In re: American E-Liquid
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his Official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services, NORMAN E. SHARPLESS, in his Official capacity as Commissioner of Food and Drugs, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR RESPIRATORY CARE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and SCOTT GOTTLIEB, in his Official capacity as Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Appellant: ARIZONA SMOKE FREE BUSINESS ALLIANCE, AMERICAN VAPING ASSOCIATION, OHIO VAPOR TRADE ASSOCIATION, KENTUCKY SMOKE FREE ASSOCIATION, IOWANS FOR ALTERNATIVE TO SMOKING AND TOBACCO, SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- RHODE ISLAND, SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- TEXAS, TENNESSEE SMOKE FREE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS VAPOR COALITION, SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- CALIFORNIA, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, SMOKE FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION, SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- LOUISIANA, SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- HAWAII, NEW YORK STATE VAPOR ASSOCIATION, SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- CONNECTICUT, SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- WISCONSIN, INDIANA SMOKE FREE ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN E-LIQUID MANUFACTURING STANDARDS ASSOCIATION, MARYLAND VAPOR ALLIANCE and In re: AMERICAN E-LIQUID MANUFACTURING STANDARDS ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, TRUTH INITIATIVE, LEAH BRASCH, LINDA GOLDSTEIN, STEVEN HIRSCH, CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO-FREE KIDS, CYNTHIA FISHMAN, DAVID MYLES, MARYLAND CHAPTER- AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION and AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Amicus Curiae: MICHAEL SIEGEL, STATE OF MARYLAND, WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION, CONSUMER ADVOCATES FOR SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES ASSOCIATION and MARYLAND ASSOCIATION OF COUNTY HEALTH OFFICERS
Case Number: 19-2242
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 144 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Letter re: Defendants' letter dated August 5, 2020 by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 . [1000794101] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242]--[Edited 08/18/2020 by KH] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 08/17/2020 04:43 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 143 Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 135 ] unpublished per curiam Opinion, [ # 136 ] Judgment Order. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-00883-PWG. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 07/08/2020 07:28 AM]
June 30, 2020 Filing 142 COURT ORDER filed denying Motion for rehearing [ # 137 ] Copies to all parties. [1000766182] [19-2242] KH [Entered: 06/30/2020 08:36 AM]
June 30, 2020 Filing 141 COURT ORDER filed denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [ # 139 ] Copies to all parties.. [1000766172] [19-2130] KH [Entered: 06/30/2020 08:27 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 140 Letter re: withdrawal of counsel by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 . [1000762915] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 06/23/2020 04:42 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 139 PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Raffman [Entered: 06/18/2020 04:59 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 138 Mandate stayed pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] JR [Entered: 05/22/2020 03:43 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 137 PETITION for rehearing by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2242. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 05/22/2020 03:30 PM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 136 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed in part, dismissed in part. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-00883-PWG. Entered on Docket Date: 05/04/2020. [1000732412] Copies to all parties and the district court. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 05/04/2020 07:38 AM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 135 UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-00883-PWG. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000732407]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 05/04/2020 07:33 AM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 134 Letter re: [ # 133 ] court Order by FDA, Norman E. Sharpless, Alex M. Azar, II and Department of Health and Human Services in 19-2198 . [1000727890] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 04/24/2020 04:01 PM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 133 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to remand case for limited purpose [ # 126 ] Status report due May 21, 2020. Copies to all parties. [1000725426] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 04/21/2020 03:08 PM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 132 Letter re: Proceedings in D.D.C. by FDA, Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 . [1000724199] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:49 AM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 131 REPLY by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA, Norman E. Sharpless and Scott Gottlieb in 19-2198 to response [ # 127 ], response [ # 129 ], response [ # 130 ].. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 04/15/2020 12:13 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 130 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132 to Motion to remand case for limited purpose [ # 126 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 04/10/2020 08:56 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 129 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to notice requesting response [ # 128 ], Motion [ # 126 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 04/10/2020 04:53 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE ISSUED to American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles, Truth Initiative and American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2130, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association, Texas Vapor Coalition and American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 requesting response to Motion to remand case for limited purpose [ # 126 ] Response due: 04/10/2020.[1000715206]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 04/06/2020 07:55 AM]
April 4, 2020 Filing 127 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130 to Motion to remand case for limited purpose [ # 126 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Michael Edney [Entered: 04/04/2020 10:12 AM]
