IN RE: DOMESTIC AIRLINE TRAVEL ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: JACK SNIADO, ARVIND SUNDAR, MICHAEL KROMAR, GAIL WARE, DELIA MELLEN, LARRY HORWITZ, TIMOTHY ST. CYR, ANOOSHIRVAN BIDGOLI, JULIA L. HOLT, MICHAEL MARTIN, BRADFORD TOMLIN, ROBERT DERINGER, LARRY MORRISON, JENNIFER M. MCMAHON, ANGELINA CHANDLER, ELIZABETH WALKER, ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL, RICHARD E. KRAFT, JON KELLAM, CRAIG KELLY, AMELIA BELL, STEVEN M. TRAUT WELLS, INC., BONNIE FOSTER PATRICK, MICHAEL BACKUS, ALL PLAINTIFFS, EDWARD C. PHILLIPS, SETH LYONS, WILLIAM RUBINSOHN, LEVIN SIMES LLP, JAMES GRIMES, LARISSA D. KOSITS, KEVIN SCRIBNER, SHERI ROSALIA, STEVEN YENINAS, ULLICO INC., ELSIE M. JONES, SAMANTHA WHITE, JUDAH MICHAEL, KUMAR PATEL, DMITRIY BANGIYEV, JONATHAN SCHUMACHER, GUILLERMO DE LA GARZA, JOSEPH HALL, AMY BESS, LAX & COMPANY, INC., ALANA COSTANTINO, WILLIAM YOUMANS, RICHARD WARCHOL, JAY TILAK, JAMES L. STEWART, EDWARD PARK, BRIAN CONNELLY, AUDREY ONDRADE, WILLIAM B. COTTRELL, KENT BUSEK, JOSH STAMPS, ANTHONY DENINNO, ELIZABETH A. CUMMING, KATHERINE ROSE WARNOCK, GARRETT KINDELSPIRE, PAUL MACOLINO, LORRIE ANN COATES, STATE-BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CHARLES G. DIBRELL, III, JUDY A. REIBER, ANDREW NEMIT, CHONG HUMMEL, SHAWN JAIN, MICHAEL COFFEY, JR., YVETTE WHEELER, HOWARD COLLINS, JUDAH NATHANSON, XAVIER BESS, STEVEN HERSH, BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB, III, LTD., CHRISTOPHER DEVIVO, SOLOMON FRIEDMAN, JOHN-GABRIEL LICHT, CAROLYN COLLINS, BARBARA LAWRENCE CONE, DAVID MCENERNEY, GLORIA GOLDBLATT, CHEROKII VERDUZCO, RACHEL GOLIAN, CURTIS PALMER, LILIAN M. RAJI, BREANNA JACKSON, MINGLI CHEN, CATHERINE RICHMOND, DAVID WELLS, HOWARD SLOAN KOLLER GROUP, NATHAN FRANK, DAVID MARKUN, KAYLA REPAN, CHARLES CARTE, MICHAEL OHLSTEIN, VINCENT PANFIL, KAREN BRUZDA, GAIL WOLFE, SARAH TRAN, JEFFREY HARDIMON, KEITH ANDERSON, BARBARA E. HARTLEY, JEFFREY ROBB, RON COATS, DEAN TED, NELSON VALDES, EDWARD LAWRENCE, RICHARD PRICE, JENNIFER BERDAY, PETER EVERITT, CHRISTOPHER FALCONETTI, LOIS GIORDANO, BRIAN BANK, RAJESH PATEL, ROSEMARIE GABRIELE, ERIC STETZLER, STEPHANIE JUNG, EILEEN SILVER, JONATHAN SHANKLE, ARIA WINT, COLLEEN PANZINO, JORDAN LEIGH, VALBONA ALLA, KATHRYN LAVIN, ETHAN BRODSKY, UNION LABOR LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALEXIA ATTARD, JEFFREY LARSON, KENNETH A. NELSON, JAY WINTON, JAMES J. RILEY, JACOB DOMBROSKI, MARISA DOMBROSKI, CHARLES CURLEY, AARON LAY, PAULA A. ATES, ELIZABETH MONTGOMERY, TINA EVANS, CHRISTOPHER TURTZO, HOWARD ROBINSON, CHRISTINA CLEVELAND, STELLA BANGIYEVA, GABRIEL WATKINS, AARON MULVEY, SHARON PRICE, ANNIE MIGDAL, LEON COATS, CAROLYN MULVEY, MARTIN POMEROY, THERESA BROWN, WHITNEY TOMLIN, SHEARSON PUBLISHING, RICHARD KING, LINDA WILLIAMS, MICHAEL GARZEL, MICHELE ANDRADE, ISRAEL KATZ, ROBERT ROLLAND, RICHARD P. IEYOUB, SR and BARBARA HUNTER
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100, FREDERICK ISAACSON, AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., ABC CORPS. 1-100, UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC, AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., AIR CANADA, UNITED AIRLINES, INC. and SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.
Special Master: RICHARD A. LEVIE
In Re: IN RE: DOMESTIC AIRLINE TRAVEL ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Undetermined: INTERNATIONAL AIR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2015mc01404
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sweeny on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Sweeny, Charles)
May 16, 2019 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Heaphy on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Heaphy, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 377 NOTICE of Appearance by Cadio Zirpoli on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHEROKII VERDUZCO (Zirpoli, Cadio)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER denying as premature James M. Dombroski's #355 Motion for Consideration of his Response in Lieu of Oral Argument. This Motion may be renewed at a later date. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/14/19. (DM)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER GRANTING in part and STAYING in part Plaintiffs' #300 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Reasonable Litigation Expenses and Award of Future Litigation Expenses. Plaintiffs' request for reimbursement of litigation expenses in the total amount of $1,573,192.48 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Future Litigation Expenses remains STAYED by this Court, pursuant to its January 4, 2019 Minute Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/14/19. (DM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM OPINION Re: Plaintiffs' #299 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with Southwest and American. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/09/2019. (DM)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #299 Motion for Settlement with Southwest Airlines Co. and American Airlines, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/9/19.(dot)
May 7, 2019 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Gassman on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Gassman, Seth)
May 6, 2019 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Gallagher on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Gallagher, Paul)
May 1, 2019 Filing 370 STIPULATION Regarding Travel Agents and Brokers by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Scherrer, Hilary)
April 30, 2019 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by Britton Dale Davis on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Davis, Britton)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER ADOPTING the Special Master's Report and Recommendation No. 7, DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. to Provide a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 7. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/23/2019. (DM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 367 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. Attorney Michael L. Charlson terminated. (ztd)
April 14, 2019 Filing 365 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION No. 7. Signed by Special Master Richard A. Levie on April 14, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
April 13, 2019 Filing 364 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. to Provide a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 7 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Beran, Katie)
April 12, 2019 Filing 366 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. Attorney Mortimer Hartwell terminated. (ztd)
April 12, 2019 Filing 363 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Delta Air Lines, Inc. Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Delta To Further Respond To Interrogatory No. 7 by DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Mitchell, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 362 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. Attorney Matthew J. Jacobs terminated. (Jacobs, Matthew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 361 NOTICE re. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. to Provide a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 7 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Scherrer, Hilary)
April 4, 2019 Filing 360 NOTICE of Change of Address by Whitney E. Street (Street, Whitney)
April 3, 2019 Filing 359 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to Mortimer H. Hartwell; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order dated 3/13/2019; Resent at New Address: 555 Mission Street, Suite 2000, San Francisco, CA 94105. (dot)
April 3, 2019 Filing 358 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to Michael L. Charlson; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order dated 3/13/2019; Resent at New Address: 555 Mission Street, Suite 2000, San Francisco, CA 94105. (dot)
April 2, 2019 Filing 357 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STEVEN YENINAS. Attorney Braden Beard terminated. (Beard, Braden)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER ADOPTING the Special Master's Report and Recommendation No. 6. Plaintiffs shall serve full and separate answers under oath to Defendants' Contention Interrogatory Nos. 19-22 and 24-38 within 30 calendar days of this Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/29/19. (DM)
March 28, 2019 Filing 355 First MOTION for Consideration of Dombroski's Response (ECF No. 337) in Lieu of Oral Argument re #337 Response to Document by JACOB DOMBROSKI, MARISA DOMBROSKI, AUDREY ONDRADE (Dombroski, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 354 TRANSCRIPT OF FINAL APPROVAL HEARING before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on March 22, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-102. Date of Issuance: March 27, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the co urt reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2019.(Edwards, Lisa)
March 26, 2019 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie R. Beran on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Beran, Katie)
March 22, 2019 Filing 352 Report of Special Master. Signed by Special Master Richard A. Levie on March 22, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
March 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Fairness Hearing held on 3/22/2019. #299 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval by ALL PLAINTIFFS heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (ztnr)
March 20, 2019 Filing 351 NOTICE of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with Southwest Airlines Co. and American Airlines, Inc. by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #299 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zapala, Adam)
March 20, 2019 Filing 350 NOTICE Of Counsel For Fairness Hearing by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. re #342 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Bradshaw, Benjamin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 349 NOTICE of Counsel for Fairness Hearing by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Hausfeld, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 348 NOTICE of Counsel for Fairness Hearing by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. (Liebenberg, Roberta)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On March 12, 2019, counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants attended a Status Conference to discuss the schedule and deadlines in this case, the status of ongoing discovery, and some questions regarding the March 22, 2019 Fairness Hearing. The next Status Conference in this case shall be held on August 7, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 28A. The parties' Joint Status Report is due by August 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/13/19. (DM)
March 12, 2019 Filing 347 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF Objection to Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with Southwest Airlines Co. and American Airlines, Inc. by Shimshon Wexler (ztd); ("Let this be filed" signed by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly)
March 12, 2019 Filing 346 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on March 12, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-23. Date of Issuance: March 12, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards, Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court re porter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019.(Edwards, Lisa)
March 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 3/12/2019. Status Report due by 8/1/2019. Status Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
March 6, 2019 Filing 345 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam)
March 6, 2019 Filing 344 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to Elizabeth Montgomery; Type of Document Returned: Order #12 ; Resent at New Address: aka Elizabeth Hall-Morten, 8061 Mozart Street, Round Rock, TX 78665. (dot)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #314 Motion for Disbursement of Funds for Costs of Class Notice from Qualified Settlement Funds. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/25/19. (DM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER Regarding Procedures for the March 22, 2019 Fairness Hearing. See Order for details, including the time allotted to the parties and which class members will be permitted time to speak at the Fairness Hearing. By 3/21/2019, at 10:00 a.m., counsel should notify the Court as to the names of the attorneys who will be speaking at the March 22, 2019 Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/25/2019. (DM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting Objector Paul DeMott's #340 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The Reply is accepted for fling and will be considered by this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/25/2019. (DM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 340 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of the Objection of Paul DeMott by Paul DeMott (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Geoffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 339 REPLY re #334 Reply to opposition to Motion, in Support of Objection of Paul DeMott filed by Paul DeMott. (Parker, Geoffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 338 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. Attorney Brendan Sepulveda terminated. (Schnorrenberg, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 337 RESPONSE re #334 Reply to opposition to Motion, in Support of Dombroski's Objection filed by JACOB DOMBROSKI, MARISA DOMBROSKI, AUDREY ONDRADE. (Dombroski, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 336 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Answers to Defendants' Fifth Set of Interrogatories by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Schnorrenberg, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 335 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Answers to Defendants' Fifth Set of Interrogatories by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Zapala, Adam)
