Jeremy Love v. Kenneth Lassiter
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Defendant / Appellee: FNU CHESTER, SWINDELL EDWARDS, FNU DYE, BETTY BROWN, FNU CARVER, FNU DULA, FNU TURNER, KENNETH E. LASSITER, FNU RAMSEY, CHRIS RITCH and FNU BEAVER
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEREMY R. LOVE, a/k/a Jeremy R. Love El, MSTA Branch Temple 43
Case Number: 20-7620
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Jeremy R. Love. [20-7620] KH [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:31 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Jeremy R. Love. [20-7620] KH [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:30 PM]
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: JEREMY R. LOVE #1016630. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jeremy Love, Nyeshea Willie, Division of Prisons, Administrative Services Section, 831 W. Morgan Street, 4265 MSC, Raleigh, NC 27699-4265. [1000847790] [20-7620] KH [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:09 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Jeremy R. Love. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [20-7620] KH [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:03 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00075-MR. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-7620] KH [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:24 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jeremy Love. Informal Opening Brief due 11/23/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-7620] KH [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:20 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jeremy R. Love ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Jeremy Love. [20-7620] KH [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:13 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00075-MR. Case manager: KHancock. [20-7620] KH [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeremy Love v. Kenneth Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU CHESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SWINDELL EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU DYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETTY BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU CARVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU DULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH E. LASSITER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS RITCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU BEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEREMY R. LOVE, a/k/a Jeremy R. Love El, MSTA Branch Temple 43
Represented By: Jeremy R. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?