April 3, 2020 Filing 126 MOTION by FDA, Norman E. Sharpless, Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2198 to remand case for limited purpose [4cca retains jurisdiction]. Date and method of service: 04/03/2020 ecf. [1000715115] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 04/03/2020 07:16 PM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 125 Letter re: [ # 122 ] letter by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132 . [1000714455] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 04/02/2020 09:40 PM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 124 Letter re: [ # 122 ] letter, [ # 123 ] letter by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 . [1000714421] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 04/02/2020 05:08 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 123 Letter re: [ # 122 ] letter by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130 . [1000713713] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Michael Edney [Entered: 04/01/2020 06:11 PM]
March 30, 2020 Filing 122 Letter re: Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) motion filed in district court by FDA, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2198 . [1000711999] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 03/30/2020 06:18 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 121 ORAL ARGUMENT (Video Conference) heard before the Honorable G. Steven Agee, Stephanie D. Thacker and Allison J. Rushing. Attorneys arguing case: Mark Steven Raffman for Appellant Cigar Association of America, Jeffrey B. Dubner for Appellees American Heart Association, American Lung Association, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Academy of Pediatrics, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Truth Initiative, Dr. Leah Brasch, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch and Dr. David Myles and Joshua Revesz for none Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2130, Dr. Eric P. Gotting for Appellants RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, American Vaping Association, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Tennessee Smoke Free Association, Texas Vapor Coalition, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas and Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Jeffrey B. Dubner for Appellees American Heart Association, American Lung Association, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Academy of Pediatrics, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Truth Initiative, Dr. Leah Brasch, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch and Dr. David Myles and Joshua Revesz for none Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2132, Joshua Revesz for Appellants Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Alex M. Azar, II and Jeffrey B. Dubner for Appellees American Heart Association, American Lung Association, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Academy of Pediatrics, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Truth Initiative, Dr. Leah Brasch, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch and Dr. David Myles in 19-2198, Dr. Eric P. Gotting for Appellants RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, American Vaping Association, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Tennessee Smoke Free Association, Texas Vapor Coalition, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas and Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Jeffrey B. Dubner for Appellees American Heart Association, American Lung Association, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Academy of Pediatrics, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Truth Initiative, Dr. Leah Brasch, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch and Dr. David Myles and Joshua Revesz for none Department of Health and Human Services, FDA, Alex M. Azar, II and Scott Gottlieb in 19-2242. Courtroom Deputy: Joseph Coleman. [1000704486] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] JLC [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:54 AM]
March 17, 2020 Filing 120 Letter re: [ # 119 ] court Order by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 . [1000704006] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 03/17/2020 04:06 PM]
March 13, 2020 Filing 119 COURT ORDER filed re: oral argument on March 18, 2020. Copies to all parties. [1000702145] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] CP [Entered: 03/13/2020 04:57 PM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 118 Letter re: the Court's March 9, 2020 Order by FDA, Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 . [1000700785] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:27 AM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 117 Letter re: the Court's March 9, 2020 by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 . [1000700436] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 03/11/2020 04:57 PM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 116 COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to file amicus curiae brief by Public Health Law Center et al.[ # 91 ] Copies to all parties. [1000700422] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] AW [Entered: 03/11/2020 04:37 PM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 115 Calendar notice sent.. Nature of notice: Request for information - March 17 - 20, 2020 session. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] JLC [Entered: 03/09/2020 04:57 PM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 113 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130 to Motion [ # 91 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Raffman [Entered: 03/04/2020 06:02 PM]
March 2, 2020 Filing 112 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132. Counsel arguing: Eric P. Gotting Opening argument time: 10 minutes Rebuttal argument time: 2 minutes . [1000694034] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:21 PM]
March 2, 2020 Filing 111 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 03/02/2020 01:43 PM]
March 2, 2020 Filing 110 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Maryland Association of County Health Officers in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 03/02/2020 01:19 PM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 108 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kathleen Susan Hoke for Maryland Association of County Health Officers in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000693320] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Kathleen Hoke [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:55 PM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 107 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Maryland Association of County Health Officers in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 requesting additional copies of brief(s). Additional copies due 03/02/2020 [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:03 PM]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER filed granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 95 ]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? N. Copies to all parties. [1000693204] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 03:52 PM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 104 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to notice requesting response [ # 97 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:13 PM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 102 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to State of Maryland and State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 requesting additional copies of brief(s).. Additional copies due 03/02/2020 [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:49 AM]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER filed granting amicus curiae brief [ # 90 ] in 19-2130 Copies to all parties. [1000692851] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:40 AM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 99 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Maryland Association of County Health Officers in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 03/02/2020 from Kathleen Susan Hoke.. