STATE OF TEXAS v. HOLDER Featured Case

Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Defendant: ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR.
Movant: ERIC KENNIE, ANNA BURNS, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY, JANE HAMILTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, LORRAINE BIRABIL, DANIEL CLAYTON and SERGIO DELEON
Case Number: 1:2012cv00128
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Referring Judge: David S. Tatel
2 Judge: Robert L. Wilkins
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint proposed schedule due by 9/12/2012. (cdw)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER denying Texas's request for judicial preclearance of Senate Bill 14 and ordering the parties to submit a joint proposed schedule on Claim Two of Texas's Amended Complaint by September 13, 2012. See Order for further details. Signed by Judges David S. Tatel, Rosemary M. Collyer, and Robert L. Wilkins on 8/30/2012. (lcrmc2)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 340 THREE JUDGE OPINION. Signed by Judges David S. Tatel, Rosemary M. Collyer, and Robert L. Wilkins on 8/30/2012. (lcrmc2)
August 27, 2012 Filing 339 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on April 30, 2012; Page Numbers: 1-58. Date of Issuance:August 27, 2012. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2012.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
August 20, 2012 Filing 338 NOTICE of Filing Section 5 Determination by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Berkower, Risa)
August 12, 2012 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 7/12/12 am; Page Numbers: 1-168. Date of Issuance:8/12/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2012.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
August 12, 2012 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 7/11/12 am; Page Numbers: 1-187. Date of Issuance:8/12/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2012.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
August 12, 2012 Filing 335 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 7/10/12 am; Page Numbers: 1-173. Date of Issuance:8/12/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2012.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
August 12, 2012 Filing 334 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 7/9/12 am; Page Numbers: 1-189. Date of Issuance:8/12/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202..354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2012.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
August 12, 2012 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 5/3/12; Page Numbers: 1-134. Date of Issuance:8/12/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2012.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
August 3, 2012 Filing 332 NOTICE of Recent District Court Decision Regarding Restrictions On Third-Party Voter Registration Activity In Texas by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
August 3, 2012 Filing 331 NOTICE of Recent Opinion Regarding Voter ID by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 26, 2012 Filing 330 RESPONSE re 308 Notice (Other) Regarding Election Identification Certificates filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Westfall, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2012 Filing 329 RESPONSE re 318 Notice (Other) of Objections to Defendant's Trial Exhibits filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Maranzano, Jennifer)
July 23, 2012 Filing 328 SEALED Exhibits filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(PX539) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX540, # 2 Exhibit PX600, # 3 Exhibit PX601, # 4 Exhibit PX602, # 5 Exhibit PX604, # 6 Exhibit PX605, # 7 Exhibit PX607, # 8 Exhibit PX609, # 9 Exhibit PX700, # 10 Exhibit PX711, # 11 Exhibit PX712, # 12 Exhibit PX713, # 13 Exhibit PX714, # 14 Exhibit PX715, # 15 Exhibit PX716, # 16 Exhibit PX717, # 17 Exhibit PX718, # 18 Exhibit PX751, # 19 Exhibit PX752, # 20 Exhibit PX759, # 21 Exhibit PX760, # 22 Exhibit PX788, # 23 Exhibit PX789, # 24 Exhibit PX790, # 25 Exhibit PX791, # 26 Exhibit PX1-ELLIS1, # 27 Exhibit PX1-ELLIS2)(zrdj)
July 23, 2012 Filing 327 SEALED Exhibit B to Notice Re VRNID and DPS Data Under filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 321 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; granting 325 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/23/2012. (lcrmc2)
July 19, 2012 Filing 326 RESPONSE re 317 Notice (Other) regarding objections to Defendant-Intervenors' Trial Exhibits filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 19, 2012 Filing 325 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Seal Exhibits Exhibits PX1-Ellis1, PX1-Ellis2, PX539, PX540, PX600, PX601, PX602, PX604, PX605, PX607, PX609, PX700, PX711, PX712, PX713, PX714, PX715, PX716, PX717, PX718, PX751, PX752, PX759, PX760, PX788, PX789, PX790, PX791 by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 18, 2012 Filing 324 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by STATE OF TEXAS re 322 Notice (Other) (Sweeten, Patrick)
July 18, 2012 Filing 323 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibits by STATE OF TEXAS re 322 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX 106, # 2 Exhibit PX 400, # 3 Exhibit PX 401, # 4 Exhibit PX 402, # 5 Exhibit PX 404, # 6 Exhibit PX 506, # 7 Exhibit PX 509, # 8 Exhibit PX 513, # 9 Exhibit PX 518, # 10 Exhibit PX 526, # 11 Exhibit PX 530, # 12 Exhibit PX 531, # 13 Exhibit PX 532, # 14 Exhibit PX 538, # 15 Exhibit PX 543, # 16 Exhibit PX 547, # 17 Exhibit PX 548, # 18 Exhibit PX 558, # 19 Exhibit PX 576)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 18, 2012 Filing 322 NOTICE of Filing of State of Texas's Revised Trial Exhibit List by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State's Trial Exhibit List)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 17, 2012 Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit B to Notice Re VRNID and DPS Data Under Seal by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
July 17, 2012 Filing 320 NOTICE of Errata by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 17, 2012 Filing 319 NOTICE Regarding Objection to State of Texas's Trial Exhibits by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 17, 2012 Filing 318 NOTICE of Filing Objections to U.S. Trial Exhibits by STATE OF TEXAS re 314 Notice (Other), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Objections to US Trial Exhibits)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 17, 2012 Filing 317 NOTICE of Filing of Obbjections to Def-In tervenors' Trial Exhibits by STATE OF TEXAS re 303 Notice (Other), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Objections to Def-Intervenors' Trial Exhibits)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 17, 2012 Filing 316 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit B to Notice Re VRNID and DPS Data by STATE OF TEXAS re 315 Notice (Other) (Sweeten, Patrick)
July 17, 2012 Filing 315 NOTICE Regarding VRNID and DPS Data by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 17, 2012 Filing 314 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 311 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 590, # 2 Exhibit DE 591, # 3 Exhibit DE 592, # 4 Exhibit DE 593, # 5 Exhibit DE 594, # 6 Exhibit DE 595, # 7 Exhibit DE 596, # 8 Exhibit DE 597, # 9 Exhibit DE 598)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2012 Filing 313 NOTICE of Filing Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 311 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DE 579, # 2 Exhibit DE 580, # 3 Exhibit DE 581, # 4 Exhibit DE 582, # 5 Exhibit DE 583, # 6 Exhibit DE 584, # 7 Exhibit DE 585, # 8 Exhibit DE586, # 9 Exhibit DE 587, # 10 Exhibit DE 588, # 11 Exhibit DE 589)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2012 Filing 312 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Trial Exhibits by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 13, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Bench Trial held and concluded on 7/13/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
July 13, 2012 Filing 311 NOTICE of Revised Trial Exhibit List by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Berkower, Risa)
July 13, 2012 Filing 310 NOTICE of Objections to State of Texas's Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Berkower, Risa)
July 13, 2012 Filing 309 NOTICE of Advisory to the Court Clarifying the Underlying Documents Needed to Obtain an Election Identification Certificate by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Perales, Nina)
July 13, 2012 Filing 308 NOTICE of Advisory Regarding Election Identification Certificates by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Mortara, Adam)
July 12, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Bench Trial held on 7/12/2012. Defendant/Intervenor Witnesses: Senator Carlos Uresti (via video deposition), Senator Wendy Davis, Dr. Allan Lichtman, and Professor Stephen Ansolabehere. Oral Motion by the Intervenor Defendants to offer Dr. Lichtman as an expert in the fields of political history, political analysis, historical methodologies, statistical methodologies, and voting rights, heard and granted. Oral Motion by the parties to offer Dr. Ansolabehere as an expert in American electoral politics, public opinion, statistical methods in political science, and the analysis of the effect of voting changes and voting laws, heard and granted. Bench Trial continued to 7/13/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim (AM) & Rebecca Stonestreet (PM)). (cdw)
July 12, 2012 Filing 307 NOTICE of Corrections to the Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Thomas Sager by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mortara, Adam)
July 12, 2012 Filing 306 NOTICE of Reply Designations for Expert Witnesses by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Berkower, Risa)
July 12, 2012 Filing 305 NOTICE Concerning Unpublished Opinion by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Apache County HSD No. 90 v. United States)(Freeman, Daniel)
July 12, 2012 Filing 304 NOTICE of Reply Designations for Sen. Carlos Uresti by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Berkower, Risa)
July 12, 2012 Filing 303 NOTICE of Filing Amended List of Trial Exhibits and Second Supplemental Appendix by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Index of Trial Exhibits, # 2 Appendix Index to the Second Supplemental Appendix, # 3 Appendix Second Supplemental Appendix)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 12, 2012 Filing 302 NOTICE of Counter Expert Deposition Designations by STATE OF TEXAS re 271 Notice (Other), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mortara, Adam)
July 11, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Bench Trial held on 7/11/2012. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Professor Daron Shaw. Oral Motion by the Plaintiff to admit Professor Daron Shaw as an expert in the areas of Political Science elections, public opinion voting behavior, and survey research, heard and granted. Defendant/Intervenor Witnesses: Victoria Rodriguez, Lydia Camarillo, Reverend Peter Jackson, Senator Rodney Ellis, Randall "Buck" Wood, Professor Henry Flores, Dr. David Marker, and Senator Carlos Uresti (via video deposition). Oral Motion by the Intervenor Defendants to offer Dr. David Marker as an expert in survey work, survey research, sampling methodology, survey response rates, survey evaluation, and data analysis, heard and granted. Bench Trial continued to 7/12/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim (AM) & Rebecca Stonestreet (PM)) (cdw)
