 349 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM ROBINS KAPLAN LLP, with fee, RECEIVED. [1671088] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/23/2015 12:29 PM]
December 22, 2015 Filing 348 ARGUMENT CD, sent FedEx overnight to Attorney General of Missouri, TRANSMITTED. [1670380] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/22/2015 04:01 PM]
December 22, 2015 Filing 347 ARGUMENT CD, picked up at the counter by Constantine Cannon, TRANSMITTED. [1670188] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/22/2015 02:50 PM]
December 22, 2015 Filing 346 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MISSOURI, with fee, RECEIVED. [1670184] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/22/2015 02:48 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 345 ARGUMENT CD, sent FedEx overnight to Latham & Watkins LLP, TRANSMITTED. [1669299] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:50 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 344 ARGUMENT CD, sent regular mail to Vanek, Vickers, Masini, TRANSMITTED. [1669267] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:41 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 343 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM CONSTANTINE CANNON, with fee, RECEIVED. [1669096] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 03:47 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 342 ARGUMENT CD, rto be picked up by messenger for Sidley Austin LLP TRANSMITTED.[1668915] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 02:37 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 341 ARGUMENT CD, to be picked up by messenger for O'Melveny & Myers LLP TRANSMITTED.[1668911] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 02:36 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 340 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM LATHAM & WATKINS LLP, with fee, RECEIVED. [1668729] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 12:31 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 339 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM VANEK, VICKERS, MASINI, with fee, RECEIVED. [1668726] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 12:29 PM]
December 21, 2015 Filing 337 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 12/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1668420] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/21/2015 10:43 AM]
December 18, 2015 Filing 372 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Deborah E. Arbabi, TRANSMITTED.[1707824] [15-1672] [Entered: 02/18/2016 03:54 PM]
December 18, 2015 Filing 369 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Michael R. Gordon, TRANSMITTED.[1694032] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 04:22 PM]
December 18, 2015 Filing 368 ARGUMENT CD, sent to Evan Chesler, TRANSMITTED.[1694028] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/28/2016 04:20 PM]
December 18, 2015 Filing 336 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from Peter B. McGowan - Sidley Austin LLP with fee, RECEIVED.[1667820] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/18/2015 02:55 PM]
December 18, 2015 Filing 335 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from Marie A. Bonitatibus - O'Melveny & Myers LLP with fee, RECEIVED.[1667815] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/18/2015 02:54 PM]
December 18, 2015 Filing 334 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 12/18/2015, to EDNY, ISSUED.[1667775] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/18/2015 02:02 PM]
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER, dated 12/18/2016, pending decision in United States v. Am. Express Co., No. 15-1672, the Court on its own motion hereby orders a temporary stay of the Order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York dated 04/30/2015. The Court further orders a temporary stay in the District Court of any and all matters related to this litigation, by: RKW, RCW, CFD, C.JJ., FILED.[1667760] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:43 PM]
December 17, 2015 Filing 331 CASE, before RKW, RCW, CFD, C.JJ., HEARD.[1666559] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/17/2015 12:03 PM]
December 16, 2015 Filing 330 ATTORNEY, Mark G. Califano for American Express Company American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., in case 15-1672 , [ # 329 ], ADDED.[1665820] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/16/2015 03:37 PM]
December 16, 2015 Filing 329 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 325 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1665722][329] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/16/2015 02:51 PM]
December 15, 2015 Filing 328 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM CRABTREE & AUSLANDER, with fee, RECEIVED. [1664967] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/15/2015 05:15 PM]
December 15, 2015 Filing 325 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/15/2015 by email.[1664774] [15-1672] [Entered: 12/15/2015 04:00 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 324 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM CROWELL & MORING LLP, with fee, RECEIVED. [1653124] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/30/2015 05:14 PM]
November 19, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1646030] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/19/2015 10:55 AM]
November 19, 2015 Filing 321 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1645916] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/19/2015 10:02 AM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 320 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1645633] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 04:44 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 318 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 210 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645443][318] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 03:52 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 317 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 209 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645428][317] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 03:49 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 316 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 207 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645404][316] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 03:41 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 315 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 206 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645393][315] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 03:37 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 314 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 208 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645382][314] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 03:30 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 313 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 205 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645334][313] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 03:16 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 312 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 204 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645178][312] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 01:30 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 311 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 203 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Alan S. Frankel, FILED. [1645171][311] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 01:25 PM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 310 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 219 ], FILED. [1645145][310] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/18/2015 01:01 PM]
November 16, 2015 Filing 306 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 11/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1643422] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2015 04:55 PM]
November 16, 2015 Filing 305 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 11/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1643127] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/16/2015 03:43 PM]
November 12, 2015 Filing 303 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/12/2015 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1640839] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/12/2015 04:54 PM]
November 12, 2015 Filing 302 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1640383] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/12/2015 02:54 PM]
November 5, 2015 Filing 299 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 12/17/2015, SET.[1636348] [15-1672] [Entered: 11/05/2015 04:47 PM]
October 23, 2015 Filing 292 SEALED FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1627451] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/26/2015 10:52 AM]
October 23, 2015 Filing 291 CURED DEFECTIVE FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF [ # 287 ], [ # 289 ], on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED.[1626814] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 03:20 PM]
October 23, 2015 Filing 290 CURED DEFECTIVE FINAL FORM BRIEF [ # 286 ], [ # 288 ], on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED.[1626804] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 03:19 PM]
October 23, 2015 Filing 289 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/23/2015 by CM/ECF. [1626576] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 12:38 PM]