February 14, 2019 Filing 334 REPLY to opposition to motion re #299 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval, #300 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Reasonable Litigation Expenses, and Award of Future Litigation Expenses filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of Jessica Jenkins)(Zapala, Adam)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting #332 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/11/2019. (DM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMITS by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam)
February 6, 2019 Filing 331 NOTICE of Submission to the Special Master of Defendants United Airlines, Inc. and Delta Air Lines, Inc's Motion to Compel Answers to Defendants' Fifth Set of Interrogatories by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SEALED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of Shannon Wheatman, PhD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/31/19.(zdot)
January 31, 2019 Filing 329 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,, Renewed filing of #307 Objection and #310 Corrected Supporting Declaration of M. Frank Bednarz opposing #299 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval, #300 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael Frank Bednarz, Theodore H Frank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank, #2 Exhibit 1. United Airlines receipt, #3 Declaration Corrected Declaration of M. Frank Bednarz)(Frank, Theodore)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On January 4, 2019, attorney Theodore H. Frank filed his #307 Objection to the Settlements and Attorney Fee Request on behalf of himself and another objector, Mr. Bednarz. On that same date, Mr. Frank filed his #310 Errata Corrected Declaration of Mr. Bednarz. On January 24, 2019, Mr. Frank again filed his #328 Objection, which appeared to be meant to encompass both previous filings in one consolidated document. The Court has now been informed that Objection, ECF No. 328, does not contain the declarations in their entirety. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, by February 4, 2019, attorney Theodore Frank shall file his CONSOLIDATED Objection, with all corrected declarations and exhibits attached thereto, which will be docketed in place of ECF No. 328. Care should be taken to redact any personal information such as frequent flier rewards numbers. A copy of this Minute Order shall be sent via email to Mr. Frank. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/31/19. (DM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Peter van Houwelingen on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke)
January 24, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE of Objection by Theodore H. Frank and M. Frank Bednarz to Settlements and Attorney Fee Request; ("Leave to file Granted but documents 307 & 310 shall be stricken as duplicative." signed 1/24/19 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (ztd)
January 23, 2019 Filing 325 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #314 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds for Costs of Class Notice from the Qualified Settlement Funds filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B)(Zapala, Adam)
January 23, 2019 Filing 324 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A - Submitted Under Seal)(Zapala, Adam)
January 22, 2019 Filing 326 NOTICE of Objection to Settlement Agreement by Edward M. Anaya; ("Leave to file Granted" signed by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (ztd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on January 16, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance: January 22, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2019.(Edwards, Lisa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 323 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Jason Liebich's Objection to Settlement Agreements "Leave to file Denied as duplicate of ECF 316" This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/17/19. (ztd)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On January 16, 2019, counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants attended a Status Conference to discuss: (1) the status of ongoing discovery; (2) objections to the pending settlement and Plaintiff's responses to the objections, which are due on February 14, 2019; (3) the need for more detail about any model for distribution of settlement proceeds; and (4) the status of four additional cases that have been added to this multidistrict litigation. By March 6, 2019, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report. The next Status Conference is set for March 12, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/16/19.(DM)
January 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 1/16/2019. Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2019. Status Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
January 11, 2019 Filing 321 NOTICE Of Objections to Settlement Agreement; ("Let this be filed" signed 1/11/19 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (ztd)
January 11, 2019 Filing 320 SEALED DOCUMENT (Objection to Settlement Agreement; sealed per chambers) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) "Let this be filed" signed on 1/11/19 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly (ztd) Modified to add fiat on 1/24/2019 (znmw).
January 11, 2019 Filing 317 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam)
January 11, 2019 Filing 316 NOTICE of Letters Received by Class Counsel and Counsel for Southwest Airlines Co. and American Airlines, Inc. by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Hausfeld, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 315 Joint STATUS REPORT by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. (Atkins, Alden)
January 9, 2019 Filing 319 NOTICE of Objections regarding Settlement; ("Let this be filed" signed on 1/9/19 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (ztd)
January 8, 2019 Filing 314 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds for Costs of Class Notice from the Qualified Settlement Funds by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam)
January 7, 2019 Filing 313 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Compel United Airlines, Inc. to Produce or Un-Redact Certain Documents from Its Core Production Privilege Log by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Zapala, Adam)
January 5, 2019 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey C. Parker on behalf of Paul DeMott (Parker, Geoffrey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 311 RESPONSE re #299 Objection to Proposed Settlements and Requested Fee Award by Paul DeMott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Paul DeMott, #2 Exhibit 2 - Class Notice Received by Paul DeMott)(Parker, Geoffrey) Modified event title and link on 1/8/2019 (znmw).
January 4, 2019 Filing 310 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT'S MEMO AT ENTRY NO. #328 . . . . .NOTICE of Corrected Filing by Michael Frank Bednarz, Theodore H Frank re #307 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected Declaration of M. Frank Bednarz)(Frank, Theodore) Modified on 1/28/2019 (ztd).
January 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs written response to objections due by 2/14/2019. (kt)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Plaintiffs request that this Court hold in abeyance their request for $15 million in attorneys' fees until Interim Class Counsel present the Court with a motion to distribute the settlement proceeds. Plaintiffs indicate that they do not seek to hold in abeyance their request for reimbursement of reasonable litigation expenses in the amount of $1,573,192.48, or an award of $3 million for future litigation expenses. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' #305 Request, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and future litigation expenses is STAYED until further order of this Court. The Court will not stay Plaintiffs' request for "reasonable litigation expenses in the amount of $1,573,192.48," which have already been incurred. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/4/2019. (DM)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court is in receipt of objections to the proposed settlement, made by certain class members, and these objections will be addressed at the March 22, 2019 Fairness Hearing. By no later than February 14, 2019, the Plaintiffs shall provide a written response to these objections. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/4/2019. (DM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 309 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #267 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Stephan Willett. (Willett, Stephan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 308 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) dated 12/27/2018 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr)
January 4, 2019 Filing 307 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT'S MEMO AT ENTRY NO. #328 . . . . . Memorandum in opposition to re #299 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval, #300 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Reasonable Litigation Expenses, and Award of Future Litigation Expenses and Rule 23 Objection filed by Michael Frank Bednarz, Theodore H Frank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank, #2 Exhibit 1. United Airlines receipt, #3 Declaration of M. Frank Bednarz, #4 Exhibit 1. Southwest Airlines receipt)(Frank, Theodore) Modified on 1/28/2019 (ztd).
January 3, 2019 Filing 318 NOTICE of Objections regarding Settlement; ("Leave to File Granted" signed 1/3/19 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (ztd) Modified fiat on 1/24/2019 (znmw).
January 3, 2019 Filing 306 Memorandum in opposition to re #300 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Reasonable Litigation Expenses, and Award of Future Litigation Expenses filed by JACOB DOMBROSKI, MARISA DOMBROSKI, AUDREY ONDRADE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James M. Dombroski in Support of Objection and in Support of Application for Attorney's Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Dombroski, James)
January 2, 2019 Filing 305 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re #300 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Reasonable Litigation Expenses, and Award of Future Litigation Expenses in Part by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Zapala, Adam)
December 27, 2018 Filing 304 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2656) (ztnr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 303 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel United Airlines to Produce or Un-Redact Certain Documents From Its Core Production Privilege Log by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Sepulveda, Brendan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 302 NOTICE of Objection by Michael B. Suessmann (ztd); ("Let this be filed" signed 12/12/18 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly)
December 5, 2018 Filing 300 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Reasonable Litigation Expenses, and Award of Future Litigation Expenses by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Joint Declaration of CPM & HLLP, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41)(Zapala, Adam)
December 5, 2018 Filing 299 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements With Southwest Airlines Co. and American Airlines, Inc., #2 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval, #3 Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval)(Hausfeld, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Filing 301 NOTICE of Objections regarding Settlement; ("Let this be filed" signed 12/4/18 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (ztd)
November 27, 2018 Filing 298 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION No. 5 REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF CERTAIN FARE BASES CODES OF DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.Signed by Special Master Richard A. Levie on 11/27/2018.(DM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 297 NOTICE NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL UNITED AIRLINES, INC. TO PRODUCE OR UN-REDACT CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FROM ITS CORE PRODUCTION PRIVILEGE LOG AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Zapala, Adam)
November 9, 2018 Filing 296 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY ON THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES TO COMPLY WITH DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR OTHER RELIEF by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Zapala, Adam)
November 5, 2018 Filing 295 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant United Airlines, Inc. to Comply with Discovery Requests and for Other Relief by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Sepulveda, Brendan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 294 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant United Airlines, Inc. to Comply with Discovery Requests and for Other Relief by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Hausfeld, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #292 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/17/18. (DM)
October 16, 2018 Filing 292 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brent K. Nakamura, :Firm- BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER LLP, :Address- 1999 Harrison Street, Suite 900, Oakland, California 94612. Phone No. - 510-874-1207. Fax No. - 510-874-1460 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5741594. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent K. Nakamura, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 291 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kathleen S. Rogers (Rogers, Kathleen)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 STIPULATED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Interrogatories due by 9/30/2018. Requests for Admissions due by 3/29/2019. Motions to Compel due by 5/31/2019. Deadline for Fact Depositions by 6/14/2019. Close of Fact Discovery by 7/31/2019. Merit Expert Reports due by 9/30/2019. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 11/14/2019. Depositions of Merit Experts due by 12/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2020. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 3/9/2020. See Order for all deadlines. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/24/2018.(DM) Modified on 9/24/2018 docket entry title to match document title (kt).