July 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Bench Trial held on 7/10/2012. Plaintiff's Witness: Professor Thomas Sager. Defendant/Intervenor Witnesses: Representative Trey Martinez Fischer, Representative Rafael Anchia, Professor Morgan Kousser, and Victoria Rodriguez. Bench Trial continued to 7/11/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim (AM) & Rebecca Stonestreet (PM)) (cdw)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 239 Motion to Take Judicial Notice; granting 293 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court will take judicial notice of the facts set forth in the Defendant-Intervenor's 296 Reply. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/10/12. (lcrmc2)
July 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Bench Trial held on 7/9/2012. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Brian Keith Ingram, Representative Jose Aliseda, Major Forrest Mitchell, Senator Thomas Williams, and Professor Thomas Sager. Bench Trial continued to 7/10/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim (AM) & Rebecca Stonestreet (PM)) (cdw)
July 9, 2012 Filing 301 NOTICE of Senator Uresti's Deposition Designations by STATE OF TEXAS (Frederick, Matthew)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 298 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katie O'Connor terminated. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/9/2012. (KD)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 297 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reynolds Brissenden may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the State of Texas. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/9/2012. (KD)
July 9, 2012 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Colangelo on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (jeb, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 298 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PETER JOHNSON, JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, DONALD WRIGHT, RONALD WRIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Katie)
July 9, 2012 Filing 297 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Reynolds B. Brissenden, :Firm- Office of the Attorney General, :Address- 300 West 15th Street, 9th Floor. Phone No. - 512-936-2158. Fax No. - 512-499-0712 by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Reynolds B. Brissenden, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 9, 2012 Filing 296 REPLY to opposition to motion re 239 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 8, 2012 NOTICE of Ruling. MINUTE ORDER: The Attorney General has requested to present a witness' live testimony and also have this Court rely on the deposition designations for that same witness. The Attorney General claims that, given the time constraints, it will present truncated live testimony that will be supplemented by the deposition designations. Texas opposes this request. According to Texas, a witness should either be presented live or through deposition testimony, but not both. The Court overrules Texas' objection. The Court finds that the scheduling difficulties and strict time constraints for the presentation of evidence in this three-judge trial constitute an "exceptional circumstance" within the meaning of Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a)(4)(E), so that the Attorney General may proceed in this fashion, and Texas and the Defendant-Intervenors may cross-examine the witness in court and/or cross-designate portions of the witness' deposition testimony as they deem appropriate and as their scheduling priorities direct. See SCM Corp. v. Xerox Corp., 76 F.R.D. 214, 216 n.2 (D. Conn. 1977) ("[i]f some brief portions of the deposition concern relatively non-controversial matters, as to which an opportunity to assess credibility by observing the witness is not important, such portions may be admissible under provision (E) of Rule 32(a)(3) [now see Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a)(4)], since the length of this trial is itself an 'exceptional circumstance' justifying such use 'in the interest of justice and with due regard to the importance of presenting the testimony of witnesses orally in open court' ")(quoting the Rule). (Wilkins, Robert)
July 6, 2012 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Colangelo on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (znmw, )
July 6, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert L. Wilkins: Telephone Conference held and concluded on 7/6/2012. (Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim) (tcb)
July 6, 2012 Filing 295 NOTICE Identifying Order of Witnesses by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Westfall, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2012 Filing 294 RESPONSE re 239 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Mortara, Adam)
July 6, 2012 Filing 293 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond to the Court's Order Regarding the Joint Request for Judicial Notice by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 276 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas A. Saenz. Mr. Saenz is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Intervenor- Defendant MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ and SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/6/2012. (tcb)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 282 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/6/2012. (tcb)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting 279 MOTION to Allow the Testimony of Lydia Camarillo by Declaration or, in the Alternative, to Grant Leave to Amend Witness List to Present Her Testimony Live. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/6/2012. (tcb)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting 280 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Seal Document; For the reasons set forth in the State of Texass motion, the Court hereby GRANTS State of Texass motion to seal. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/6/2012. (tcb) .
July 6, 2012 Filing 290 NOTICE of Clarification of Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 7/6/2012 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins. (tcb)
July 5, 2012 Filing 289 REPLY re 254 Notice (Other) of Attorney General's Deposition Designations in Reply filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Fisher, Spencer)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Texas' request, and the consent of all parties, the telephonic status conference scheduled for July 6, 2012, will be held at 3:00 p.m. EST rather than 2:00 p.m. EST. All other aspects of this Court's Minute Order of this date remain in effect. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/5/12. (lcrlw2)
July 5, 2012 Filing 288 REPLY re 254 Notice (Other) of Plaintiff's Objections and Counter Designations filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A telephonic status conference is hereby set for 2:00 p.m. Eastern Time, July 6, 2012 in Courtroom 17. No later than noon EST on July 6, 2012, one representative of the parties shall contact the chambers of Judge Wilkins (202-354-3480) to provide a joint call-in number for the call. In their respective witness lists submitted on June 20, 2012, Defendant Attorney General and Defendant-Intervenors indicated that there were some witnesses whose testimony they intended to present live while there were other witnesses whose testimony they intended to present by "trial deposition" or "declaration." The parties are hereby ordered to meet and confer with respect to their witness lists and be prepared to report at the status conference: which witnesses will appear live; which witnesses, if any, will appear by trial deposition or declaration; and whether there is any objection to any party's final witness list. The Court also needs to raise some scheduling issues during the status conference. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/5/2012. (lcrlw2)
July 5, 2012 Filing 287 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Reply Appendix by STATE OF TEXAS re 264 Reply to Document (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Contents, # 2 Appendix)(Frederick, Matthew)
July 5, 2012 Filing 286 REPLY re 241 Proposed Findings of Fact, 240 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Supplemental Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Supp. App. Exhibits 119-123, # 3 Exhibit Supp. App. Exhibits 124-128)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 5, 2012 Filing 285 REPLY re 223 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Freeman, Daniel)
July 4, 2012 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Sells on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Sells, Bryan)
July 4, 2012 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Alan Dellheim on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Dellheim, Richard)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's May 7, 2012 Order [Dkt. 107], the parties were required to submit versions of their proposed findings of fact/conclusions of law (FoF/CoL) containing hyperlinks "to the precise page of the appendix or relevant legal authority cited." Defendant Attorney General's submission, however, contains hyperlinks that only link to the first page of a cited exhibit or authority. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Attorney General shall deliver, no later than 4:00 p.m. on July 5, 2012, 6 corrected copies of discs containing its submissions with hyperlinks to the precise page of the appendix or legal authority cited. These discs should be hand delivered to the clerk's office, and addressed to the Chambers of Judge Robert L. Wilkins. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/2012. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Filing 282 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Senate Rules by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Fisher, Spencer)
July 3, 2012 Filing 281 NOTICE Advisory Regarding Deposition Designations by STATE OF TEXAS (Frederick, Matthew)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 197 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, or Reference to the Subjective Intent of Individual Legislators. Any ruling on this Motion is premature, there is no prejudice to allowing such evidence or argument given that this will be a bench trial, and the Motion raises a question of law upon which the Court is able to rule at any time. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12.(lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 217 Motion in Limine to Exclude Documents Related to Fraud and Testimony by Major Forrest Mitchell. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 201 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of J. Morgan Kousser. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 194 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Allan J. Lichtman. Professor Lichtman does not, as Texas argues, attempt to opine on the individual intentions of legislators. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 192 Motion in Limine to Preclude Witness Testimony on Matters That Are Protected by the Legislative Privilege. Any ruling on this Motion is premature, as the Court is able to rule on any objections as appropriate at trial. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 219 Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Census Data. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12.(lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 193 Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony by the Texas League of Young Voters' Newly Disclosed Witnesses. The Texas League of Young Voters fails to give good cause for its late notice of the two witnesses, and there has been no substantial justification shown for the failure to previously disclose the witnesses. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 195 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument and Testimony Suggesting an Adverse Inference Based on Texas Legislators' Assertion of Legislative Privilege. The Motion is premature, there is no prejudice to allowing such evidence or argument given that this will be a bench trial, and the Motion raises a question of law upon which the Court is able to rule at any time. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 266 Defendant Attorney General's Motion for Immediate Relief Concerning Plaintiff's Response to the Attorney General's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Any facts that Texas has set forth in its initial briefing that it did not "reply to or oppose" are not deemed conceded or waived simply because Texas did not reply to them paragraph by paragraph in its Reply. Moreover, to the extent Texas raises any additional facts in a Reply, the Attorney General is free to respond to those facts in its July 5, 2012 brief. The Attorney General has failed to show any prejudice which would warrant granting its Motion. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 221 Motion in Limine. Pursuant to the Stipulation filed by the parties [Dkt. No. 245] on June 29, 2012, Defendant Attorney General has withdrawn this Motion. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12. (lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Filing 280 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Seal Document by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Frederick, Matthew)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/3/12.(lcrlw2)
