GRACE et al v. SESSIONS et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: GRACE, MINA, GINA, MONA, MARIA, CARMEN, J.A.C.F., GIO, NORA, A.B.A., CINDY ARDON MEJIA and A.P.A.
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, L. FRANCIS CISSNA and JAMES MCHENRY
Amicus: IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS, TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER, UNITED NATIONS HIGH COMMISSIONER FOR REFUGEES, ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, VIRGINIA and WASHINGTON
Case Number: 1:2018cv01853
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1252
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-5013 for 115 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (zrdj)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 55 motion for preliminary injunction. In light of 105 the Court's Permanent Injunction Order, the Court denies as moot 55 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/30/2018. (lcegs2)
January 25, 2019 Filing 125 STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Greer, Christina)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 107 defendants' motion to stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/25/2019. (lcegs2)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 119 plaintiffs' motion for telephone conference and clarifying 105 the Court's Order. The parties have notified the Court of their disagreement over the language in the Court's Order dated December 19, 2018. The parties disagree over paragraph 5 which orders the defendants "to bring back into the United States, at no expense to plaintiffs, any plaintiff who has been removed pursuant to an expedited removal order prior to this Order and parole them into the United States, and provide each of them a new credible fear process consistent with the Court's Memorandum Opinion." Notwithstanding the parole language, the Court has not required the defendants to provide a different process than what is mandated by the relevant credible fear statutory provisions. See 8 U.S.C. § 1225(b)(1)(B)(iii)(IV) (stating an alien "shall be detained pending a final determination of credible fear of persecution"). Accordingly, the motion for telephone conference is DENIED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/23/2019. (lcegs2)
January 22, 2019 Filing 121 RESPONSE re 119 MOTION for Telephone Conference and Status Report Concerning Paragraph 5 of Permanent Injunction filed by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Greer, Christina)
January 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response To 119 due on 1/22/2019 By 5:00PM. (mac)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing defendants to respond to 119 plaintiffs' motion for telephone conference by no later than 5:00 p.m. (EST) on January 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/22/2019. (lcegs2)
January 18, 2019 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 122 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 120 STATUS REPORT by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (See Docket Entry 119 to view document) (jf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION for Telephone Conference and Status Report Concerning Paragraph 5 of Permanent Injunction by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer)
January 18, 2019 Filing 118 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Christina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 117 STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Greer, Christina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 116 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re 115 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
January 17, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 105 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Strike, 106 Memorandum & Opinion by JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, L. FRANCIS CISSNA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Reuveni, Erez)
January 11, 2019 Filing 114 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 113 STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Greer, Christina)
January 9, 2019 Filing 112 REPLY to opposition to motion re 107 MOTION to Stay re 105 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Strike, filed by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Greer, Christina)
January 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Status Report due by 1/11/2019 (mac)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of 111 defendants' status report, defendants are directed to file a further status report by no later than January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/4/2019. (lcegs2)
January 4, 2019 Filing 111 STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Greer, Christina)
January 2, 2019 Filing 110 Memorandum in opposition to re 107 MOTION to Stay re 105 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Strike, filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer)
December 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/4/2019 (mac)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 109 the parties' motion to lift stay and to set aside the briefing schedule. In light of the parties' joint stipulation regarding paragraph 5 of the Permanent Injunction Order, the stay entered on December 26, 2018, is lifted, and the briefing schedule issued on December 27, 2018, is vacated. The parties are directed to comply with the Court's Permanent Injunction Order dated December 19, 2018. The defendants are FURTHER DIRECTED to file a status report detailing the steps they have taken to comply with Paragraph 5 of the Permanent Injunction Order by no later than January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/28/2018. (lcegs2)
December 28, 2018 Filing 109 STIPULATION re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, Order, JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PARAGRAPH 5 OF THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION, MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY ENTERED ON DECEMBER 26, 2018, AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE BRIEFING SCHEDULE by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Christina)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to brief the following issue by no later than 1:00 p.m. (EST) on December 28, 2018: whether paragraph 5 of the Permanent Injunction Order is related to an "emergenc[y] involving the safety of human life or the protection of property." See 31 USC § 1342. Submissions should be no longer than five pages. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/27/2018. (lcegs2)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 108 motion for stay in light of lapse of appropriations. Defendants are directed to notify the Court when appropriations are restored or if a continuing resolution is enacted. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/26/2018. (lcegs2)
December 26, 2018 Filing 108 Emergency MOTION to Stay to comply with Paragraph 5 of the Permanent Injunction Order by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (Greer, Christina) Modified event title on 12/28/2018 (znmw).
