Little Rock Family Planning, et al v. Arkansas Board of Health
Defendant / Appellant: Arkansas Board of Health
Plaintiff / Appellee: Little Rock Family Planning Services and Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma, doing business as Planned Parenthood Great Plains
Case Number: 19-1532
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 MANDATE ISSUED. [4771925] [19-1532] (LMT) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:11 PM]
March 28, 2019 JUDGMENT FILED - The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith.; Granting [ # 4771720-2 ] motion to dismiss case filed by Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for appellant. [4771916] [19-1532] (LMT) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:06 PM]
March 28, 2019 MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. Dylan L. Jacobs for Appellant Arkansas Board of Health w/service 03/28/2019. [4771720] [19-1532] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 12:43 PM]
March 19, 2019 UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1532: paid - cs] Fee paid in dist ct 3/18/19. [4768285] [19-1532] (RLS) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:09 PM]
March 14, 2019 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/23/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Arkansas Board of Health due 04/23/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766878] [19-1532] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:17 PM]
March 14, 2019 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 03/13/2019 [4766876] [19-1532] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:15 PM]
March 14, 2019 Civil case docketed. [4766863] [19-1532]--[Edited 03/14/2019 by RLS] (RLS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock Family Planning, et al v. Arkansas Board of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Arkansas Board of Health
Represented By: Michael A. Cantrell
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Little Rock Family Planning Services
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Christine Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Planned Parenthood of Arkansas and Eastern Oklahoma, doing business as Planned Parenthood Great Plains
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Christine Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?