Darek Kitlinski v. DOJ
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, OTHER UNNAMED EMPLOYEES OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION AND OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, JOSE FERNANDO RAMON, Special Agent, Office of Professional Responsibility, Drug Enforcement Administration, LORETTA E. LYNCH, Attorney General, U.S Department of Justice and DONNA A. RODRIGUEZ, a/k/a Donna Ashe, Section Chief, Research and Analysis Staff of the Human Resources Divison Drug Enforcement Administration
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, Drug Enforcement Administration As to Privacy Act Claims and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAREK J. KITLINSKI and LISA M. KITLINSKI
Case Number: 19-1621
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed [1000556854] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ] Number of days granted: 42. Opening brief and appendix due 09/16/2019. Response brief due 10/16/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1621] AW [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:04 PM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Darek J. Kitlinski and Lisa M. Kitlinski to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until September 16, 2019.. Date and method of service: 07/30/2019 ecf. [1000556629] [19-1621] Jackie White [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:52 AM]
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/05/2019. Response Brief due 09/04/2019 [19-1621] AW [Entered: 06/26/2019 10:25 AM]
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Darek J. Kitlinski and Lisa M. Kitlinski. [19-1621] Kevin Byrnes [Entered: 06/26/2019 10:21 AM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Lisa M. Kitlinski. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000536797] [19-1621] Kevin Byrnes [Entered: 06/25/2019 05:28 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin E. Byrnes for Darek J. Kitlinski and Lisa M. Kitlinski. [1000535514] [19-1621] Kevin Byrnes [Entered: 06/24/2019 01:25 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Darek J. Kitlinski and Lisa M. Kitlinski. [1000535511] [19-1621] Kevin Byrnes [Entered: 06/24/2019 01:24 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Darek J. Kitlinski and Lisa M. Kitlinski. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000535509] [19-1621] Kevin Byrnes [Entered: 06/24/2019 01:23 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rebecca S. Levenson for William P. Barr and DOJ. [1000533317] [19-1621] Rebecca Levenson [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:45 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kimere J. Kimball for William P. Barr and DOJ. [1000533283] [19-1621] Kimere Kimball [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:30 PM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00060-LO-IDD.. [19-1621] AW [Entered: 06/12/2019 10:28 AM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00060-LO-IDD. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1621] AW [Entered: 06/12/2019 10:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darek Kitlinski v. DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, Drug Enforcement Administration As to Privacy Act Claims
Represented By: Rebecca Sara Levenson
Represented By: Kimere Jane Kimball
Represented By: R. Joseph Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Rebecca Sara Levenson
Represented By: Kimere Jane Kimball
Represented By: R. Joseph Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAREK J. KITLINSKI
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Represented By: Jackie Lynn White Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA M. KITLINSKI
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Represented By: Jackie Lynn White Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTHER UNNAMED EMPLOYEES OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION AND OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE FERNANDO RAMON, Special Agent, Office of Professional Responsibility, Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTA E. LYNCH, Attorney General, U.S Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA A. RODRIGUEZ, a/k/a Donna Ashe, Section Chief, Research and Analysis Staff of the Human Resources Divison Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?