Jordan v. D.O.C. et al
Plaintiff: Victor L. Jordan, Sr.
Defendant: D.O.C., Jennifer Reis, Pierce, Carlos Nunez, Milling, James Watson, Richard Wauthier, Brian Lapila, Marco Correia, Robert Marquis, Brewer, Tony Colella, Justin R. Cossette, Saas, Guerrera, Kelly Wolf-Craig, Rios, Lisa, Maiya, Jane Doe, John Doe, Torres, Rodriguez and Calender
Case Number: 3:2024cv00236
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 3/4/2024. (Corriette, M.)
March 1, 2024 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Victor L. Jordan, Sr. (Imbriani, S)
March 1, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victor L. Jordan, Sr. (Imbriani, S)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INSUFFICIENCY. Plaintiff has filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP"); in other words, he seeks to commence a federal lawsuit without prepaying the filing fee. A federal law, 28 U.S.C. 1915, permits him to do so if, among other things, he submits a financial affidavit showing that he is unable to pay, accompanied by a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the six-month period preceding his complaint.Within the last two weeks, the Court has received five new complaints and IFP applications from Mr. Jordan:* The first of these complaints was filed on February 14, 2024, and docketed by the Clerk as 24-cv-204-VAB. It involves claims that CT Department of Correction ("DOC") staff has interfered with his legal mail, filings, and documents.* The second complaint was filed on February 20, 2024, and docketed by the Clerk as 24-cv-227-VAB. It involves claims that DOC staff denied him medical care, violating his rights under the Protect Act, the Americans with Disabilities Act, and the Rehabilitation Act.* The third complaint was filed on February 21, 2024, and docketed by the Clerk as 24-cv-236-VAB. It involves claims of retaliation, false imprisonment, and denial of reasonable accommodations, among others.* The fourth complaint was filed on February 23, 2024, and docketed by the Clerk as 24-cv-251-VAB. It involves claims of interference with plaintiff's court filings, denial of medical care, and failure to provide reasonable accommodations, among others.* The fifth complaint was filed on February 26, 2024, and docketed by the clerk as 24-cv-259-VAB. It involves claims of retaliation, deliberate indifference, and denial of mental health care, among others.For each of these complaints, Mr. Jordan filed an identical IFP application, modifying only the first page of each to reflect the named defendants in each case. This raises two concerns. The first concern is whether Mr. Jordan understands that he will incur five separate PRLA fees, whether or not the Court grants him IFP status. With the current filing fee of $405, the mere filing of these five complaints would amount to over $2,000 in fee liabilities. The second concern is whether the trust account statements he has filed in support of his IFP applications accurately reflect his current financial situation as of the filing of each complaint. The affidavit and trust account statement that Mr. Jordan filed with his first complaint, was two weeks out of date at the time of his last complaint. The Court cannot accept outdated account statements and copies of the same outdated certification for each IFP application.If Mr. Jordan truly wishes to initiate five separate cases and incur $2,025 in PLRA fee liabilities, he must submit separate IFP applications prepared separately for each case, stating his financial condition at the time of the complaint in that case. (He needs to do this only in 24-cv-236, 24-cv-251, and 24-cv-269, because the Court granted him IFP status in 24-cv-204 and 24-cv-227 before noticing this issue.) He must also submit a certified copy of his trust account statement, reflecting six months of his account balances up to the date of the filing of the complaint in that case, along with a separate certification signed by a DOC official, for each. If Mr. Jordan did not intend to initiate five separate cases and incur $2,025 in PLRA fee liabilities, he may withdraw any claim that he no longer wishes to pursue by filing a notice of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to send the plaintiff a blank copy of the application form at his address of record. The plaintiff is directed to fill out the form completely and accurately, and to file it with the Clerk of the Court along with a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement covering at least the six months before the date of his complaint. If he does not do so by March 20, 2024, his case may be dismissed. So ordered. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 2/28/2024.(Corriette, M.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Imbriani, S)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/21/2024.(Imbriani, S)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Chief Judge on 6/22/2016.(Imbriani, S)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/21/2024.(Imbriani, S)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2024. (Oliver, T.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Victor L. Jordan, Sr. (Oliver, T.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Authorization Form by Victor L. Jordan, Sr. (Oliver, T.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victor L. Jordan, Sr. (Oliver, T.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brewer, Calender, Tony Colella, Marco Correia, Justin R. Cossette, D.O.C., Jane Doe(RN), Jane Doe(PhD.), John Doe(#4), John Doe(#8), John Doe(#3), John Doe(#5), John Doe(#6), John Doe(#2), John Doe(Shift Commander), John Doe(#1), John Doe(#7), Guerrera, Brian Lapila, Lisa, Maiya, Robert Marquis, Milling, Carlos Nunez, Pierce, Jennifer Reis, Rios, Rodriguez, Saas, Torres, James Watson, Richard Wauthier, Kelly Wolf-Craig, filed by Victor L. Jordan, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oliver, T.)
February 21, 2024 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. D.O.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor L. Jordan, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lapila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Correia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Marquis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin R. Cossette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guerrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Wolf-Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?