September 21, 2018 Filing 289 STIPULATION Stipulated Amended Scheduling Order Regarding Discovery and Summary Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Scherrer, Hilary)
September 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 9/17/2018. Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2019. Status Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). On September 17, 2018, counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants United Airlines, Inc. and Delta Air Lines, Inc. attended a Status Conference to discuss the schedule and deadlines in this case and the status of third party discovery. At the Status Conference, counsel for Plaintiffs and the two Defendants indicated that they had reached an agreement regarding Defendants' #277 Motion to Set a Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing and Expert Discovery. The parties have decided that Defendants' summary judgment motion will be briefed prior to any briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification. The parties decided further that the summary judgment briefing and discovery on the merits will be done after the July 31, 2019 discovery deadline. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS this joint scheduling proposal by the parties. By September 21, 2018, the parties shall provide this Court with an amended Scheduling Order containing all the amended dates consistent with this Court's #286 Order extending discovery until July 31, 2019, dates relating to merits discovery, and dates for briefing of any summary judgment motion. Because the parties' agreement resolves the issues set forth in the Defendants' #277 Motion to Set a Schedule, that Motion is deemed to be MOOT. The next Status Conference in this case shall be held on January 16, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The parties' Joint Status Report is due by January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/17/18. (DM)
September 14, 2018 Filing 288 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BARBARA LAWRENCE CONE (Zapala, Adam)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Plaintiffs' #270 Notice of Motion and Motion for an Extension of Fact Discovery Deadlines. A separate Order accompanies this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/13/2018. (DM)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #270 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, with the proviso that no further extensions of discovery will be considered by the Court. An Amended Scheduling Order will be set after the next Status Conference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/13/2018. (DM)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING FINAL APPROVAL SCHEDULING. Final Approval Hearing set for March 22, 2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. See Order for other deadlines relating to settlement notice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/12/2018. (DM) Modified on 9/13/2018 to correct date (dot).
September 12, 2018 Filing 284 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (Schnorrenberg, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 283 REPLY to opposition to motion re #277 MOTION for Briefing Schedule Defendants' Motion to Set A Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing and Expert Discovery filed by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (Gardiner, Kent)
September 11, 2018 Filing 282 NOTICE of Proposed Order (Amended) Regarding Final Approval Scheduling by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #267 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, (Zapala, Adam)
September 7, 2018 Filing 281 Memorandum in opposition to re #277 MOTION for Briefing Schedule Defendants' Motion to Set A Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing and Expert Discovery filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam)
September 2, 2018 Filing 279 REPLY to opposition to motion re #270 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Maura R. Grossman In Further Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For An Extension Of The Fact Discovery Deadline, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19)(Scherrer, Hilary)
August 31, 2018 Filing 280 SEALED DOCUMENT (Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda) filed by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. re #276 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #275 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Ex. 3 to the Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda) Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/31/2018. (DM)
August 31, 2018 Filing 277 MOTION for Briefing Schedule Defendants' Motion to Set A Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing and Expert Discovery by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnorrenberg, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 276 Memorandum in opposition to re #270 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David M. Schnorrenberg, #3 Declaration of David D. Lewis, #4 Declaration of Michael Kriegal, #5 Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #7 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #8 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #9 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #10 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #11 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #12 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #13 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #14 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #15 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #16 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Brendan Sepulveda, #17 Certificate of Service)(Schnorrenberg, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 275 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 3)(Schnorrenberg, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 274 Memorandum in opposition to re #270 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Michael)
August 27, 2018 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly C. Kenney on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Kenney, Molly)
August 24, 2018 Filing 273 SEALED DOCUMENT (Main document is exhibit 9) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. re #270 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12)(ztd)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #269 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits 9-12 to the Kenney Declaration. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/24/2018. (DM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 270 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Maura Grossman, #4 Declaration of Jeannine Kenney, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Certificate of Service)(Zapala, Adam)
August 24, 2018 Filing 269 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12)(Zapala, Adam)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Plaintiffs' Motions for Approval of Settlement Notice Program #218 and #257 . A separate Order accompanies this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/22/2018. (DM)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #218 and #257 Plaintiffs' Motions for Approval of Settlement Notice Program. The Non-Settling Defendants shall produce customer e-mail addresses by 9/21/2018. See Order for details and other deadlines relating to the schedule for notice and final approval. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/22/2018. (DM)
August 22, 2018 Filing 266 REPLY re #257 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #248 MOTION for Settlement with American Airlines, Inc., #218 MOTION Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #197 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/, #234 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), #218 MOTION Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #197 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #215 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam) Modified event title on 8/27/2018 (znmw).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MINUTE ORDER correcting the deadlines in connection with the Stipulation and Order #264 . Plaintiffs' Motion challenging United's Core Document Production privilege claims is due by 9/14/2018; United's Opposition is due no later than 30 calendar days after service of the Motion; and Plaintiffs' reply is due no later than 14 calendar days after service of the Opposition. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/15/18. (DM)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CHALLENGING UNITED AIRLINES, INC'S CORE DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PRIVILEGE CLAIMS: Plaintiffs' Motion challenging United's Core Document Production privilege claims is due by 8/31/2018. United's Opposition is due by 10/1/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply is due by 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/15/18. (DM)
August 15, 2018 Filing 263 RESPONSE re #257 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #248 MOTION for Settlement with American Airlines, Inc., #218 MOTION Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #197 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/ filed by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Denvir, James)
August 14, 2018 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Sepulveda on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Sepulveda, Brendan)
August 13, 2018 Filing 261 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulation and Order Regarding the Briefing Schedule for Challenging United Airlines, Inc.'s Core Document Production Privilege Claims by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam)
August 10, 2018 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Lea Goodman on behalf of DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Goodman, Martha)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Fed. R. Evid. 502(D) ORDER: Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/08/2018. (DM)
August 7, 2018 Filing 258 STIPULATION Stipulated Claw-back Arrangement and [Proposed] Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam)
August 2, 2018 Filing 257 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #248 MOTION for Settlement with American Airlines, Inc., #218 MOTION Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #197 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #215 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings , #249 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) Modified event title on 8/8/2018 (znmw).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #255 Motion to Amend/Correct the Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/20/18. (DM)
July 20, 2018 Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #162 Protective Order by DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Michael)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER ADOPTING the Special Master's Report and Recommendation No. 4, which GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/10/18. (DM) Modified on 7/10/2018 to correct document type(kt).
June 28, 2018 Filing 253 REPLY re #250 Objection to Report and Recommendations of Special Master filed by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Mitchell, Michael)
June 25, 2018 Filing 252 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard G. Parker (Parker, Richard)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless): The Court is in receipt of the #250 Objections to the Amended Report and Recommendation of the Special Master, filed by Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc. and United Airlines, Inc., and the Plaintiffs' #251 Response to the Objections. Defendants' Reply, if any, shall be filed by Monday, July 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/25/2018. (DM)
June 22, 2018 Filing 251 RESPONSE re: #250 to Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's Amended Report and Recommendation Regarding Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Interrogatory No. 15 filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Zapala, Adam) Modified to add linkage on 7/3/2018 (ztd).
June 20, 2018 Filing 250 OBJECTION to #247 Report and Recommendations of Special Master filed by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Michael)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #248 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendant American Airlines, Inc. By August 2, 2018, Settlement Class Counsel shall submit to the Court for approval a notice plan for purposes of advising Settlement Class Members of their rights, including the procedure for requesting an exclusion or filing an objection. Settlement Class Counsel shall inform this Court of the specific Notice language, the way(s) in which Settlement Class Members will be notified, the manner in which objections should be made and will be addressed, the persons responsible for administration of claims, and any other matters that are related to the settlement of claims against Defendant American Airlines, Inc. Settlement Class Counsel shall also propose several dates for the fairness hearing, allowing time for the parties to respond to objections raised by the Settlement Class Members. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/18/18. (DM)
June 15, 2018 Filing 248 MOTION for Settlement with American Airlines, Inc. by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary)
June 15, 2018 Filing 247 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #4. Signed by Hon. Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on 15 June 2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
June 13, 2018 Filing 246 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #4. Signed by Hon. Richard A. Levie (Ret.) Special Master on 13 June 2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
June 8, 2018 Filing 245 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Compel American Airlines re. American Airlines' Privilege Log by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Scherrer, Hilary)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On June 6, 2018, the Court held a Status Conference during which the discovery schedule, privilege logs and third party discovery were discussed. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report by September 12, 2018. The next Status Conference is set for September 17, 2018, in Courtroom 28A, beginning at 10:30 a.m. Prior to the Status Hearing, the parties shall provide this Court with a consolidated list of the names of all counsel who will attend the Status Hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/06/2018. (DM)
June 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 6/6/2018. All relevant parties were present. The Next Status Conference has been set for 9/17/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Status Report due by 6/12/2018. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (jl)
June 1, 2018 Filing 244 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Certain of Defendants Interrogatories by DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Mitchell, Michael)
May 31, 2018 Filing 243 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (Schnorrenberg, David)
May 31, 2018 Filing 242 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Motion To Compel Answers To Certain Of Defendants' Interrogatories by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Zapala, Adam)
May 29, 2018 Filing 241 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel American Airlines Regarding American Airlines' CID Log by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. (Parker, Richard)
May 29, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Defendants Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Certain of Defendants Interrogatories by DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Mitchell, Michael)
May 7, 2018 Filing 239 NOTICE Of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel American Airlines Regarding American Airlines' Privilege Log by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Scherrer, Hilary)
May 1, 2018 Filing 238 SEALED DOCUMENT (Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Notice Plan Costs and Exhibits A-C)(ztd)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #234 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 05/01/2018. (DM)
April 30, 2018 Filing 236 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #234 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Zapala, Adam)
April 30, 2018 Filing 235 REDACTED DOCUMENT- to #234 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Redacted Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REDACTED - Summary of Notice Plan Costs and Exhibits A-C)(Zapala, Adam)
April 30, 2018 Filing 234 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program, #2 Exhibit Summary of Notice Plan Costs and Exhibits A-C)(Zapala, Adam)
April 27, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re #231 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; emailed to hscherrer@hausfeldllp.com, cc'd 247 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Do No Refile, FYI: Please remember that the person signing the document must be the person who electronically files the document. (ztd, )
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #231 Unopposed Motion for Limited Extensions of Certain Third-Party Discovery Deadlines. The deadline by which Plaintiffs must resolve all issues or move to compel as to third-parties Cowen, Evercore, J.P. Morgan, Primecap, T. Rowe Price, and Wolfe Research is extended from April 30, 2018 until May 14, 2018. and the deadline by which Plaintiffs must resolve all issues or move to compel as to third-party Credit Suisse is extended until May 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/27/2018. (DM)
April 26, 2018 Filing 231 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Limited Extension of Certain Third-Party Discovery Deadlines) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). In consideration of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program, the Court requests that Plaintiffs provide an estimate of the proposed budget reflecting the administrative costs to be paid to Dr. Shannon Wheatman/Kinsella Media in connection with their work on the proposed notice program. Furthermore, in light of the fact Plaintiffs have indicated that the cost of mailing notices to potential class members would range between 12.3 and 43.4 million dollars, the Court further requests an estimate of the range of costs associated with providing e-mail notification to potential class members, and the range of costs associated with the other methods of disseminating notice, as proposed in the Plaintiffs' notice program. This requested information shall be provided by Monday, April 30, 2018, and it may be provided under seal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/25/2018. (DM)
April 23, 2018 Filing 232 SEALED DOCUMENT (Response to 4/16/18 Minute Order) filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. re Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
April 23, 2018 Filing 230 SEALED Response to the Court's April 16, 2018 Minute Order filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #228 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/23/2018. (DM)
April 19, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re #226 Notice of Appearance; emailed to rskaggs@bsfllp.com, cc'd 245 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI Reminder: Please save all fillable documents to pdf before filing. The Court has made the correction to this document. (ztd, )
April 18, 2018 Filing 228 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Response to the Court's April 16, 2018 Minute Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Richard)
April 18, 2018 Filing 227 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Requesting Information About Customer Data (with Certificate of Service) filed by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. (Liebenberg, Roberta)
April 18, 2018 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory L. Skaggs on behalf of DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Skaggs, Rory) (Main Document 226 replaced on 4/19/2018) (ztd).
