State of Missouri, et al v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Montana, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota and State of Wyoming
Defendant / Appellant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as the President of the United States of America, United States of America, The Office of Personnel Management, Kiran Ahuja, in her official capacity as director of the Office of Personnel Management and as co-chair of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, General Services Administration, Robin Carnahan, in her official capacity as administrator of the General Services Administration and as co-chair of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Office of Management and Budget, Shalanda Young, in her official capacity as acting Director of the Office of Management and Budget and as a member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Jeffrey Zients, in his official capacity as co-chair of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, in her official capacity as Acting Administrator for Federal Procurement, Office of Management and Budget, John M. Tenaglia, in his official capacity as Principal Director of Defense Pricing and Contracting, Department of Defense, Jeffrey A. Koses, in his official capacity as Senior Procurement Executive & Deputy Chief Acquisition Officer, General Services Administration and Karla S. Jackson, in her official capacity as Assistant Administrator for Procurement, National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Case Number: 22-1104
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eighth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5133334-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David Peters. Brief of Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden Jr., Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, General Services Administration, Karla S. Jackson, Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, John M. Tenaglia, The Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Shalanda Young and Jeffrey Zients due 04/11/2022 [5133407] [22-1104] (MRM) [Entered: 03/07/2022 08:46 AM]
March 4, 2022 MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/11/2022, filed by Attorney Mr. David Peters for Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Ms. Lesley A. Field, GSA, Ms. Karla S. Jackson, Mr. Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Mr. John M. Tenaglia, The Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Ms. Shalanda Young and Mr. Jeffrey Zients w/service 03/04/2022. [5133334] [22-1104] (DP) [Entered: 03/04/2022 04:29 PM]
February 1, 2022 DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Ms. Lesley A. Field, GSA, Ms. Karla S. Jackson, Mr. Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Mr. John M. Tenaglia, The Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Ms. Shalanda Young and Mr. Jeffrey Zients. w/service 02/01/2022 [5122918] [22-1104] (DP) [Entered: 02/01/2022 02:13 PM]
January 24, 2022 METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Ms. Lesley A. Field, GSA, Ms. Karla S. Jackson, Mr. Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Mr. John M. Tenaglia, The Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Ms. Shalanda Young and Mr. Jeffrey Zients - Joint Appendix - w/service 01/24/2022 [5120084] [22-1104] (DP) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:13 PM]
January 20, 2022 STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Ms. Lesley A. Field, GSA, Ms. Karla S. Jackson, Mr. Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Mr. John M. Tenaglia, The Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Ms. Shalanda Young and Mr. Jeffrey Zients - w/service 01/20/2022. [5119002] [22-1104] (DP) [Entered: 01/20/2022 01:16 PM]
January 20, 2022 Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Ms. Lesley A. Field, GSA, Ms. Karla S. Jackson, Mr. Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Mr. John M. Tenaglia, The Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Ms. Shalanda Young and Mr. Jeffrey Zients. Transcript ordered[5118994] [22-1104] (DP) [Entered: 01/20/2022 01:10 PM]
January 20, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by D. John Sauer for Appellees State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota and State of Wyoming w/service 01/20/2022 [5118942] [22-1104] (DJS) [Entered: 01/20/2022 12:00 PM]
January 20, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Michael E.Talent for Appellees State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Iowa, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota and State of Wyoming w/service 01/20/2022 [5118937] [22-1104] (MET) [Entered: 01/20/2022 11:55 AM]
January 19, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by David L. Peters for Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Ms. Lesley A. Field, GSA, Ms. Karla S. Jackson, Mr. Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Mr. John M. Tenaglia, The Office of Personnel Management, United States of America, Ms. Shalanda Young and Mr. Jeffrey Zients w/service 01/19/2022 [5118428] [22-1104] (DP) [Entered: 01/19/2022 10:41 AM]
January 19, 2022 APPEARANCE filed by Anna O. Mohan for Appellants Ms. Kiran Ahuja, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Ms. Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Ms. Lesley A. Field, GSA, Ms. Karla S. Jackson, Mr. Jeffrey A. Koses, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Mr. Jeffrey Zients, Ms. Shalanda Young, United States of America, The Office of Personnel Management and Mr. John M. Tenaglia w/service 01/19/2022 [5118561] [22-1104] (AOM) [Entered: 01/19/2022 01:30 PM]
January 18, 2022 Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum & order 12/20/21. [5117891] [22-1104] (CAH) [Entered: 01/18/2022 10:58 AM]
January 18, 2022 BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/28/2022. Appendix due 03/10/2022. BRIEF APPELLANTS Joseph R. Biden Jr., et al., due 03/10/2022 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5117895] [22-1104] (CAH) [Entered: 01/18/2022 11:02 AM]
January 18, 2022 Civil case docketed. [5117888] [22-1104] (CAH) [Entered: 01/18/2022 10:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Missouri, et al v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Missouri
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Nebraska
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Alaska
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Iowa
Represented By: Samuel Paul Langholz
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Montana
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Justin D. Smith
Represented By: Michael E. Talent
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., in his official capacity as the President of the United States of America
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: The Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Kiran Ahuja, in her official capacity as director of the Office of Personnel Management and as co-chair of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: General Services Administration
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Robin Carnahan, in her official capacity as administrator of the General Services Administration and as co-chair of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Shalanda Young, in her official capacity as acting Director of the Office of Management and Budget and as a member of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Jeffrey Zients, in his official capacity as co-chair of the Safer Federal Workforce Task Force and COVID-19 Response Coordinator
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Lesley A. Field, in her official capacity as Acting Administrator for Federal Procurement, Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John M. Tenaglia, in his official capacity as Principal Director of Defense Pricing and Contracting, Department of Defense
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Jeffrey A. Koses, in his official capacity as Senior Procurement Executive & Deputy Chief Acquisition Officer, General Services Administration
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Karla S. Jackson, in her official capacity as Assistant Administrator for Procurement, National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: David Peters
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?