December 19, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION to Stay re 105 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Strike, by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greer, Christina)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/19/2018. (lcegs2)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 64 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Consider Evidence Outside Administrative Record ; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/19/2018. (lcegs2, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 104 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Greer, Christina) Modified on 12/20/2018 (znmw).
November 21, 2018 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on November 19, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-124. Date of Issuance: November 21, 2018. Court Reporter: Janice Dickman, Telephone number: 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019.(Dickman, Janice)
November 19, 2018 Filing 101 Civil Statement from Plaintiffs regarding case caption. (Spitzer, Arthur)
November 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Motions Hearing Held On The Cross Motions For Summary Judgment. Oral Arguments Heard And Taken Under Advisement. The Court Will Issue A Written Opinion. (Court Reporter JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
November 7, 2018 Filing 100 JOINT APPENDIX containing Excerpts Cited from the Administrative Record by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Newell, Jennifer)
November 7, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Lenora M. Lapidus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lapidus, Lenora)
November 6, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby schedules a hearing on the cross-motions for summary judgment for November 19, 2018, in Courtroom 24A at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/5/2018. (lcegs2)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 97 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Lenora M. Lapidus is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/5/2018. (lcegs2)
October 31, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY to opposition to motion re 88 Cross MOTION to Strike 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record filed by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Press, Joshua)
October 31, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lenora M. Lapidus, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, :Address- 125 Broad Street, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - (212) 549 2668. Fax No. - (212) 549 2580 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5768114. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lenora Lapidus, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur)
October 26, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Jane Roth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roth, Emma)
October 24, 2018 Filing 95 Memorandum in opposition to re 88 Cross MOTION to Strike 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer)
October 24, 2018 Filing 94 REPLY to opposition to motion re 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Newell, Jennifer)
October 24, 2018 Filing 93 REPLY re 86 Response to Document, in support of Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Newell, Jennifer)
October 24, 2018 Filing 92 REPLY to opposition to motion re 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum)(Newell, Jennifer)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Reply Brief due by 10/24/2018. Defendants Reply Brief due by 10/31/2018. (mac)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting joint 90 motion for modification of the briefing schedule. Plaintiffs' reply brief concerning their extra record evidence motion and opposition to Defendants' motion to strike is due by no later than October 24, 2018; and Defendants' reply brief concerning their motion to strike is due by no later than October 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/15/2018. (lcegs2)
October 12, 2018 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Clarification of Briefing Schedule Seeking Clarification or Modification of Briefing Schedule on Evidence Motions by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer). Added MOTION to Modify on 10/15/2018 (jf).
October 10, 2018 Filing 91 REPLY to opposition to motion re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (See Docket Entry 85 to view document). (znmw)
October 10, 2018 Filing 89 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record filed by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (See Docket Entry 88 to view document). (znmw) Modified to enter in error as a duplicate of 87 on 10/19/2018 (znmw).
October 10, 2018 Filing 88 Cross MOTION to Strike 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Press, Joshua) Modified filer on 10/12/2018 (znmw).
October 10, 2018 Filing 87 Memorandum in opposition to re 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record filed by JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSON, JAMES MCHENRY. (Press, Joshua) Modified filers on 10/19/2018 (znmw).