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). In consideration of Plaintiffs' #218 Motion for Approval of Settlement Notice Program, the Court requests Defendants' response to the following questions by Wednesday, April 18, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. As to all Defendants: 1) what percentage of airline reservations are done using the internet? As to Southwest Airlines Co. only, in light of the fact that Plaintiffs have indicated that Southwest's transactional data includes e-mail addresses for approximately 95% of its customers: 1) does Southwest also have postal addresses for its customers; and if so, 2) for what percentage of its customers does it have postal addresses? Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/16/2018. (DM)
April 3, 2018 Filing 225 REPLY re #218 MOTION Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #197 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #215 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam)
April 3, 2018 Filing 224 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. Attorney Joseph Lee Meadows terminated. (Schnorrenberg, David)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER REGARDING THIRD-PARTY PROTOCOLS. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/29/18. (DM)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER REGARDING SPECIFIC PROCEDURES RELATING TO PRIVILEGE CHALLENGES TO CORE AND POST-CORE DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/29/18. (DM) (Main Document 222 replaced on 4/2/2018) (zkt).
March 28, 2018 Filing 221 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION No. 3. Signed by SPECIAL MASTER on 28 March 2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
March 28, 2018 Filing 220 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION N0. 2. Signed by Special Master on 28 MARCH 2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
March 27, 2018 Filing 219 RESPONSE re #218 MOTION Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #197 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #215 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Non-Settling Defendants' Response filed by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Denvir, James)
March 23, 2018 Filing 218 MOTION Approval of Settlement Notice Program re #197 Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #215 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration with Exhibits 1-5, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER REGARDING PROTOCOL TO RESOLVE CHALLENGES TO PRIVILEGE LOGS DEFENDANTS SUBMITTED TO DOJ. See Order for details. The following deadlines apply:Plaintiffs shall identify the entries to be challenged by 4/6/2018. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference are to be completed by 4/23/2018. Motions to compel production are due by 5/7/2018. Responses to motions to compel are due by 5/29/2018. Replies are due by 6/8/2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/20/2018. (DM)
March 19, 2018 Filing 216 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #1. Signed by SPECIAL MASTER RICHARD A. LEVIE on 19 MARCH 2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Levie, Richard)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #214 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Settlement Notice Program. The Plaintiffs' Class Notice Program is due by 3/23/2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/16/2018. (DM)
March 15, 2018 Filing 214 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Settlement Notice Program by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam)
March 12, 2018 Filing 213 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel J. Mogin (Mogin, Daniel)
February 28, 2018 Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on February 12, 2018; Page Numbers: 1 - 24. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 3/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018.(Jones, Cathryn)
February 16, 2018 Filing 211 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by AMY BESS (Kralowec, Kimberly)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #208 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Submit Plaintiffs' Class Notice Program by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/15/2018. (DM)
February 14, 2018 Filing 209 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver (Weaver, Lesley)
February 14, 2018 Filing 208 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Plaintiffs' Class Notice Program by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Parties shall file their next Joint Status Report by May 31, 2018. The next Status Hearing is set for June 6, 2018, in Courtroom 28A, beginning at 1:30 p.m. On the morning of June 6, 2018, the parties shall provide this Court with a consolidated list of the names of all counsel who will attend the Status Hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/14/2018. (DM)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND CLASS CERTIFICATION:Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2019. See Order for details and other deadlines. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/14/2018. (DM)
February 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 2/12/2018. Joint Status Report due by 5/31/2018. Status Conference set for 6/6/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones.) (dot)
February 7, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Scanlon on behalf of INTERNATIONAL AIR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION (Scanlon, Michael)
February 7, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Lang on behalf of INTERNATIONAL AIR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION (Lang, Thomas)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). In preparation for the February 12, 2018 Status Conference, the Court is providing counsel with advance notice of some scheduling issues that have not been addressed in the February 5, 2018 Joint Status Report. Assuming that the Court accepts the January 31, 2019 date as the close of discovery, that date would signify that all fact and third party depositions had been completed; all privilege logs had been provided, likely on a rolling basis, and ruled on; and any motions to compel would have been filed, fully briefed and resolved by that time. Because these events are not separately addressed in the Joint Status Report, due dates will need to be proposed by the parties, and such due dates must provide time to accommodate such briefing and resolution, allowing for any additional discovery required that occurs after these events while still maintaining the January 31, 2019 date for the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/06/2018. (DM)
February 5, 2018 Filing 204 Joint STATUS REPORT by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Denvir, James)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER EXTENDING APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. The Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel, as modified by the substitution of Adam J. Zapala as Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel in place of Steven N. Williams, is extended until 45 days after resolution of the class certification issue. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/19/18. (DM)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #199 Motion to Amend the Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/19/2018. (DM)
January 18, 2018 Filing 201 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #198 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings RESPONSE TO ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Zapala, Adam)
January 17, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Braden Beard on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Beard, Braden)
January 5, 2018 Filing 199 MOTION to Amend/Correct #76 Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Plaintiffs' counsel's responses, if any, are due by 1/18/2018. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/04/2018. (DM)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. By February 16, 2018, Settlement Class Counsel shall submit to the Court for approval a Notice Plan for purposes of advising Settlement Class Members of their rights, including the procedure for requesting an exclusion or filing an objection. Settlement Class Counsel shall inform this Court of the specific Notice language, the way(s) in which Settlement Class Members will be notified, the manner in which objections should be made and will be addressed, the persons responsible for the administration of claims, and any other matters that are related to the settlement of claims against Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. Settlement Class Counsel shall also propose several dates for the fairness hearing, allowing time for the parties to respond to objections raised by the Settlement Class Members. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/03/2018. (DM)
December 29, 2017 Filing 196 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary)
December 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs shall submit their report by 1/16/2018. (kt)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #195 Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to submit their cumulative time and expense report for November 2017. Plaintiffs shall submit their report by 1/16/2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/19/2017. (DM)
December 19, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Their Cumulative Time and Expense Report for November 2017 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scherrer, Hilary)
November 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 11/16/2017. Joint Status Report due by 2/5/2018. Status Conference set for 2/12/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Richard Ehrlich.) (dot)
November 13, 2017 Filing 194 Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (Parker, Richard)
November 3, 2017 Filing 193 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to VALBONA ALLA, ETHAN BRODSKY, JEFFREY ROBB. (Ademi, Shpetim)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Next Status Hearing, which was previously set for November 13, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. is now RESCHEDULED to November 16, 2017, at 2:00 P.M. in COURTROOM 28A. By November 13, 2017, the parties shall file a detailed Joint Status Report indicating how they intend to meet the discovery deadlines. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/30/2017. (DM)
October 25, 2017 Filing 192 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Glenn McLellan (McLellan, Michael)
September 22, 2017 Filing 191 ANSWER to #184 Amended Complaint by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. Related document: #184 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Gardiner, Kent)
September 21, 2017 Filing 190 ANSWER to #184 Amended Complaint by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. Related document: #184 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Parker, Richard)
September 21, 2017 Filing 189 ANSWER to #184 Amended Complaint by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. Related document: #184 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Denvir, James)
September 21, 2017 Filing 188 ANSWER to #184 Amended Complaint by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. Related document: #184 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Atkins, Alden)
September 19, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 9/19/2017. Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2017. Status Conference set for 11/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Richard Ehlrich.) (dot)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). This matter came before the Court on September 19, 2017, for a Status Hearing to discuss ongoing discovery. After confirming the availability of the parties, the next Status Hearing is set for NOVEMBER 13, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. in COURTROOM 28A. By November 8, 2017, the parties shall file a detailed Joint Status Report indicating how they intend to meet the discovery deadlines. The Joint Status Report should include a list of the NAMES of all counsel who will attend the Status Hearing, and this information should be included in all Joint Status Reports hereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/19/2017. (DM)
September 15, 2017 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO SPECIAL MASTER OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL UNITED AIRLINES AND DELTA AIRLINES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Williams, Steven)
September 14, 2017 Filing 186 Joint STATUS REPORT by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Mitchell, Michael)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Following a May 11, 2017 Status Hearing, this matter was set for another Status Hearing on September 21, 2017. After confirming the availability of the parties, that September 21, 2017 Status Hearing was re-set for SEPTEMBER 19, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. in COURTROOM 28A. Accordingly, the September 21, 2017 date that was initially set is VACATED, and the Status Hearing will proceed on September 19, 2017, at 10:00 AM in courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/08/2017. (DM)
September 8, 2017 Filing 185 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Defendants' Position Statement in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel United Airlines and Delta Air Lines Regarding Plaintiffs' Requests for Production by UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Schnorrenberg, David)
August 31, 2017 Filing 184 CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. with Jury Demand filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(znmw)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #177 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/31/2017. (DM)
August 28, 2017 Filing 182 NOTICE of Submission to Special Master of Plaintiffs' Position Statement on Motion to Compel United Airlines and Delta Airlines Regarding Plaintiffs' Requests for Production by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Kenney, Jeannine)
August 25, 2017 Filing 181 REPLY to opposition to motion re #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct #91 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Steven)
August 22, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE OF INTENTION TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct #91 Amended Complaint , #178 Response to motion (Scherrer, Hilary)
August 22, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #179 Notice (Other); emailed to hscherrer@hausfeldllp.com, cc'd 224 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Incorrect format (letter). Please refile in proper format in accordance with Local Rules. (ztnr, )
August 21, 2017 Filing 179 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Intention to File Reply Brief by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct #91 Amended Complaint , #178 Response to motion (Scherrer, Hilary) Modified on 8/22/2017 (ztnr).
