Paoli v. Stetser et al
Plaintiff: |
Christina Paoli |
Defendant: |
Stetser, Layfield, Rowley, Ralston, Carlyle, O'Neil, Warrington, Barnett, Whaley, Delaware State Police Troop 7, Hardy and Dixon |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00066 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Delaware |
Office: |
Wilmington Office |
County: |
Sussex |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory M. Sleet |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 10, 2014 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM ORDER: 1. The Defendants' Objections to the Report and Recommendation (DI 73 ) are SUSTAINED; 2. The Report and Recommendation (DI 11 ) is ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART; 3. The Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (DI 52 ) is GRANTED; 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/10/2014. (mdb)
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing
72
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that D.I. 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Delaware State Police Troop 7, Carlyle, Dixon, Stetser, Rowley, Layfield, Warrington, Barnett, Hardy, Whaley, Ralston, O 039;Neil be GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Specifically, the Court recommends that Defendants' Motion be GRANTED as to all claims except for the Section 1983 illegal search and seizure claim asserted against Defendant Rowley. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/28/2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 07/11/2014. (mlc)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
62
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; denying 47 Motion to Amend/Correct; adopting Report and Recommendations re 58 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/10/13. (mmm)
|
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
58
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENIAL of D.I. 47 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint (Pro Se) and GRANTING-IN-PART D.I. 48 MOTION to Compel filed by Christina Paoli,, filed by Christina Paoli. Please note that when filing Obj ections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2013. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 05/16/2013. (mlc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?