October 10, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE re 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Counter-statement filed by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (Reuveni, Erez)
October 10, 2018 Filing 85 Memorandum in opposition to re 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and reply in support of motion for summary judgment (ECF 57) filed by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (Reuveni, Erez)
October 4, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Celso Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Perez, Celso)
October 3, 2018 Filing 84 AMICUS BRIEF by UNITED NATIONS HIGH COMMISSIONER FOR REFUGEES. (jf)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 73 UNHCR's consent motion to file brief as amicus curiae. UNHCR's brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/3/2018. (lcegs3)
October 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Opposition and Reply due by 10/10/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 10/24/2018. Joint Submission due by 10/31/2018. (mac)
October 2, 2018 Filing 83 AMICUS BRIEF by IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS. (jf)
October 2, 2018 Filing 82 AMICUS BRIEF by CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, VIRGINIA, WASHINGTON. (jf)
October 2, 2018 Filing 81 AMICUS BRIEF by ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS. (jf)
October 2, 2018 Filing 80 AMICUS BRIEF by TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER. (jf)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 77 motion to file brief of amici curiae by Immigration Law Professors. The Immigration Law Professors' brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 76 motion to file brief as amici curiae. The District of Columbia and the states of California, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Minnesota, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington's brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 75 consent motion to file amici curiae brief by Administrative Law Professors. The Administrative Law Professors' brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 72 motion to file brief of the Tahirih Justice Center et al. as amici curiae. Tahirih Justice Center et al.'s brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 78 plaintiffs' motion for alteration of proposed order. The following schedule shall govern the proceedings in this case: Defendants' Opposition and Reply shall be filed by no later than October 10, 2018, and shall be no longer than 60 pages in length. Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed by no later than October 24, 2018, and shall be no longer than 35 pages in length. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 31, 2018, the parties, including those seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief, shall submit to the Court two hard copies and one USB drive containing all submissions to the Court governed by this scheduling order, including points and authorities. All paper copy submissions to the Court shall include the headers added by the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) System shall be single-sided, double-spaced, use 12-point Times New Roman font, and use one-inch page margins. Each set of hard copies shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the pleading therein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 31, 2018, the parties shall jointly submit one copy of each principal case or authority cited by any party. The points and authorities shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the contents therein. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018.(lcegs2)
October 1, 2018 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer). Added MOTION to Amend/Correct on 10/4/2018 (znmw).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 70 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Anjum Gupta is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/1/2018. (lcegs2)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Opposition And Reply due by 10/10/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 10/17/2018. Joint Submission due by 10/24/2018. (mac)
September 28, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae Immigration Law Professors in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragland, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part 67 defendants' motion for an extension time to file a brief re 66 plaintiffs' motion to consider evidence outside of the administrative record, 64 plaintiffs' cross motion for summary judgment. Having considered the motion and the opposition thereto, the Court grants in part defendants' motion. Defendants' Opposition and Reply shall be filed by no later than October 10, 2018, and shall be no longer than 60 pages in length. Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed by no later than October 17, 2018, and shall be no longer than 35 pages in length. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 24, 2018, the parties, including those seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief, shall submit to the Court two hard copies and one USB drive containing all submissions to the Court governed by this scheduling order, including points and authorities. All paper copy submissions to the Court shall include the headers added by the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) System shall be single-sided, double-spaced, use 12-point Times New Roman font, and use one-inch page margins. Each set of hard copies shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the pleading therein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 24, 2018, the parties shall jointly submit one copy of each principal case or authority cited by any party. The points and authorities shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the contents therein. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/28/2018. (lcegs2)
September 28, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, VIRGINIA, WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Litos, Stephanie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 75 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Admin Law Professors' Brief as Amici Curiae ISO Plntfs, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Ho, Derek)
September 28, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Tam Ho on behalf of ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS (Ho, Derek)
September 28, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of UNHCR as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of UNHCR as Amicus Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reyes, Ana)
September 28, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Tahirih Justice Center et al. as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment by TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Brief of the Tahirih Justice Center, et al. as Amici Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Paul)
September 28, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 71 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Tahirih Justice Center, et al. as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled.(jf)
September 28, 2018 Filing 71 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Tahirih Justice Center, et al. as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment by Tahirih Justice Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Brief of the Tahirih Justice Center et al. as Amici Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Paul) Modified on 9/28/2018 (jf).