July 3, 2012 Filing 279 MOTION to Allow the Testimony of Lydia Camarillo by Declaration or, in the Alternative, to Grant Leave to Amend Witness List to Present Her Testimony Live by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 3, 2012 Filing 278 NOTICE of Filing Supplement to Texas Joint Appendix by STATE OF TEXAS re 206 Large Additional Attachment(s) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Contents, # 2 Appendix)(Frederick, Matthew)
July 3, 2012 Filing 277 NOTICE of Clarification of List of Trial Exhibits by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 3, 2012 Filing 276 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas A. Saenz, :Firm- MALDEF, :Address- 634 S. Spring Street, 11th Fl., Los Angeles, CA 90014. Phone No. - 213-629-2512. Fax No. - 213-629-8016 by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas A. Saenz, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
July 3, 2012 Filing 275 NOTICE of Errata by STATE OF TEXAS re 264 Reply to Document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Frederick, Matthew)
July 3, 2012 Filing 274 RESPONSE re 266 MOTION for Immediate Relief Concerning Plaintiff's Response to the Attorney General's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Frederick, Matthew)
July 2, 2012 Filing 273 NOTICE of Trial Exhibit List by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 571, # 3 Exhibit 572, # 4 Exhibit 573, # 5 Exhibit 574, # 6 Exhibit 575, # 7 Exhibit 576, # 8 Exhibit 577, # 9 Exhibit 578)(Berkower, Risa)
July 2, 2012 Filing 272 NOTICE of Trial Exhibits by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
July 2, 2012 Filing 271 NOTICE of Expert Deposition Designations by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert Deposition Designations, # 2 Exhibit Ansolabehere, # 3 Exhibit Flores, # 4 Exhibit Kousser, # 5 Exhibit Marker, # 6 Exhibit Sager part A, # 7 Exhibit Sager part B, # 8 Exhibit Shaw)(Berkower, Risa)
July 2, 2012 Filing 270 Proposed Findings of Fact by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Freeman, Daniel)
July 2, 2012 Filing 269 NOTICE Advisory Concerning Stricken Portions of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Pursuant to June 29, 2012 Stipulation by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2012 Filing 268 NOTICE regarding Stipulation by STATE OF TEXAS re 245 Notice (Other) (Sweeten, Patrick)
July 2, 2012 Filing 267 Exhibit List by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Frederick, Matthew)
July 2, 2012 Filing 266 MOTION for Immediate Relief Concerning Plaintiff's Response to the Attorney General's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkower, Risa)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 252 Motion for Leave for Luis O. Figueroa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/2/2012. (lcrmc2)
July 1, 2012 Filing 265 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 264 Reply to Document filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A-1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment A-2, # 3 Exhibit Attachment B-1, # 4 Exhibit Attachment B-2, # 5 Exhibit Attachment C-1, # 6 Exhibit Attachment C-2, # 7 Exhibit Attachment D-1, # 8 Exhibit Attachment D-2, # 9 Exhibit Attachment E-1, # 10 Exhibit Attachment E-2)(Sweeten, Patrick)
July 1, 2012 Filing 264 REPLY re 223 Proposed Findings of Fact, 202 Proposed Findings of Fact AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
July 1, 2012 Filing 263 RESPONSE re 241 Proposed Findings of Fact, 240 Proposed Findings of Fact Plaintiff's Response to Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 30, 2012 Filing 262 NOTICE of Errata by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 30, 2012 Filing 261 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 224 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Appx Att 51 - Ex 554b, # 2 Exhibit AG Appx Att 52 - Ex 554c, # 3 Exhibit AG Appx Att 53 - Exs 555-559, # 4 Exhibit AG Appx Att 54 - Exs 560-565, # 5 Exhibit AG Appx Att 55 - Exs 566-570, # 6 AG Appx Att 56 - Exhibit Index)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2012 Filing 260 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 224 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Appx Att 41 - Exs 498-505, # 2 Exhibit AG Appx Att 42 - Exs 506-512, # 3 Exhibit AG Appx Att 43 - Exs 513-516, # 4 Exhibit AG Appx Att 44 - Exs 517-530, # 5 Exhibit AG Appx Att 45 - Exs 531-538, # 6 Exhibit AG Appx Att 46 - Exs 539-543, # 7 Exhibit AG Appx Att 47 - Exs 544-547, # 8 Exhibit AG Appx Att 48 - Exs 548-550, # 9 Exhibit AG Appx Att 49 - Exs 551-553, # 10 Exhibit AG Appx Att 50 - Ex 554a)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2012 Filing 259 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 224 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Appx Att 31 - Ex 404, # 2 Exhibit AG Appx Att 32 - Exs 405-406, # 3 Exhibit AG Appx Att 33 - Exs 407-413, # 4 Exhibit AG Appx Att 34 - Exs 414-430, # 5 Exhibit AG Appx Att 35 - Exs 431-436, # 6 Exhibit AG Appx Att 36 - Exs 437-441, # 7 Exhibit AG Appx Att 37 - Exs 442-450, # 8 Exhibit AG Appx Att 38 - Exs 451-459, # 9 Exhibit AG Appx Att 39 - Exs 460-473, # 10 Exhibit AG Appx Att 40 - Exs 474-497)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2012 Filing 258 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 224 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Appx Att 21 - Exs 307-326, # 2 Exhibit AG Appx Att 22 - Exs 327-348, # 3 Exhibit AG Appx Att 23 - Exs 349-367, # 4 Exhibit AG Appx Att 24 - Ex 368, # 5 Exhibit AG Appx Att 25 - Exs 369-372, # 6 Exhibit AG Appx Att 26 - Exs 373-383, # 7 Exhibit AG Appx Att 27 - Ex 384, # 8 Exhibit AG Appx Att 28 - Exs 385-389, # 9 Exhibit AG Appx Att 29 - Exs 390-395, # 10 Exhibit AG Appx Att 30 - Exs 396-403)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2012 Filing 257 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 224 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Appx Att 11 - Exs 99-102a, # 2 Exhibit AG Appx Att 12 - Exs 102b-107, # 3 Exhibit AG Appx Att 13 - Exs 108-162, # 4 Exhibit AG Appx Att 14 - Exs 163-216, # 5 Exhibit AG Appx Att 15 - Exs 217-234, # 6 Exhibit AG Appx Att 16 - Exs 235-263, # 7 Exhibit AG Appx Att 17 - Exs 264-286, # 8 Exhibit AG Appx Att 18 - Ex 287a, # 9 Exhibit AG Appx Att 19 - Ex 287b, # 10 Exhibit AG Appx Att 20 - Exs 288-306)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2012 Filing 256 NOTICE of Filing of Trial Exhibits by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 224 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AG Appx Att 01 - Exs 1-41, # 2 Exhibit AG Appx Att 02 - Exs 42-58, # 3 Exhibit AG Appx Att 03 - Exs 59-85, # 4 Exhibit AG Appx Att 04 - Ex 86a, # 5 Exhibit AG Appx Att 04 - Ex 86a, # 6 Exhibit AG Appx Att 06 - Ex 86c, # 7 Exhibit AG Appx Att 07 - Ex 86d, # 8 Exhibit AG Appx Att 08 - Exs 87-93, # 9 Exhibit AG Appx Att 09 - Exs 94-96a, # 10 Exhibit AG Appx Att 10 - Exs 96b-98)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2012 Filing 255 NOTICE of Correction by STATE OF TEXAS re 254 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mortara, Adam)
June 29, 2012 Filing 254 NOTICE of Counter Designations & Objections by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Errata A)(Mortara, Adam)
June 29, 2012 Filing 253 REPLY to opposition to motion re 217 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Documents Related to Fraud and Testimony by Major Forrest Mitchell filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Fisher, Spencer)
June 29, 2012 Filing 252 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Luis O. Figueroa, :Firm- MALDEF, :Address- 110 Broadway, Suite 300, San Antonio, TX 78205. Phone No. - 210-224-5476. Fax No. - 210-224-5382 by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Luis O. Figueroa, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
June 29, 2012 Filing 251 REPLY to opposition to motion re 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Allan J. Lichtman filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 250 REPLY to opposition to motion re 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of J. Morgan Kousser filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 249 REPLY to opposition to motion re 192 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony Protected by Legislative Privilege filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 248 REPLY to opposition to motion re 195 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Suggesting an Adverse Inference Based on Texas Legislators' Assertion of Legislative Privilege filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 247 REPLY to opposition to motion re 193 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by the Texas League of Young Voters's Newly Disclosed Witnesses filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 246 REPLY to opposition to motion re 197 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, or Reference to the Subjective Intent of Individual Legislators filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 29, 2012 Filing 245 NOTICE of Stipulation by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation)(Freeman, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 Filing 244 NOTICE of Erratum by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 223 Proposed Findings of Fact (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FoF/CoL Corrected)(Freeman, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the Attorney General to electronically file the exhibits to 223 Proposed Findings of Fact. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/29/12. (lcrmc2)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 243 Motion for Leave for Asha L.I. Spencer to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 222 Motion for Leave for Jorge Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/28/12. (lcrmc2)
June 28, 2012 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Asha L.I. Spencer, :Firm- Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP, :Address- 54 W Hubbard St., Ste. 300. Phone No. - 312-494-4400. Fax No. - 312-494-4440 by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 27, 2012 Filing 242 NOTICE of Deposition Designations by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 27, 2012 Filing 241 Proposed Findings of Fact by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 27, 2012 Filing 240 Proposed Findings of Fact by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 220 Motion to Withdraw Felicia Johnson as a Defendant-Intervenor. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/27/12. (lcrmc2)