August 18, 2017 Filing 178 RESPONSE re #177 MOTION to Amend/Correct #91 Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Opposition)(Parker, Richard)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' #177 Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. By no later than August 18, 2017, Defendants shall indicate whether or not they oppose Plaintiffs' Motion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/11/2017. (DM)
August 10, 2017 Filing 177 MOTION to Amend/Correct #91 Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary)
July 27, 2017 Filing 176 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC.. (Robson, Katrina)
June 30, 2017 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT OF 5/11/17 STATUS HEARING before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on May 11, 2017. Page Numbers: 1-8. Date of Issuance: June 30, 2017. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, t he transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2017.(Wayne, Bryan)
June 28, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent J. Ward on behalf of SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. (Ward, Vincent)
June 28, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Duncan on behalf of SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. (Duncan, Matthew)
June 28, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberta D. Liebenberg on behalf of SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. (Liebenberg, Roberta)
June 27, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. (Goldberg, Joseph)
June 6, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara J. Hart (Hart, Barbara)
June 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2017. (dot)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). In advance of the next scheduled hearing, the parties shall file a brief joint status report updating the Court as to the progress of discovery and alerting the Court to any other outstanding issues that the parties deem appropriate by no later than SEPTEMBER 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 1, 2017. (NS)
May 12, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by KATHERINE ROSE WARNOCK (Williams, Jodie)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). This matter came before the Court on May 11, 2017, for a Status Hearing. The parties are proceeding with discovery in this matter. No adjustments to the discovery schedule are necessary. This matter is hereby set for a Status Hearing on SEPTEMBER 19, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. in COURTROOM 28A. The Court has confirmed the availability of the parties at this date and time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 11, 2017. (NS)
May 11, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 5/11/2017. Status Conference set for 9/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (dot)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs' #168 Uncontested Motion to Appear by Telephone at the May 11, 2017 Status Conference, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Steven N. Williams, Plaintiffs' Interim Class Co-Counsel, is permitted to appear by phone at the May 11, 2017, Status Conference. Mr. Williams shall provide chambers with his telephonic contact information in advance of the hearing. The Court notes that to the extent other Plaintiffs' counsel seek to monitor (without participating in) this Status Conference, they shall adhere to the procedure set forth in this Court's #4 Initial Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 8, 2017. (NS)
May 5, 2017 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the May 11, 2017 Status Conference by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Williams, Steven)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding the search for and production of electronically stored information and hard copy documents; Appendix 1 & 2. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/5/17. (dot)
May 4, 2017 Filing 166 Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. (Bradshaw, Benjamin)
May 4, 2017 Filing 165 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulation and Order Regarding the Search for and Production of Electronically Stored Information and Hard Copy Documents by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (Schnorrenberg, David)
April 14, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. Attorney Vincent van Panhuys terminated. (van Panhuys, Vincent)
April 11, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Kitchenoff on behalf of BARBARA LAWRENCE CONE (Kitchenoff, Robert)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal; exhibit (A). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/20/17. (dot)
March 17, 2017 Filing 161 STIPULATION / [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential and Privileged Materials by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. (Parker, Richard)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DISCOVERY STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/13/17. (dot)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 EXPERT STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/13/2017. (dot)
March 10, 2017 Filing 158 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] EXPERT STIPULATION AND ORDER by UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Schnorrenberg, David)
March 10, 2017 Filing 157 STIPULATION [PROPOSED] DISCOVERY STIPULATION AND ORDER by UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Schnorrenberg, David)
March 1, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE of Change of Address by Warren T. Burns (Burns, Warren)
February 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/10/2017. (dot)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Special Master conveyed to the Court a joint request of the parties to extend a discovery deadline set forth in this Court's #152 Scheduling Order Regarding Discovery and Briefing on Motion for Class Certification. At the request of the parties, the deadline for submission of agreed Protective Order, discovery in lieu of R. 26(a) disclosures, protocol for production of ESI and documents expert stipulation, privilege protocol, deposition protocol, preservation agreement, and/or other agreements that the parties deem necessary is hereby extended from February 27, 2017, to MARCH 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 22, 2017. (NS)
February 15, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lee Meadows on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Meadows, Joseph)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. The Hon. Richard A. Levie shall be appointed pursuant to Rule 53 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as Special Master (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 9, 2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hon. Richard A. Levie pursuant to FRCP 53(b)(3)(A) and 28 U.S.C. 455) (NS)
February 6, 2017 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT OF INITIAL SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on January 26, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-57. Date of Issuance: February 6, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthous e at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2017.(wz)
February 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2017. Status Conference set for 5/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). In order to accommodate the schedule of Special Master Levie appointed for the purpose of overseeing discovery, the Status Hearing previously set for May 3, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby CONTINUED to MAY 11, 2017, at 10:00 A.M. in COURTROOM 28A. To the extent that the parties are not available on this date and time, they are directed to promptly notify the Court.The date by which the parties are required to file a brief joint status report updating the Court as to the progress of discovery and alerting the Court to any other outstanding issues that the parties deem appropriate, is hereby extended from April 26, 2017, to MAY 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 1, 2017. (NS)
January 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2017. Status Conference set for 5/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (see Order for details). This matter is set for a Status Hearing on MAY 3, 2017, at 10:00 A.M., in COURTROOM 28A. By no later than APRIL 26, 2017, the parties shall file a brief joint status report updating the Court as to the progress of discovery and alerting the Court to any other outstanding issues that the parties deem appropriate. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 30, 2017. (NS)
January 26, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling and Case Management Conference held on 1/26/2017. (Court Reporter William Zaremba.) (dot)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER EXTENDING APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 26, 2017. (NS)
January 25, 2017 Filing 150 RESPONSE re #144 Status Report Request to Include in the Scheduling Order an Opportunity to Object to the Proposed Protective Order filed by LINDA WILLIAMS. (Alioto, Joseph)
January 24, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. re #148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski, :Firm- OMelveny & Myers LLP, :Address- Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - (212) 326-2000. Fax No. - (212) 326-2061 Fili (Bradshaw, Benjamin)
January 24, 2017 Filing 148 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 1/24/2017..... MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey A. N. Kopczynski, :Firm- OMelveny & Myers LLP, :Address- Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - (212) 326-2000. Fax No. - (212) 326-2061 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4815424. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradshaw, Benjamin) Modified on 1/25/2017 (znmw).
January 23, 2017 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Gil D. Messina on behalf of LINDA WILLIAMS (Messina, Gil)
January 13, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Anne Falvey on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Falvey, Cheryl)
January 13, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by David Martin Schnorrenberg on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Schnorrenberg, David)
January 11, 2017 Filing 144 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Williams, Steven)
January 11, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address by EILEEN SILVER (Goldstein, Jayne)
January 4, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver (Weaver, Lesley)
December 29, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Gross (Gross, Terry)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting Interim Class Counsel's #138 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Make in camera Filing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/26/2016. (lcckk1)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting Defendants' #137 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Report. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/29/2016. (lcckk1)
December 28, 2016 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to Make In Camera Filing of Class Counsel's Time and Expenses by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven)
December 28, 2016 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by DELTA AIRLINES, INC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Michael)
December 27, 2016 Filing 136 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL, RACHEL GOLIAN, ISRAEL KATZ (Aranoff, Ronald)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Pursuant to the Minute Order entered in this matter on January 12, 2016, the parties are directed to deliver one (1) courtesy copy of any submission that is over twenty-five (25) pages in length or that includes more than one (1) exhibit to the Court Security Officer at the loading dock located at Third and C Streets (not the Clerks Office or Chambers). Courtesy copies shall be appropriately bound and tabbed for ease of reference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 29, 2016. (NS)
November 29, 2016 Filing 135 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. (Atkins, Alden)
November 28, 2016 Filing 134 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. Related document: #91 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Gardiner, Kent)
November 28, 2016 Filing 133 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. Related document: #91 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Parker, Richard)
November 28, 2016 Filing 132 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. Related document: #91 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Denvir, James)
November 28, 2016 Filing 131 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. Related document: #91 Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Atkins, Alden)
November 23, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Uncontested Motion to Continue the Initial Scheduling and Case Management Conference. The Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. All other deadlines and provisions of the Court's Order Regarding Initial Scheduling and Case Management Conference (ECF No. 125) remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/23/16. (dot)
November 21, 2016 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling & Case Management Conference by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hausfeld, Michael)
November 17, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis S. Schmelzer on behalf of AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. (Denis, Paul) Modified on 11/18/2016 (znmw).
November 17, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. Attorney Carolyn Hazard terminated. (Hazard, Carolyn)
November 17, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Whitney E. Street on behalf of KEITH ANDERSON, BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB, III, LTD., JAMES GRIMES, LAX & COMPANY, INC., HOWARD ROBINSON Substituting for attorney Lesley E. Weaver (Street, Whitney)
November 15, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Plan due by 1/4/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. By no later than JANUARY 4, 2017, the parties shall jointly submit to the Court a written report that outlines the proposed Case Management Plan (see Order for details). This matter is hereby set for an Initial Scheduling and Case Management Conference on JANUARY 19, 2017, at 1:00 P.M. in COURTROOM 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 15, 2016. (NS)
October 28, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to #91 due by 11/28/2016. (dot)
October 28, 2016 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 28, 2016. (NS)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DENYING Defendants' #106 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file their Answer to the Plaintiffs' #91 Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by no later than NOVEMBER 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 28, 2016. (NS)
August 11, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederic S. Fox on behalf of KAYLA REPAN (Fox, Frederic) (Main Document 122 replaced on 8/11/2016) (td).
