SHAPIRO et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Plaintiff: RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO, JEFFREY STEIN, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS and TRUTHOUT
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2013cv00555
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion, the Court hereby ORDERS that: (1) The FBI's motion for reconsideration 55 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (2) The FBI's motion for a partial s tay 60 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The FBI's obligation to produce the case evaluation forms to the plaintiffs is hereby STAYED through and until July 25, 2016, or, if the FBI files a notice of appeal by that date, pending a ppeal. (3) If the FBI does not file a notice of appeal by July 25, 2016, it shall produce the case evaluation forms to the plaintiffs on or before that date. (4) The FBI shall produce the records to plaintiff Shapiro that would otherwise only be im pacted by the FBI's late assertion of the Exemption 5 deliberative-process privilege on or before July 25, 2016. If the FBI files a notice of appeal as to this specific production obligation, the order set out in this paragraph is stayed pending appeal. (5) The briefing schedule entered on April 8, 2016, remains in place. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/25/2016. (lcrdm2, )
April 8, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint report 51 , the Court hereby ORDERS that (1) on or before May 10, 2016, the FBI shall produce all responsive records in this case except (a) those records the Court determined were prope rly withheld in its January 22, 2016 opinion, (b) those records about which the Court previously directed further briefing, and (c) those records that the FBI believes would, if released, compromise national security or sensitive, personal, private i nformation; (2) on or before May 10, 2016, the FBI shall submit a renewed motion for summary judgment, supplemented by further evidentiary submissions, regarding those records that it intends to withhold consistent with the Court's January 22, 2 016 opinion and this Order; (3) the plaintiffs may file a renewed cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the FBI's renewed motion for summary judgment, limited to the issues described above and the propriety of declaratory and injun ctive relief, on or before June 7, 2016; (4) the FBI may file a reply in support of its renewed motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before July 5, 2016; (5) the plaintiffs may fil e a reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before July 19, 2016; and (6) if the FBI seeks to stay any of the production obligations outlined in this Order, it shall file a motion to that effect on or before April 29, 2016. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for more details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/8/2016. (lcrdm2, )
January 22, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: The FBI's motion for summary judgment 21 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The plaintiffs' cross-motion for partial summary judgment 28 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. A separate Order will issue following the status conference in this matter. See Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/2016. (lcrdm2, )
September 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ODER discharging [#8] order to show cause issued by Chief Judge Roberts; the parties shall meet and confer, and shall file a joint report containing a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 3, 2013. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 19, 2013. (MA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAPIRO et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Light
Represented By: Kelly Brian McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY STEIN
Represented By: Kelly Brian McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS
Represented By: Kelly Brian McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUTHOUT
Represented By: Kelly Brian McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?