March 26, 2024 |
Filing
1128
ORDER denying without prejudice 1030 BNSF Railway Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, 1031 CSX Transportation Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, 1032 Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, and 1033 Norfolk Southern Railway Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 26, 2024. (lcmo)
|
March 4, 2024 |
Filing
1123
OPINION AND ORDER regarding evidentiary dispute as to 49 U.S.C. § 10706. Defendants shall submit proposed redactions for specified exhibits on or before March 18, 2024. Plaintiffs shall file any objection to defendants' proposed redactions on or before April 1, 2024. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 4, 2024. (lcmo)
|
May 26, 2023 |
Filing
1102
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding the 1101 Status Report Regarding Case Schedule. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint status report, on or before June 9, 2023, with a proposed schedule for responding to this Order. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 26, 2023. (lcml)
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing
1088
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: On or before September 23, 2022, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file a joint status report informing the Court of the outcome of further discussions regarding which documents relevant to the pending summary judgment motions should be excluded, in whole or in part, under Section 10706. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 27, 2022. (lcjr)
|
June 29, 2022 |
Filing
1084
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting 1082 Defendants' Motion to Set Status Conference. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint status report, on or before July 12, 2022, informing the Court of any progress the parties have made to agree on procedures and set a schedule for supplemental briefing. The Court will hold a status conference on July 19, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. via Zoom videoconference, the details of which will be sent the morning of or in advance of the hearing. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 29, 2022. (ATM)
|
June 15, 2021 |
Filing
1043
OPINION granting 1010 Defendants' Motion for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). An order consistent with this opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 15, 2021. (lcaf)
|
March 30, 2021 |
Filing
1016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER setting a briefing schedule for summary judgment motions as to liability. Motions and opening briefs are due 5/14/2021; memoranda in opposition are due 7/13/2021; reply briefs are due 8/12/2021. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 30, 2021. (lcaf)
|
February 19, 2021 |
Filing
1008
OPINION denying 417 Defendants Motion to Exclude Interline-Related Communications from Consideration for Class Certification or Any Other Purpose Prohibited by 49 USC Section 10706; and denying 927 Defendants Motion and Memorandum of Law Regarding the Interpretation and Application of 49 USC Section 10706. An Order consistent with this Opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 19, 2021. (MA)
|
December 19, 2019 |
Filing
918
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re briefing on the Section 10706 issue. Defendants' motion supplementing their previous Section 10706 filings shall be due on or before February 21, 2020; plaintiffs' responses shall be due on or before April 3,2020; defendants' reply shall be due on or before April 24, 2020; and oral argument is scheduled on May 7, 2020 at 10:00p a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 19, 2019. (MA)
|
December 9, 2019 |
Filing
907
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the parties shall file joint supplemental submissions on or before December 16, 2019. (MA)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing
890
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Court will refer the disputes regarding the protective order to Magistrate Judge Harvey if the parties cannot resolve their issues by close of business on December 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 26, 2019. (MA)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
853
PUBLIC OPINION of October 10, 2017 denying direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 10, 2017.(MA)
|
October 10, 2017 |
Filing
843
ORDER denying direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification 337 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 10, 2017. (MA)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing
806
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions Offered by Dr. Joseph Kalt 774 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 20, 2016. (MA)
|
October 9, 2015 |
Filing
786
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendants' motion for leave to late file the declaration of Dr. B. Kelly Eakin. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 9, 2015. (lcplf1)
|
November 26, 2014 |
Filing
756
OPINION AND ORDER granting 742 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a supplemental expert report. Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental expert report on or before April 1, 2015; defendants shall notify the Court on or before April 15, 2015 whe ther they intend to file an additional expert report in response and propose a date by which they will do so; the parties shall jointly propose on or before April 22, 2015 a schedule for defendants' deposition of plaintiffs' supplemental expert, the deposition of defendants' expert, if necessary, and further briefing, if necessary. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 26, 2014. (MA)
|
November 12, 2014 |
Filing
750
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re issues the parties should be prepared to discuss at the November 13, 2014 hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 12, 2014. (MA)
|
September 3, 2013 |
Filing
668
OPINION denying Oxbow's motion to disqualify Latham & Watkins LLP. An appropriate order accompanies this opinion. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 3, 2013. (MA)
|
September 20, 2012 |
Filing
617
OPINION denying defedants' motion to stay proceedings under Rule 23(f) as it pertains to expert discovery and briefing of the Daubert and summary judgment issues and granting the motion as it pertains to class notice. An order consistent with this opinion will be issued this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 20, 2012. (MA)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing
550
PUBLIC OPINION of June 21, 2012 granting the direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 21, 2012. (lcplf1)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing
540
ORDER granting 337 direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for class certification; granting 537 direct purchaser plaintiffs' motion for order directing parties to meet and confer concerning scheduling. By July 10, 2012, the parties shall meet and confer and shall file a joint report showing cause why the Opinion issued under seal this same day should not be published in full without redactions on the public docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 6/21/2012. (zmm, )
|
November 30, 2011 |
Filing
535
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 511 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/30/11. (lcjmf1)
|
November 17, 2011 |
Filing
534
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 533 ORDER re 506 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/17/11. (lcjmf1)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
436
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: In Camera Review of Union Pacific Railway Company Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 09/28/2010. (lcjmf1)
|
June 7, 2010 |
Filing
371
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 340 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 06/07/2010. (lcjmf1)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
313
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 10/23/2009. (lcjmf1)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing
291
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 7/2/09. (lcjmf1)
|