Randy Dingle v. Talmage Baggett
Defendant / Appellee: PATRICIA ELLEN WATSON DINGLE, Individual, JASON L. HARRELL, Aent - Sheriff, DAVID E. MOORE, JR., OFFICER MORRISON, GINA V. HAWKINS, WILLIAM R. WEST, JR., District Attorney, unknown Bill West, GLENN C. ADAMS, Board of Commissioners, LARRY FREEMAN, Individual, CLAVION MORNING, Deputy Sgt., MEGAN CHAVIS, Clerk - Deputy CSC, JOSEPH NEWTON CALLAWAY, II, WILLIAM DANCY, Security Guard, W. MARSHALL FAIRCLOTH, Vice Chair - Cumberland Co. Commissioner, MERYL CARTER MAYNOR, Individual, SERGEANT MANNING, Sheriff Deputy, JEFFERY JEROME SPIVEY, ALONZO DINGLE, Individual, LEE WARREN, Register of Deeds, T. COOPER, Deputy - CC Dentention Center, WALDEN, TORRY JESSUP, DMV Administrator Commission, LINWOOD EDWARDS, Individual, BILL BUTLER, FBI Head Agent, FRANCIS KEITH SPIVEY, MAYNOR CONNELL, Coach - Individual, ELIZABETH JAMES KILGORE, DARREN R. WHITEHURST, MICHAEL B. STEIN, Attorney - Hutchens Law, BENJAMIN JAMES, Coach, TALMAGE S. BAGGETT, Judge, CARL WALL, SBI Agent, CHARLES EVANS, Board of Commissioners, TIM MANNING, Sheriff, DANICA LAWSON DINGLE, Individual, JOHNNIE MACK SPIVEY, ADDIE LEE SMALLWOOD, Individual, NICHOLE HOKING, Capt. Deputy Jailer Adm. - CC Detention Center, OLLIE HOPKINS, MARK ROWDEN, Pastor, W. R. DARDEN, Magistrate, MICHAEL C. BOOSE, Board of Commissioners, LARRY LANCASTER, Board of Commissioners, TERRY RAY, Major, LINWOOD JAMES, Pastor, PETER ELLISON DINGLE, Retired, TARDRA ADAMS, Chief Jailer - CC Detention Center, EARL MOOSE BUTLER, Retired Sheriff, JAMES EDWARD SPIVEY, MICKEY LOCKLEAR, Deputy, RICHARD JENKINS, JOHN HOLLEY, Sheriff, ARLEATHIA CROSS, HUBERT PETERKIN, Sheriff, DENNIS PETERSON, Major - Sheriff's Dept., JESSICA BOON, Jail Admin. CC Detention Center, ENNIS W. WRIGHT, Sheriff, WILLIAM ROB LEWIS, Judge, R. GREGG EDWARDS, Attorney, DEPUTY SHERIFF MURPHY, Deputy, JOE UTLEY, Administrator - Tax Office, JEANNETTE M. COUNCIL, Chair - County Commission, TIMOTHY J. PETERKIN, Attorney, DONALD MELVIN, BRUCE BULLOCK, Long Branch / Southeastern Home Sale, RONNIE MONROE MITCHELL, Attorney, MAXIN DENISE MELVIN, EUGENE BENJAMIN CARTER, ELLEN B. HANCOX, Trial Clerk Administrator, NATASHIA DINGLE, Individual, STEPHEN C. STOKES, JACQUELYN FAYE CARTER, Individual, JIMMY KEEFE, Board of Commissioners, JOSEPH A. BLEDSOE, III, Trustee, BRENDA ENGLIS, Capt. Deputy Jailer - CC Dention Center and DON WILLIAM, Capt. Deputy Jailer - CC Detention Center
Plaintiff / Appellant: RANDY DINGLE
Case Number: 20-2041
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 43 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Jason L. Harrell and Tim Manning. [20-2041] Kyle Smalling [Entered: 11/16/2020 04:37 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 42 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randy Dingle. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000847549] [20-2041] CT [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:55 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 41 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Mr. Joseph Newton Callaway, II. [20-2041] Rudy Renfer [Entered: 11/09/2020 02:38 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 40 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Torry Jessup. [20-2041] John Congleton [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:15 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 39 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Glenn C. Adams, Michael C. Boose, Jeannette M. Council, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Jimmy Keefe, Larry Lancaster, Joe Utley and Lee Warren. [20-2041] Robert Hasty [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:02 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 38 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Mr. Joseph A. Bledsoe, III. [20-2041] Joseph Bledsoe [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:04 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE re: Notice in Response to Plaintiff-Appellants Informal Brief by William Dancy. [20-2041] Christopher Derrenbacher [Entered: 11/06/2020 10:35 AM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 36 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher J. Derrenbacher for William Dancy. [1000843488] [20-2041] Christopher Derrenbacher [Entered: 11/06/2020 10:33 AM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by William Dancy. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000843484] [20-2041] Christopher Derrenbacher [Entered: 11/06/2020 10:32 AM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 34 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by John Holley and Hubert Peterkin. [20-2041] Bradley Wood [Entered: 11/05/2020 02:50 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T. Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Monroe Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Officer Morrison, Deputy Sheriff Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Walden, Don William and Ennis W. Wright. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000843002] [20-2041] Ronnie Mitchell [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:26 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 32 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Randy Dingle re: failure to file informal brief. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Randy Dingle. [20-2041] CT [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:01 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by R. Gregg Edwards that no brief will be filed. [20-2041] Steven Bader [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:33 AM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T. Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Monroe Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Officer Morrison, Deputy Sheriff Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Walden, Don William and Ennis W. Wright. [20-2041] Ronnie Mitchell [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:35 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/SERVICE LIST by Randy Dingle. [20-2041] CT [Entered: 11/05/2020 12:35 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 28 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Gina V. Hawkins. [20-2041] Michael Whyte [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:28 AM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 27 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Randy Dingle re: filing of disclosure form.. [20-2041] CT [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:08 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tim Manning. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000831111] [20-2041] Kyle Smalling [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:36 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jason L. Harrell. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000831107] [20-2041] Kyle Smalling [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:34 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kyle A. Smalling for Jason L. Harrell and Tim Manning. [1000831101] [20-2041] Kyle Smalling [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:33 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mr. Joseph A. Bledsoe, III. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000830865] [20-2041] Joseph Bledsoe [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:59 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph A. Bledsoe, III for Mr. Joseph A. Bledsoe, III. [1000830862] [20-2041] Joseph Bledsoe [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:57 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert A. Hasty, Jr. for Glenn C. Adams, Michael C. Boose, Jeannette M. Council, Charles Evans, W. Marshall Faircloth, Jimmy Keefe, Larry Lancaster, Joe Utley and Lee Warren. [1000830567] [20-2041] Robert Hasty [Entered: 10/16/2020 09:28 AM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gina V. Hawkins. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000829989] [20-2041] Michael Whyte [Entered: 10/15/2020 12:52 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael Rose Whyte for Gina V. Hawkins. [1000829986] [20-2041] Michael Whyte [Entered: 10/15/2020 12:50 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R. Gregg Edwards. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000827308] [20-2041] Steven Bader [Entered: 10/12/2020 04:48 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven A. Bader for R. Gregg Edwards. [1000827307] [20-2041] Steven Bader [Entered: 10/12/2020 04:44 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Torry Jessup. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000827148] [20-2041] John Congleton [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:23 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John W. Congleton for Torry Jessup. [1000827145] [20-2041] John Congleton [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:19 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 Document(s) re-sent to Randy Dingle. Which document(s)? Re: [ # 2 ] initial notice, [ # 3 ] briefing order. Mailed to: Randy Dingle. [20-2041] TW [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:11 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 Returned mail received from Randy Dingle re [ # 2 ] initial notice, [ # 3 ] briefing order. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? Had appellant's address updated and will resend fee notice and informal briefing order. [1000826349] [20-2041] TW [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:07 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rudy E. Renfer, Assistant United States Attorney for Mr. Joseph Newton Callaway, II. [1000825711] [20-2041] Rudy Renfer [Entered: 10/07/2020 03:29 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bryan G. Nichols for Carl Wall. [1000825211] [20-2041] Bryan Nichols [Entered: 10/07/2020 09:50 AM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ronnie M. Mitchell for Tardra Adams, Jessica Boon, Earl Moose Butler, T. Cooper, Brenda Englis, Nichole Hoking, Richard Jenkins, Mickey Locklear, Sergeant Manning, Ronnie Monroe Mitchell, Clavion Morning, Officer Morrison, Deputy Sheriff Murphy, Dennis Peterson, Terry Ray, Walden, Don William and Ennis W. Wright. [1000824715] [20-2041] Ronnie Mitchell [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:49 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian F. Castro for John Holley and Hubert Peterkin. [1000823769] [20-2041] Brian Castro [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:58 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hubert Peterkin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000823765] [20-2041] Bradley Wood [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:55 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Holley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000823762] [20-2041] Bradley Wood [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:54 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bradley O. Wood for John Holley and Hubert Peterkin. [1000823751] [20-2041] Bradley Wood [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:50 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 1 ] case by Randy Dingle. [1000822803] [20-2041] CT [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:44 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00425-D. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-2041] CT [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:26 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 10/23/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-2041] CT [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:18 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Randy Dingle - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 10/29/2020. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00425-D.. [20-2041] CT [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:13 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00425-D. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-2041] CT [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Randy Dingle v. Talmage Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA ELLEN WATSON DINGLE, Individual
Represented By: Patricia Ellen Watson Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON L. HARRELL, Aent - Sheriff
Represented By: Kyle Abraham Smalling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID E. MOORE, JR.