September 28, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- ANJUM GUPTA, :Firm- Rutgers Law School Immigrant Rights Clinic, :Address- 123 Washington Street, Newark, NJ 07102. Phone No. - 973-353-2518. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5710719. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anjum Gupta in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragland, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K. Ragland on behalf of IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS (Ragland, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 68 Memorandum in opposition to re 67 MOTION hold merits briefing in abeyance, or, alternatively, for an extension of time to file a brief re 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record , 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiffs are directed to respond to 67 government's motion to hold merits briefing in abeyance or for an extension of time, by no later than 12:00 pm on September 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/27/2018. (lcegs2)
September 27, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance hold merits briefing in abeyance, or, alternatively, for an extension of time to file a brief re 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record , 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) Modified event title on 10/2/2018 (znmw). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 10/2/2018 (znmw).
September 26, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION To Consider Evidence Outside of the Administrative Record by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer)
September 26, 2018 Filing 65 Memorandum in opposition to re #57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts)(Newell, Jennifer)
September 26, 2018 Filing 64 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Sarah Mujahid, #4 Exhibit 1-17, #5 Declaration Declarations of Jamil, Nasr, Love, Goodwin and Powers, #6 Declaration Honduras Declaration, #7 Declaration Guatemala Declaration, #8 Declaration El Salvador Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Jennifer)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #63 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Thomas Buser-Clancy is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/24/2018. (lcegs2)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #62 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Andre Ivan Segura is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/24/2018. (lcegs2)
September 24, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas Buser-Clancy, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas, :Address- 5225 Katy Freeway, Suite 350, Houston TX 77007. Phone No. - 713-942-8146. Fax No. - 713-942-8966 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5702935. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Michelman, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andre Ivan Segura, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas, :Address- 5225 Katy Freeway, Suite 350, Houston TX 77007. Phone No. - 713-942-8146. Fax No. - 713-942-8966 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5702895. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Michelman, Scott)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Emma Roth is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/21/2018. (lcegs2)
September 20, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emma Roth, :Firm- ACLU Womne's Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St., New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-284-7325. Fax No. - 212-549-2650 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5698964. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Michelman, Scott)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #60 Plaintiff Gio's unopposed motion to lift #21 Order granting temporary stay of removal as to him ONLY. In view of the government's detention policy regarding individuals in expedited removal, the stay of removal is HEREBY VACATED as to Gio ONLY. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/14/2018. (lcegs2)
September 14, 2018 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay as to Him Only by GIO (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celso J. Perez, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eiland, Katrina)
September 13, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Musalo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Musalo, Karen)
September 13, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Eunice Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lee, Eunice)
September 12, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez)
September 11, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Emergency Stay of Removal REDACTED by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support REDACTED)(Michelman, Scott) Modified on 9/11/2018 to correct docket event/text (jf).
September 11, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REDACTED by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support REDACTED, #2 Text of Proposed Order REDACTED)(Michelman, Scott)
September 11, 2018 Filing 54 COMPLAINT REDACTED against LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by CINDY ARDON MEJIA, J.A.C.F., MINA, GRACE, CARMEN, GINA, NORA, A.P.A., GIO, MONA, A.B.A., MARIA.(Michelman, Scott)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' consent motion for an Order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) to lift restrictions on docket, and to seal documents containing confidential information. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/10/2018. (lcegs2)
September 7, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Scholten Dutton, Ann)
September 7, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #47 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and refiled by counsel under the correct docket event. (jf)
September 6, 2018 Filing 50 RESPONSE re #43 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Response to Sealed Court Order filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Attachments: #1 Revised Consent Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Revised))(Eiland, Katrina)
September 6, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar C. Jadwat on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jadwat, Omar)
September 5, 2018 Filing 51 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/26/2018. (jf)
September 5, 2018 Filing 48 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LEE FRANCIS CISSNA served on 8/27/2018; JAMES MCHENRY served on 8/27/2018; KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN served on 8/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Wofsy, Cody)
September 5, 2018 Filing 47 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 8/27/2018. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Wofsy, Cody) Modified on 9/7/2018 (jf).
