Crystal Rivers v. Virginia State Police
Defendant: IRS, CITY OF LYNCHBURG VIRGINIA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BEDFORD COUNTY VIRGINIA, ALBEMARLE COUNTY, VIRGINIA, BUREAU OF FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS, SHERRI SACKETT, STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION, MARYLOU PRILLIMAN, ROBERT R. CHAPMAN, III, E. JOSEPH FACE, JR., Commissioner, PETER C. SACKETT, LIBERTY UNIVERSITY, INCORPORATED, FRANK W. MORRISON, VSB #07549, SHERWOOD SUNDERLAND DAY, VSB #15128, STEVEN R. GRANT, VSB #27178, KAREN DEER, PRESCOTT H. GAY, SR., VSB #17727, LAURA J. WALLACE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and BANK OF THE JAMES FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., a/k/a Bank of the James
Defendant / Appellee: TED COUNTS REALTY GROUP AND AUCTION CO INC., MARGIE CALLAHAN, VIRGINIA STATE POLICE, MICHELLE FLUKER, KELLY POTTER, RALPH BECK, SERENE CREEK RUN ASSOCIATION, HOWARD FREAR, MARK MERRILL, BBOYZ LLC, KELLY EDMUNDSON, JENNIFER BAKER, LISA L. SCHENKEL, VSB #21521, BILL TALBOTT, TRAVIS BAKER, BETH ROGERS, ROBERT BEACH, MATT FARISS, MATTHEW KRYCINSKI, SELECT BANK FINANCIAL CORP, MICHAEL FRIEDMAN, BARBARA FREAR, OLD DOMINION NATIONAL BANK, UNION BANK AND TRUST, now Atlantic Union Bank; successor of and formerly StellarOne Bank, formerly Planters Bank & Trust Company of Virginia, SARAH KRYCINSKI, VIRGINIA STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION, SAMEER PATEL, M.D., VSB #65811, SHANA LESTER, SETH ELI TWERY, VSB #20031, NORTHCREEK INC. NORTH CREEK CONSTRUCTION, DAVID EDMUNDSON, ADVANTAGE TITLE & CLOSING LLC, J. MICHAEL THOMAS, WILLIAM FLUKER, SELECT BANK, LOREN FRIEDMAN, RICHARD ROGERS, JENNIFER RICHARDSON, UNION BANKSHARES CORPORATION, now Atlantic Union Bankshares, MARK DOUGLAS LOFTIS, VSB #79538, S & R FARM, LLC, BRANCH BANKING & TRUST COMPANY OF VIRGINIA, MICHAEL BRADBURY and SERENITY ACRES FARM LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: CRYSTAL VL RIVERS
Case Number: 21-1162
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 39 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eric D. Chapman for Select Bank, Select Bank Financial Corp and J. Michael Thomas. [1000930763] [21-1162] Eric Chapman [Entered: 04/08/2021 11:40 AM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 38 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Chad A Mooney for Seth Eli Twery. [1000930395] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:59 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 37 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Chad A Mooney for Northcreek Inc. North Creek Construction. [1000930394] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:58 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 36 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Chad A. Mooney for Serene Creek Run Association. [1000930384] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:53 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 35 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Chad A. Mooney for Jennifer Baker, Travis Baker, Michelle Fluker, William Fluker, Barbara Frear, Howard Frear, Loren Friedman, Michael Friedman, Matthew Krycinski, Sarah Krycinski and Michael Bradbury. [1000930377] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:51 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J. Michael Thomas. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000930358] [21-1162] Eric Chapman [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:37 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Bank Financial Corp. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000930356] [21-1162] Eric Chapman [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:36 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000930354] [21-1162] Eric Chapman [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:35 PM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 31 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers. [21-1162] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 03/30/2021 07:44 PM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sameer Patel, M.D.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000923658] [21-1162] Bevin Alexander [Entered: 03/26/2021 11:41 AM]
March 24, 2021 Filing 29 RULE 46 NOTICE issued to Bevin Ray Alexander, Jr., Esq. for Sameer Patel, M.D., Edward Albion Armfield for Shana Lester and Serenity Acres Farm LLC, Eric Daniel Chapman for Select Bank Financial Corp, Select Bank and J. Michael Thomas, Mr. Chad Allan Mooney for Robert Beach, Michael Friedman, Jennifer Baker, Seth Eli Twery, Northcreek Inc. North Creek Construction, Serene Creek Run Association, Travis Baker, Loren Friedman, Richard Rogers, Beth Rogers, Matthew Krycinski, Sarah Krycinski, Michael Bradbury, Howard Frear, Barbara Frear, William Fluker and Michelle Fluker and John Benjamin Rottenborn for S & R Farm, LLC, Ralph Beck, Bboyz LLC and Mark Douglas Loftis filing of disclosure form Requested document due 04/08/2021. Mailed to: Edward Armfield, Eric Chapman, David Edmundson and Kelly Edmundson. [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:57 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Edmundson and Kelly Edmundson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000918839] [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:10 PM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Richardson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000916376] [21-1162] Brian O'Grady [Entered: 03/15/2021 06:00 PM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Matt Fariss. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000916375] [21-1162] Brian O'Grady [Entered: 03/15/2021 05:59 PM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advantage Title & Closing LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000916374] [21-1162] Brian O'Grady [Entered: 03/15/2021 05:58 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northcreek Inc. North Creek Construction. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000915408] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:44 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelly Potter. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000915393] [21-1162] J.P. Boyd [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:37 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Dominion National Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000915392] [21-1162] J.P. Boyd [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:37 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mark Merrill. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000915389] [21-1162] J.P. Boyd [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:36 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Bankshares Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000915352] [21-1162] William Phillips [Entered: 03/12/2021 01:56 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Bank and Trust. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000915350] [21-1162] William Phillips [Entered: 03/12/2021 01:54 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lisa L. Schenkel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000915345] [21-1162] William Phillips [Entered: 03/12/2021 01:51 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Baker, Travis Baker, Michael Bradbury, Michelle Fluker, William Fluker, Barbara Frear, Howard Frear, Loren Friedman, Michael Friedman, Matthew Krycinski, Sarah Krycinski, Beth Rogers and Richard Rogers. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000913436] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:21 AM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Seth Eli Twery. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000913416] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:12 AM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Serene Creek Run Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000913415] [21-1162] Chad Mooney [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:11 AM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ted Counts Realty Group and Auction Co Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000913023] [21-1162] Floyd Isenhour [Entered: 03/09/2021 04:26 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 Returned mail received from Edward Albion Armfield re [ # 9 ] Order. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? Resent to firms new address. [1000912124] [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 03/08/2021 04:48 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Advantage Title & Closing LLC, Jennifer Baker, Travis Baker, Bboyz LLC, Robert Beach, Ralph Beck, Michael Bradbury, David Edmundson, Kelly Edmundson, Matt Fariss, Michelle Fluker, William Fluker, Barbara Frear, Howard Frear, Loren Friedman, Michael Friedman, Matthew Krycinski, Sarah Krycinski, Shana Lester, Mark Douglas Loftis, Mark Merrill, Northcreek Inc. North Creek Construction, Old Dominion National Bank, Sameer Patel, M.D., Kelly Potter, Jennifer Richardson, Beth Rogers, Richard Rogers, S & R Farm, LLC, Lisa L. Schenkel, Select Bank, Select Bank Financial Corp, Serene Creek Run Association, Serenity Acres Farm LLC, Ted Counts Realty Group and Auction Co Inc., J. Michael Thomas, Seth Eli Twery and Union Bank and Trust re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Edward Armfield, Eric Chapman, David Edmundson and Kelly Edmundson,. [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:20 AM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Margie Callahan. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000908790] [21-1162] Alexander de Witt [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:57 PM]
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 Returned mail received from Edward Armfield re [ # 8 ] Order. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? Firm address updated and resent. [1000908589] [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 03/02/2021 03:04 PM]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [5]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Edward Albion Armfield, Eric Chapman, David Edmundson, and Kelly Edmundson. [1000903780] [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/23/2021 10:35 AM]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ]. Number of days granted: 21. Informal Opening Brief due 04/02/2021. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Edward Armfield, Eric Chapman, David Edmundson, and Kelly Edmundson. [1000902655] [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:16 AM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers to extend filing time for informal opening brief until April 2, 2021. Date and method of service: 02/22/2021 ecf. [1000902650] [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:12 AM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00061-EKD-JCH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. Record is 9 separate files, file with original case number only and files with supplements numbered 1-8. [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/22/2021 08:55 AM]