October 23, 2015 Filing 288 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/23/2015 by CM/ECF. [1626566] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 12:32 PM]
October 23, 2015 Filing 287 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Final Form Reply Brief, [269], on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED.[1626490] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:48 AM]
October 23, 2015 Filing 286 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Final Form Brief, [268], on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED.[1626479] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:45 AM]
October 22, 2015 Filing 270 MOTION ORDER, granting joint motion for leave to file under seal the deferred joint appendix [ # 247 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1626025][270] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/22/2015 04:34 PM]
October 22, 2015 Filing 269 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1625685] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/22/2015 02:35 PM]
October 22, 2015 Filing 268 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1625668] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/22/2015 02:24 PM]
October 21, 2015 Filing 278 SEALED DEFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 4 of 10, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. [1626457] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:38 AM]
October 21, 2015 Filing 271 SEALED FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. [1626270] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 10:12 AM]
October 21, 2015 Filing 267 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/21/2015 by CM/ECF. [1624584] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/21/2015 02:35 PM]
October 19, 2015 Filing 265 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 10/19/2015, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 10/19/2015 by CM/ECF.[1622900] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/19/2015 08:34 PM]
October 19, 2015 Filing 263 CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 28(j) LETTER [ # 261 ], [ # 262 ], on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED.[1622369] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/19/2015 01:54 PM]
October 19, 2015 Filing 262 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 10/16/2015, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1622359] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/19/2015 01:50 PM]
October 19, 2015 Filing 261 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [260], on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED.[1622338] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/19/2015 01:40 PM]
October 16, 2015 Filing 260 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1621093] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/16/2015 12:36 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 284 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 10 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626467] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:41 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 283 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 9 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626465] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:41 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 282 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 8 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626463] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:40 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 281 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 7 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626462] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:40 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 285 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 6 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626474] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:43 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 277 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 5 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626454] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:37 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 276 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 4 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626453] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:36 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 280 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 3 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626461] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:39 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 275 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 2 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, FILED. [1626452] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:35 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 274 SEALED DEFFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 1 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1626306] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 10:27 AM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 257 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 10 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620588] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:43 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 256 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 9 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620587] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:40 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 255 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 8 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620586] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:38 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 254 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 7 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620585] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:37 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 253 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 6 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620584] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:35 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 252 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620583] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:33 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 251 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620582] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:32 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 250 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620581] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:30 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 249 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620580] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:27 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 248 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 10, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF.[1620579] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:24 PM]
October 15, 2015 Filing 247 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/15/2015 by CM/ECF. [1620577] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/15/2015 09:19 PM]
October 5, 2015 Filing 245 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1613242] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/05/2015 07:48 PM]
October 2, 2015 Filing 279 SEALED DEFERRED APPENDIX, Volume 5 of 10, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. [1626460] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/23/2015 11:39 AM]
October 2, 2015 Filing 244 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file deferred appendix on or before 10/15/2015 [ # 241 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1611801][244] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/02/2015 12:04 PM]
October 1, 2015 Filing 241 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1611096] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/01/2015 03:25 PM]
September 28, 2015 Filing 238 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Nickolai Gilford Levin for Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/28/2015 by CM/ECF. [1607933] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/28/2015 02:39 PM]
September 28, 2015 Filing 237 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Evan R. Chesler for Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/28/2015 by CM/ECF. [1607772] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/28/2015 12:03 PM]
September 24, 2015 Filing 236 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/14/2015, PROPOSED.[1606427] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/24/2015 04:49 PM]
September 24, 2015 Filing 235 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [ # 227 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1605869][235] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/24/2015 11:19 AM]
September 23, 2015 Filing 232 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 219 ], FILED. [1605136][232] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/23/2015 12:37 PM]
September 22, 2015 Filing 228 OPPOSITION TO , to file amicus curiae brief [ # 219 ], on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1604183] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/22/2015 01:41 PM]
September 22, 2015 Filing 227 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1604174] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/22/2015 01:32 PM]