September 5, 2018 Filing 46 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III served on 8/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Wofsy, Cody)
August 30, 2018 Filing 44 ERRATA Correcting Certificates of Service for by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA #12 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by MARIA, A.B.A., J.A.C.F., CINDY ARDON MEJIA, A.P.A., GINA, MINA, MONA, CARMEN, GIO, GRACE, NORA, #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARIA, A.B.A., J.A.C.F., CINDY ARDON MEJIA, A.P.A., GINA, MONA, MINA, CARMEN, GRACE, GIO, NORA. (Eiland, Katrina)
August 30, 2018 Filing 43 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Eiland, Katrina)
August 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Summary Judgment motion due by 9/12/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/26/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/3/2018. Motions for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support defendants due by 9/19/2018. Plaintiffs' Cross Summary Judgment motion due by 9/26/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 10/3/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 10/10/2018. Motions for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of plaintiffs due by 10/3/2018. Parties' two hard copies and one USB drive of their submissions due by 10/17/2018. Parties joint submission of each principal case or authority cited due by 10/17/2018. (zcdw)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #42 the parties' joint motion to revise the briefing schedule, and vacating the prior scheduling order. The following revised schedule shall govern the proceedings in this case: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than September 12, 2018, and shall be no longer than 45 pages in length. Any motions seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of the Defendants, with the brief attached as an exhibit, shall be filed by no later than September 21, 2018. The Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by no later than September 26, 2018, and shall be no longer than 65 pages in length. Any motions seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, with the brief attached as an exhibit, shall be filed by no later than September 28, 2018. Defendants' Opposition and Reply shall be filed no later than October 3, 2018, and shall be no longer than 45 pages in length. Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed by no later than October 10, 2018, and shall be no longer than 25 pages in length. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 17, 2018, the parties, including those seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief, shall submit to the Court two hard copies and one USB drive containing all submissions to the Court governed by this scheduling order, including points and authorities. All paper copy submissions to the Court shall include the headers added by the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) System shall be single-sided, double-spaced, use 12-point Times New Roman font, and use one-inch page margins. Each set of hard copies shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the pleading therein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 17, 2018, the parties shall jointly submit one copy of each principal case or authority cited by any party. The points and authorities shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the contents therein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any prospective amici shall file their briefs either upon motion for leave of the Court or upon consent of all parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/29/2018. (lcegs2)
August 29, 2018 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule seeking revision of current briefing schedule by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez)
August 29, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record and Certified List of Contents by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit B - List of Contents of EOIR Record of Proceedings)(Darrow, Joseph)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #40 the parties' joint status report, the following schedule shall govern the proceedings in this case: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than September 12, 2018, and shall be no longer than 45 pages in length. Any motions seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of the Defendants, with the brief attached as an exhibit, shall be filed by no later than September 19, 2018. The Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by no later than September 26, 2018, and shall be no longer than 65 pages in length. Any motions seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, with the brief attached as an exhibit, shall be filed by no later than October 3, 2018. Defendants' Opposition and Reply shall be filed no later than October 3, 2018, and shall be no longer than 45 pages in length. Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed by no later than October 10, 2018, and shall be no longer than 25 pages in length. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 17, 2018, the parties, including those seeking leave to file an amicus curiae brief, shall submit to the Court two hard copies and one USB drive containing all submissions to the Court governed by this scheduling order, including points and authorities. All paper copy submissions to the Court shall include the headers added by the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) System shall be single-sided, double-spaced, use 12-point Times New Roman font, and use one-inch page margins. Each set of hard copies shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the pleading therein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than October 17, 2018, the parties shall jointly submit one copy of each principal case or authority cited by any party. The points and authorities shall be in three-ring binders, with appropriate tables of contents and tabs, and the binders shall be clearly labeled to identify the contents therein. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/29/2018. (lcegs2)
August 27, 2018 Filing 40 Joint STATUS REPORT on Scheduling by All Parties by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Newell, Jennifer)
August 17, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of service of the administrative record by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III (Reuveni, Erez)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #38 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Omar C. Jadwat is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/17/2018. (lcegs2)
August 17, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Omar C. Jadwat, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-549-2660. Fax No. - 212-549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5646458. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Michelman, Scott)
August 16, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Greer on behalf of All Defendants (Greer, Christina)
August 16, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Shin-Young Park on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Park, Sandra)
August 16, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Rabinovitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rabinovitz, Judy)
