USA v. Freeman Burkholder
Amicus Curiae: PFLAG INTERNATIONAL, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, INTERFAITH ALLIANCE FOUNDATION, WOMEN'S LEAGUE FOR CONSERVATIVE JUDAISM, HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, SOUTH ASIAN AMERICANS LEADING TOGETHER, SIKH COALITION, B'NAI B'RITH INTERNATIONAL, MUSLIM ADVOCATES, NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, NAACP, POLICE EXECUTIVE RESEARCH FORUM, GLSEN, BEND THE ARC: A JEWISH PARTNERSHIP FOR JUSTICE, CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS, AMERICAN JEWISH COMMITTEE, JEWISH COUNSIL FOR PUBLIC AFFAIRS, HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION, SIKH AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, UNITED SIKHS, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, THE LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE ON CIVIL AND HUMAN RIGHTS, OCA - ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN ADVOCATES, HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN, JEWISH WOMEN INTERNATIONAL, AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE, NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK, UNION OF REFORM JUDAISM, NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE, SOCIETY FOR HUMANISTIC JUDAISM, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT EXECUTIVES and WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: FREEMAN BURKHOLDER
Case Number: 13-3214
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2015 Filing 109 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. George Charles Pappas for Emma Miller. Certificate of Service:06/03/2015. Argument Request: requested. [13-3182, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (FILED ON INCORRECT CASE)--[Edited 06/03/2015 by CB] (GCP) [Entered: 06/03/2015 09:58 AM]
January 2, 2015 Filing 108 CJA voucher issued to Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder. (CJF) [Entered: 01/01/2015 05:11 PM]
December 1, 2014 Filing 107 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 12/01/2014 02:22 PM]
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER filed denying petition for en banc rehearing [ # 102 ] filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. Jeffrey S. Sutton and Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judges; and Edmund A. Sargus , Jr., District Judge. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (BLH) [Entered: 11/20/2014 10:23 AM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 105 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a petition for en banc rehearing, [ # 102 ]; previously filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler in 13-3201, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Response from Attorney Mr. James Samuel Gentile for Appellant Eli M. Miller Certificate of Service:10/29/2014. [13-3201, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (JSG) [Entered: 10/29/2014 06:13 PM]
October 29, 2014 Filing 104 RESPONSE to petition for en banc rehearing, [ # 102 ], previously filed by filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler in 13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Response filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr.. Certificate of service: 10/29/2014. [13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (WLO) [Entered: 10/29/2014 10:21 AM]
October 15, 2014 Filing 103 LETTER SENT to Mr. David C. Jack for Lovina Miller, Mr. Michael E. Rosman for Kathryn Jean A. Miller, Mr. George Charles Pappas for Emma Miller, Mr. Kip Thomas Bollin for Anna Miller, Mr. Brian M. Pierce for Elizabeth Miller, Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock, Mr. Samuel George Amendolara for Daniel S. Mullet, Mr. Steven Richard Jaeger for Levi F. Miller, Mr. Robert E. Duffrin for Johnny S. Mullet, Mr. Damian A. Billak for Lester S. Mullet, Mr. J. Dean Carro for Lester M. Miller, Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr., Mr. Wesley A. Dumas, Sr. for Raymond Miller, Mr. James Samuel Gentile for Eli M. Miller, Mr. Nathan A. Ray for Emanuel Schrock, Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder, notifying that they are directed to respond to petition for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. Response due 10/29/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (BLH) [Entered: 10/15/2014 06:07 PM]
October 10, 2014 Filing 102 PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Certificate of Service: 10/10/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 10/10/2014 06:47 PM]
September 10, 2014 Filing 101 PETITION for rehearing before original panel filed by Mr. Matthew David Ridings for Anna Miller. Certificate of Service: 09/10/2014. [13-3183, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (COUNSEL ADVISED TO REFILE TO ONLY THE CASE THAT THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES (13-3183)--[Edited 09/10/2014 by CB] (MDR) [Entered: 09/10/2014 10:17 AM]
September 3, 2014 Filing 100 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to10/10/2014 (30 days) to file a petition for rehearing en banc [ # 99 ] filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (BLH) [Entered: 09/03/2014 10:55 AM]
August 29, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214 to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 10/10/2014. Certificate of Service: 08/29/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 08/29/2014 04:14 PM]
August 27, 2014 Filing 98 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed: The defendants' various hate-crime convictions are REVERSED, and the case is REMANDED to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. Decision for publication. Jeffrey S. Sutton (AUTHORING) and Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judges; Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. (DISSENTING), U.S. District Judge for the Southern District of Ohio, sitting by designation. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CL) [Entered: 08/27/2014 10:47 AM]