February 20, 2021 Filing 5 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Ms. Crystal VL Rivers. [21-1162] Crystal Rivers [Entered: 02/20/2021 05:02 PM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Edward Armfield, Eric Chapman, David Edmundson, and Kelly Edmundson. Informal Opening Brief due 03/12/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/16/2021 08:57 AM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Ms. Crystal VL Rivers. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 03/18/2021. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00061-EKD-JCH. Mailed to: Edward Armfield, Eric Chapman, David Edmundson, and Kelly Edmundson. [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/16/2021 08:54 AM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/26/2021. [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:34 AM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:18-cv-00061-EKD-JCH. Case manager: Rachel Lee. [21-1162] RJL [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Crystal Rivers v. Virginia State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TED COUNTS REALTY GROUP AND AUCTION CO INC.
Represented By: Floyd Elbert Isenhour III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARGIE CALLAHAN
Represented By: Alexander Spotswood de Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE FLUKER
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY POTTER
Represented By: J.P. McGuire Boyd Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RALPH BECK
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERENE CREEK RUN ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWARD FREAR
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK MERRILL
Represented By: J.P. McGuire Boyd Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BBOYZ LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY EDMUNDSON
Represented By: Kelly Edmundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER BAKER
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA L. SCHENKEL, VSB #21521
Represented By: William Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS BAKER
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETH ROGERS
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT BEACH
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATT FARISS
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher Jr.
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Grady
Represented By: Stanley Paul Wellman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW KRYCINSKI
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT BANK FINANCIAL CORP
Represented By: Eric Daniel Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL FRIEDMAN
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA FREAR
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OLD DOMINION NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: J.P. McGuire Boyd Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNION BANK AND TRUST, now Atlantic Union Bank; successor of and formerly StellarOne Bank, formerly Planters Bank & Trust Company of Virginia
Represented By: William Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARAH KRYCINSKI
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMEER PATEL, M.D., VSB #65811
Represented By: Bevin Ray Alexander Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHANA LESTER
Represented By: Edward Albion Armfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SETH ELI TWERY, VSB #20031
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTHCREEK INC. NORTH CREEK CONSTRUCTION
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID EDMUNDSON
Represented By: David Edmundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADVANTAGE TITLE & CLOSING LLC
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher Jr.
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Grady
Represented By: Stanley Paul Wellman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. MICHAEL THOMAS
Represented By: Eric Daniel Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM FLUKER
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT BANK
Represented By: Eric Daniel Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOREN FRIEDMAN
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD ROGERS
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER RICHARDSON
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher Jr.
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Grady
Represented By: Stanley Paul Wellman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNION BANKSHARES CORPORATION, now Atlantic Union Bankshares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK DOUGLAS LOFTIS, VSB #79538
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S & R FARM, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANCH BANKING & TRUST COMPANY OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL BRADBURY
Represented By: Chad Allan Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERENITY ACRES FARM LLC
Represented By: Edward Albion Armfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LYNCHBURG VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEDFORD COUNTY VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBEMARLE COUNTY, VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRI SACKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE CORPORATION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYLOU PRILLIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT R. CHAPMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. JOSEPH FACE, JR., Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER C. SACKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY UNIVERSITY, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK W. MORRISON, VSB #07549
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERWOOD SUNDERLAND DAY, VSB #15128
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN R. GRANT, VSB #27178
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN DEER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESCOTT H. GAY, SR., VSB #17727
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA J. WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF THE JAMES FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., a/k/a Bank of the James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRYSTAL VL RIVERS
Represented By: Crystal VL Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?