In re: Philip Berger
Petitioner: In re: PHILIP E. BERGER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate and TIMOTHY K. MOORE, in his official capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives
Case Number: 19-2056
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 34 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John C. Ulin for Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP and High Point NAACP. [1000601008] [19-2056] John Ulin [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:36 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 33 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew Tutt for Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. [1000600992] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:31 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 11 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-2056] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:18 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 31 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen K. Wirth for Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP and High Point NAACP. [1000600539] [19-2056] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:08 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 11 ], notice requesting response [ # 12 ]. [19-2056] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:20 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 29 Corrected CERTIFICATE/SERVICE LIST by Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. Related documents: [ # 13 ] appearance of counsel [19-2056] Haley Proctor [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:06 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598707] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:42 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Stokes County Branch of the NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598705] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:41 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598704] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:40 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Moore County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598703] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:39 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by High Point NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598702] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:38 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Greensboro NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598701] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:37 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598700] [19-2056] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:36 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amar Majmundar for Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. [1000598363] [19-2056] Amar Majmundar [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:21 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul M. Cox for Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. [1000598362] [19-2056] Paul Cox [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:19 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ken Raymond. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598360] [19-2056] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:18 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Damon Circosta. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598359] [19-2056] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:17 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jefferson Carmon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598356] [19-2056] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:16 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by David C. Black. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598355] [19-2056] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:16 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Stella Anderson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000598354] [19-2056] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:15 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Olga E. Vysotskaya de Brito for Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. [1000598353] [19-2056] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:14 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Haley N. Proctor for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000598049] [19-2056] Haley Proctor [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:43 AM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE ISSUED to Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Damon Circosta, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Ken Raymond, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 11 ]. Response due: 10/03/2019. [1000597413] [19-2056] AB [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:58 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000597347] [19-2056] David Thompson [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:20 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicole F. Reaves for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000597338] [19-2056] Nicole Frazer Reaves [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:15 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Peter A. Patterson for Timothy K. Moore and Philip E. Berger. [1000597328] [19-2056] Peter Patterson [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:12 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicole J. Moss for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000597321] [19-2056] Nicole Moss [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:10 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael W. Kirk for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000597314] [19-2056] Michael Kirk [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:07 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David H. Thompson for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000597307] [19-2056] David Thompson [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:05 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 3 ] Motion for writ of mandamus. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA. Mailed to: Ralf Dunn, Haley Proctor, and Caitlin Swain-McSurely. [19-2056] CH [Entered: 09/30/2019 09:44 AM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA. Case manager: CHalupa. [19-2056] CH [Entered: 09/27/2019 04:01 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore for stay pending appeal. Date and method of service: 09/26/2019 ecf. [1000597411] [19-2056] AB [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:56 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic filing fee paid. Filing Fee:$500.00. Receipt Number: A04-68164-108. [19-2056]--[Edited 09/27/2019 by CH] CH [Entered: 09/27/2019 04:04 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Petition for writ of mandamus filed by Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [19-2056] CH [Entered: 09/27/2019 04:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Philip Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: PHILIP E. BERGER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Nathan A. Huff
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Haley Marie Nix Proctor
Represented By: Michael William Kirk
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TIMOTHY K. MOORE, in his official capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Nathan A. Huff
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Haley Marie Nix Proctor
Represented By: Michael William Kirk
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?