Sullivan v. Barclays PLC
Defendant: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, HSBC Holdings PLC, John Does 1-50, Barclays PLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citibank, N.A., Deutsche Bank, AG, HSBC Bank PLC, Citigroup, Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. and DB Group Services (UK) Limited
Plaintiff / Appellee: California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., White Oak Fund LP and Stephen Sullivan, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: Societe Generale S.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Credit Agricole CIB, UBS AG, Credit Agricole S.A., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 19-2012
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Stephen Sullivan in 19-2012, FILED. Service date 08/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2638253] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:11 PM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, California State Teachers' Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 08/16/2019 by CM/ECF. [2635090] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/16/2019 05:43 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 08/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2632864] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:55 AM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, T. Jakob Sebrow for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 19-2012 T. Jakob Sebrow for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 19-1769 , [81], ADDED.[2631298] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:47 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631287] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:43 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 08/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2629553] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/12/2019 11:11 AM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 79 CAPTION, added Cross-Appellants and Cross-Appellees designations to all the parties on appeal, AMENDED.[2623315] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/02/2019 02:35 PM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 78 ATTORNEY, Peter Dexter St. Phillip Jr. for Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. Stephen Sullivan FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust White Oak Fund LP California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 19-2012, [ # 73 ], ADDED.[2614888] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:33 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 77 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 70 ], [ # 73 ], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, in case 19-2012, FILED.[2614886] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:32 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 76 ATTORNEY, Geoffrey M. Horn for Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust White Oak Fund LP California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 19-2012, [ # 72 ], ADDED.[2614881] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:29 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 75 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 69 ], [ # 72 ], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614875] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:27 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 74 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 68 ], [ # 71 ], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614846] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:19 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 07/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2614619] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:01 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 07/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2614615] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:59 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 71 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 07/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2614612] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:57 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 70 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [67], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614597] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:51 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 69 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [66], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614584] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:47 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 68 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [65], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614561] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:38 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2614330] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:45 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2614319] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:43 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 65 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2614311] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:40 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 63 ATTORNEY, Andrew Hammond for Credit Agricole S.A. Credit Agricole CIB, in case 19-2012, [ # 62 ], ADDED.[2614068] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:15 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Credit Agricole CIB and Credit Agricole S.A., FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2613969] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:12 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 61 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Credit Agricole CIB and Credit Agricole S.A., FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2613961] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:08 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 60 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Credit Agricole CIB and Credit Agricole S.A., FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2613959] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:08 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 59 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Credit Agricole CIB and Credit Agricole S.A., FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2613955] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:04 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 58 ATTORNEY, Stratton C. Strand, [ # 57 ], in place of attorney Benjamin H. Torrance, SUBSTITUTED.[2613886] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:21 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of United States of America in 19-2012, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2613779] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:05 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 55 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2613268] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:51 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 51 ], ADDED.[2613267] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:51 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 53 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2613264] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:50 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 52 ATTORNEY, Tawfiq Saifee Rangwala for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 50 ], ADDED.[2613259] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:47 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2613258] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:47 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2613254] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:45 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 49 ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 48 ], ADDED.[2613252] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:44 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2613239] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:37 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2613175] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:07 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 45 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612903] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:41 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, in case 19-2012, [ # 42 ], ADDED.[2612897] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:37 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 43 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612892] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:34 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2612883] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:25 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 41 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612873] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:19 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser, [ # 39 ], in place of attorney Fraser L. Hunter in case 19-2012, SUBSTITUTED.[2612861] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:05 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2612857] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:01 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for UBS AG, in case 19-2012, [ # 36 ], ADDED.[2612746] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:52 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2612737] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:50 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 35 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612729] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:47 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 34 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612724] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:46 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612719] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:43 AM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 30 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612326] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:54 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 29 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant ICAP plc and ICAP Europe Limited, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612325] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:52 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, H. Rowan Gaither IV for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 19-2012, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2612177] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:35 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2612044] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:34 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc in 19-2012, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612031] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:29 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM D, [ # 2611006-2 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellant Credit Agricole S.A. in 19-2012, FILED.[2611936] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:45 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM C, [ # 2610992-2 ], [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A. in 19-2012, FILED.[2611933] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:44 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2611918] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:36 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2611911] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:30 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Societe Generale S.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2611896] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:23 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Steven Wolowitz for Societe Generale S.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2611892] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:21 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2611862] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:00 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2611858] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:56 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2611854] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:54 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2611849] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:52 PM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A. in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2607695] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:12 PM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A. in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2607682] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:08 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Nicole Saharsky, [ # 14 ], in place of attorney Steven Wolowitz, SUBSTITUTED.[2611888] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:18 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A. in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2606489] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/11/2019 06:08 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, informing Court of proposed due date 09/27/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2605537] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/11/2019 10:35 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTE: See lead case, 19-1769, containing complete set of docket entries.[2601074] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:59 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2601069] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:58 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole CIB, Credit Agricole S.A., ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP plc, Societe Generale S.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC and UBS AG in 19-2012, district court receipt # BNYSDC-17164578, FILED.[2601067] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:57 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2601062] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:55 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole CIB, Credit Agricole S.A., ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP plc, Societe Generale S.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC and UBS AG in 19-2012, FILED. [2601056] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Barclays PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Group Services (UK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: California State Teachers' Retirement System
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: White Oak Fund LP
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stephen Sullivan, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Societe Generale S.A.
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Represented By: Nicole A. Saharsky Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Calica Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Represented By: Fraser L. Hunter Esq. Jr.
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Credit Agricole CIB
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UBS AG
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Credit Agricole S.A.
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Represented By: David R. Gelfand Esq.
Represented By: Tawfiq Saifee Rangwala Esq.
Represented By: Mark D. Villaverde Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Hora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ICAP Europe Limited
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ICAP plc
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Stratton Christopher Strand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?