July 20, 2016 Filing 121 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to -- SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CAC -- filed by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. (Atkins, Alden)
July 20, 2016 Filing 120 REPLY to opposition to motion re #106 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O)(Robson, Katrina)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Southwest may file a supplemental reply brief not to exceed 6 pages in addition to a reply brief being filed jointly with the other defendants. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/19/16. (dot)
July 19, 2016 Filing 118 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Alden)
June 28, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver (Weaver, Lesley)
June 27, 2016 Filing 116 Memorandum in opposition to re #106 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion) Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Hausfeld, Michael)
May 16, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Lingel H. Winters on behalf of WILLIAM RUBINSOHN (Winters, Lingel)
May 13, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ISRAEL KATZ. Attorney Faith E. Gay and Stephen R. Neuwirth terminated. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
May 13, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to RACHEL GOLIAN. Attorney Stephen R. Neuwirth terminated. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
May 13, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL. Attorney Stephen R. Neuwirth terminated. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
May 13, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J. Aranoff on behalf of ISRAEL KATZ (Aranoff, Ronald)
May 11, 2016 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Powers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Atkins, Alden)
May 11, 2016 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Gardiner, Kent)
May 11, 2016 Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. (Gardiner, Kent)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.'s #101 Consent Motion to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 11, 2016. (NS)
May 11, 2016 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Robson, Katrina)
May 11, 2016 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC.. (Robson, Katrina)
May 11, 2016 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. (Robson, Katrina)
May 11, 2016 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.. (Atkins, Alden)
May 11, 2016 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELTA AIRLINES, INC.. (Mitchell, Michael)
May 11, 2016 Filing 101 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Alden)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Presently before the Court is Plaintiffs' #100 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to paragraph 9 of the Court's #4 Initial Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.2 are waived as to any attorney appearing in these actions who is duly admitted to practice before any United States Court. As such, the Court shall DENY AS MOOT Plaintiffs' #100 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 6, 2016. (NS)
May 6, 2016 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lingel H. Winters, :Firm- Law Offices of Lingel H. Winters, :Address- 388 Market Street, Suite 900, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - (415) 398-2941. Fax No. - (415) 362-1431 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4516302. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIAM RUBINSOHN (Alioto, Joseph)
May 6, 2016 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 2/3/2016; Page Numbers: 1-18. Date of Issuance:5-6-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order Form.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2016.(Foradori, Lisa) Modified on 5/9/2016 (znmw).
May 4, 2016 Filing 98 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Edward Mason (Mason, Gary)
April 7, 2016 Filing 97 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) dated 4/7/2016 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying Plaintiffs' request to lift the discovery stay in this case for the limited purpose of allowing discovery as to the materials provided to Government (presented in 3/24/2016 telephone conference). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/30/2016. (lcckk2)
March 29, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Isaacson on behalf of DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Isaacson, William)
March 29, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby L. Dennis on behalf of DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Dennis, Abby)
March 28, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Authority Pursuant to the Court's March 24, 2016 Minute Order by DELTA AIRLINES, INC. (Denvir, James)
March 28, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Authorities by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Williams, Steven)
March 25, 2016 Filing 91 AMENDED COMPLAINT - Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC. with Jury Demand filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Hausfeld, Michael)
March 24, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANOOSHIRVAN BIDGOLI, BARBARA HUNTER, ANNIE MIGDAL (Simon, Bruce)
March 24, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 3/24/2016. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori.) (dot)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: To follow up on the conference call held earlier today regarding Plaintiffs' request for lifting the discovery stay in this case for a limited purpose, the Court reiterates that briefing on these issues is not necessary. However, the Court finds that it would enable an expedited ruling on this matter if the parties provide a list of the cases they referenced in the telephone conference call and any other cases they rely on in support of their arguments that their respective positions are consistent with the general pattern among other similar cases. (That is, Plaintiffs argue that lifting a discovery stay in these circumstances is an ordinary event, and Defendants argue the contrary.) Accordingly, by no later than NOON on Monday, MARCH 28, 2016, each side shall provide a Notice, of no more than ONE PAGE, with a list of the cases they referenced or rely on, including citations to legal databases/reporters or case numbers and docket entries for documents that are accessible via ECF/PACER. The parties MAY NOT include any argument regarding the relevance of these cases to the request now before the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/24/2016. (lcckk2)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' joint request, the Court held a telephone conference call on the record today to discuss Plaintiffs' request to lift the discovery stay in this case for a limited purpose, specifically to obtain the materials that Defendants had provided to the Government in response to the Government's subpoena. The Court held a substantive discussion on the record regarding Plaintiffs' arguments in favor of lifting the discovery stay for that limited purpose and Defendants' arguments in opposition. The Court concluded that additional briefing was not necessary regarding this request and that it would rule on Plaintiffs' request, by a subsequent written order, on the basis of the arguments provided in the telephone conference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/24/2016. (lcckk2)
March 23, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 3/24/2016 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
March 23, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry for 03/21/2016 re Set/Reset Hearings was entered in error and will be refiled with corrected date. (dot)
March 23, 2016 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 2-3-16; Page Numbers: 1-146. Date of Issuance:3-23-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 4/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2016.(Foradori, Lisa)
March 22, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Zapala on behalf of STEPHANIE JUNG (znmw)
March 22, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KEVIN SCRIBNER (Wolchansky, Melissa)
March 21, 2016 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 11/24/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot) Modified on 3/23/2016 (dot).
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). At the parties' joint request, this matter is hereby set for an on-the-record telephonic conference call on THURSDAY, MARCH 24, 2016, at 11:00 A.M. The parties are directed to establish a connection between them and then jointly call chambers at that date and time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 21, 2016. (NS)
March 17, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Air Canada (Pier, Thomas)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsels' #85 Alternative Proposal Regarding the Court's Review of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Time and Expense Records. In light of the Alternate Proposal, the Court's #84 Order of February 29, 2016, is hereby MODIFIED as follows. Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel shall provide in camera submissions of time and expense records to the Court for its review on first of each month for the month that occurred two months prior (e.g., the report for April 2016 will be submitted to the Court on June 1, 2016). If the first of the month falls on a weekend or federal holiday, the in camera submission shall be filed on the next business day. The first in camera submission shall be provided to the Court by April 1, 2016, and shall cover fees and expenses incurred from July 2015 through February 2016. The filing of regular monthly in camera submissions shall commence on May 1, 2016, as outlined above. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 3, 2016. (NS)
March 3, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE of Interim Co-Lead Counsel's Alternative Proposal Regarding the Court's Review of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Time and Expense Records by ALL PLAINTIFFS re #84 Order, (Scherrer, Hilary)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. The Court hereby INCORPORATES and ADOPTS the Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel's #81 Proposal for the Management of Plaintiffs' Fees and Expenses and the Court's Review of Same with modifications regarding air travel and the Court's review of Plaintiffs' counsels' time and expense records (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 29, 2016. (NS)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #82 Proposed Joint Schedule, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before MARCH 25, 2016; Defendants shall file their Responsive Pleading(s) or Motion(s) on or before MAY 11, 2016; Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendants' Responsive Motions(s), if any, on or before JUNE 27, 2016; Defendants shall file their Reply in Support of Responsive Motions, if any, on or before JULY 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 26, 2016. (NS)
February 25, 2016 Filing 82 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint) by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (Parker, Richard)
February 25, 2016 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM re Order,,, by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Williams, Steven)
February 25, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Pier on behalf of ERIC STETZLER (Pier, Thomas)
February 25, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Laurence Yde on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Yde, Paul)
February 12, 2016 Filing 78 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) dated 2/12/2016 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr)
February 8, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Cialkowski on behalf of ROBERT DERINGER, JOHN-GABRIEL LICHT, DAVID WELLS (Cialkowski, David)
February 4, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule due by 2/25/2016 (dot)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The parties are directed to confer and submit a proposed joint schedule to the Court by no later than FEBRUARY 25, 2016, that includes the date by which Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated amended complaint and the date by which Defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) to the complaint. To the extent that Defendants anticipate filing responsive motion(s) to the complaint, the parties also shall provide a briefing schedule for addressing any such motions.Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel shall also submit to the Court by no later than FEBRUARY 25, 2016, a proposal for addressing the issue of managing Plaintiffs' fees and expenses in this litigation, including their proposal for the Court's review of same. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 4, 2016. (NS)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 4, 2016. (NS)
February 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 2/3/2016. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori.) (dot)
January 29, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED AIRLINES, INC.. Attorney Howard Shapiro terminated. (Shapiro, Howard)
January 28, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by CRAIG KELLY (Micheletti, Christopher)
January 21, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
January 20, 2016 Filing 73 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (MDL 2656) (ztnr)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). After informally conferring with Plaintiffs' Counsel who have filed motions seeking appointment as Interim Class Counsel and Defense Counsel, the Court has determined, in an abundance of caution, that it would be prudent to postpone the hearing currently scheduled for January 22, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., in light of the projected inclement weather. The Court is available on January 22, 2016, and appreciates all parties' willingness to appear on that date. However, the Court has determined that this is the appropriate course with which to proceed, particularly in light of the number of counsel who will be traveling from outside of the jurisdiction. As such, the Status Hearing on the issue of selecting Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel scheduled for January 22, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., is hereby RESCHEDULED to FEBRUARY 3, 2016, at 10:00 A.M., in COURTROOM 28A. The Court has confirmed the availability of Plaintiffs' Counsel who have filed motions seeking appointment as Interim Class Counsel as well as Defense Counsel at this date and time.The Court advises the parties that the hearing will predominantly consist of the Court asking questions of counsel based on the filings that it has received in response to its #38 Order of December 7, 2015. The Court notes that it has received sufficient briefing on the issue of appointing Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel and does not require any additional information unless circumstances have changed for counsel. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 20, 2016. (NS)
January 20, 2016 Filing 72 RESPONSE re #60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen R. Neuwirth of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel and to Appoint Executive Committee, #58 MOTION for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy as Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class C filed by LINDA WILLIAMS. (Alioto, Joseph)
January 19, 2016 Filing 71 ERRATA TO RESPONSE BY PLAINTIFFS LAVIN, YENINAS, KING, AND JUNG IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTMENT OF HAUSFELD LLP & CPM by STEPHANIE JUNG, RICHARD KING, KATHRYN LAVIN, STEVEN YENINAS #69 Response to motion,,, filed by STEVEN YENINAS, KATHRYN LAVIN, STEPHANIE JUNG, RICHARD KING. (Scherrer, Hilary)