September 22, 2015 Filing 224 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [ # 173 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., by RR, FILED. [1603740][224] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/22/2015 09:53 AM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 220 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 09/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1603554] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 07:56 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 219 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date09/21/2015 by email.[1603543] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 06:05 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 210 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email.[1603522] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:38 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 209 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email.[1603521] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:37 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 208 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email.[1603520] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:36 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 207 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email.[1603518] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:35 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 206 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email.[1603517] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:35 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 205 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email.[1603516] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:34 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 204 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by US mail.[1603514] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:33 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 203 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email.[1603512] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:32 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 202 NEW PARTY, Movant Alan S. Frankel, ADDED.[1603508] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 05:26 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email. [1603301] [15-1672]--[Edited 09/21/2015 by JT] [Entered: 09/21/2015 03:46 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Movant Alan S. Frankel, FILED. Service date 09/21/2015 by email. [1603288] [15-1672]--[Edited 09/21/2015 by JT] [Entered: 09/21/2015 03:42 PM]
September 21, 2015 Filing 198 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF [ # 192 ], [ # 195 ], on behalf of Movant Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons LLC, BI-LO LLC, CVS Health, Inc., H.E. Butt Grocery Co., HyVee, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Rite-Aid Corp., Safeway Inc., SuperValu, Inc., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED.[1602510] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/21/2015 08:34 AM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 197 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal document [ # 169 ] filed by Appellee United States of America, by CFD, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1602311][197] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/18/2015 04:13 PM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 195 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons LLC, BI-LO LLC, CVS Health, Inc., H.E. Butt Grocery Co., HyVee, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Rite-Aid Corp., Safeway Inc., SuperValu, Inc., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., , FILED. Service date 09/18/2015 by CM/ECF. [1601961] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/18/2015 01:05 PM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 193 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/07/2015, A, PROPOSED.[1601726] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/18/2015 10:58 AM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 192 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [166], on behalf of Movant Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons LLC, BI-LO LLC, CVS Health, Inc., H.E. Butt Grocery Co., HyVee, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Rite-Aid Corp., Safeway Inc., SuperValu, Inc., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED.[1601551] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/18/2015 09:56 AM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 188 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF [ # 187 ], on behalf of Movant Home Depot USA, Inc., FILED.[1601150] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/17/2015 03:26 PM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 187 AMICUS BRIEF, Home Depot USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1601108] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/17/2015 03:04 PM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 186 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF [ # 176 ], [171], on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED.[1600631] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/17/2015 10:01 AM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 185 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 164 ] filed by Movant The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc. Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc. OfficeMax Incorporated Saks Incorporated Office Depot, Incorporated Staples, Inc. Target Corporation American Signature, Inc. Ascena Retail Group, Inc. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. Chicos FAS, Inc. Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., by CFD, FILED. [1600574][185] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/17/2015 09:41 AM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 183 ATTORNEY, Adam Owen Glist for Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC DBD, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc. American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. 7-Eleven, Inc. Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc. Willmar Motors, LLC National Grocers Association Mills Fleet Farm, Inc. Coborns Incorporated Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc. Speedway LLC Mills Motor, Inc. Martin's Super Markets, Inc. Yum! Brands, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Boscovs, Inc. IKEA North America Services, LLC Fleet and Farm of Green Bay Petsmart, Inc. Recreational Equipment, Inc. Express LLC National Restaurant Association Michaels Stores, Inc. WFM Northern Nevada, Inc. Stein Mart, Inc. Academy, Ltd. Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc. Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. Best Buy Co., Inc. Whole Food Company Mills Auto Center, Inc. Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. Lowe's Companies, Inc. Ashley Furniture Industries Inc. Retail Industry Leaders Association Whole Foods Market California, Inc. Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc. The Buckle, Inc. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Foot Locker, Inc. Beall's, Inc. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc. National Association of Convenience Stores Drury Hotels Company, LLC HMSHost Corporation RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc. The William Carter Company WFM Hawaii, Inc. Davids Bridal, Inc. Republic Services, Inc. P.C. Richard & Son, Inc. Sears Holdings Corporation Buc-ee's Ltd The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc. WFM-WO, Inc. Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc. Davids Bridal Canada Inc. The Gap, Inc. Kwik Trip, Inc. Official Payments Corporation Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC Barnes & Noble, Inc. Brookshire Grocery Company Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc. WFM Southern Nevada, Inc. Whole Foods Market Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc. Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc. Marathon Petroleum Company LP Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc. Dillard's, Inc., in case 15-1672 , [ # 181 ], ADDED.[1600394] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/17/2015 07:48 AM]
September 17, 2015 Filing 182 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM [ # 178 ], [ # 181 ], on behalf of Movant7-Eleven, Inc., Academy, Ltd., Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Ashley Furniture Industries Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Beall's, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Boscovs, Inc., Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC, Brookshire Grocery Company, Buc-ee's Ltd, Coborns Incorporated, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc., Davids Bridal Canada Inc., DBD, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Davids Bridal, Inc., Express LLC, Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc., Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., Mills Auto Center, Inc., Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc., Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc., Mills Fleet Farm, Inc., Mills Motor, Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association, Official Payments Corporation, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Republic Services, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Stein Mart, Inc., Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited, The Buckle, Inc., The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The William Carter Company, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., WFM Hawaii, Inc., WFM Northern Nevada, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc., WFM-WO, Inc., Whole Food Company, Whole Foods Market, Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc., Yum! Brands, Inc. and Willmar Motors, LLC, FILED.[1600393] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/17/2015 07:43 AM]