June 26, 2014 Filing 97 CAUSE ARGUED by Mr. Steven M. Dettelbach for Appellee USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214; Mr. Michael E. Rosman for Appellant Kathryn Miller; Mr. Matthew David Ridings for Appellant Anna Miller; and Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Appellant Samuel Mullet, Sr. before Sutton, Circuit Judge; Griffin, Circuit Judge and Sargus, U.S. District Judge. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (LAG) [Entered: 06/26/2014 03:21 PM]
June 17, 2014 Filing 96 RESPONSE filed regarding an additional citation, [ # 95 ]. Response from Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for Appellee USA in 13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Certificate of Service:06/17/2014. [13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 06/17/2014 03:11 PM]
June 13, 2014 Filing 95 ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr.. Certificate of Service: 06/13/2014. [13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (WLO) [Entered: 06/13/2014 01:50 PM]
June 4, 2014 Filing 94 RESPONSE filed regarding an additional citation, [ # 93 ]. Response from Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for Appellee USA in 13-3181, 13-3177, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Certificate of Service:06/04/2014. [13-3181, 13-3177, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 06/04/2014 04:00 PM]
June 2, 2014 Filing 93 ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Mr. Michael E. Rosman for Kathryn Miller. Certificate of Service: 06/02/2014. [13-3181, 13-3177, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (MER) [Entered: 06/02/2014 05:08 PM]
May 27, 2014 Filing 92 RULING declaring as moot motion to waive oral argument [ # 91 ] in 13-3205. [13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] **(ARGUMENT WILL BE MADE BY 3 ATTORNEYS FOR ALL CASES) (CB) [Entered: 05/27/2014 07:08 AM]
May 23, 2014 Filing 91 MOTION filed by Mr. Brian M. Pierce for Elizabeth Miller to waive oral argument and submit case on the briefs. Certificate of Service: 05/23/2014. [13-3193, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (BMP) [Entered: 05/23/2014 11:12 AM]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER filed denying motion to enlarge oral argument time [ # 5094230-2 ] filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer in 13-3205. Entered by order of the court. [13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (YH) [Entered: 05/23/2014 10:44 AM]
May 21, 2014 Filing 89 FILED: Waiver of Oral Argument by Mr. Nathan A. Ray for Emanuel Schrock. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2014. [13-3208, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3214] (NAR) [Entered: 05/21/2014 09:10 AM]
May 20, 2014 Filing 88 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Samuel George Amendolara for Daniel S. Mullet regarding Waiver of Oral Argument 05/20/2014 . Certificate of Service: 05/20/2014. [13-3195, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (SGA) [Entered: 05/20/2014 02:49 PM]
May 20, 2014 Filing 87 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. James Samuel Gentile for Eli M. Miller regarding WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2014. [13-3207, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3208, 13-3214] (JSG) [Entered: 05/20/2014 02:39 PM]
May 20, 2014 Filing 86 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Robert E. Duffrin for Johnny S. Mullet regarding Waiver of Oral Argument. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2014. [13-3201, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (RED) [Entered: 05/20/2014 02:24 PM]
May 20, 2014 Filing 85 RULING declaring as moot motion to waive oral argument (COUNSEL IS ADVISING THAT ARGUMENT WILL BE MADE BY 3 ATTORNEYS FOR ALL CASES). [ # 5094890-2 ] filed by Mr. Steven Richard Jaeger in 13-3196. [13-3196, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 05/20/2014 08:05 AM]
May 19, 2014 Filing 84 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. J. Dean Carro for Lester M. Miller regarding Lester Miller's waiving oral argument. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2014. [13-3204, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (JDC) [Entered: 05/19/2014 03:26 PM]
May 19, 2014 Filing 83 Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew David Ridings for Appellant Anna Miller. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (MDR) [Entered: 05/19/2014 02:35 PM]
May 19, 2014 Filing 82 FILED: Waiver of Oral Argument by Mr. Damian A. Billak for Lester S. Mullet. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2014. [13-3202, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (DAB) [Entered: 05/19/2014 02:32 PM]
May 16, 2014 Filing 81 Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Michael E. Rosman for Appellant Kathryn Miller. Certificate of Service: 05/16/2014. [13-3181, 13-3177, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (MER) [Entered: 05/16/2014 04:16 PM]
May 8, 2014 Filing 80 Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Steven M. Dettelbach for Appellee USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (SMD) [Entered: 05/08/2014 03:23 PM]
May 8, 2014 Filing 79 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214 by Steven M. Dettelbach. Certificate of Service: 05/08/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (SMD) [Entered: 05/08/2014 10:43 AM]
May 6, 2014 Filing 78 Oral argument date set for 9:00 a.m., Thursday, June 26, 2014. Notice of argument sent to counsel on 05/06/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (LAG) [Entered: 05/06/2014 01:20 PM]
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER filed granting motion to allow amicus [ # 63 ] filed by Ms. Lisa M. Bornstein, Mr. Steven M. Freeman, Mr. Michael Lieberman, Mr. Seth Marnin, Ms. Kate McSweeny, Mr. David M. Raim, Ms. Joy L. Langford and Ms. Miriam Zeidman.. Entered by order of the court. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 04/30/2014 08:01 AM]
March 13, 2014 Filing 67 CORRESPONDENCE: article. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/13/2014 10:01 AM]
March 10, 2014 Filing 66 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 5047720-2 ] filed by Mr. Steven Richard Jaeger. in 13-3196. [13-3196, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:47 AM]