June 27, 2012 Filing 239 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 27, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: The Attorney General's Motion to Preclude due by 6/27/2012. Response due by 6/30/2012. Reply due by 7/3/2012. (cdw)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 216 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motions in Limine. Texas shall respond to 221 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Sager by June 30, 2012. The Attorney General may file a reply memorandum on orbefore July 3, 2012. The Attorney General may file a motion to preclude the testimony of Dr. Daron Shaw by June 27, 2012. The State of Texas may file a memorandum in opposition by June 30, 2012, and the Attorney General may file a reply memorandum by July 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/27/12. (lcrmc2)
June 27, 2012 Filing 238 NOTICE of Agreement Between Parties by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony (Freeman, Daniel)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 181 Motion to Withdraw Brianna Williams as Defendant-Intervenor. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/27/12. (lcrmc2)
June 26, 2012 Filing 237 NOTICE of Removal of Dorothy Tates from Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Witness List by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 25, 2012 Filing 236 Memorandum in opposition to re 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of J. Morgan Kousser filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Berkower, Risa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 235 NOTICE of Deposition Designations by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Berkower, Risa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 234 Memorandum in opposition to re 192 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony Protected by Legislative Privilege filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Berkower, Risa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 233 Memorandum in opposition to re 193 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by the Texas League of Young Voters's Newly Disclosed Witnesses filed by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Adam M. Harris, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Harris, Adam)
June 25, 2012 Filing 232 Memorandum in opposition to re 197 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, or Reference to the Subjective Intent of Individual Legislators filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Berkower, Risa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 231 Memorandum in opposition to re 195 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Suggesting an Adverse Inference Based on Texas Legislators' Assertion of Legislative Privilege filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Berkower, Risa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 230 NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Appendix by STATE OF TEXAS re 202 Proposed Findings of Fact (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Supplemental Appendix)(Frederick, Matthew)
June 25, 2012 Filing 229 Memorandum in opposition to re 217 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE MAJOR MITCHELLS TESTIMONY AND DOCUMENTS RELATING TO VOTER FRAUD filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 25, 2012 Filing 228 Memorandum in opposition to re 197 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, or Reference to the Subjective Intent of Individual Legislators filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 25, 2012 Filing 227 Memorandum in opposition to re 192 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony Protected by Legislative Privilege filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 25, 2012 Filing 226 Memorandum in opposition to re 195 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Suggesting an Adverse Inference Based on Texas Legislators' Assertion of Legislative Privilege filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER clarifying that the pretrial conference scheduled for June 28, 2012 was VACATED by the Court. See 137 Order dated May 22, 2012 for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/25/2012. (lcrmc1)
June 25, 2012 Filing 225 Memorandum in opposition to re 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Allan J. Lichtman filed by LORRAINE BIRABIL, ANNA BURNS, DANIEL CLAYTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, SERGIO DELEON, JANE HAMILTON, ERIC KENNIE, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B and C to Kennie Intervenors' Opposition to Texas Motion in Limine)(Hebert, Joseph)
June 25, 2012 Filing 224 NOTICE of Exhibit Index by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 223 Proposed Findings of Fact (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Berkower, Risa)
June 25, 2012 Filing 223 Proposed Findings of Fact by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Freeman, Daniel)
June 25, 2012 Filing 222 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jorge Sanchez, :Firm- MALDEF, :Address- 11 East Adams, Suite 700, Chicago, IL 60603. Phone No. - 312-427-0701, ext. 409. Fax No. - 312-427-0691 by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jorge Sanchez, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
June 23, 2012 Filing 221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Freeman, Daniel)
June 22, 2012 Filing 220 MOTION to Withdraw FELICIA JOHNSON AS DEFENDANT-INTERVENOR by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korgaonkar, Natasha)
June 21, 2012 Filing 219 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Census Data by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 1990 Census Data, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2000 Census Data, # 3 Exhibit 3 - ACS Data pt 1, # 4 Exhibit 4 - ACS Data pt 2, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 2010 Census Data)(Freeman, Daniel)
June 20, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Affirmative Deposition Designations by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mortara, Adam)
June 20, 2012 Filing 217 MOTION in Limine by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Fisher, Spencer)
June 20, 2012 Filing 216 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion in Limine by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Frederick Email, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Guyette Depo, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Mendoza Email)(Freeman, Daniel)
June 20, 2012 Filing 215 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39, # 2 Exhibit 40, # 3 Exhibit 41, # 4 Exhibit 42, # 5 Exhibit 43)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 214 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35, # 2 Exhibit 36, # 3 Exhibit 37)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 213 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30, # 2 Exhibit 31, # 3 Exhibit 32, # 4 Exhibit 33)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 212 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 26, # 2 Exhibit 27, # 3 Exhibit 28)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 211 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 210 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 209 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 14, # 2 Exhibit 15, # 3 Exhibit 16)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 208 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11, # 4 Exhibit 12)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 207 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 206 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Joint Appendix by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 205 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 204 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 203 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STATE OF TEXAS 202 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 202 Proposed Findings of Fact by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix State of Texas Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of J. Morgan Kousser by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 200 NOTICE of Trial Witnesses by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Berkower, Risa)
June 20, 2012 Filing 199 Proposed Findings of Fact by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 198 NOTICE of Intended Witness Testimony by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 20, 2012 Filing 197 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, or Reference to the Subjective Intent of Individual Legislators by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 196 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Live Witness List by STATE OF TEXAS (Mortara, Adam)
June 20, 2012 Filing 195 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Suggesting an Adverse Inference Based on Texas Legislators' Assertion of Legislative Privilege by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Allan J. Lichtman by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 193 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony by the Texas League of Young Voters's Newly Disclosed Witnesses by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 192 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony Protected by Legislative Privilege by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 20, 2012 Filing 191 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 189 Motion for Leave for Rebecca M. Couto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/19/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 190 Motion to Modify Order. Texas shall have until Thursday, June 21, 2012 to present its designated witness for deposition on topics 10 and 12 of the United States Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition. The United States shall have until June 22, 2012 to file a motion in limine, if it so chooses, as to those topics. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/19/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Texas shall produce a witness and documents in accordance with paragraph 8 of the Attorney General's June 5, 2012 30(b)(6) notice of deposition with respect to the analysis performed in early 2011. Signed by Judges David S. Tatel, Robert L. Wilkins, and Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/18/12. (lcrmc2)
June 18, 2012 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Order on Texas's Motion for Protective Order by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 18, 2012 Filing 189 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rebecca M. Couto, :Firm- MALDEF, :Address- 110 Broadway, Suite 300, San Antonio, TX 78205. Phone No. - (210) 224-5476. Fax No. - (210) 224-5382 by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Rebecca M. Couto, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/15/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 14, 2012 Filing 187 REPLY to opposition to motion re 182 MOTION Protective Order filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Deposition of Keith Ingram, # 2 Exhibit B-Deposition of Ann McGeehan)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying 166 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/14/12. (lcrlw2)
June 14, 2012 Filing 185 Memorandum in opposition to re 182 MOTION Protective Order filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: McGeehan Dep., # 2 Exhibit B: Ingram Dep., # 3 Exhibit C: Germaine Martinez Dep., # 4 Exhibit D: Gloria Martinez Dep., # 5 Exhibit E: Johnson-Lawson Dep.)(Freeman, Daniel)
June 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery closes by 6/15/2012. Exhibit Lists due by 7/2/2012. Witness Lists due by 6/20/2012. Motions in Limine due by 6/20/2012. Responses due by 6/25/2012. Replies due by 6/29/2012. (cdw) Modified on 6/14/2012 (zcdw).
