NETIS v. SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MAHAL NETIS
Defendant: ERNEST CODILIS, SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS), CHRIS AZUR, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE, PARVAN ARGAWAL, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS, ANGELA ZAVALA, MICHAEL BURNS, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, SHERRY MORRISON, MWS CAPITAL, LLC, NANCY RISTER, ROBERT CHODY, LAURA BARKER, MARTY RUBLE, MATTHEW SHAW, KAMMIE MARSHALL and JUDY HOBBS
Case Number: 1:2018cv01517
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, all other pending motions #3 , #4 , #5 are DENIED. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/11/2018. (zsb) (tempaty2, ).
July 12, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PARVAN ARGAWAL, CHRIS AZUR, MICHAEL BURNS, ERNEST CODILIS, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS), SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS, SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANGELA ZAVALA with Jury Demand filed by MAHAL NETIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, D & R) (zmd)
July 12, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate Foreclosure due to Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Due Process #5 MOTION to Vacate Foreclosure by MAHAL NETIS (Attachments: #1 Amended Proposed Order) (zmd) Modified on 7/23/2018 (zmd).
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate Foreclosure Due to Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Due Process by MAHAL NETIS. (zmd)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate Judgment/Order Dispossessory/Stay of Sentence/Recover Home by MAHAL NETIS. (zmd)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Cease and Desist all Claims Against Tribal Lands ExParte Injunctive Relief Recover Home by MAHAL NETIS. (zmd)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MAHAL NETIS. (zmd)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARVAN ARGAWAL, CHRIS AZUR, MICHAEL BURNS, ERNEST CODILIS, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS), SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS, SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANGELA ZAVALA with Jury Demand filed by MAHAL NETIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through S) (zmd)
June 26, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/26/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NETIS v. SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST CODILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS AZUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARVAN ARGAWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA ZAVALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRY MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWS CAPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY RISTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CHODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA BARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY RUBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMMIE MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHAL NETIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?