North American Meat Institute v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Defendant / Appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California, SONIA ANGELL, Dr., Director of the California Department of Public Health and KAREN ROSS, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, THE HUMANE LEAGUE, ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING USA, ANIMAL EQUALITY, COMPASSION OVER KILLING and FARM SANCTUARY
Plaintiff / Appellant: NORTH AMERICAN MEAT INSTITUTE
Case Number: 19-56408
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/05/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11522427]. [19-56408] (AD) [Entered: 12/05/2019 12:44 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellees Xavier Becerra, Karen Ross and Sonia Angell Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/05/2019. [11522108] [19-56408] (Wise, R.) [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:24 AM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11520903]. [19-56408] (AD) [Entered: 12/04/2019 12:44 PM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant North American Meat Institute Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/04/2019. [11520214] [19-56408] (Zidlicky, Paul) [Entered: 12/04/2019 07:39 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed December 3, 2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than January 3, 2020; the answering brief is due January 31, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11519718] (AF) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:52 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11519613] (RT) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Meat Institute v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONIA ANGELL, Dr., Director of the California Department of Public Health
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN ROSS, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: THE HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: THE HUMANE LEAGUE
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING USA
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: ANIMAL EQUALITY
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: COMPASSION OVER KILLING
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: FARM SANCTUARY
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NORTH AMERICAN MEAT INSTITUTE
Represented By: Paul J. Zidlicky
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons Esquire
Represented By: Eric Dean McArthur Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?