January 19, 2016 Filing 70 RESPONSE re #60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen R. Neuwirth of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel and to Appoint Executive Committee, #57 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Joseph M. Alioto, #58 MOTION for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy as Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class C CORRECTED RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFFS BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB III LTD., ET AL, IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTMENT OF HAUSFELD, LLP AND COTCHETT, PITRE & McCARTHY, LLP AS INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL filed by KEITH ANDERSON, MICHELE ANDRADE, MICHAEL BACKUS, BRIAN BANK, JENNIFER BERDAY, AMY BESS, BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB, III, LTD., CHARLES CARTE, MINGLI CHEN, CHRISTINA CLEVELAND, LEON COATS, RON COATS, MICHAEL COFFEY, JR., CAROLYN COLLINS, HOWARD COLLINS, BRIAN CONNELLY, ANTHONY DENINNO, ROBERT DERINGER, PETER EVERITT, CHRISTOPHER FALCONETTI, SOLOMON FRIEDMAN, ROSEMARIE GABRIELE, LOIS GIORDANO, GLORIA GOLDBLATT, JAMES GRIMES, RICHARD P. IEYOUB, SR, BREANNA JACKSON, CRAIG KELLY, GARRETT KINDELSPIRE, RICHARD KING, KATHRYN LAVIN, LAX & COMPANY, INC., JOHN-GABRIEL LICHT, DAVID MCENERNEY, JUDAH MICHAEL, JUDAH NATHANSON, EDWARD PARK, HOWARD ROBINSON, JAMES L. STEWART, SARAH TRAN, NELSON VALDES, CHEROKII VERDUZCO, ELIZABETH WALKER, DAVID WELLS, YVETTE WHEELER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, Lesley)
January 18, 2016 Filing 69 RESPONSE re #60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen R. Neuwirth of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel and to Appoint Executive Committee, #57 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Joseph M. Alioto, #59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class C and in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Hausfeld and CPM as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by STEPHANIE JUNG, RICHARD KING, KATHRYN LAVIN, STEVEN YENINAS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael D. Hausfeld, #2 Affidavit of Steven N. Williams, #3 Affidavit of Bonny Sweeney, #4 Affidavit of Greg Arenson, #5 Affidavit of Eric Fastiff, #6 Affidavit of Warren Burns)(Scherrer, Hilary)
January 18, 2016 Filing 68 RESPONSE re #58 MOTION for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy as Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen R. Neuwirth of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel and to Appoint Executive Committee, #57 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Joseph M. Alioto Response of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP to Motions by Certain Other Law Firms for Appointment as Interim Class Counsel filed by STATE-BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM, ULLICO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nos. 1-4, #2 Declaration of Patrick McGlone, #3 Declaration of Timothy J. Smyth, #4 Declaration of Michael Kromar, #5 Declaration of Sheri Rosalia, #6 Declaration of Josh Stamps, #7 Declaration of Christopher Turtzo, #8 Declaration of Richard Warchol)(Himes, Jay)
January 18, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE re #57 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Joseph M. Alioto, #58 MOTION for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy as Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class C filed by ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL, RACHEL GOLIAN, ISRAEL KATZ. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
January 18, 2016 Filing 66 RESPONSE re #60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen R. Neuwirth of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel and to Appoint Executive Committee, #57 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Joseph M. Alioto, #58 MOTION for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy as Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class C PLAINTIFFS BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB III LTD., ET AL, IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTMENT OF HAUSFELD, LLP AND COTCHETT, PITRE & McCARTHY, LLP AS INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL filed by KEITH ANDERSON, MICHELE ANDRADE, MICHAEL BACKUS, BRIAN BANK, JENNIFER BERDAY, AMY BESS, BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB, III, LTD., KENT BUSEK, CHARLES CARTE, MINGLI CHEN, CHRISTINA CLEVELAND, LEON COATS, RON COATS, MICHAEL COFFEY, JR., CAROLYN COLLINS, HOWARD COLLINS, BRIAN CONNELLY, ANTHONY DENINNO, ROBERT DERINGER, PETER EVERITT, CHRISTOPHER FALCONETTI, SOLOMON FRIEDMAN, ROSEMARIE GABRIELE, LOIS GIORDANO, GLORIA GOLDBLATT, JAMES GRIMES, BARBARA E. HARTLEY, RICHARD P. IEYOUB, SR, BREANNA JACKSON, CRAIG KELLY, GARRETT KINDELSPIRE, RICHARD KING, KATHRYN LAVIN, LAX & COMPANY, INC., JOHN-GABRIEL LICHT, SETH LYONS, DAVID MCENERNEY, JUDAH MICHAEL, JUDAH NATHANSON, EDWARD PARK, HOWARD ROBINSON, STEVEN M. TRAUT WELLS, INC., JAMES L. STEWART, SARAH TRAN, NELSON VALDES, CHEROKII VERDUZCO, ELIZABETH WALKER, DAVID WELLS, YVETTE WHEELER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, Lesley)
January 14, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver on behalf of MICHAEL COFFEY, JR., JAMES GRIMES (Weaver, Lesley)
January 14, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver on behalf of BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB, III, LTD., LAX & COMPANY, INC., HOWARD ROBINSON Substituting for attorney Whitney E. Street (Weaver, Lesley)
January 13, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Mogin on behalf of KATHERINE ROSE WARNOCK (Mogin, Daniel)
January 13, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonny E. Sweeney on behalf of STEVEN YENINAS (Sweeney, Bonny)
January 13, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Hagstrom on behalf of ROBERT ROLLAND, TIMOTHY ST. CYR (Hagstrom, Richard)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The parties are hereby directed to deliver one (1) courtesy copy of any submission that is over twenty-five (25) pages in length or that includes more than one (1) exhibit to the Court Security Officer at the loading dock located at Third and C Streets (not the Clerk's Office or Chambers). Courtesy copies shall be appropriately bound and tabbed for ease of reference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 12, 2016. (NS)
January 11, 2016 Filing 60 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stephen R. Neuwirth of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel and to Appoint Executive Committee by ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL, RACHEL GOLIAN, ISRAEL KATZ (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Stephen R. Neuwirth and Exhibits 1-16 thereto, #3 Exhibit 17-33 to Affidavit of Stephen R. Neuwirth, #4 Affidavit of Kit. A. Pierson, #5 Affidavit of Ronald J. Aranoff, #6 Affidavit of Bruce L. Simon, #7 Affidavit of Barbara J. Hart, #8 Affidavit of Daniel E. Gustafson, #9 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Neuwirth, Stephen)
January 11, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Class Counsel] by MICHAEL KROMAR, SHERI ROSALIA, JOSH STAMPS, CHRISTOPHER TURTZO, RICHARD WARCHOL (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David W. Mitchell in support thereof and Exhibits A and B, #2 Affidavit of Jay L. Himes in support thereof and Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coughlin, Patrick)
January 11, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy as Interim Co-Lead Counsel by STEPHANIE JUNG, RICHARD KING, KATHRYN LAVIN, STEVEN YENINAS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Appointment of Hausfeld LLP and Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy as Interim Co-Lead Counsel, #2 Affidavit of Michael D. Hausfeld, #3 Affidavit of Steven N. WIlliams, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary)
January 11, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Joseph M. Alioto by LINDA WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph M. Alioto, #2 Resume of Joseph M. Alioto)(Alioto, Joseph)
January 11, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Glenn McLellan on behalf of SARAH TRAN (McLellan, Michael)
January 11, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. LeBel on behalf of LEVIN SIMES LLP (LeBel, Daniel)
January 8, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis O. Scarpulla on behalf of BARBARA E. HARTLEY (Scarpulla, Francis)
January 8, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Kralowec on behalf of AMY BESS (Kralowec, Kimberly)
January 5, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Kanner on behalf of LEON COATS, RON COATS, CAROLYN COLLINS, HOWARD COLLINS, ROSEMARIE GABRIELE (Kanner, Allan)
January 5, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N. Kaplan on behalf of HOWARD SLOAN KOLLER GROUP (Kaplan, Robert)
December 30, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa W. Wolchansky on behalf of KEVIN SCRIBNER (Wolchansky, Melissa)
December 30, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Abraham on behalf of LARRY MORRISON (Abraham, Jeffrey)
December 29, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Archie I. Grubb, II on behalf of ELIZABETH WALKER (Grubb, Archie)
December 24, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED AIRLINES, INC., UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.. Attorney Michael Lacovara terminated. (Lacovara, Michael)
December 23, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of UNITED AIRLINES, INC. (Gardiner, Kent)
December 23, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Gardiner, Kent)
December 23, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Shpetim Ademi on behalf of VALBONA ALLA, ETHAN BRODSKY, JEFFREY ROBB (Ademi, Shpetim)
December 16, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Papale on behalf of LINDA WILLIAMS (Papale, Lawrence)
December 9, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay L. Himes on behalf of ULLICO INC. (Himes, Jay)
December 9, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dombroski on behalf of JACOB DOMBROSKI, MARISA DOMBROSKI, AUDREY ONDRADE (Dombroski, James)
December 8, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce L. Simon on behalf of ANOOSHIRVAN BIDGOLI, BARBARA HUNTER, ANNIE MIGDAL (Simon, Bruce)
December 8, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Gustafson on behalf of KENT BUSEK, STEVEN M. TRAUT WELLS, INC. (Gustafson, Daniel)
December 8, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing: Plaintiffs' counsel seeking appointment as Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel shall file the documents and memoranda of law in support of their appointment by no later than 1/11/2016; Any responses to such affidavits and memoranda of law shall be filed by no later than 1/18/2016. A Status Conference is set for 1/22/2016, at 1:30 PM, in Courtroom 28A, before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (kt)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER addressing process for selecting Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel (see Order for details). Plaintiffs' counsel seeking appointment as Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel shall file the documents referenced in this Order and memoranda of law in support of their appointment by no later than JANUARY 11, 2016. Any responses to such affidavits and memoranda of law shall be filed by no later than JANUARY 18, 2016. The Court shall hold a Status Hearing on the issue of selecting Plaintiffs' Interim Class Counsel on JANUARY 22, 2016, at 1:30 P.M. in COURTROOM 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 7, 2015. (NS)
December 2, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren T. Burns on behalf of ELIZABETH A. CUMMING, PETER EVERITT, KENNETH A. NELSON, JONATHAN SHANKLE, BRADFORD TOMLIN, WHITNEY TOMLIN, YVETTE WHEELER (Burns, Warren)
December 1, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Alioto on behalf of EDWARD LAWRENCE, MICHAEL MARTIN (Alioto, Joseph)
December 1, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Dianne M. Nast on behalf of JAY TILAK (Nast, Dianne)
November 30, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Finkelman Bennett on behalf of KUMAR PATEL, RAJESH PATEL (Bennett, Natalie)
November 24, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd S. Garber on behalf of LILIAN M. RAJI (Garber, Todd)
November 23, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jiangxiao Athena Hou on behalf of MINGLI CHEN (Hou, Jiangxiao)
November 23, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Micheletti on behalf of CRAIG KELLY (Micheletti, Christopher)
November 20, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Justice on behalf of CHONG HUMMEL, ELSIE M. JONES (Justice, Kimberly)
November 20, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack W. Lee on behalf of EDWARD PARK (Lee, Jack)
November 19, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Steyer on behalf of MICHELE ANDRADE (Steyer, Allan)
November 16, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Malkinson on behalf of RICHARD E. KRAFT, VINCENT PANFIL (Attachments: #1 Appearance)(Malkinson, John)
November 14, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Leckman on behalf of RICHARD PRICE (Leckman, Peter)
November 13, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Coughlin on behalf of MICHAEL KROMAR, SHERI ROSALIA, JOSH STAMPS, CHRISTOPHER TURTZO, RICHARD WARCHOL (Coughlin, Patrick)
November 13, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Faith E. Gay on behalf of ISRAEL KATZ (Gay, Faith)
November 11, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond J. Farrow on behalf of MICHAEL BACKUS (Farrow, Raymond)
November 11, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Albert on behalf of CHARLES CARTE (Albert, Lee)
November 10, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Manfred P. Muecke on behalf of CHRISTINA CLEVELAND, GARRETT KINDELSPIRE (Muecke, Manfred)
November 10, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayne Arnold Goldstein on behalf of EILEEN SILVER (Goldstein, Jayne)
November 6, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin F. Johns on behalf of LOIS GIORDANO (Johns, Benjamin)
November 6, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Hausfeld on behalf of KATHRYN LAVIN (Hausfeld, Michael)
November 6, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of STEVEN HERSH, CURTIS PALMER (Nussbaum, Linda)
November 5, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary K. Scherrer on behalf of RICHARD KING (Scherrer, Hilary)
November 5, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E. Del Gaizo on behalf of STELLA BANGIYEVA, CHARLES CURLEY (Del Gaizo, Gregory)
November 5, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Radice on behalf of SETH LYONS, DAVID MCENERNEY (Radice, John)
November 5, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kit A. Pierson on behalf of WILLIAM YOUMANS (Pierson, Kit)
November 5, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J. Aranoff on behalf of RACHEL GOLIAN (Aranoff, Ronald)
November 4, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Neuwirth on behalf of ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL (Neuwirth, Stephen)
November 4, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay L. Himes on behalf of STATE-BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Himes, Jay)
November 4, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Edward Mason on behalf of SHAWN JAIN (Mason, Gary)
November 4, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabet C. Pritzker on behalf of LARISSA D. KOSITS (Pritzker, Elizabet)
November 4, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Joseph Bruckner on behalf of JONATHAN SCHUMACHER (Bruckner, W.)