September 16, 2015 Filing 181 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant 7-Eleven, Inc., Academy, Ltd., Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Ashley Furniture Industries Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Beall's, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Boscovs, Inc., Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC, Brookshire Grocery Company, Buc-ee's Ltd, Coborns Incorporated, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc., Davids Bridal Canada Inc., DBD, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Davids Bridal, Inc., Express LLC, Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc., Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., Mills Auto Center, Inc., Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc., Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc., Mills Fleet Farm, Inc., Mills Motor, Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association, Official Payments Corporation, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Republic Services, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Stein Mart, Inc., Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited, The Buckle, Inc., The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The William Carter Company, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., WFM Hawaii, Inc., WFM Northern Nevada, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc., WFM-WO, Inc., Whole Food Company, Whole Foods Market, Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc., Yum! Brands, Inc. and Willmar Motors, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1600351] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/16/2015 05:28 PM]
September 16, 2015 Filing 179 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [172], on behalf of Movant Home Depot USA, Inc., FILED.[1599774] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/16/2015 12:08 PM]
September 16, 2015 Filing 178 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,Notice of appearance, [168], on behalf of Movant Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC DBD, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc. American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. 7-Eleven, Inc. Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc. Willmar Motors, LLC National Grocers Association Mills Fleet Farm, Inc. Coborns Incorporated Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc. Speedway LLC Mills Motor, Inc. Martin's Super Markets, Inc. Yum! Brands, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Boscovs, Inc. IKEA North America Services, LLC Fleet and Farm of Green Bay Petsmart, Inc. Recreational Equipment, Inc. Express LLC National Restaurant Association Michaels Stores, Inc. WFM Northern Nevada, Inc. Stein Mart, Inc. Academy, Ltd. Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc. Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. Best Buy Co., Inc. Whole Food Company Mills Auto Center, Inc. Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. Lowe's Companies, Inc. Ashley Furniture Industries Inc. Retail Industry Leaders Association Whole Foods Market California, Inc. Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc. The Buckle, Inc. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Foot Locker, Inc. Beall's, Inc. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc. National Association of Convenience Stores Drury Hotels Company, LLC HMSHost Corporation RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc. The William Carter Company WFM Hawaii, Inc. Davids Bridal, Inc. Republic Services, Inc. P.C. Richard & Son, Inc. Sears Holdings Corporation Buc-ee's Ltd The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc. WFM-WO, Inc. Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc. Davids Bridal Canada Inc. The Gap, Inc. Kwik Trip, Inc. Official Payments Corporation Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC Barnes & Noble, Inc. Brookshire Grocery Company Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc. WFM Southern Nevada, Inc. Whole Foods Market Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc. Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc. Marathon Petroleum Company LP Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc. Dillard's, Inc FILED.[1599720] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/16/2015 11:49 AM]
September 16, 2015 Filing 177 ATTORNEY, Jeffrey Isaac Shinder for Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC DBD, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc. American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. 7-Eleven, Inc. Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc. Willmar Motors, LLC National Grocers Association Mills Fleet Farm, Inc. Coborns Incorporated Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc. Speedway LLC Mills Motor, Inc. Martin's Super Markets, Inc. Yum! Brands, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Boscovs, Inc. IKEA North America Services, LLC Fleet and Farm of Green Bay Petsmart, Inc. Recreational Equipment, Inc. Express LLC National Restaurant Association Michaels Stores, Inc. WFM Northern Nevada, Inc. Stein Mart, Inc. Academy, Ltd. Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc. Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. Best Buy Co., Inc. Whole Food Company Mills Auto Center, Inc. Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. Lowe's Companies, Inc. Ashley Furniture Industries Inc. Retail Industry Leaders Association Whole Foods Market California, Inc. Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc. The Buckle, Inc. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Foot Locker, Inc. Beall's, Inc. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc. National Association of Convenience Stores Drury Hotels Company, LLC HMSHost Corporation RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc. The William Carter Company WFM Hawaii, Inc. Davids Bridal, Inc. Republic Services, Inc. P.C. Richard & Son, Inc. Sears Holdings Corporation Buc-ee's Ltd The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc. WFM-WO, Inc. Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc. Davids Bridal Canada Inc. The Gap, Inc. Kwik Trip, Inc. Official Payments Corporation Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC Barnes & Noble, Inc. Brookshire Grocery Company Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc. WFM Southern Nevada, Inc. Whole Foods Market Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc. Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc. Marathon Petroleum Company LP Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc. Dillard's, Inc., in case 15-1672 , [ # 167 ], ADDED.[1599687] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/16/2015 11:37 AM]
September 16, 2015 Filing 176 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Page Proof Brief, [171], on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED.[1599638] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/16/2015 11:20 AM]
September 15, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/15/2015 by CM/ECF. [1599159] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/15/2015 08:29 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 190 SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. [1601519] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/18/2015 09:47 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 172 AMICUS BRIEF, Home Depot Usa, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597958] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 05:01 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 171 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by 3rd party, CM/ECF. [1597955] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 04:58 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Home Depot USA, Inc. , FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597952] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 04:57 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 169 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597947] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 04:54 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC DBD, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc. American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. 7-Eleven, Inc. Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc. Willmar Motors, LLC National Grocers Association Mills Fleet Farm, Inc. Coborns Incorporated Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc. Speedway LLC Mills Motor, Inc. Martin's Super Markets, Inc. Yum! Brands, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Boscovs, Inc. IKEA North America Services, LLC Fleet and Farm of Green Bay Petsmart, Inc. Recreational Equipment, Inc. Express LLC National Restaurant Association Michaels Stores, Inc. WFM Northern Nevada, Inc. Stein Mart, Inc. Academy, Ltd. Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc. Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. Best Buy Co., Inc. Whole Food Company Mills Auto Center, Inc. Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. Lowe's Companies, Inc. Ashley Furniture Industries Inc. Retail Industry Leaders Association Whole Foods Market California, Inc. Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc. The Buckle, Inc. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Foot Locker, Inc. Beall's, Inc. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc. National Association of Convenience Stores Drury Hotels Company, LLC HMSHost Corporation RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc. The William Carter Company WFM Hawaii, Inc. Davids Bridal, Inc. Republic Services, Inc. P.C. Richard & Son, Inc. Sears Holdings Corporation Buc-ee's Ltd The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc. WFM-WO, Inc. Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc. Davids Bridal Canada Inc. The Gap, Inc. Kwik Trip, Inc. Official Payments Corporation Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC Barnes & Noble, Inc. Brookshire Grocery Company Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc. WFM Southern Nevada, Inc. Whole Foods Market Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc. Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc. Marathon Petroleum Company LP Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc. Dillard's, Inc , FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597841] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 04:05 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc. Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC DBD, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc. American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. 7-Eleven, Inc. Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc. Willmar Motors, LLC National Grocers Association Mills Fleet Farm, Inc. Coborns Incorporated Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc. Speedway LLC Mills Motor, Inc. Martin's Super Markets, Inc. Yum! Brands, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Boscovs, Inc. IKEA North America Services, LLC Fleet and Farm of Green Bay Petsmart, Inc. Recreational Equipment, Inc. Express LLC National Restaurant Association Michaels Stores, Inc. WFM Northern Nevada, Inc. Stein Mart, Inc. Academy, Ltd. Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc. Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. Best Buy Co., Inc. Whole Food Company Mills Auto Center, Inc. Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. Lowe's Companies, Inc. Ashley Furniture Industries Inc. Retail Industry Leaders Association Whole Foods Market California, Inc. Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc. The Buckle, Inc. Whole Foods Market Group, Inc. Foot Locker, Inc. Beall's, Inc. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc. National Association of Convenience Stores Drury Hotels Company, LLC HMSHost Corporation RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc. The William Carter Company WFM Hawaii, Inc. Davids Bridal, Inc. Republic Services, Inc. P.C. Richard & Son, Inc. Sears Holdings Corporation Buc-ee's Ltd The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc. WFM-WO, Inc. Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc. Davids Bridal Canada Inc. The Gap, Inc. Kwik Trip, Inc. Official Payments Corporation Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC Barnes & Noble, Inc. Brookshire Grocery Company Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc. WFM Southern Nevada, Inc. Whole Foods Market Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc. Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc. Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc. Marathon Petroleum Company LP Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc. Dillard's, Inc , FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597830] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 03:58 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 166 AMICUS BRIEF, Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons LLC, BI-LO LLC, CVS Health, Inc., H.E. Butt Grocery Co., HyVee, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Rite-Aid Corp., Safeway Inc., SuperValu, Inc., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597566] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 02:09 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 164 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc. Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc. OfficeMax Incorporated Saks Incorporated Office Depot, Incorporated Staples, Inc. Target Corporation American Signature, Inc. Ascena Retail Group, Inc. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. Chicos FAS, Inc. Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., , FILED. Service date 09/11/2015 by email.[1597252] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:31 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 163 ATTORNEY, Michael J. Canter for The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc. Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc. OfficeMax Incorporated Saks Incorporated Office Depot, Incorporated Staples, Inc. Target Corporation American Signature, Inc. Ascena Retail Group, Inc. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. Chicos FAS, Inc. Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., in case 15-1672 , [ # 150 ], ADDED.[1597245] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:29 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 162 NEW PARTY, Movant Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc., ADDED.[1597238] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:25 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 161 NEW PARTY, Movant American Signature, Inc., ADDED.[1597235] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:23 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 160 NEW PARTY, Movant Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., ADDED.[1597232] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:23 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 159 NEW PARTY, Movant Chicos FAS, Inc., ADDED.[1597230] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:22 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 158 NEW PARTY, Movant The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc., ADDED.[1597229] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:21 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 157 NEW PARTY, Movant Saks Incorporated, ADDED.[1597227] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:21 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 156 NEW PARTY, Movant OfficeMax Incorporated, ADDED.[1597225] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:20 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 155 NEW PARTY, Movant Abercrombie & Fitch Co., ADDED.[1597224] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:19 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 154 NEW PARTY, Movant Ascena Retail Group, Inc., ADDED.[1597222] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:18 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 153 NEW PARTY, Movant Office Depot, Incorporated, ADDED.[1597220] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:17 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 152 NEW PARTY, Movant Staples, Inc., ADDED.[1597219] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:17 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 151 NEW PARTY, Movant Target Corporation, ADDED.[1597218] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 11:16 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc. Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc. OfficeMax Incorporated Saks Incorporated Office Depot, Incorporated Staples, Inc. Target Corporation American Signature, Inc. Ascena Retail Group, Inc. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. Chicos FAS, Inc. Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597062] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 10:06 AM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc. Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc. OfficeMax Incorporated Saks Incorporated Office Depot, Incorporated Staples, Inc. Target Corporation American Signature, Inc. Ascena Retail Group, Inc. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. Chicos FAS, Inc. Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., FILED. Service date 09/14/2015 by CM/ECF. [1597050] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/14/2015 10:00 AM]
September 1, 2015 Filing 146 ATTORNEY, Robert Nicholson for United States of America, in case 15-1672 , [ # 145 ], ADDED.[1588892] [15-1672] [Entered: 09/01/2015 09:57 AM]
August 31, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/31/2015 by CM/ECF. [1588682] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/31/2015 04:46 PM]
August 11, 2015 Filing 139 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Keith Hylton, ADDED.[1573271] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:55 AM]
August 11, 2015 Filing 138 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae David J Teece, ADDED.[1573270] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:54 AM]
August 11, 2015 Filing 137 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Robert D Willig, ADDED.[1573268] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:53 AM]
August 11, 2015 Filing 136 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Joseph Gregory Sidak, ADDED.[1573266] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:52 AM]
August 10, 2015 Filing 135 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Joseph Gregory Sidak, Robert D Willig, David J Teece, Keith Hylton, FILED. Service date 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF. [1573083] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/10/2015 06:34 PM]