June 13, 2012 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer R. Fisher on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Fisher, Spencer)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Modify; granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion to Modify. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/13/12. (lcrmc2)
June 13, 2012 Filing 182 MOTION Protective Order by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 11, 2012 Filing 181 MOTION to Withdraw BRIANNA WILLIAMS AS DEFENDANT-INTERVENOR by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korgaonkar, Natasha)
June 11, 2012 Filing 180 REPLY re 170 MOTION to Modify the Court's May 7, 2012 Scheduling Order filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying 130 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 150 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/08/12. (lcrlw2)
June 8, 2012 Filing 178 RESPONSE re 170 MOTION to Modify the Court's May 7, 2012 Scheduling Order filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER provisionally granting 168 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and directing Ms. Judge to file an application to join the Bar of this Court forthwith. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/8/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Having been advised of a discovery dispute, the Court Orders that the deposition of Rep. Harless be reopened for a period not to exceed one hour and be limited to questions about contacts with constituents and other members of the public. The deposition shall also be taken in accord with this Court's 167 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/8/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 8, 2012 Filing 177 REPLY to opposition to motion re 166 MOTION to Compel filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Freeman, Daniel)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 171 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Order is hereby modified to extend the close of expert discovery to June 25, 2012. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall file any supplemental findings of fact related to expert discovery no later than July 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/7/2012. (lcrlw2)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 174 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. It is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Order is modified to extend the deadline for service of any expert rebuttal reports from June 8, 2012 to June 11, 2012 at 11:59 PM EST. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/7/12. (lcrlw2)
June 7, 2012 Filing 176 RESPONSE re 166 MOTION to Compel filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion to Compel. Signed by Circuit Judge David S. Tatel on 6/7/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 7, 2012 Filing 174 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 7, 2012 Filing 173 RESPONSE re 170 MOTION to Modify the Court's May 7, 2012 Scheduling Order filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
June 6, 2012 Filing 172 NOTICE of Correction by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 166 MOTION to Compel (Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 6, 2012 Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, Matthew)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The State of Texas is hereby ORDERED to respond to the United States' Motion to Compel at Dkt. No. 166 no later than 5:00 p.m. EST on June 7, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/6/2012. (lcrlw2)
June 5, 2012 Filing 170 MOTION to Modify the Court's May 7, 2012 Scheduling Order by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2012 Filing 169 RESPONSE re 164 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Westfall, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The State of Texas is hereby ORDERED to submit a copy of the following documents listed in the revised Governors Office privilege log [Dkt. 152-3] under seal and ex parte no later than noon EST on Wednesday, June 6, 2012, for in camera review: TX_00057456-TX_00057475; TX_00057699-TX_00057718; TX_00057719-TX_00057743; TX_00057744-TX_00057746. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/5/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 5, 2012 Filing 168 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- DONITA JUDGE, :Firm- Advancement Project, :Address- 1220 L Street, NW, Suite 850 Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 728-9557. Fax No. - (202) 728-9558 by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, PETER JOHNSON, JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, SOUTHWEST WORKERS UNION, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, DONALD WRIGHT, RONALD WRIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Donita Judge, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Haygood, Ryan)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion to Compel. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/5/2012. (lcrmc2)
June 5, 2012 Filing 166 MOTION to Compel by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(Berkower, Risa)
June 1, 2012 Filing 165 Memorandum in opposition to re 164 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
May 31, 2012 Filing 164 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, Matthew)
May 30, 2012 Filing 163 REPLY to opposition to motion re 152 MOTION to Compel filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Freeman, Daniel)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 161 Motion to Modify. Exhibit # 2 to 156 Reply is sealed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/30/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 30, 2012 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by John William McKenzie on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (McKenzie, John)
May 29, 2012 Filing 161 MOTION to Modify : Seal Exhibit by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Freeman, Daniel)
May 29, 2012 Filing 160 REPLY to opposition to motion re 130 MOTION to Compel by Defendant-Intervenors filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Frederick, Matthew)
May 29, 2012 Filing 159 REPLY to opposition to motion re 130 MOTION to Compel filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Frederick, Matthew)
May 29, 2012 Filing 158 RESPONSE re 145 Notice (Other) filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email from Mckenzie to Freeman & Rosenberg, # 2 Exhibit Privilege log, # 3 Exhibit Privilege log, # 4 Exhibit Privilege log)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 29, 2012 Filing 157 RESPONSE re 152 MOTION to Compel filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Privilege log, # 2 Exhibit Privilege log, # 3 Exhibit Privilege log, # 4 Exhibit Governor updated privilege log, # 5 Declaration Archer Declaration, # 6 Affidavit Geren Affidavit, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 29, 2012 Filing 156 REPLY to opposition to motion re 136 MOTION to Compel filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Tex. v. U.S. Tr., # 2 Exhibit 2 - Election Code Cases(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Harless Website, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Al Dia Article, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Texas Watchdog Article, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Texas GOP Interview)(Freeman, Daniel) Modified on 5/30/2012 (rdj).
May 29, 2012 Filing 155 REPLY to opposition to motion re 134 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
May 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER regarding Lieutenant Governor Privilege Discovery Dispute. See Order for full details. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (lcrlw2)
May 26, 2012 Filing 153 NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's May 25, 2012 Minute Order by STATE OF TEXAS (Frederick, Matthew)
May 25, 2012 Filing 152 MOTION to Compel by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - OOG Log, # 4 Exhibit 2 - TLC Log, # 5 Exhibit 3 - OOG Index, # 6 Exhibit 4 - TLC Index)(Freeman, Daniel)
May 25, 2012 Filing 151 NOTICE of Compliance with Minute Order by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Contested Document Index)(Berkower, Risa)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The United States is hereby ORDERED to file and serve on the State of Texas by 9:00 p.m. EST today (May 25, 2012) a list of every contested document at issue in the specific privilege dispute the United States raised with the Court on May 25, 2012. The State of Texas is hereby ORDERED to submit a copy of all the documents in the United States' list under seal and ex parte no later than 1:00 p.m. EST on Saturday, May 26, 2012 for in camera review. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/25/2012. (lcrlw2, )
May 25, 2012 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Birney de Leeuw on behalf of IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (de Leeuw, Michael)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, as conceded, 133 Motion for Protective Order. Texas failed to file an opposition by the May 24, 2012 deadline set forth in this Court's 107 & 137 Orders. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/25/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 24, 2012 Filing 150 MOTION for Protective Order by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (See Docket Entry 146 to view document. Counsel is instructed to docket the motion as a separate docket entry in the future)(rdj)
May 24, 2012 Filing 148 RESPONSE re 136 MOTION to Compel filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 24, 2012 Filing 147 Memorandum in opposition to re 130 MOTION to Compel filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - May 23 Email)(Freeman, Daniel)
May 24, 2012 Filing 146 RESPONSE re 130 MOTION to Compel and Cross-Motion for Protective Order filed by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
May 24, 2012 Filing 145 NOTICE Concerning Email Privilege Log by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 136 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - May 22 Email, # 2 Exhibit Supp Log Pt 1, # 3 Exhibit Supp Log Pt 2, # 4 Exhibit Supp Index)(Freeman, Daniel)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, Texas's 138 Motion for Extension of Time to produce updated privilege logs. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/24/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 24, 2012 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Pedersen on behalf of MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Pedersen, Amy)
May 24, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Harris on behalf of IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Harris, Adam)
May 24, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas H. Flaum on behalf of IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Flaum, Douglas)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Attorney General's 140 notice advising that he has withdrawn his notice to depose Representative Berman, the Court denies Texas's 132 Motion for Protective Order as moot. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/24/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 103 Motion for Protective Order. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/24/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 24, 2012 Filing 140 NOTICE Concerning Deposition of Representative Berman by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 132 MOTION for Protective Order (Freeman, Daniel)
May 23, 2012 Filing 139 NOTICE Advisory Regarding Updated Privilege Logs by STATE OF TEXAS re 128 Order on Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Office of the Governor Privilege Log, # 2 Exhibit Texas Legislative Council Privilege Log)(Frederick, Matthew)
May 23, 2012 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order Regarding Privilege Logs by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, Matthew)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 110 Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal; denying 114 Motion for Leave to File Opposition under Seal. To the extent that non-responsive information was inadvertently disclosed in the database productions (e.g., data from fields that were not requested), that information shall be treated as confidential and is protected under the Courts current 65 protective order. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/23/2012. (lcrmc2, )
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/23/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER denying 135 Motion to Clarify for the reasons stated in the Court's Order located at Docket No. 137. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/22/2012. (lcrlw2)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying 85 Motion to Clarify and denying 88 Motion to Clarify to the extent said motions sought to continue July 9, 2012 trial date. See attached Order for full details. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/22/2012. (lcrlw2)
May 21, 2012 Filing 136 MOTION to Compel by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1: Beuck Deposition, # 4 Exhibit 2: Fraser Deposition, # 5 Exhibit 3: Harless Deposition, # 6 Exhibit 4: McCoy Deposition, # 7 Exhibit 5: US RFPs, # 8 Exhibit 6: Tex RFP Response, # 9 Exhibit 7: May 11 Privilege Log, # 10 Exhibit 8: Harless Docs, # 11 Exhibit 9: Dewhurst Docs, # 12 Exhibit 10: Objection Letter, # 13 Exhibit 11: Busbee Docket, # 14 Exhibit 12: Busbee Order, # 15 Exhibit 13: Contested Privilege Index, # 16 Exhibit 14: Waivers, # 17 Exhibit 15: Sweeten Email, # 18 Exhibit 16: Tex ROG Response, # 19 Exhibit 17: Dewhurst Release)(Freeman, Daniel)
May 21, 2012 Filing 135 MOTION to Clarify and Re-set Date by Which Defendant-Intervenors' Expert Reports Are Due by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Rosenberg, Ezra)
May 21, 2012 Filing 134 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
May 21, 2012 Filing 133 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Non-Party Deposition by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Freeman, Daniel)