Represented By: David E. Moore Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER MORRISON
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GINA V. HAWKINS
Represented By: Michael Rose Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM R. WEST, JR., District Attorney, unknown Bill West
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLENN C. ADAMS, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY FREEMAN, Individual
Represented By: Larry Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLAVION MORNING, Deputy Sgt.
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEGAN CHAVIS, Clerk - Deputy CSC
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH NEWTON CALLAWAY, II
Represented By: Rudy E. Renfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM DANCY, Security Guard
Represented By: Christopher John Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. MARSHALL FAIRCLOTH, Vice Chair - Cumberland Co. Commissioner
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERYL CARTER MAYNOR, Individual
Represented By: Meryl Carter Maynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT MANNING, Sheriff Deputy
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERY JEROME SPIVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALONZO DINGLE, Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEE WARREN, Register of Deeds
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. COOPER, Deputy - CC Dentention Center
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALDEN
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TORRY JESSUP, DMV Administrator Commission
Represented By: John W. Congleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINWOOD EDWARDS, Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL BUTLER, FBI Head Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANCIS KEITH SPIVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAYNOR CONNELL, Coach - Individual
Represented By: Maynor Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH JAMES KILGORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARREN R. WHITEHURST
Represented By: Darren R. Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL B. STEIN, Attorney - Hutchens Law
Represented By: Michael B. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BENJAMIN JAMES, Coach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TALMAGE S. BAGGETT, Judge
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL WALL, SBI Agent
Represented By: Bryan Grant Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES EVANS, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIM MANNING, Sheriff
Represented By: Kyle Abraham Smalling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANICA LAWSON DINGLE, Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHNNIE MACK SPIVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADDIE LEE SMALLWOOD, Individual
Represented By: Addie Lee Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICHOLE HOKING, Capt. Deputy Jailer Adm. - CC Detention Center
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OLLIE HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK ROWDEN, Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. R. DARDEN, Magistrate
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL C. BOOSE, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY LANCASTER, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY RAY, Major
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINWOOD JAMES, Pastor
Represented By: Linwood James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER ELLISON DINGLE, Retired
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TARDRA ADAMS, Chief Jailer - CC Detention Center
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EARL MOOSE BUTLER, Retired Sheriff
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES EDWARD SPIVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICKEY LOCKLEAR, Deputy
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD JENKINS
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN HOLLEY, Sheriff
Represented By: Bradley O. Wood
Represented By: Brian Florencio Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARLEATHIA CROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUBERT PETERKIN, Sheriff
Represented By: Bradley O. Wood
Represented By: Brian Florencio Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS PETERSON, Major - Sheriff's Dept.
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA BOON, Jail Admin. CC Detention Center
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENNIS W. WRIGHT, Sheriff
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM ROB LEWIS, Judge
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. GREGG EDWARDS, Attorney
Represented By: Eleanor Redhage Gilroy
Represented By: Steven Andrew Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY SHERIFF MURPHY, Deputy
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE UTLEY, Administrator - Tax Office
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEANNETTE M. COUNCIL, Chair - County Commission
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY J. PETERKIN, Attorney
Represented By: Antoine Depaul Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD MELVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE BULLOCK, Long Branch / Southeastern Home Sale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONNIE MONROE MITCHELL, Attorney
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAXIN DENISE MELVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EUGENE BENJAMIN CARTER
Represented By: Eugene Benjamin Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLEN B. HANCOX, Trial Clerk Administrator
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATASHIA DINGLE, Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN C. STOKES
Represented By: Kathryn Hicks Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELYN FAYE CARTER, Individual
Represented By: Jacquelyn Faye Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIMMY KEEFE, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Robert Alford Hasty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH A. BLEDSOE, III, Trustee
Represented By: Thomas Heller Hooper
Represented By: Joseph A. Bledsoe III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDA ENGLIS, Capt. Deputy Jailer - CC Dention Center
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON WILLIAM, Capt. Deputy Jailer - CC Detention Center
Represented By: Ronnie Monroe Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANDY DINGLE
Represented By: Randy Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?