August 10, 2015 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Joseph Gregory Sidak, Robert D Willig, David J Teece, Keith Hylton, FILED. Service date 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF. [1573045] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/10/2015 05:17 PM]
August 5, 2015 Filing 133 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1569764] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/05/2015 01:06 PM]
August 4, 2015 Filing 132 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal document [ # 127 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., by RCW, Circuit Judge; FILED. [1568889][132] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/04/2015 02:56 PM]
August 3, 2015 Filing 140 SEALED PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1573276] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/11/2015 09:59 AM]
August 3, 2015 Filing 128 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/03/2015 by CM/ECF.[1568103] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/03/2015 09:43 PM]
August 3, 2015 Filing 127 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/03/2015 by CM/ECF. [1568102] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/03/2015 09:40 PM]
July 9, 2015 Filing 126 SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to file a deferred appendix pursuant to FRAP 30(c) and Local Rule 3.1 (c), FILED.[1549980] [15-1672] [Entered: 07/09/2015 12:39 PM]
July 8, 2015 Filing 123 NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: to file deferred appendix RECEIVED. Service date 07/08/2015 by CM/ECF.[1549038] [15-1672] [Entered: 07/08/2015 02:48 PM]
June 26, 2015 Filing 122 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [ # 112 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., by DC, FILED. [1541177][122] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/26/2015 10:05 AM]
June 22, 2015 Filing 120 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant' brief due date as 08/03/2015, appellee's brief due date as 09/14/2015,TRANSMITTED.[1538968] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/23/2015 05:00 PM]
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER, dated 06/22/2015, setting the following expedited briefing schedule: Appellants principal brief and the joint appendix are due August 3, 2015; Appellees answering brief is due September 14, 2015; and Appellants reply brief is due September 28, 2015. The appeal shall be calendared to be heard the week of November 23, 2015, or the first available week thereafter, FILED.[1537802] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/22/2015 04:16 PM]
June 19, 2015 Filing 112 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1536869] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/19/2015 04:40 PM]
June 19, 2015 Filing 111 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2015 by CM/ECF.[1536748] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/19/2015 03:52 PM]
June 19, 2015 Filing 110 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2015 by CM/ECF.[1536584] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/19/2015 02:31 PM]
June 17, 2015 Filing 109 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1534048] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/17/2015 08:05 AM]
June 16, 2015 Filing 105 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/16/2015, to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, ISSUED.[1533688] [15-1672]--[Edited 06/18/2015 by YL] [Entered: 06/16/2015 02:52 PM]
June 16, 2015 Filing 104 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to stay pending appeal [ # 17 ] filed by Appellants American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.; denying as moot motions to file amicus curiae brief [ # 79 ] [ # 80 ], [ # 89 ], by GC, DAL, GEL, FILED. [1533683][104] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/16/2015 02:49 PM]
June 11, 2015 Filing 96 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 58 ], on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/11/2015 by CM/ECF.[1530967][96] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/11/2015 07:29 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 90 LETTER, on behalf of Movant H.E. Butt Grocery Co., Albertsons LLC, HyVee, Inc., Safeway Inc., The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Walgreen Co., RECEIVED. Service date 06/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1528754] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/09/2015 07:06 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 89 MOTION for leave to file a memorandum as an amicus curiae in opposition to emergency motion to stay injunction pending appeal, on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co., FILED. Service date06/09/2015 by email, CM/ECF.[1528722] [15-1672]--[Edited 06/10/2015 by YL] [Entered: 06/09/2015 05:21 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 86 LETTER, on behalf of Movant 7-Eleven, Inc., Academy, Ltd., Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., American Eagle Outfitters, Inc., Ashley Furniture Industries Inc., Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Beall's, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Boscovs, Inc., Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC, Brookshire Grocery Company, Buc-ee's Ltd, Coborns Incorporated, Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc., Davids Bridal Canada Inc., Davids Bridal, Inc., DBD, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Drury Hotels Company, LLC, Express LLC, Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Green Bay, Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc., Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc., Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc., Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc., Foot Locker, Inc., HMSHost Corporation, IKEA North America Services, LLC, Kwik Trip, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Martin's Super Markets, Inc., Michaels Stores, Inc., Mills Auto Center, Inc., Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc., Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc., Mills Fleet Farm, Inc., Mills Motor, Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., National Association of Convenience Stores, National Grocers Association, National Restaurant Association, Official Payments Corporation, P.C. Richard & Son, Inc., Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Petsmart, Inc., RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Republic Services, Inc., Retail Industry Leaders Association, Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P., Sears Holdings Corporation, Speedway LLC, Stein Mart, Inc., Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited, The Buckle, Inc., The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc., The Gap, Inc., The William Carter Company, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., WFM Hawaii, Inc., WFM Northern Nevada, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc., WFM-WO, Inc., Whole Food Company, Whole Foods Market, Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Whole Foods Market Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc., Willmar Motors, LLC and Yum! Brands, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1528703] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/09/2015 04:55 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 84 LETTER, on behalf of Movant BI-LO LLC and Rite-Aid Corp., RECEIVED. Service date 06/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1528680] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/09/2015 04:42 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 83 LETTER, on behalf of Movant Home Depot USA, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1528669] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/09/2015 04:38 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 80 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, in opposition to the emergency motion to stay injunction pending appeal, on behalf of Movants CVS Health, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's and SuperValu, Inc., FILED. Service date06/09/2015 by CM/ECF.[1528398] [15-1672]--[Edited 06/09/2015 by YL] [Entered: 06/09/2015 03:16 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION, for leave to appear as amici curiae for the purpose of opposing the emergency motion to stay injunction pending appeal, on behalf of Movants CVS Health, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's and SuperValu, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/09/2015 by CM/ECF. [1528378] [15-1672]--[Edited 06/09/2015 by YL] [Entered: 06/09/2015 03:06 PM]
June 9, 2015 Filing 75 ATTORNEY, Rachel O. Davis, [ # 73 ], in place of attorney Margaret Q. Chapple, SUBSTITUTED.[1527495] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/09/2015 07:48 AM]
June 8, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State of Connecticut, FILED. Service date 06/08/2015 by CM/ECF. [1527388] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/08/2015 04:30 PM]
June 8, 2015 Filing 72 MOTION ORDER, Eric L. Bloom has filed a motion to appear pro hac vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED for the purpose of seeking leave to file opposition to the stay motion on behalf of Amici Curiae Merchants Rite Aid Corp. FILED. [1527242][72] [15-1672]--[Edited 06/08/2015 by MR] [Entered: 06/08/2015 03:23 PM]