May 21, 2012 Filing 132 MOTION for Protective Order by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 21, 2012 Filing 131 NOTICE Advisory to the Court Regarding Defendants' Defective notice of Deposition of Lt. Governor Dewhurst by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 21, 2012 Filing 130 MOTION to Compel by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 21, 2012 Filing 129 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Berkower, Risa)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 124 Motion for Leave for John M. Hughes to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 125 Motion for Leave for Adam Karl Mortara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/21/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/21/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 18, 2012 Filing 127 REPLY to opposition to motion re 103 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Berkower, Risa)
May 18, 2012 Filing 126 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 122 Order Texas Advisory Concerning Discovery Requests filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
May 18, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
May 18, 2012 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam Karl Mortara, :Firm- Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP, :Address- 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300, Chicago, IL 60654. Phone No. - (312) 494-4400. by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 18, 2012 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John M. Hughes, :Firm- Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP, :Address- 1899 Wynkoop Street, 8th Floor, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 592-3113. by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/18/2012 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. (cdw)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER setting telephonic status conference for 5/18/12 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 8. See Order for full details. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/17/12. (lcrlw2)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER resolving discovery dispute between the United States and Texas regarding questioning of Texas legislators. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/17/2012. (Wilkins, Robert)
May 16, 2012 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 5/16/2012 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim) (tb, )
May 15, 2012 Filing 121 NOTICE Concerning Federal Non-Party Databases (Fourth) by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Freeman, Daniel)
May 11, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE Concerning Non-Party Federal Agency Databases by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Freeman, Daniel)
May 11, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE Concerning Database Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 107 Order (Freeman, Daniel)
May 11, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE of Filing by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gary King)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave for Scott Brazil to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 115 Motion for Leave for Rebecca Robertson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 116 Motion for Leave for Karolina J. Lyznik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/11/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 11, 2012 Filing 117 RESPONSE re 103 MOTION for Protective Order filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Sweeten, Patrick)
May 11, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karolina J. Lyznik, :Firm- MALDEF, :Address- 110 Broadway, Suite 300, San Antonio, TX 78205. Phone No. - (210) 224-5476. Fax No. - (210) 224-5382 by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karolina Lyznik, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
May 10, 2012 Filing 115 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rebecca Robertson, :Firm- ACLU Foundation of Texas, :Address- 1500 McGowen, Suite 250, Houston, TX 77288. Phone No. - 173-942-8146 ex 116. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, PETER JOHNSON, JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, SOUTHWEST WORKERS UNION, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, DONALD WRIGHT, RONALD WRIGHT (McDonald, Laughlin)
May 10, 2012 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition Under Seal by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Rosenberg, Ezra)
May 10, 2012 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- K. Scott Brazil, :Firm- Brazil & Dunn, :Address- 4201 Cypress Creek Parkway, Ste. 530, Houston, TX 77068. Phone No. - 281-580-6310. Fax No. - 281-680-6362 by LORRAINE BIRABIL, ANNA BURNS, DANIEL CLAYTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, SERGIO DELEON, JANE HAMILTON, ERIC KENNIE, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Dunn, Chad)
May 9, 2012 Filing 112 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 107 Order Regarding Scheduling filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time. Texas shall respond to the Court's ordering regarding a certification no later than May 9, 2012 at 8:00 p.m. EST. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/9/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 9, 2012 Filing 111 MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO THE COURTS ORDER REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULE AND DEADLINES by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 9, 2012 Filing 110 MOTION for Leave to File document under seal by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 9, 2012 Filing 109 NOTICE of filing under seal by STATE OF TEXAS (Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court's Order to file a joint report on databases is continued to May 11, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. If any Defendant or Defendant-Intervenor contends that the databases produced by Texas are incomplete, in an incorrect format, or otherwise non-compliant, that party shall submit an affidavit from its expert witness(es) no later than 5:00 p.m. EST May 11, 2012, setting forth in detail: 1) why the production was inadequate or non-compliant; and 2) what steps need to be taken to cure the deficiency so that the expert witness is able to conduct his/her analysis. It is further ordered that Texas shall produce the databases it has failed to produce forthwith. By no later than May 8, 2012, Texas shall produce to the Defendant-Intervenors the drivers license database and concealed handgun database with the relevant fields and truncated SSNs as previously ordered. By no later than May 9, 2012, Texas shall produce to the United States an updated voter registration database with full SSNs and shall produce to the Defendant-Intervenors the voter registration database with truncated SSNs as previously ordered. By no later than May 9, 2012 at 5:00 p.m., Texas shall notify the Defendants of the number of Texas registered voters it has identified who do not appear to have a requisite photographic identification. The United States shall, as soon as practicable and by no later than May 11, 2012, canvas the relevant federal agencies to determine what protective order(s) may be necessary to allow release of information requested by Texas and provide same to the Court and parties; coordinate consultations between agency IT personnel and Texas IT personnel; and inform Texas to whom to send Rule 45 subpoenas. Additionally, by no later than May 15, 2012, the United States shall file a notice indicating how long it will take each relevant agency to produce the requested information from the federal databases according to the number of persons identified by Texas for whom it seeks information. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/9/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 8, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Telephone Conference held on 5/8/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
May 7, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE Advisory Regarding Database Production by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, Matthew)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER regarding discovery and pre-trial deadlines. See order for full details. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/7/2012.(lcrlw2)
May 7, 2012 Filing 106 NOTICE Concerning Federal Non-Party Databases by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Freeman, Daniel)
May 7, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/8/2012 at 3:15 PM before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
May 4, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Report due by 5/8/2012. (cdw)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint report no later than 5:00 p.m. EST Tuesday, May 8, 2012, advising the Court of the status of database discovery. If any Defendants or Defendant-Intervenors contend that the databases produced are incomplete, in an incorrect format, or otherwise non-compliant, that party shall submit an affidavit from their expert witness(es) no later than 5:00 p.m. EST Tuesday, May 8, 2012, setting forth in detail: 1) why the production was inadequate or non-compliant; and 2) what steps need to be taken to cure the deficiency so that the expert witness is able to conduct his/her analysis. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/4/2012. (lcrmc1)
May 4, 2012 Filing 105 NOTICE of Database Production Status by STATE OF TEXAS (Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 3, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Status Conference held on 5/3/2012. Witness: Keith Ingram. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
May 3, 2012 Filing 104 REPLY to opposition to motion re 93 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Privilege Logs filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3-16-12 Transcript, # 2 Exhibit TLC Privilege Log, # 3 Exhibit Hanna Email)(Freeman, Daniel)
May 3, 2012 Filing 103 MOTION for Protective Order by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkower, Risa)
May 3, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Risa Berkower on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Berkower, Risa)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 100 Motion for Leave for Amy Pedersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice while her application to the bar of this Court is pending. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/3/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Texas shall, by May 4, 2012, provide to Defendants the following additional fields in its T.E.A.M. database: (1) residential/home address, (2) mailing address, (3) assigned voting precinct, (4) language code, (5) registration date, (6) effective date of registration, (7) gender information as to cancellation of registration and reason for cancellation, (8) source code information, (9) voting history as set for in TX's May 3, 2012 Advisory. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/3/2012. (lcrmc2)
May 2, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE Advisory on Database Production by STATE OF TEXAS (Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 1, 2012 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amy Pedersen, :Firm- MALDEF, :Address- 1016 16th Street NW, #100, Washington, DC 20036. Phone No. - (202) 293-2828. Fax No. - (202) 735-6585 by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy Pedersen, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
May 1, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/3/2012 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. (cdw)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER requiring the parties to attend a status conference on May 3, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/1/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 30, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
April 30, 2012 Filing 98 RESPONSE re 93 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Privilege Logs filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jeff Archer, # 2 Declaration Sen. Thomas Williams, # 3 Declaration Rep. Dennis Bonnen, # 4 Declaration Rep. David Simpson, # 5 Declaration David S. Morales, # 6 Declaration Rep. Patricia Harless)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. As stated at the telephone conference today, Texas is ORDERED to turn over to Defendants the eight fields of data identified by the parties in the concealed handgun license database, i.e. (1) Hispanic/nonHispanic, (2) citizenship, (3) driver's license, (4) expired license to carry, (5) license rescinded/withdrawn/suspended, (6) deceased, (7) license application status, and (8) gender. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/30/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 27, 2012 Filing 97 RESPONSE re 94 Notice (Other) Advisory Regarding Discovery filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Frederick, Matthew)
April 27, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Kinney Sweeten on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Sweeten, Patrick)
April 27, 2012 Filing 95 RESPONSE re 88 MOTION to Clarify Schedule, 85 MOTION to Clarify Trial Schedule filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Frederick, Matthew)
April 26, 2012 Filing 94 NOTICE Concerning Federal Databases by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Maranzano, Jennifer)
April 25, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents and Privilege Logs by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Freeman, Daniel)
April 25, 2012 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer held on 4/16/12; Page Numbers: 109. Date of Issuance:4/17/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2012.(Pilgrim, Crystal)
April 25, 2012 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Answer deadline was entered in error, please disregard. (cdw)
April 25, 2012 ENTERED IN ERROR............Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to the Complaint due by 6/12/2012. (cdw) Modified on 4/25/2012 (cdw, ).
