SOGHOIAN v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Featured Case

Electronic security and privacy research Christopher Soghoian's Freedom of Information Act ('FOIA') lawsuit filed against the U.S. Department of Justice over its refusal to release agency records responsive to his request for agency records on GPS, location tracking, and related surveillance of people within an FBI target's 'community of interest.'

Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2011cv01080
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2012 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/31/2012. (lcabj2)
July 31, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 17 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing as moot. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/31/2012. (lcabj2)
July 15, 2012 26 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's July 5, 2012 Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re Order, (Interrante, John)
July 6, 2012 Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant's In-Camera Submission due by 7/13/2012. (jth)
July 5, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that on or before July 13, 2012, defendant deliver to chambers withheld documents 1, 2, and 5-14 on CRM's Vaughn Index, as well as 3 and 4 on EOUSA's Vaughn index for in camera inspection to assist the Court in making a responsible de novo determination, see Ray v. Turner, 587 F.2d 1187, 1195 (D.C. Cir. 1978). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/5/12. (lcabj1)
June 22, 2012 25 REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing filed by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN. (See Docket Entry 24 to view document). (znmw, )
June 22, 2012 24 SURREPLY to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment filed by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN. (SOGHOIAN, CHRISTOPHER) Modified link on 6/25/2012 (znmw, ).
June 15, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 17 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. The reply will be due 6/22/2012. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/2012. (MT)
June 14, 2012 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply reply to cross-motion by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SOGHOIAN, CHRISTOPHER)
June 14, 2012 22 NOTICE of Filing of Full Vaughn Index by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re Set/Reset Deadlines, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Vaughn Index for EOUSA (Boseker Declaration), # 2 Exhibit Vaughn Index for DOJ CRM (Cunningham Declaration))(Interrante, John)
June 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant is ordered to submit a full Vaughn Index to the Court by 6/20/2012. The Cunningham Declaration [Dkt. # 15-2] references an attached Vaughn index, but the index appears to have been omitted from the declaration. The Boseker Declaration [Dkt. # 15-3] contains a proper index. Defendant is directed to provide the Court with the full index of documents withheld from plaintiff's request and the exemptions relied upon for doing so. (jth)
June 13, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER Defendant is ordered to submit a full Vaughn Index to the Court on or before June 20, 2012. The Cunningham Declaration [Dkt. # 15-2] references an attached Vaughn index, but the index appears to have been omitted from the declaration. The Boseker Declaration [Dkt. # 15-3] contains a proper index. Defendant is directed to provide the Court with the full index of documents withheld from plaintiff's request and the exemptions relied upon for doing so. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/13/2012. (lcabj2)
May 15, 2012 21 Memorandum in opposition to re 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing (same as ECF No. 20) filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Interrante, John)
May 15, 2012 NOTICE OF ERROR re 20 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to john.interrante@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please refile document, 3. Same document under the Opposition event (jf, )
May 14, 2012 20 REPLY to opposition to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Interrante, John) Modified on 5/15/2012 (jf, ).
April 30, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. The reply to the motion for summary judgment and opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment will be due 5/14/2012. The reply to the cross-motion for summary judgment will be due 6/14/2012. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/30/2012. (MT)
April 27, 2012 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing, 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Amend Court's February 16, 2012 Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
April 10, 2012 18 Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN. (See Docket Entry 17 to view document) (jf, )
April 10, 2012 17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Oral Hearing by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SOGHOIAN, CHRISTOPHER). Added MOTION for Hearing on 4/10/2012 (jf, ).
February 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 4/9/2012. (jth)
February 16, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The opposition to 15 Motion for Summary Judgment will be due 4/9/2012. The parties should evaluate their relative positions and notify chambers if a referral to the court mediation program or a Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes would be appropriate in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/16/2012. (MT)
February 15, 2012 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend January 19, 2012 Minute Order by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SOGHOIAN, CHRISTOPHER)
February 6, 2012 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration John Cunningham (DOJ CRM), # 3 Declaration John Boseker (EOUSA), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
January 19, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion is due by 2/6/2012; Plaintiff's Opposition is due by 3/9/2012; and Defendant's Reply is due by 3/23/2012. (jth)
January 19, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due 2/6/2012, plaintiff's opposition will be due 3/9/2012, and defendant's reply will be due 3/23/2012. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/19/2012. (MT)
January 18, 2012 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 12 Scheduling Order,, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
October 28, 2011 13 STATUS REPORT (Consent) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Interrante, John)
October 11, 2011 12 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment will be due by 1/20/2012. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion for summary judgment will be due by 2/21/2012. Defendant's reply to the motion for summary judgment will be due by 3/13/2012. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/11/2011. (MT)
October 11, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are directed to submit another status report indicating whether, in light of the agency's further review of the withheld documents and the fact that many of the requested documents are available on the internet, the matter can be resolved short of the filing of dispositive motions. Status Report due by 10/28/2011. (jth)
October 11, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to submit another status report on or before 10/28/2011 indicating whether, in light of the agency's further review of the withheld documents and the fact that many of the requested documents are available on the internet, the matter can be resolved short of the filing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/11/2011. (MT)
October 7, 2011 11 STATUS REPORT (Consent) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Interrante, John)
September 13, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are directed to file a joint report notifying the Court if the Vaughn declarations have been completed and proposing a schedule for the briefing of dispositive motions. The Joint Report is due by 10/7/2011. (jth)
September 13, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re 10 Defendant's Scheduling Report. The parties are directed to submit a joint report on or before 10/7/2011 notifying the Court if the Vaughn declarations have been completed and proposing a schedule for the briefing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/2011. (MT)
September 12, 2011 10 NOTICE (Defendant's Scheduling Report) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 9 Order (Interrante, John)
August 15, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant directed to file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a document production scheduling report by 9/12/2011. (jth)
August 15, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER that defendant file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a document production scheduling report on or before 9/12/2011. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/15/2011. (MT)
August 12, 2011 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Interrante, John)
July 12, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The answer will be due 8/12/2011. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/12/2011. (MT)
July 11, 2011 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John)
July 10, 2011 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Interrante on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Interrante, John)
June 29, 2011 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/14/2011. (SOGHOIAN, CHRISTOPHER)
June 29, 2011 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/14/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/14/2011. (SOGHOIAN, CHRISTOPHER)
June 29, 2011 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/14/2011 (SOGHOIAN, CHRISTOPHER)
June 14, 2011 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 2 pro se plaintiff's motion to file electronically. Plaintiff should read materials available on the Court's website pertaining to electronic filing, fill out the ECF Registration Form, and fax it to the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/14/11. (MT)
June 13, 2011 2 MOTION to allow electronically filing by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN (jf, )
June 13, 2011 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
June 13, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616039588) filed by CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOGHOIAN v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SOGHOIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: John G. Interrante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?