Apodaca v. Zavaras et al
Plaintiff: |
Steve Apodaca |
Defendant: |
Aristedes W. Zavaras, Susan Jones, William Claspell, Peggy Steele, Joseph W. Wright, James Michaud and James A. Olson |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00755 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 22, 2010 |
Filing
52
ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 46 Notice of Appeal by Steve Apodaca, appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a 1915 motion with district court, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/22/10. (bjrsl, )
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing
51
AMENDED ORDER re: 45 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to file Notice of Appeal by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/19/10. (bjrsl, )
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing
42
ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the 08/04/10, amended complaint, as amended by the 09/03/10 amendment, and the action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the failure of Plaintiff to comply with the pleading requirements of Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/18/10 for Zita Leeson Weinshienk(jjh, )
|
October 6, 2010 |
Filing
41
Minute ORDER granting 40 Motion to Clarify and Correct an Error. The Court will address the amendment Mr. Apodaca filed on 09/13/10. Additionally, the Court is aware that Plaintiff has named the Honorable Zita L. Weinshienk, as a Defendant in this action by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/06/10.(jjh, )
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing
31
Minute ORDER denying 29 Motion Requesting This Court to Direct the Clerk of the Court to Send Back Plaintiff's Amended Prisoner's COmplaint. Order granting 30 Motion to Amend Complaint only to the extend that Plaintiff requestsanother o pportunity to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff will be given one last opportunity to file a third and final amended complaint that complies with the directives of the 06/15/10 order. The clerk of the Court is directed to send to Plaintiff, togeth er with a copy of this minute order, a copy of the Prisoner Complaint form for Plaintiff to use in filing his third and final amended complaint. Plaintiff will be allowed 30 days from the date of this minute order in which to file a third and final amended complaint. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/12/10.(jjh, )
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing
19
Minute Order granting 18 (Motion) Request for Clarification of the 06/15/10, order as set forth in this Minute Order. Order granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff will be allowed 30 days in which to submit an amended complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/02/10.(jjh, )
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing
15
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/15/10. (jjh, )
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing
11
ORDER Overruling Objection. Ordered that the document titled "Request for Reconsideration of This Court's Order of 04/21/10 Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Appiontment of Counsel as Premature; and Plaintiff's Request to Have District Court Judge Hear His Civil Action and Not Magistrate Judge" 9 is construed as an objection and is overruled by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/04/10 for Zita Lesson Weinshienk (jjh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?