August 14, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina Eiland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Eiland, Katrina)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #32 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Karen Musalo is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/13/2018. (lcegs2)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Anne Dutton is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/13/2018. (lcegs2)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #30 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Eunice Lee is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/13/2018. (lcegs2)
August 13, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #29 Status Report, filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carmen)(Wofsy, Cody)
August 13, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen Musalo, :Firm- Center for Gender and Refugee Studies, University of California -- Hastings College of the Law, :Address- 200 McAllister Street, San Francisco CA 94102. Phone No. - 415-581-8836. Fax No. - 415-581-8824 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5636337. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Michelman, Scott)
August 13, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anne Dutton, :Firm- Center for Gender and Refugee Studies, University of California -- Hastings College of the Law, :Address- 200 McAllister Street, San Francisco CA 94102. Phone No. - 415-581-8825. Fax No. - 415-581-8824 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5636315. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Michelman, Scott)
August 13, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eunice Lee, :Firm- Center for Gender and Refugee Studies, University of California -- Hastings College of the Law, :Address- 200 McAllister Street, San Francisco CA 94102. Phone No. - 415-581-8836. Fax No. - 415-581-8824 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5636296. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA (Michelman, Scott)
August 13, 2018 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT Responding to the Court's Minute Order (8/13/18) by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cronen Declaration, #2 Declaration Bible Declaration, #3 Exhibit Email to counsel)(Reuveni, Erez)
August 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Schedule Proposal For Further Proceedings due by 8/27/2018 Motion To Complete/Compel/Supplement due by 8/29/2018. Response/Opposition due by 9/4/2018. Reply due by 9/6/2018. (mac)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the #27 parties' joint status report on scheduling, defendants shall serve the administrative record and index on the parties by no later than August 17, 2018. The plaintiffs shall complete their review of the administrative record and provide correspondence to the defendants raising any concerns by no later than August 22, 2018. The parties shall attempt to resolve record disputes amongst themselves by no later than August 24, 2018. If the parties resolve the record disputes amongst themselves, the parties are ordered to submit a joint schedule proposal for further proceedings by no later than August 27, 2018. If the parties are unable to resolve any record disputes, the parties shall adhere to the following schedule for resolution of any disputes by the Court: Any motion to complete/compel/supplement shall be filed by no later than August 29, 2018; any response/opposition shall be filed by no later than September 4, 2018; and any reply shall be filed by no later than September 6, 2018. One week after either an order resolving all administrative record disputes or the parties resolution of any administrative record concerns themselves, whichever is later, defendants shall file the certified list of the contents of the administrative record with the Court. The defendants shall provide a complete copy of the administrative record, with certified list, to the Court on flash drive(s) or DVD(s). The Court will schedule further proceedings in this matter following the production of the administrative record and resolution of any disputes regarding the administrative record. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/13/2018. (lcegs2)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #28 Plaintiff Mona's unopposed motion to lift #21 Order granting temporary stay of removal as to her ONLY. In view of the government's detention policy regarding individuals in expedited removal, the stay of removal is HEREBY VACATED as to Plaintiff Mona ONLY. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded of the obligation, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(c), to provide a proposed order with each motion and opposition. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/13/2018. (lcegs2)
August 13, 2018 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay of Removal as to Her Only by MONA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katrina Eiland)(Wofsy, Cody)
August 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Report due on 8/13/2018 by 5:00PM. (mac)
August 10, 2018 Filing 27 Joint STATUS REPORT by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (Press, Joshua)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing defendants to file a comprehensive report to the Court explaining the circumstances surrounding the removal of plaintiffs on the morning of August 9, 2018, notwithstanding the representations from the attorney for the defendants that the government would not remove the plaintiffs prior to 11:59 pm that day. The report shall be supported by declarations of appropriate officials. Defendants shall file the report by no later than 5:00 pm August 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/10/2018. (lcegs2)
August 10, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anton Darrow on behalf of All Defendants (Darrow, Joseph)
August 10, 2018 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT concerning compliance with the Court's order (ECF No. 22) by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (Reuveni, Erez)
August 10, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Samuel Press on behalf of All Defendants (Press, Joshua)
August 10, 2018 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 8-9-18; Page Numbers: 1-48. Date of Issuance:8-9-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 8/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018.(Wallace, Scott)
August 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Status Report due on 8/10/2018 by 5:00PM. (mac)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing defendants to return plaintiffs to the United States FORTHWITH. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/9/2018.(lcegs2)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting temporary stay of removal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/9/2018. (lcegs2)
August 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2018 re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court Will Issue Orders Forthcoming. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/09/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 9, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (znbn)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Court's calendar, the motions hearing previously scheduled for 8/9/2018 at 9:30am will now take place on 8/9/2018 at 10:00am in Courtroom 24A. PLEASE NOTE THE TIME CHANGE. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/9/2018. (lcegs2)
August 9, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for Emergency Stay of Removal filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. (Michelman, Scott) Modified to add link on 8/13/2018 (znmw).