November 4, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N. Williams on behalf of STEPHANIE JUNG. (Williams, Steven)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). Pursuant to the Court's #4 Initial Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, no more than one attorney for each Plaintiff may enter an appearance on the Master Docket. The Order further indicates that "Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of the Court with the name of one counsel to be the attorney of record, and the Clerk shall remove all other listed attorneys for that Plaintiff from the Master Docket." The parties shall notify the Clerk of the Court of the one counsel of record for each Plaintiff by filing an Entry of Appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) on the Master Docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 4, 2015. (NS)
November 3, 2015 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Azra Z. Mehdi on behalf of James L Stewart Associated Cases: 1:15-mc-01404-CKK, 1:15-cv-01816-CKK(Mehdi, Azra) Modified on 11/4/2015 (znmw).
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 30, 2015. (NS)
October 28, 2015 Filing 3 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) dated 8/28/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr)
October 23, 2015 Filing 2 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) dated 10/23/2015 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Colleen Kollar-Kotelly for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr)
October 13, 2015 Filing 1 COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/13/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: DOMESTIC AIRLINE TRAVEL ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK SNIADO
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARVIND SUNDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KROMAR
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL WARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELIA MELLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY HORWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY ST. CYR
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANOOSHIRVAN BIDGOLI
Represented By: Bruce L. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA L. HOLT
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MARTIN
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADFORD TOMLIN
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DERINGER
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY MORRISON
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER M. MCMAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELINA CHANDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH WALKER
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Archie I. Grubb, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD E. KRAFT
Represented By: John R. Malkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON KELLAM
Represented By: Craig L. Briskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG KELLY
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Christopher T. Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMELIA BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN M. TRAUT WELLS, INC.
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE FOSTER PATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BACKUS
Represented By: Raymond J. Farrow
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Cadio Zirpoli
Represented By: Matthew D. Heaphy
Represented By: Hilary K. Scherrer
Represented By: Charles T. Sweeny
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD C. PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETH LYONS
Represented By: John D. Radice
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM RUBINSOHN
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Represented By: Lingel H. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVIN SIMES LLP
Represented By: Daniel T. LeBel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GRIMES
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARISSA D. KOSITS
Represented By: Elizabet C. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN SCRIBNER
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERI ROSALIA
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN YENINAS
Represented By: Paul Thomas Gallagher
Represented By: Seth R. Gassman
Represented By: Jeannine M. Kenney
Represented By: Braden Beard
Represented By: Bonny E. Sweeney
Represented By: Katie R. Beran
Represented By: Molly C. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ULLICO INC.
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELSIE M. JONES
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDAH MICHAEL
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KUMAR PATEL
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMITRIY BANGIYEV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN SCHUMACHER
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUILLERMO DE LA GARZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY BESS
Represented By: Kimberly A. Kralowec
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAX & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA COSTANTINO
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM YOUMANS
Represented By: Kit A. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WARCHOL
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY TILAK
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L. STEWART
Represented By: Azra Z. Mehdi
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD PARK
Represented By: Jack W. Lee
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN CONNELLY
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY ONDRADE
Represented By: James M. Dombroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM B. COTTRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENT BUSEK
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSH STAMPS
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY DENINNO
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH A. CUMMING
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE ROSE WARNOCK
Represented By: Daniel J. Mogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRETT KINDELSPIRE
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL MACOLINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORRIE ANN COATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE-BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM
Represented By: Jay L. Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES G. DIBRELL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY A. REIBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW NEMIT
Represented By: Craig L. Briskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHONG HUMMEL
Represented By: Kimberly A. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN JAIN
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL COFFEY, JR.
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVETTE WHEELER
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD COLLINS
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDAH NATHANSON
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XAVIER BESS
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HERSH
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOSTON AMATEUR BASKETBALL CLUB, III, LTD.
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER DEVIVO
Represented By: Mark I. Labaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLOMON FRIEDMAN
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Nancy A. Kulesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN-GABRIEL LICHT
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN COLLINS
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA LAWRENCE CONE
Represented By: Robert S. Kitchenoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MCENERNEY
Represented By: John D. Radice
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA GOLDBLATT
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEROKII VERDUZCO
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: Matthew D. Heaphy
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Charles T. Sweeny
Represented By: Cadio Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL GOLIAN
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS PALMER
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILIAN M. RAJI
Represented By: Todd S. Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BREANNA JACKSON
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINGLI CHEN
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Jiangxiao Athena Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE RICHMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID WELLS
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD SLOAN KOLLER GROUP
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN FRANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MARKUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLA REPAN
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES CARTE
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OHLSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT PANFIL
Represented By: John R. Malkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN BRUZDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH TRAN
Represented By: Michael Glenn McLellan
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HARDIMON
Represented By: Marc H. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH ANDERSON
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Represented By: Michael Glenn McLellan
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA E. HARTLEY
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROBB
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON COATS
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN TED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON VALDES
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD LAWRENCE
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD PRICE
Represented By: Peter Leckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER BERDAY
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER EVERITT
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER FALCONETTI
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOIS GIORDANO
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BANK
Represented By: Terry Gross
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Adam C. Belsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJESH PATEL
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE GABRIELE
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC STETZLER
Represented By: Thomas P. Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE JUNG
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN SILVER
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN SHANKLE
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIA WINT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLEEN PANZINO
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN LEIGH
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALBONA ALLA
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN LAVIN
Represented By: Michael David Hausfeld
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETHAN BRODSKY
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNION LABOR LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Paul L. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIA ATTARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY LARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH A. NELSON
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY WINTON
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB DOMBROSKI
Represented By: James M. Dombroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARISA DOMBROSKI
Represented By: James M. Dombroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES CURLEY
Represented By: Gregory E. Del Gaizo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON LAY
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA A. ATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH MONTGOMERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER TURTZO
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD ROBINSON
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA CLEVELAND
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Manfred P. Muecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLA BANGIYEVA
Represented By: Gregory E. Del Gaizo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL WATKINS
Represented By: Michael Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON MULVEY
Represented By: Aaron Kyle Mulvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON PRICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE MIGDAL
Represented By: Bruce L. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON COATS
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN MULVEY
Represented By: Aaron Kyle Mulvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN POMEROY
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA BROWN
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITNEY TOMLIN
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEARSON PUBLISHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD KING
Represented By: Hilary K. Scherrer
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Lawrence G. Papale
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Represented By: Gil D. Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GARZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE ANDRADE
Represented By: Allan Steyer
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISRAEL KATZ
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Stephen R. Neuwirth
Represented By: Ronald J. Aranoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT ROLLAND
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD P. IEYOUB, SR
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA HUNTER
Represented By: Bruce L. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDERICK ISAACSON
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin G. Bradshaw
Represented By: Katrina M. Robson
Represented By: Richard G. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Cheryl Anne Falvey
Represented By: Paul Laurence Yde
Represented By: David Martin Schnorrenberg
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Joseph Lee Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTA AIRLINES, INC
Represented By: Brent K. Nakamura
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: Rory L. Skaggs
Represented By: Michael S. Mitchell
Represented By: Abby L. Dennis
Represented By: James Peter Denvir, III
Represented By: Martha Lea Goodman
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Denis
Represented By: Benjamin G. Bradshaw
Represented By: Sloane Ackerman
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Nuxoll Kopczynski
Represented By: Robert Alan Siegel
Represented By: Benjamin Bradshaw
Represented By: Katrina M. Robson
Represented By: Dennis S. Schmelzer
Represented By: Carolyn Hazard
Represented By: Richard G. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR CANADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: Brendan Sepulveda
Represented By: Cheryl Anne Falvey
Represented By: Luke Peter van Houwelingen
Represented By: Paul Laurence Yde
Represented By: Britton Dale Davis
Represented By: David Martin Schnorrenberg
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Joseph Lee Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO.
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Craig D. Margolis
Represented By: Vincent van Panhuys
Represented By: Vincent J. Ward
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: William Parker Sanders
Represented By: Matthew J. Jacobs
Represented By: Michael L. Charlson
Represented By: Alden Lewis Atkins
Represented By: Mortimer H. artwell
Represented By: Matthew Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: RICHARD A. LEVIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN RE: DOMESTIC AIRLINE TRAVEL ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: INTERNATIONAL AIR TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Thomas J. Lang
Represented By: Michael James Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?