March 10, 2014 Filing 65 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief, reply brief now due 3/31/14. [ # 46 ] filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. in 13-3196. [13-3196, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:42 AM]
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER filed granting motion to file oversize brief [ # 53 ] filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler.. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/07/2014 02:40 PM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 64 AMICUS BRIEF filed by ALL amicus counsel [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:36 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 63 Amicus MOTION filed by counsel for ALL Amici Parties to become an amicus curiae. Certificate of Service: 03/06/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:34 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 62 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Seth Marnin for Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League in[13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:24 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 61 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Lieberman for Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League in . [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:22 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 60 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Miriam Zeidman for Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:21 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 59 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Steven M. Freeman for Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:17 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 58 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Joy L. Langford for ALL Amici Curiae. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:14 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 57 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. David M. Raim for ALL Amici Curiae [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:09 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 56 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Kate McSweeny for ALL Amici Curiae [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 10:03 AM]
March 6, 2014 Filing 55 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Lisa M. Bornstein for Amicus Curiae The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights . [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214]--[Edited 03/10/2014 by CB] (CB) [Entered: 03/10/2014 09:57 AM]
February 28, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214 to file oversize brief. Certificate of Service: 02/28/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 02/28/2014 09:30 PM]
February 28, 2014 Filing 52 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Certificate of Service:02/28/2014. Argument Request: requested. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 02/28/2014 09:27 PM]
February 19, 2014 Filing 51 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 50 ] filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. in 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214, resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 02/28/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 02/19/2014 08:12 AM]
February 18, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 02/18/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 02/18/2014 06:04 PM]
January 16, 2014 Filing 49 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214 by Dennis J. Dimsey. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (DJD) [Entered: 01/16/2014 03:01 PM]
December 18, 2013 Filing 47 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 46 ]. in 13-3177, resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 02/21/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 12/18/2013 10:17 AM]
December 17, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for USA in 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/17/2013. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 12/17/2013 11:56 AM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 42 RULING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 01/13/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 12/13/2013 09:13 AM]
December 12, 2013 Filing 40 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder. Certificate of Service:12/12/2013. Argument Request: requested. (GHL) [Entered: 12/12/2013 09:56 PM]
December 12, 2013 Filing 39 FILED: by Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder. Certificate of Service: 12/12/2013. (GHL) [Entered: 12/12/2013 03:13 PM]
December 2, 2013 Filing 37 SHOW CAUSE order filed to have Appellant Freeman Burkholder show cause why this court should not proceed with disciplinary action. Response due by 12/09/2013 for Freeman Burkholder. Appellant brief due 12/9/13. (CB) [Entered: 12/02/2013 09:03 AM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 34 LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 4945634-2 ] filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer in 13-3205, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/22/2013. appellee brief now due 12/23/2013. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 10/01/2013 09:59 AM]
September 5, 2013 Filing 31 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/18/2013;. appellee brief due 11/20/2013; [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 09/05/2013 02:57 PM]
July 2, 2013 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT ORDER completed by Court Reporter Ms. Shirle Perkins for Document [ # 20 ] transcript filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine and Ms. Shirle Perkins in 13-3214 , [ # 19 ] transcript filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine and Ms. Shirle Perkins in 13-3214. Date Hearing Held: 8/3-31/12, 9/6-13/12. Per DC docket (ALM) [Entered: 07/02/2013 11:32 AM]