June 8, 2015 Filing 69 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [64], [65], [67], [68], AMICUS BRIEF [66], on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co., FILED.[1526681] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/08/2015 09:57 AM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus 7-Eleven, Inc. et al, FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1526483] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 07:48 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus 7-Eleven, Inc. et al, FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1526482] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 07:45 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 66 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co., FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1526474] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 06:18 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Southwest Airlines Co., FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1526367] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 04:34 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Southwest Airlines Co., FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1526334] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 04:25 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 58 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to stay [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1526011] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 02:29 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 55 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, by Eric L. Bloom, Esq. as counsel for Amici Curiae Merchants, FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by US mail, email.[1525920] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 01:16 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Mitchell L. Gentile for State of Arizona, State of Nebraska, State of Connecticut, State of Vermont, State of Montana, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Idaho, State of Texas, State of Ohio, State of Illinois, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of New Hampshire, State of Rhode Island, in case 15-1672, [ # 53 ], ADDED.[1525781] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 12:09 PM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State of Arizona, State of Connecticut, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of Ohio, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Vermont, FILED. Service date 06/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1525761] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 11:59 AM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 51 ATTORNEY, Kevin J. Orsini for American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., in case 15-1672, [ # 49 ], ADDED.[1525439] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 09:15 AM]
June 5, 2015 Filing 50 ATTORNEY, Peter T. Barbur for American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., in case 15-1672, [ # 48 ], ADDED.[1525438] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/05/2015 09:14 AM]
June 4, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/04/2015 by CM/ECF. [1525397] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/04/2015 07:54 PM]
June 4, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/04/2015 by CM/ECF. [1525396] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/04/2015 07:51 PM]
June 4, 2015 Filing 47 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/04/2015 by CM/ECF.[1525395] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/04/2015 07:48 PM]
June 4, 2015 Filing 46 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/04/2015 by CM/ECF.[1525394] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/04/2015 07:47 PM]
June 4, 2015 Filing 45 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/04/2015 by CM/ECF.[1525393] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/04/2015 07:44 PM]
June 4, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice for the purpose of seeking leave to file opposition to the stay motion on behalf of Amici Curiae Merchants [ # 39 ] filed byPaul E. Slater, William J. Blechman, Richard Alan Arnold and James Almon [ # 38 ] [ # 37 ] [ # 35 ] FILED. [1524844][43] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/04/2015 11:57 AM]
June 3, 2015 Filing 36 ARGUMENT/SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1523506] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/03/2015 10:00 AM]
June 2, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, by James Almon, Esq. as counsel for Amici Curiae Merchants, FILED. Service date 06/02/2015 by US mail.[1523530] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/03/2015 10:10 AM]
June 2, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, by Richard Alan Arnold, Esq. as counsel for Amici Curiae Merchants, FILED. Service date 06/02/2015 by US mail, email.[1523523] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/03/2015 10:08 AM]
June 2, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, by William J. Blechman, Esq. as counsel for Amici Curiae Merchants, FILED. Service date 06/02/2015 by US mail.[1523518] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/03/2015 10:07 AM]
June 2, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, by Paul E. Slater, Esq. as counsel for Amici Curiae Merchants, FILED. Service date 06/02/2015 by email, US mail.[1523484] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/03/2015 09:52 AM]
May 29, 2015 Filing 32 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/29/2015, to EDNY(Brooklyn), ISSUED.[1520968] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/29/2015 04:19 PM]
May 29, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to stay [ # 17 ] filed by Appellant American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1520961][31] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/29/2015 04:17 PM]
May 27, 2015 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Kristen Ceara Limarzi for United States of America, in case 15-1672, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[1518355] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/27/2015 11:12 AM]
May 27, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/27/2015 by CM/ECF. [1518341] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/27/2015 11:08 AM]
May 26, 2015 Filing 17 EMERGENCY MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. and American Express Company, FILED. Service date 05/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1517914] [15-1672]--[Edited 05/27/2015 by YL] [Entered: 05/26/2015 06:37 PM]
May 26, 2015 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, James Joseph Fredricks for United States of America, in case 15-1672, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[1516979] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/26/2015 09:00 AM]
May 22, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1516802] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 03:10 PM]
May 22, 2015 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Shana Marie Wallace for United States of America, in case 15-1672, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[1516790] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:52 PM]
May 22, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1516780] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:48 PM]
May 22, 2015 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Nickolai G. Levin, [ # 1 ], in place of attorney Varuni Nelson, SUBSTITUTED.[1516717] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:06 PM]
May 22, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1516537] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 12:04 PM]
May 21, 2015 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1516714] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:04 PM]
May 21, 2015 Filing 7 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516713] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:04 PM]
May 21, 2015 Filing 6 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516712] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:03 PM]
May 21, 2015 Filing 5 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516710] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:02 PM]
May 21, 2015 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/19/2015, RECEIVED.[1516707] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:01 PM]
May 21, 2015 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., district court docket entry re: receipt # 0207-7759546, FILED.[1516697] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 01:55 PM]
May 21, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1516695] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 01:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. American Express Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael A. Carrier, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bridgestone Americas Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nestle Waters North America Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MorphoTrust USA, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SuperValu, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Einer R. Elhauge, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caleres, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence J. White
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas L. Greaney, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Spencer Weber Waller, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AutoNation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Roger Noll
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert D Willig
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Shubha Ghosh, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BJ's Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robin Feldman, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southwest Airlines Co.
