Edward Plastino, et al v. Chris Koster, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Edward F. Plastino
Defendant / Appellee: Chris Koster, in his official Capacity as Attorney General of the State of Missouri and Tom Neer, in his Official Capacity as Sheriff of St. Charles County, Missouri
Case Number: 13-1974
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2013 MANDATE ISSUED. [4084966] [13-1974] (DMS)
October 11, 2013 JUDGMENT FILED - Granting [ # 4084665-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Mr. David G. Sigale.,The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. Oct 2013 [4084958] [13-1974] (DMS)
October 10, 2013 CORRECTED certificate of service for motion to dismiss case, Doc No. [ # 4084665-2 ], filed by Appellants Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation [4084667] [13-1974] (DGS)
October 10, 2013 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. David G. Sigale for Appellants Second Amendment Foundation and Edward F. Plastino w/service 10/10/2013. [4084665] [13-1974] (DGS)
July 26, 2013 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4058221-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David G. Sigale. Brief of Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation due 10/11/2013. Appellants' Appendix due on 10/11/2013. [4058649] [13-1974] (DMS)
July 24, 2013 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/11/2013 at 11:59 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. David G. Sigale for Appellants Second Amendment Foundation and Edward F. Plastino w/service 07/24/2013. [4058221] [13-1974] (DGS)
June 6, 2013 CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4042668-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David G. Sigale [4042864] Brief of Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation due 07/22/2013. Appendix due on 07/22/2013 [4042864] [13-1974] (DMS)
June 5, 2013 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 08/14/2013 at 11:59 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. David G. Sigale for Appellants Second Amendment Foundation and Edward F. Plastino w/service 06/05/2013. [4042668] [13-1974] (DGS)
May 16, 2013 APPEARANCE filed by Matthew T. Singer for Appellant Edward F. Plastino w/service 05/16/2013 [4036287] [13-1974] (MTS)
May 14, 2013 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation - Joint Appendix w/service 05/14/2013 [4035645] [13-1974] (DGS)
May 14, 2013 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation. Transcript ordered [4035644] [13-1974] (DGS)
May 13, 2013 CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation. - FOR CAL. [4035109] [13-1974] (DGS)
May 6, 2013 APPEARANCE filed by David G. Sigale for Appellants Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation w/service 05/06/2013 [4032967] [13-1974] (DGS)
May 2, 2013 APPEARANCE filed by Joanna Trachtenberg for Appellee Chris Koster w/service 05/02/2013 [4031683] [13-1974] (JLT)
April 30, 2013 APPEARANCE filed by Toby J. Dible for Appellee Tom Neer w/service 04/30/2013 [4031014] [13-1974] (TJD)
April 30, 2013 APPEARANCE filed by Robert E. Hoeynck for Appellee Tom Neer w/service 04/30/2013 [4030980] [13-1974] (REH)
April 30, 2013 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/10/2013. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Edward F. Plastino and Second Amendment Foundation due 06/10/2013. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4030884] [13-1974] (EDG)
April 30, 2013 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Order dated 4/24/13 from the district court. [4030880] [13-1974] (EDG)
April 30, 2013 Civil case docketed. [4030876] [13-1974] (EDG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Edward Plastino, et al v. Chris Koster, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Matthew Todd Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Edward F. Plastino
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Matthew Todd Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Koster, in his official Capacity as Attorney General of the State of Missouri
Represented By: Joanna L. W. Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tom Neer, in his Official Capacity as Sheriff of St. Charles County, Missouri
Represented By: Robert Edward Hoeynck Jr.
Represented By: Toby J. Dible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?