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 10:25 AM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE ISSUED to Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130 requesting response to Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 91 ] Response due: 03/04/2020.[1000692778]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:54 AM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE ISSUED to American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 requesting response to Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 95 ]Response due: 03/04/2020..[1000692772]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:48 AM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 114 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 92 ] by American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, AMA, American Public Health Association, American Thoracic Society, Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care and Action on Smoking and Health, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, AMA, American Public Health Association, American Thoracic Society, Americans for Nonsmokers' Rights, Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association, National African American Tobacco Prevention Network, Inc., National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, National Medical Association and Public Health Law Center in 19-2130, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, AMA, American Public Health Association, American Thoracic Society, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, National Medical Association, Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association and Action on Smoking and Health, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, AMA, American Public Health Association, American Thoracic Society, Americans for Nonsmokers' Rights, Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association, National African American Tobacco Prevention Network, Inc., National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, National Medical Association and Public Health Law Center in 19-2132, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, AMA, American Public Health Association, American Thoracic Society, Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association, National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, National Medical Association and Action on Smoking and Health, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, AMA, American Public Health Association, American Thoracic Society, Americans for Nonsmokers' Rights, Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association, National African American Tobacco Prevention Network, Inc., National Association for the Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, National Medical Association and Public Health Law Center in 19-2198, 19-2242. Number of pages: [40]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/02/2020. [1000696530] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 03/05/2020 01:19 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 101 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 90 ] by State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. . Number of pages: [20]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/28/2020. [1000692946] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:47 AM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 109 Receipt of paper copy of REPLY BRIEF filed at [ # 94 ] by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132, 19-2242. Number of pages: [43]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of Copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 03/02/2020. [1000693863] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 03/02/2020 01:04 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 103 Receipt of paper copy of REPLY BRIEF filed at [ # 93 ] by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless and FDA in 19-2198. Number of pages: [33]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of Copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 02/28/2020. [1000692977] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242]--[Edited 02/28/2020 by MFT] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 12:13 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 94 BRIEF by Cigar Association of America, Premium Cigar Association, Cigar Rights of America and American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Maryland Vapor Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, New York State Vapor Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2130, Cigar Rights of America, Indiana Smoke Free Association and American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Maryland Vapor Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, New York State Vapor Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132, Cigar Association of America, Premium Cigar Association, Cigar Rights of America, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Maryland Vapor Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, New York State Vapor Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2198, 19-2242 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000692560] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Raffman [Entered: 02/27/2020 08:45 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 93 BRIEF by FDA, Norman E. Sharpless, Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2198 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/28/2020. [1000692415] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 02/27/2020 03:38 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 92 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Public Health Law Center et al., amici curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/28/2020. [1000692332] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Rachel Bloomekatz [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:50 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION by Public Health Law Center et al., proposed amici curiae to file amicus curiae brief without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 02/27/2020 ecf. [1000692319] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Rachel Bloomekatz [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:46 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 90 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/28/2020. [1000691793] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Sarah Rice [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:29 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 106 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 89 ] by Maryland Association of County Health Officers in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. . Number of pages: [15]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/28/2020. [1000693215] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:02 PM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION by Maryland Association of County Health Officers in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to file amicus curiae brief without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 02/26/2020 ecf. [1000692755] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:30 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 89 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Maryland Association of County Health Officers; Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/27/2020. [1000691591] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Kathleen Hoke [Entered: 02/26/2020 05:09 PM]
