ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Electronic Frontier Foundation (EFF) filed a complaint for injunctive relief against Defendants Departments of Commerce, Justice and Homeland Security to seek expedited processing and release of records concerning the creation, participation and support of the federal Tattoo Recognition Technology program.

Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2017cv02567
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by July 3, 2018 informing the Court of the status of the production of documents. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/7/2018. (lcabj2)
May 4, 2018 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cohen, Jason)
March 6, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by May 4, 2018 informing the Court of the status of the production of documents. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/6/2018. (lcabj2)
March 5, 2018 11 STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cohen, Jason)
March 1, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jason)
February 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Dispositive Motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of their production of documents to plaintiff, due on or before 3/5/2018. (kt)
February 5, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of their production of documents to plaintiff on or before March 5, 2018. See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/5/2018. (lcabj2)
February 5, 2018 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Taaffe, Damon) Modified to add link on 2/6/2018 (znmw).
January 16, 2018 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Department of Homeland Security (Sobel, David)
January 4, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file a responsive pleading by February 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/2018. (lcabj2)
January 4, 2018 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon)
December 12, 2017 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon)
December 8, 2017 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/6/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/5/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/6/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 12/6/2017; DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/6/2017; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/6/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing and Service)(Sobel, David)
November 30, 2017 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
November 30, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth)
November 30, 2017 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. (Sobel, David)
November 30, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5227047) filed by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Dept. of Commerce, # 3 Summons Dept. of Justice, # 4 Summons US Attorney General, # 5 Summons US Attorney, # 6 Summons Dept. Homeland Security)(Sobel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Represented By: David L. Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Damon William Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Damon William Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Damon William Taaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?