April 25, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of PETER JOHNSON, JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, DONALD WRIGHT, RONALD WRIGHT (Spitzer, Arthur)
April 25, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE Amended Notice of Legislative Privilege Assertion by STATE OF TEXAS re 89 Notice (Other) (Frederick, Matthew)
April 24, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE of Legislative Privilege Assertion by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit March 30, 2012 Ltr from from Mitchell to Westfall)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 86 Motion for Leave for Douglas H. Flaum, Michael B. de Leeuw, and Adam M. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 87 Motion for Leave for Gary L. Bledsoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/24/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 23, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION to Clarify Schedule by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Maranzano, Jennifer)
April 23, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gary L. Bledsoe, :Firm- Law Office of Gary L. Bledsoe and Associates, :Address- 316 W. 12th Street, #307, Austin, TX 78701. Phone No. - 5123229992. Fax No. - 5123220840 by TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Notzon, Robert)
April 23, 2012 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Douglas H. Flaum, Michael B. de Leeuw, Adam M. Harris, :Firm- Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, :Address- One New York Plaza, 24th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-859-8259. by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas H. Flaum, # 2 Declaration of Michael B. de Leeuw, # 3 Declaration of Adam M. Harris, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ho, Dale)
April 23, 2012 Filing 85 MOTION to Clarify Trial Schedule by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 34 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/20/212. (lcrmc2)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave for Elise C. Boddie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/20/2012. (lcrmc2) Modified on 4/23/2012 (ztnr, ).
April 20, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE Regarding Subpoena by STATE OF TEXAS (Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 19, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elise C. Boddie, :Firm- NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., :Address- 99 Hudson Street, Suite 1600. Phone No. - 212-965-2200. Fax No. - 212-226-7592 by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elise C. Boddie, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ho, Dale)
April 19, 2012 Filing 81 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by LORRAINE BIRABIL, ANNA BURNS, DANIEL CLAYTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, SERGIO DELEON, JANE HAMILTON, ERIC KENNIE, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS.(Dunn, Chad)
April 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
April 17, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion re clarification due by 4/23/2012. Response due by 4/26/2012. (cdw)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The United States shall, by no later than April 23, 2012, file its motion with the Court regarding "clarification" of the present July 9, 2012 trial date. Texas may respond no later than April 26, 2012. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/17/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 17, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE of Disputed Discovery Issues by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Maranzano, Jennifer)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. No affidavit was attached to the motion demonstrating compliance with the local rules. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/17/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 16, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 4/16/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
April 16, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 4/16/2012. A further Telephone Conference is set for 4/17/2012 at 12:30 PM before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
April 13, 2012 Filing 79 REPLY filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 13, 2012 Filing 78 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT identifying Corporate Parent NONE for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ. (rdj)
April 13, 2012 Filing 77 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS.(rdj)
April 13, 2012 Filing 76 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS identifying Corporate Parent NONE for JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS. (rdj)
April 13, 2012 Filing 75 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by PETER JOHNSON, JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, DONALD WRIGHT, RONALD WRIGHT. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS.(rdj)
April 13, 2012 Filing 74 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by PETER JOHNSON, JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, DONALD WRIGHT, RONALD WRIGHT. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS.(Abudu, Nancy)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion to Intervene; granting 42 Motion to Intervene; granting 64 Motion to Intervene. The intervenors are bound by the Court's scheduling and other orders (including the combined limitation on interrogatories). All intervenors in this case shall identify a single attorney to examine a deponent at any deposition. The questioning at trial will likewise be limited. Furthermore, the intervenors shall appoint a single attorney to be the administrative contact point with the Court and all briefing done by the intervenors shall be consolidated. The intervenors are cautioned to avoid duplication of efforts. Should preclearance be denied, the Court will not grant fee requests for duplicative work. Finally, given the expedited nature of this case and the fact that it was filed nearly three months ago, the Court is unlikely to grant further requests to intervene. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/13/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 12, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE Advisory Regarding Motion to Intervene by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT (Perales, Nina)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. To memorialize the Order issued by the Court at the telephonic hearing in this matter on April 10, 2012, the State of Texas shall turn over all relevant fields in the driver's license database and the concealed handgun database to the intervenors in the same manner they were turned over to the United States except that the social security numbers in each database shall be limited to the last four digits. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/12/12. (lcrmc2)
April 11, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Greenbaum on behalf of MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Greenbaum, Jon)
April 11, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Debo P. Adegbile on behalf of IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Adegbile, Debo)
April 11, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE Regarding Production of Legislative History by STATE OF TEXAS (Frederick, Matthew)
April 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2012. A further Telephone Conference is set for 4/16/2012 at 12:30 PM before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
April 10, 2012 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM re Telephone Conference by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit)(Freeman, Daniel)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. A telephone conference regarding the parties' discovery dispute is set for 3:00 p.m. this afternoon. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/10/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 9, 2012 Filing 68 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS.(Freeman, Daniel)
April 5, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gary L. Bledsoe, :Firm- Law Office of Gary L. Bledsoe and Associates, :Address- 316 W. 12th Street, #307, Austin, TX 78701. Phone No. - 5123229992. Fax No. - 5123220840 by TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Notzon, Robert)
April 5, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale E. Ho on behalf of IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Ho, Dale)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot 59 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The Court has entered, with minor changes, the protective order requested by the United States. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/5/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to seal document. Exhibit 1 to 44 Opposition to Motion for Protective Order shall be sealed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/5/2012. (lcrmc2)
April 4, 2012 Filing 64 Amended MOTION to Intervene by PETER JOHNSON, JUSTICE SEEKERS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, DONALD WRIGHT, RONALD WRIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abudu, Nancy)
April 4, 2012 Filing 63 ERRATA by STATE OF TEXAS 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Amended Complaint)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 3, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Telephone Conference held on 4/3/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
April 3, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by STATE OF TEXAS (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Kennie Arrest Record)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 3, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File document under seal by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. At oral argument on 34 Texas's motion for protective order, the United States indicated that it can submit information that provides a factual basis in support of its request for discovery from Texas legislators. The United States is ordered to submit, by no later than April 10, 2012, such information. Texas may respond no later than April 13, 2012. In light of these deadlines, the April 9, 2012 deadline requiring depositions to commence and the April 20, 2012 deadline for the United States to inform the Court whether it intends to assert discriminatory purpose (set forth in the Court's 17 and 43 Scheduling Orders) are VACATED. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/3/2012. (lcrmc2, )
April 2, 2012 Filing 60 REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 MOTION for Protective Order filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to DOJ)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave for Katie O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 46 Motion for Leave for Nancy G. Abudu to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 47 Motion for Leave for M. Laughlin McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 48 Motion for Leave for Michelle Hart Yeary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. McDonald has appeared five times before this Court pro hac vice within the past five years. He is directed to submit an application to become a member of the bar forthwith. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/2/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins on March 30, 2012. (cdw)
March 30, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 3/30/2012. (cdw)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER superseding prior MINUTE ORDER. Per the telephone conference, Texas is directed and ordered to produce to the United States Attorney's Office in Austin, TX the full social security numbers along with the other information produced in the Driver's License database on April 2, 2012 by no later than the hour identified by the United States Attorney's Office for overnight courier delivery to Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/30/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The State of Texas is directed and ordered to turn over the full social security numbers to the Department of Justice with its Driver's License database today, March 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/30/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The United States and Texas shall be prepared for oral argumentation on Texas's 34 Motion for Protective Order at the April 3, 2012 telephone conference. It is not anticipated, unless the panel has specific questions for the Defendant-Intervenors, that the Court will hear argumentation from the Defendant-Intervenors. The telephone conference is scheduled for one hour. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/30/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER re 44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. The Court will enter the protective order proposed by the United States with the following insertion: A producing party may elect to identify Confidential Information as "eyes only" or similarly to restrict its use to attorneys of record, their associates, staff and assistants working on this litigation, and their experts and experts' staffs. Information, documents, and databases so marked shall be returned, including all copies, to the producing party at the end of the litigation including appeals if any. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/30/2012. (lcrmc2, )
March 29, 2012 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Memorandum)(Freeman, Daniel)
March 29, 2012 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re 44 MOTION for Protective Order, and in Opposition re 52 NOTICE of confidential database information filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rosenberg, Ezra) Modified to add link on 3/30/2012 (znmw, ).