February 21, 2020 Filing 87 Calendar notice sent.. Nature of notice: New argment start time. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] JLC [Entered: 02/21/2020 04:38 PM]
February 21, 2020 Filing 86 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for additional argument time [ # 80 ] Total time granted: Industry Appellants: 20 minutes, Government Appellants: 20 minutes, Appellees: 20 minutes. Copies to all parties. [1000688120] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/21/2020 02:13 PM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 88 Receipt of paper copy of RESPONSE BRIEF filed at [ # 84 ] by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. Number of pages: [116]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/24/2020. [1000691096] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] JR [Entered: 02/26/2020 11:02 AM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 84 BRIEF by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/21/2020. [1000687453] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:23 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 83 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to file corrected document [ # 79 ] Description of corrected document: corrected appendix. Copies to all parties. [1000684824] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/18/2020 12:25 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to notice requesting response [ # 81 ], Motion [ # 80 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Nitin Shah [Entered: 02/18/2020 10:20 AM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE ISSUED to American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 requesting response to Motion for additional argument time [ # 80 ]Response due: 02/19/2020.[1000683821].. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:34 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION by FDA, Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 for additional argument time Total time requested: 20 minutes for industry appellants, 20 minutes for government appellants, and 20 minutes for appelles.. Date and method of service: 02/14/2020 ecf. [1000683710] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:42 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 85 Receipt of paper copy of CORRECTED APPENDIX filed at [ # 78 ] by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless and FDA in 19-2198. Total number of volumes: [4]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [919]. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 02/16/2020. [1000687810] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/21/2020 09:50 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 to file a corrected document Description of corrected document: Corrected Appendix. Date and method of service: 02/13/2020 ecf. [1000683225] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:35 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 78 Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/14/2020. [1000682781] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:22 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 77 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Michael Siegel in 19-2132,19-2242 re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Michael Siegel on 02/14/2020. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242]--[Edited 02/11/2020 by KH] KH [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:31 AM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 74 COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 57 ] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 47 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 46 ]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? N. Copies to all parties. [1000680184] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/10/2020 04:02 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 73 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Washington Legal Foundation in 19-2132, 19-2242. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/06/2020 02:58 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 72 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven M. Sullivan for State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000678295] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Steven Sullivan [Entered: 02/06/2020 01:25 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 70 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association, Texas Vapor Coalition, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association and RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION in 19-2132. Counsel arguing: Eric Gotting . [1000677847] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:09 AM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to notice requesting response [ # 50 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 02/04/2020 12:38 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 65 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. Counsel arguing: Jeffrey B. Dubner . [1000676079] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 02/04/2020 12:35 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 64 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Washington Legal Foundation in 19-2132, 19-2242 requesting additional copies of amicus curiae brief(s). Additional copies due 02/07/2020 [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/04/2020 12:26 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 63 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by FDA, Norman E. Sharpless, Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2198. Counsel arguing: Joshua Revesz . [1000675880] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:05 AM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE/ANSWER by FDA, Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 to notice requesting response [ # 50 ], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 47 ], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 46 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 02/04/2020 10:47 AM]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER filed granting filing of amicus curiae brief by Washington Legal Foundation. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [1000675798] [19-2132, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/04/2020 10:17 AM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to exceed length limitations for response/answer. Date and method of service: 02/03/2020 ecf. [1000675450] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 02/03/2020 04:43 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 56 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130. Counsel arguing: Mark S. Raffman . [1000674863] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Raffman [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:00 AM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cigar Association of America, Premium Cigar Association and Cigar Rights of America in 19-2130 to notice requesting response [ # 50 ], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 46 ], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 47 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Raffman [Entered: 02/03/2020 10:45 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 69 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Michael Siegel in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000676893] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:53 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 68 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000676888] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:51 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 54 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Docket correction requested from State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242]--[Edited 02/05/2020 by KH-issued in error] KH [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:29 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE ISSUED to Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America, Premium Cigar Association and American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2132, Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless, FDA, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles, Truth Initiative and Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2198, 19-2242 requesting response to Motion to file amicus curiae brief by Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association [ # 46 ], Motion to file amicus curiae brief by Michael Siegel.[ # 47 ] Response due: 02/04/2020.[1000673492]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:04 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 48 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 03/18/2020. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 10 days. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] JLC [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:07 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION by Michael Siegel in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 Keith D. Price to file amicus curiae brief without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 01/30/2020 ecf. [1000673269] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242]--[Edited 01/30/2020 by KH-docket text modified] Keith Price [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:36 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION by Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 Keith D. Price to file amicus curiae brief without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 01/30/2020 ecf. [1000673265] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Keith Price [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:30 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 45 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Keith D. Price for Consumer Advocates for Smoke-Free Alternatives Association in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000673263] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Keith Price [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:25 PM]
January 28, 2020 Filing 61 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 44 ] by Washington Legal Foundation in 19-2132, 19-2242. Number of pages: [30]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 01/30/2020. [1000675811] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/04/2020 10:26 AM]
January 28, 2020 Filing 44 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Washington Legal Foundation in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/28/2020. [1000670999] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Cory Andrews [Entered: 01/28/2020 09:09 AM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 42 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nitin Shah for American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000669189] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Nitin Shah [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:28 AM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 53 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 38 ] by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132, Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless and FDA in 19-2198, 19-2242. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [4]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [883]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 01/24/2020. [1000673603] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:25 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 52 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 39 ] by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless and FDA in 19-2198. Number of pages: [70]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 01/24/2020. [1000673592] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:03 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 51 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 41 ] by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132, 19-2242. Number of pages: [81]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 01/27/2020. [1000673581] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:56 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Maryland Vapor Alliance, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, New York State Vapor Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Texas Vapor Coalition and Tennessee Smoke Free Association in 19-2132 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/24/2020. [1000668808] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Raffman [Entered: 01/23/2020 08:34 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 40 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sean Lev for American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000668688] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Sean Lev [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:17 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 39 BRIEF by FDA, Norman E. Sharpless, Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2198 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/24/2020. [1000668593] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 01/23/2020 03:45 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 38 Corrected JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/23/2020. [1000668102] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 01/23/2020 11:28 AM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 37 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Docket correction requested from State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242]--[Edited 02/05/2020 by KH-issued in error] KH [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:13 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 36 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by FDA, Norman E. Sharpless, Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II in 19-2198. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/23/2020. [1000667351] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242]--[Edited 02/04/2020 by KH- See ECF 68] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:10 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 35 Accelerated BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Briefs and Appendix due 01/23/2020. Response Brief due 02/20/2020. Reply Brief due 02/27/2020. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] AB [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:09 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 34 COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to stay pending appeal [ # 11 ], denying Motion for stay of judgment pending appeal [ # 1000644865-2 ]; denying Motion for separate briefs [ # 15 ]; granting Motion to expedite consideration on the merits [ # 11 ]; granting Motion for leave to file an amicus brief [ # 29 ]; granting Motion to extend word counts of opening and reply briefs [ # 15 ]; denying as moot Motion to extend briefing schedule [ # 32 ]; scheduling oral argument; rescinding briefing schedule issued on January 13, 2020. Argument Date or Session: March 18, 2020. Copies to all parties. [1000666264] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] AB [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:52 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Tennessee Smoke Free Association, Texas Vapor Coalition and Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin in 19-2130 to Motion [ # 32 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 01/21/2020 02:05 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to extend filing time for response/reply brief until March 23, 2020 for response briefs, and April 20, 2020 for reply briefs... Date and method of service: 01/21/2020 ecf. [1000665820] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:25 AM]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 30 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 02/13/2020. Response brief due 03/16/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000661049] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 01/13/2020 01:37 PM]
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION by Cigar Association of America in 19-2130, 19-2198 to extend filing time for opening brief.. Date and method of service: 01/13/2020 ecf. [1000660519] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Raffman [Entered: 01/13/2020 08:48 AM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 71 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 67 ] by State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. . Number of pages: [13]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 02/06/2020. [1000677973] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:56 AM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 67 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000676874] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:47 AM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION by State of Maryland in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to file amicus curiae brief without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 01/07/2020 ecf. [1000657604] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Steven Sullivan [Entered: 01/07/2020 07:43 PM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132 to response [ # 20 ].. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 01/07/2020 06:43 PM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY by Cigar Association of America, Cigar Rights of America and Premium Cigar Association in 19-2130, American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132 to response [ # 25 ].. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 01/07/2020 02:49 PM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 26 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dennis A. Henigan for American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000657045] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Dennis Henigan [Entered: 01/07/2020 12:21 PM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242 to notice requesting response [ # 19 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] JQ [Entered: 01/06/2020 07:00 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198. [1000654202]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:43 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE re: Intent to File Reply by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:36 AM]
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE/ANSWER by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2132, 19-2242 to Motion [ # 11 ], Motion [ # 11 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-2132, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 12/31/2019 05:07 PM]
December 31, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 to notice requesting response [ # 12 ], Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 11 ], Motion to expedite decision [ # 11 ], Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 1000644865-2 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 12/31/2019 02:01 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE ISSUED to American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2198 requesting response to Motion to file separate brief [ # 15 ], Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 15 ] Response due 01/06/2020.[1000652244]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:49 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Norman E. Sharpless in 19-2198 to notice requesting response [ # 16 ], Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 15 ], Motion to file separate brief [ # 15 ]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:47 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark. E. Greenwold for American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000651785] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Mark Greenwold [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:31 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE ISSUED to Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless and FDA in 19-2198 requesting response to Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 15 ], Motion to file separate brief [ # 15 ] Response due 01/06/2020.[1000651671]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:01 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association, Texas Vapor Coalition, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association and RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION in 19-2132, 19-2242 to exceed length limitations for brief , to file separate briefs [15]. Date and method of service: 12/23/2019 ecf. [1000651111] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:52 PM]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ] in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2242 Number of days granted: 8. [ # 12 ] in 19-2130 Response due 12/31/2019. Copies to all parties. [1000647775] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] DL [Entered: 12/18/2019 03:29 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2242 to extend filing time for response until January 6, 2020.. Date and method of service: 12/18/2019 ecf. [1000647666] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2242] Jeffrey Dubner [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:23 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE ISSUED to American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Norman E. Sharpless, FDA and American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2198, 19-2242 requesting response to Motion to expedite decision [ # 11 ], Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 11 ], Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 1000644865-2 ] Response due: 12/23/2019.