August 8, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Chang Newell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newell, Jennifer)
August 8, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody H. Wofsy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wofsy, Cody)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Sandra Shin-Young Park is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2)
August 8, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for Emergency Stay of Removal filed by LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (Reuveni, Erez) Modified to add link on 8/13/2018 (znmw).
August 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of All Defendants (Reuveni, Erez)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA re Order, #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for Emergency Stay of Removal (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Stay Motion (and Preliminary Injunction))(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs have not yet filed the memorandum accompanying #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order for Emergency Stay of Removal referenced in the Motion. ECF No. 11 at 1. Plaintiffs are HEREBY ORDERED to file the memorandum in support of their motion by no later than 5:50 pm Eastern Daylight Time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sandra Shin-Young Park, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Women's Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-519-7871. Fax No. - 212-549-2650 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5629175. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 8/8/2018. Government Submissions to be filed no later than 8:00 PM on 8/8/2018. Plaintiff to Reply by 1:00 AM. A Motion Hearing is set for 8/9/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace) (znbn)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Katrina Eiland is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Judy Rabinovitz is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Jennifer Chang Newell is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Cody H. Wofsy is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grace, #2 Declaration of Carmen, #3 Declaration of Mina, #4 Declaration of Gina, #5 Declaration of Mona, #6 Declaration of Gio, #7 Declaration of Maria, #8 Declaration of Nora, #9 Declaration of Cindy, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for Emergency Stay of Removal by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 LR 65.1 Cert of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Deborah Anker, #3 Declaration of Sarah Mujahid, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #5 Exhibit A - F, #6 Exhibit G - L, #7 Exhibit M - T, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katrina Eiland, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628296. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Judy Rabinovitz, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-549-2618. Fax No. - 212-549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628273. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Chang Newell, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628241. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody H. Wofsy, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Right Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628203. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the forthcoming motion for temporary restraining order, the Court, sua sponte, schedules a status conference for August 8, 2018 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 24A. Plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorney's Office for the District or Columbia and/or the Department of Justice as appropriate to identify government counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 SEALED Declarations filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. re #3 Complaint, filed by MARIA, A.B.A., J.A.C.F., CINDY ARDON MEJIA, A.P.A., GINA, MINA, MONA, CARMEN, GIO, GRACE, NORA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094025) filed by CINDY ARDON MEJIA, J.A.C.F., MINA, GRACE, CARMEN, GINA, NORA, A.P.A., GIO, MONA, A.B.A., MARIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) Modified on 8/10/2018 (zrdj).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal; further ordered, that the list of the full names of the plaintiffs and their children shall remain under seal until further order of the Court.. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 07, 2018. (See Order for Full Details) (jf)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRACE et al v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINA
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONA
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A.C.F.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIO
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORA
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.A.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY ARDON MEJIA
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.A.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina Eiland(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Lenora M. Lapidus(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eunice Lee(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Scott Michelman
Represented By: Karen Musalo(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Sandra Shin-Young Park(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Celso Perez
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Emma Jane Roth(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Represented By: Christina Greer
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Represented By: Christina Greer
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Represented By: Christina Greer
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MCHENRY
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Represented By: Christina Greer
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS
Represented By: Anjum Gupta(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas K. Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Paul Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: UNITED NATIONS HIGH COMMISSIONER FOR REFUGEES
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS
Represented By: Derek Tam Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: DELAWARE
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: HAWAII
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: ILLINOIS
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: IOWA
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: MAINE
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: MARYLAND
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: MINNESOTA
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NEW YORK
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: OREGON
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: VERMONT
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: VIRGINIA
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: WASHINGTON
Represented By: Stephanie Litos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?