July 2, 2013 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT ORDER completed by Court Reporter Ms. Susan Trischan for Document [ # 21 ] transcript filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine and Ms. Susan Trischan in 13-3214. Number of Pages: 162. Date Hearing Held: 2/8/13. Per DC docket (ALM) [Entered: 07/02/2013 11:31 AM]
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate all cases for briefing and submission [ # 4844730-2 ] filed by Mr. Michael E. Rosman in 13-3181; granting motion to be removed from expedited briefing [ # 4849552-2 ] filed by Mr. John R. Mitchell in 13-3183. Also removing 13-3214 from expedited briefing. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CB) [Entered: 05/13/2013 10:32 AM]
March 29, 2013 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder; transcript ordered on 03/29/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Susan Trischan. [21] Certificate of Service: 03/29/2013. (GHL) [Entered: 03/29/2013 01:30 PM]
March 29, 2013 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder; transcript ordered on 03/29/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Shirle Perkins. [20] Certificate of Service: 03/29/2013. (GHL) [Entered: 03/29/2013 01:28 PM]
March 29, 2013 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder; transcript ordered on 03/29/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Shirle Perkins. [19] Certificate of Service: 03/29/2013. (GHL) [Entered: 03/29/2013 01:28 PM]
March 26, 2013 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder; transcript ordered on 03/26/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Shirle Perkins and Ms. Susan Trischan. [17] Certificate of Service: 03/26/2013. ****COUNSEL directed to refile transcript order form for each court reporter separately****--[Edited 03/26/2013 by PJE] (GHL) [Entered: 03/26/2013 10:14 AM]
March 26, 2013 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Freeman Burkholder by Gary Howard Levine. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2013. (GHL) [Entered: 03/26/2013 10:11 AM]
March 11, 2013 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Jessica Dunsay Silver. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2013. (JDS) [Entered: 03/11/2013 11:56 AM]
March 11, 2013 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Thomas E. Chandler. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2013. (TEC) [Entered: 03/11/2013 11:54 AM]
March 5, 2013 Filing 10 Pre-sentence report filed. (KAL) [Entered: 03/05/2013 02:48 PM]
February 26, 2013 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Bridget M. Brennan. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2013. (BMB) [Entered: 02/26/2013 10:43 AM]
February 25, 2013 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting expedited briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 05/16/2013. appellee brief now due 06/13/2013. (CB) [Entered: 02/25/2013 01:08 PM]
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER filed to expedite briefing schedule, case to be submitted on earliest practicable date, to have appellant order transcript, to extend time to file transcript Transcript now due by 04/18/2013 from court reporters. (CB) [Entered: 02/25/2013 12:59 PM]
February 25, 2013 Filing 4 LETTER SENT to extend appointment of Gary H. Levine as counsel under the Criminal Justice Act for Freeman Burkholder. (CB) [Entered: 02/25/2013 12:57 PM]
February 25, 2013 Filing 3 The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB) [Entered: 02/25/2013 12:56 PM]
February 25, 2013 Filing 12 Criminal Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Freeman Burkholder. Transcript needed: y. (CB) [Entered: 03/07/2013 10:15 AM]
February 25, 2013 Filing 1 Criminal Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Freeman Burkholder. Transcript needed: y. (CB) [Entered: 02/25/2013 12:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Freeman Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PFLAG INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: Michael Lieberman
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Miriam Zeidman
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Represented By: Seth Marnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERFAITH ALLIANCE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S LEAGUE FOR CONSERVATIVE JUDAISM
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTH ASIAN AMERICANS LEADING TOGETHER
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SIKH COALITION
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: B'NAI B'RITH INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MUSLIM ADVOCATES
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAACP
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POLICE EXECUTIVE RESEARCH FORUM
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLSEN
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BEND THE ARC: A JEWISH PARTNERSHIP FOR JUSTICE
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN JEWISH COMMITTEE
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEWISH COUNSIL FOR PUBLIC AFFAIRS
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SIKH AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED SIKHS
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE ON CIVIL AND HUMAN RIGHTS
Represented By: Lisa M. Bornstein
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OCA - ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN ADVOCATES
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEWISH WOMEN INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNION OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR HUMANISTIC JUDAISM
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT EXECUTIVES
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Kate McSweeny
Represented By: David M. Raim
Represented By: Joy L. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kristy L. Parker
Represented By: Jessica Dunsay Silver
Represented By: Thomas E. Chandler
Represented By: Thomas E. Getz
Represented By: Dennis J. Dimsey
Represented By: Steven M. Dettelbach
Represented By: Bridget Meehan Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FREEMAN BURKHOLDER
Represented By: Gary Howard Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?