Represented By: Alden L. Atkins Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Crestline Hotels & Resorts, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark R. Patterson, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Raley's
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert H. Lande, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HyVee, Inc.
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rite-Aid Corp.
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brookstone Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph Gregory Sidak, Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Meijer, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Carstensen, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fresh Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CoreLogic, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Centric Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fitness International, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Retail Federation
Represented By: Frank M. Lowrey Esq. IV
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harry First, Esq.
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eleanor M. Fox, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sears Holdings Management Corporation
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Albertsons LLC
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stephen Calkins, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The New York Times Company
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Big Sur Waterbeds, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: H.E. Butt Grocery Co.
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sofa Mart, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tesoro Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nespresso USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Norman W. Hawker, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tiffany and Company
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Denver Mattress Hospitality
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Frank M. Lowrey Esq. IV
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marina Lao, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David J Teece
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey Perloff
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John B. Kirkwood, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ralph Winter
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jack in the Box, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BI-LO LLC
Represented By: Eric L. Bloom Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Storage
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Consumer Action
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew Chin, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chris Sagers, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bally Total Fitness Corporation
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gregory T. Gundlach, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Darren Bush, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John M. Connor
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ahold U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: James Almon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lucky Brand LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Martin Gaynor
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WP Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ingram Micro, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph A. Stiglitz
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Keith Hylton
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Luxottica Retail North America Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States Public Interest Research Group
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas J. Horton, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alan S. Frankel
Represented By: Fields Alexander Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Martin Weber Esq. Jr.
Represented By: David W. Jones Esq.
Represented By: Lloyd Nolan Duck Esq. III
Represented By: Jeffrey John Angelovich Esq.
Represented By: Brian R. Strange Esq.
Represented By: Richard Eugene Norman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CVS Health, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas Grimes, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Festival Fun Parks, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Innovative Dining Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joshua P. Davis, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Herbert Hovenkamp, Law Professor
Represented By: David A. Balto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Discover Financial Services
Represented By: Elizabeth Petrela Papez Esq.
Represented By: Steffen Nathanael Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel McFadden
Represented By: Anthony Bolognese Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abercrombie & Fitch Co.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saks Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Buckle, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WFM Hawaii, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Whole Foods Market
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OfficeMax Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willmar Motors, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Foot Locker, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ashley Furniture Industries Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 7-Eleven, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Recreational Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martin's Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Frank M. Lowrey Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mills Motor, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Republic Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DBD, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yum! Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brookshire Grocery Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The William Carter Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet and Farm of Manitowoc, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michaels Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Office Depot, Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WFM Northern Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dillard's, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet Wholesale Supply of Fergus Falls, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Signature, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mills Fleet Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mills E-Commerce Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lord & Taylor Acquisitions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boscovs, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WFM Southern Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Target Corporation
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stein Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Academy, Ltd., DBA Academy Sports + Outdoors
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David's Bridal, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Bon-Ton Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brainerd Lively Auto, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mills Auto Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Eagle Outfitters, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet and Farm of Waupaca, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chico's FAS, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Gap, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Staples, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ascena Retail Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kwik Trip, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: P.C. Richard & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet and Farm of Alexandria, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Drury Hotels Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Buc-ee's Ltd
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WFM-WO, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet and Farm of Green Bay
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Leonardo Esq.
Represented By: John N. Thomas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sears Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Association of Convenience Stores
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Whole Foods Market Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Childrens Place Retail Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Official Payments Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: IKEA North America Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RaceTrac Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Retail Industry Leaders Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Express LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet and Farm of Plymouth, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet and Farm Supply Co. of West Bend, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HMSHost Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet and Farm of Menomonie, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Whole Food Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esq.
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael J. Canter Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Petsmart, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Davids Bridal Canada Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beall's, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pacific Sunwear of California, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Whole Foods Market California, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Grocers Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Restaurant Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mills Auto Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fleet Wholesale Supply Co. Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coborns Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Shinder Esq.
Represented By: Adam Owen Glist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Idaho
Represented By: Brett Delange Esq.
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Iowa
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Layne M. Lindebak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Ohio
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Texas
Represented By: David M. Ashton
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: David Anthony Rienzo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Arizona
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Abigail Stempson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Rachel O. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Missouri
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Anne E. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Victor John Domen Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Michigan
Represented By: D. J. Pascoe Esq.
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Kristen Ceara Limarzi
Represented By: Robert Nicholson
Represented By: Nickolai Gilford Levin
Represented By: James Joseph Fredricks
Represented By: Shana Marie Wallace Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Maryland
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Ellen S. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Illinois
Represented By: Chadwick O. Brooker
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Vermont
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Ryan Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Montana
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Chuck Munson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Utah
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Represented By: Ronald J. Ockey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Edmund F. Murray Esq.
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.
Search News [