March 29, 2012 Filing 57 Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION for Protective Order filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Freeman, Daniel)
March 29, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith E.B. Bell-Platts on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Bell-Platts, Meredith)
March 29, 2012 Filing 55 Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION for Protective Order filed by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Rosenberg, Ezra)
March 29, 2012 Filing 54 Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kennie Criminal History)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
March 29, 2012 Filing 53 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS.(Rosenberg, Ezra)
March 29, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE of confidential database information by STATE OF TEXAS (Mitchell, Jonathan)
March 28, 2012 Filing 51 REPLY to opposition to motion re 38 MOTION to Intervene filed by TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS. (Tanner, John)
March 28, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DEATH OF COUNSEL by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Haygood, Ryan)
March 28, 2012 Filing 49 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Korgaonkar, Natasha)
March 28, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michelle Hart Yeary, :Firm- Dechert LLP, :Address- 902 Carnegie Center Suite 500 Princeton, NJ 08540. Phone No. - 609 955-3200. Fax No. - 609 955-3295 by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 27, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
March 27, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- M. Laughlin McDonald, :Firm- ACLU Foundation, :Address- 230 Peachtree St. NW Atlanta GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-523-2721. Fax No. - 404-653-0331 by TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS (Tanner, John)
March 27, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy G. Abudu, :Firm- ACLU Foundation, :Address- 230 Peachtree St NW Atlanta GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-523-2721. Fax No. - 404-653=0331 by TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS (Tanner, John)
March 27, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katie O'Connor, :Firm- ACLLU Foundation, :Address- 230 Peachtree St NW, Atlanta GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-523-2721. Fax No. - 404-653-0331 by TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS (Tanner, John)
March 27, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION for Protective Order by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding)(Freeman, Daniel)
March 27, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery closes6/15/2012. Bench Trial set for 7/9/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins. (cdw)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the telephone conference held today, the United States shall file a notice today with the relevant case law supporting its position that Texas law does not prohibit the disclosure of the database information it is seeking from Texas. Texas shall respond to this notice by 12:00 p.m. EST March 30, 2012. Additionally, by no later than 12:00 p.m. EST on March 29, 2012, Texas shall file a notice with the Court identifying each and every database for which it contends it cannot disclose relevant data. As part of this identification, Texas shall identify each field of data contained within the database (e.g., name, address, SSN, etc.) and which of these specific fields it contends it cannot disclose. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/27/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave for Wendy Weiser to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 36 Motion for Leave for Myrna Perez to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting 37 Motion for Leave for Ian Arthur Vandewalker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/27/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial in this case is set for July 9, 2012. Fact discovery shall be completed by June 15, 2012. A pretrial conference is set for June 28, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/27/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 26, 2012 Filing 41 Memorandum in opposition to re 38 MOTION to Intervene filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U.S.'s First Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit Intervenors' First Interrogatories)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
March 23, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by VICTORIA RODRIGUEZ, NICOLE RODRIGUEZ, SOUTHWEST VOTER REGISTRATION EDUCATION PROJECT, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Answer, # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(znmw, )
March 23, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Keith Ingram)(Frederick, Matthew)
March 23, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Freeman, Daniel)
March 23, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ian Arthur Vandewalker, :Firm- The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU Law School, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12, New York, NY 10013-1205. Phone No. - (646) 292-8362. Fax No. - (212) 463-7308 by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 23, 2012 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Myrna Perez, :Firm- THE BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU LAW SCHOOL, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12, New York, NY 10013-1205. Phone No. - (646) 292-8329. Fax No. - (212) 463-7308 by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 23, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy Weiser, :Firm- The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU Law School, :Address- 161 Avenue of the Americas, Floor 12, New York, NY 10013-1205. Phone No. - (646) 292-8318. Fax No. - (212) 463-7308 by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Posner, Mark)
March 22, 2012 Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by TEXAS LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TEXAS, JUSTICE SEEKERS, PETER JOHNSON, RONALD WRIGHT, DONALD WRIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
March 22, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for Protective Order by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Letter, # 2 Exhibit RFPs, # 3 Exhibit ROGs, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
March 22, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of ESI Agreement by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ESI Agreement)(Freeman, Daniel)
March 22, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam W. Aston on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Aston, Adam)
March 22, 2012 Filing 31 ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF TEXAS.(rdj)
March 22, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Hamilton Frederick on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Frederick, Matthew)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion to Intervene and granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Intervenor-Defendants are permitted to intervene pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/22/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 21, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 3/21/2012. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. A telephone conference is scheduled for April 3, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/21/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 21, 2012 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Freeman, Daniel)
March 21, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- RYAN P. HAYGOOD, NATASHA M. KORGAONKAR, and LEAH C. ADEN, :Firm- NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., :Address- 99 Hudson St., Suite 1600, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - 212.965.2200. Fax No. - 212.226.7592 by IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan P. Haygood, # 2 Declaration of Natasha M. Korgaonkar, # 3 Declaration of Leah C. Aden, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Payton, John)
March 21, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Gerald Hebert on behalf of LORRAINE BIRABIL, ANNA BURNS, DANIEL CLAYTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, SERGIO DELEON, JANE HAMILTON, ERIC KENNIE, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY (Hebert, Joseph)
March 21, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Joint Scheduling Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
March 20, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John Payton on behalf of IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Payton, John)
March 20, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce I. Gear on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Gear, Bruce)
March 19, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by TEXAS LEAGUE OF YOUNG VOTERS EDUCATION FUND, IMANI CLARK, KIESSENCE CULBREATH, DEMARIANO HILL, FELICIA JOHNSON, DOMINIQUE MONDAY, BRIANNA WILLIAMS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Answer, # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(znmw, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Freeman on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Freeman, Daniel)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave for Ezra D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/19/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 16, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ezra D. Rosenberg, :Firm- Dechert LLP, :Address- 902 Carnegie Center, Suite 500, Princeton, NJ 08540. Phone No. - 609.955.3200. Fax No. - 609.955.3259 by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ezra Rosenberg)(Posner, Mark)
March 15, 2012 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(rdj)
March 15, 2012 Filing 24 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES.(rdj)
March 15, 2012 Filing 23 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by LORRAINE BIRABIL, ANNA BURNS, DANIEL CLAYTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, SERGIO DELEON, JANE HAMILTON, ERIC KENNIE, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY.(rdj)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Intervene; granting 15 Motion to Intervene; granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; setting a telephone conference for March 21, 2012 at 4:30 p.m.; mandating that discovery regarding discriminatory purpose be completed by April 16, 2012; and setting forth a briefing schedule on the privilege issue. See order for further details. Signed by Judges David S. Tatel, Rosemary M. Collyer, and Robert L. Wilkins on 3/15/2012. (lcrmc2)
March 14, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Telephone Conference held on 3/14/2012. A further Telephone Conference is set for 3/21/2012 at 4:30 PM. (Court Reporter: Rebecca Stonestreet) (cdw)
March 13, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephone Conference is set for 3/14/2012 at 4:30 PM before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (lcrmc2)
March 12, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Amended Complaint, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
March 12, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE CAUCUS OF THE TEXAS HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Answer, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Disclosure)(znmw, )
March 12, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Stewart Westfall on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Westfall, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2012 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 12 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned password/login. ( Refer to LCvR 5.4(b) )(rdj)
March 12, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Maranzano on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Maranzano, Jennifer)
March 12, 2012 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Maranzano on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Maranzano, Jennifer) Modified on 3/12/2012 (rdj).
March 12, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Determination by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Maranzano, Jennifer)
March 7, 2012 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/8/12., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/9/2012. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/9/2012.) (rdj)
February 24, 2012 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 8 Answer to Complaint was entered in error as a separate docket entry and will be refiled if/when the Motion to Intervene is granted. The proposed Answer remains as an exhibit to Docket Entry 9 Reply re 5 Motion to Intervene. (znmw, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 9 REPLY re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by LORRAINE BIRABIL, ANNA BURNS, DANIEL CLAYTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, SERGIO DELEON, JANE HAMILTON, ERIC KENNIE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(Dunn, Chad)
February 23, 2012 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR..... ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by LORRAINE BIRABIL, ANNA BURNS, DANIEL CLAYTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, SERGIO DELEON, JANE HAMILTON, ERIC KENNIE, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY.(Dunn, Chad) Modified on 2/24/2012 (znmw, ).
February 16, 2012 Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
February 15, 2012 Filing 6 RESPONSE re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Maranzano, Jennifer)
February 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judges Rosemary M. Collyer, David S. Tatel, and Robert L. Wilkins: Telephone Conference held on 2/9/2012. A further Telephone Conference is set for 3/14/2012 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer (Court Reporter: Rebecca Stonestreet) (cdw)
February 8, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/9/2012 at 4:45 PM before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
February 1, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by ERIC KENNIE, ANNA BURNS, MICHAEL MONTEZ, PENNY POPE, MARC VEASY, JANE HAMILTON, DAVID DE LA FUENTE, LORRAINE BIRABIL, DANIEL CLAYTON, SERGIO DELEON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
January 27, 2012 Filing 4 USCA ORDER filed in USCA on January 27, 2012 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT;designating Circuit Judge David S. Tatel and Judge Robert L. Wilkins to hear and determine this case to serve with District Court Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge to preside over this case. (jeb, )
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Convene Three-Judge Court. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/26/2012. (tth)
January 24, 2012 Filing 2 MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court by STATE OF TEXAS (rdj)
January 24, 2012 SUMMONS (2) Issued as to ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney (rdj)
January 24, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIC H. HOLDER, JR ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616045513) filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/27/2012) (jf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2012: # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6) (zjf, ). Modified on 1/27/2012 (jf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF TEXAS v. HOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Jonathan Franklin Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Maranzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ERIC KENNIE
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ANNA BURNS
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MICHAEL MONTEZ
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: PENNY POPE
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MARC VEASY
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: JANE HAMILTON
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DAVID DE LA FUENTE
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LORRAINE BIRABIL
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DANIEL CLAYTON
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SERGIO DELEON
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?