[1000644924]. [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 12/16/2019 08:04 AM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition in 19-2132 for stay pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:May 15, 2019, July 12, 2019. , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 12/13/2019 ecf. [1000644857] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 12/13/2019 06:54 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua Revesz for Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, FDA and Scott Gottlieb in 19-2198. [1000644555] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Joshua Revesz [Entered: 12/13/2019 02:28 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/14/2020. Response Brief due 02/13/2020 [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 12/05/2019 02:23 PM]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion to amend/correct [ # 1000617869-2 ] in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198 Copies to all parties. [1000639112] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 12/05/2019 02:20 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Swati Rawani for American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, Dr. Leah Brasch, Campaign For Tobacco-Free Kids, Dr. Cynthia Fishman, Dr. Linda Goldstein, Dr. Steven Hirsch, Dr. David Myles and Truth Initiative in 19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242. [1000627189] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] Swati Rawani [Entered: 11/15/2019 01:41 PM]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed consolidating case 19-2242 with 19-2130(L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Michelle Bennett, Mark Greenwold, Swati Rawani. [1000625343] [19-2130, 19-2132, 19-2198, 19-2242] KH [Entered: 11/13/2019 01:51 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition. [19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 11/11/2019 02:31 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000623562] [19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 11/11/2019 02:29 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eric P. Gotting for American E-Liquid Manufacturing Standards Association, American Vaping Association, Arizona Smoke Free Business Alliance, Indiana Smoke Free Association, Iowans for Alternative to Smoking and Tobacco, Kentucky Smoke Free Association, Maryland Vapor Alliance, New York State Vapor Association, Ohio Vapor Trade Association, RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION, Smoke Free Alternatives Trade Association, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- California, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Connecticut, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Hawaii, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Louisiana, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Rhode Island, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Texas, Smoke-Free Alternatives Trade Association- Wisconsin, Tennessee Smoke Free Association and Texas Vapor Coalition. [1000623560] [19-2242] Eric Gotting [Entered: 11/11/2019 02:26 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-00883-PWG. Mailed to: Swati Rawani, Mark Greenwold. [19-2242] KH [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:55 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-00883-PWG. Case manager: KHancock. [19-2242] KH [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: American E-Liquid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his Official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMAN E. SHARPLESS, in his Official capacity as Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR RESPIRATORY CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Lindsey Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT GOTTLIEB, in his Official capacity as Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ARIZONA SMOKE FREE BUSINESS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AMERICAN VAPING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OHIO VAPOR TRADE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KENTUCKY SMOKE FREE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: IOWANS FOR ALTERNATIVE TO SMOKING AND TOBACCO
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- TEXAS
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TENNESSEE SMOKE FREE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TEXAS VAPOR COALITION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RIGHT TO BE SMOKE-FREE COALITION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- LOUISIANA
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- HAWAII
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NEW YORK STATE VAPOR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES TRADE ASSOCIATION- WISCONSIN
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: INDIANA SMOKE FREE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AMERICAN E-LIQUID MANUFACTURING STANDARDS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARYLAND VAPOR ALLIANCE
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: In re: AMERICAN E-LIQUID MANUFACTURING STANDARDS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Eric P. Gotting
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRUTH INITIATIVE
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEAH BRASCH
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LINDA GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVEN HIRSCH
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAMPAIGN FOR TOBACCO-FREE KIDS
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CYNTHIA FISHMAN
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID MYLES
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARYLAND CHAPTER- AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Eve Lynne Hill
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Swati Rawani
Represented By: Mark Greenwold
Represented By: Eve L. Hill
Represented By: Mark Ely Greenwold
Represented By: Swati Vinay Rawani
Represented By: Dennis Anthony Henigan
Represented By: Nitin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL SIEGEL
Represented By: Andrew D. Ryan
Represented By: Zachary S. Merkle
Represented By: Keith D. Price
Represented By: Timothy C. Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Steven Marshall Sullivan
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: John M. Leory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Corbin K. Barthold
Represented By: Cory L. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSUMER ADVOCATES FOR SMOKE-FREE ALTERNATIVES ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARYLAND ASSOCIATION OF COUNTY HEALTH OFFICERS
Represented By: Kathleen Susan Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?